USA v. Kyle et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cr-00245
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth Martin Kyle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coleman & Balogh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan A. Balogh +1 415 439 8347 +1 415 373 3901 eab@colemanbalogh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn Dyer Detention

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Martin Kyle

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Bigeleisen , +1 415 957 1717 +1 415 957 1777 dmbigeleisen@gmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
Copy of ORDER of USCA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle re 72 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment- re parties directed to file supplemental briefs addressing effect if any of Supreme Court's decision in Davila, etc. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 05/26/11, before Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2013.(mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah held on 9/02/10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        *** FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT 90 . *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah held on 9/2/10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #91. *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 05/26/11, before Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2012.(mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 1/4/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 7-22-2010, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Official Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, CSR, RPR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2012.(ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #91. *** CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 05/26/11, before Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012.(mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 1/4/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #91. *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 05/26/11, before Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012.(mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 1/4/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on October 13, 2011, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jaimie Hopp, Email address: jaimiehopp@gmail.com; Telephone number: (925) 759-0770. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2012.(djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah held on 04/29/10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2012.(jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on January 19, 2011, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/ Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012.(Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/16/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on March 8, 2012, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012.(Ball, Belle) (Filed on 7/15/2012) (Entered: 07/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 11-10-10, before Judge Jeffrey White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012.(kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 2/2/12, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Kelly L. Shainline, E-mail courtreporter232@aol.com, Telephone number (510)828-9404. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2012.(Shainline, Kelly) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Ethan Atticus Balogh for Kenneth Martin Kyle as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/12. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Kenneth Martin Kyle as to Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah for proceedings held on 4/29/10, 7/22/10, 9/2/10, 11/10/10, 1/19/11, 5/26/11, 10/13/11, 2/2/12, 3/12/12 before Judge Jeffrey S. White, re 72 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Transcript due by 7/16/2012. (Balogh, Ethan) (Filed on 6/15/2012) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                  USCA copy of order: as to Kenneth Martin Kyle re 72 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appellant's submission of CJA 23 is construed as motion to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, motion is granted. Court grants retained counsel Donald Bigeleisen leave to withdraw etc. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable 71 Mail sent to Kenneth M. Kyle (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                      USCA copy of order - copy of notice of appeal received in Court of Appeals; attached time schedule as to Kenneth Martin Kyle re 72 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kenneth Martin Kyle re 68 Judgment in a Criminal Case Filing fee $ 455. Not paid - billed. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle GRANTING 70 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Letter to Judge White from defendant Kenneth Martin Kyle (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Sealing Order - General Order 54 as to Kenneth Martin Kyle.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Change of Plea Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 3/12/2012, Sentencing held on 3/12/2012 for Kenneth Martin Kyle (1), Count(s) 1, 450 months in custody; 10 years supervised release; $100 special assessment; $50,000 restitution (see judgment for additional conditions).. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 69 ***PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/14/2012 (tlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ***DATA ENTRY ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 66 *** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney:Change of Plea Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 3/8/2012, Sentencing held on 3/8/2012 for Kenneth Martin Kyle (1), Count(s) 1, 450 months in custody; 10 years supervised release; $100 special assessment; $50,000 restitution (see judgment for additional conditions).. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/12/2012 (tlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle GRANTING 62 Stipulation to set for change of plea and vacate pending deadlines as to Kenneth Martin Kyle:. Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION to set for change of plea and vacate pending deadlines by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 2/15/2012) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Trial Setting Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 2/2/2012 - NO TIME EXCLUDED. Jury Trial (2 weeks) set for 4/2/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kelly Shainline.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Statement by Kenneth Martin Kyle - Joint Status Conference Statement by David Bigeleisen, defendant's attorney, and Owen Martikan, Assistant U.S. Attorney (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 1/24/2012) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND EXCLUDING TIME. Status Conference set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Statement by Kenneth Martin Kyle - Joint Status Conference Statement (Martikan, Owen) (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Warrant Returned Executed on 11/16/11 as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle RE Status and Calling of the Case: Status Conference set for 12/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 54 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                First MOTION for Leave to File Joint Status and Calendar Statement and Proposed Order by Kenneth Martin Kyle. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status and Calendar Statement, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Status and Calling of Case)(Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/21/2011) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 10/13/2011 The Defendant moved to withdraw his plea of guilty: GRANTED. The Court ordered the guilty plea stricken. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report re: next calling of the case by 10-20-11. (Court Reporter Jaimie Hopp.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER NOTIFYING PARTIES OF COURT'S INTENT TO REJECT PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Martin Kyle and Attachments (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Service by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (Proof of Publication) (Hinds, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/21/2011) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            REQUEST TO CONTINUE SENTENCING AND ORDER APPROVING THEREON as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Change of Plea Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 5/26/2011, Plea entered by Kenneth Martin Kyle (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 45 Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture of Property as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Forfeiture of Property (Application of the United States for a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture) by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hinds, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/14/2011) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Change of Plea Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 5/26/2011, Plea entered by Kenneth Martin Kyle (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 10/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING 29 Motion to Suppress. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on January 19, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Motion Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 1/19/2011. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kenneth Martin Kyle - Reply Memorandum in Support of First Motion to Suppress Evidence (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 12/17/2010) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 32 Motion for Ex Parte Request to Continue Deadline for Production of DNA Discovery as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/16/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Owen P. Martikan in Support of 32 MOTION for Ex Parte Application to Continue Deadline for Production of DNA Discovery and [proposed] Order by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Ex Parte Application to Continue Deadline for Production of DNA Discovery and [proposed] Order by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Special Agent Analisa Nogales in Opposition to 29 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 12/10/2010) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle Motion to Suppress Evidence (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 12/10/2010) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Suppress Evidence by Kenneth Martin Kyle. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Annalisa Nogales regarding the warrant for the search of Kenneth Kyle's residence)(Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 11/24/2010) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Exhibits - Exhibit 9 (REDACTED) to Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (to replace Document 26 filed in error on 11/8/2010) by Kenneth Martin Kyle (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 11/15/2010) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Motion Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 11/10/2010 Motion to Suppress Hearing set for 1/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR AND TO BE REFILED LATER**** REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kenneth Martin Kyle re 25 Reply to Response - Exhibit 9 (REDACTED) (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 11/8/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kenneth Martin Kyle - REFILING of Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Exhibit 9 - REDACTED, to be filed separately) (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 11/5/2010) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO COMPEL: Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle DIRECTING COUNSEL TO REFILE REDACTED DOCUMENT OR SHOW CAUSE WHY REDACTION IS NOT NECESSARY. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kenneth Martin Kyle - Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 - Reports from Federal and State investigators in Missouri and additional Federal report from San Francisco ICE investigation)(Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle re 17 First MOTION to Compel Discovery (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 10/18/2010) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/20/10 as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order by Kenneth Martin Kyle Compelling Discovery (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Compel Discovery (Exhibits 1 - 8) by Kenneth Martin Kyle. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX 1: FBI memo of 12/7/09 re part of Kyle's investigation; EX 2: Warrant issued re search of Kyle's apartment on 3/10/10, # 2 Exhibit EX 3: Inventory of items seized re 3/10/10 search; EX 4: Events re Kyle's arrest at SFAirport on 3/15/10, # 3 Exhibit EX 5: Results re search of Kyle's apartment on 4/16/10; EX 6: Report re search of Kyle's computer at SFAirport, # 4 Exhibit EX 7: David Bigeleisen's letter of 4/27/10 to Owen Martikan, U.S. Attorney's Office, requesting discovery; EX 8: David Bigeleisen's letter of 9/14/10 to Owen Martikan requesting additional discovery)(Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Compel Discovery by Kenneth Martin Kyle. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 9/2/2010. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT -- Joint Status Conference Statement and Proposed Briefing Schedule proposed by Owen Martikan, Assistant U.S. Attorney and by David Michael Bigeleisen, Defendant's attorney by Kenneth Martin Kyle (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 7/22/2010 Status Conference set for 9/2/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle GRANTING 12 Stipulation and Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah Stipulation and [Proposed] Interim Protective Order (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 6/1/2010) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 4/29/2010 Status Conference set for 7/22/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXCLUDING TIME as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/28/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order by USA as to Kenneth Martin Kyle STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 4/28/2010) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Michael Bigeleisen appearing for Kenneth Martin Kyle, Tessa Van Vlerah (Bigeleisen, David) (Filed on 4/22/2010) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman:entry of plea not guilty, as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 4/7/2010. Set prev. for 4/29/10 at 2:30 before Judge White. (Tape #9:39-9:41.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman:Arraignment as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (1) Count 1,2,4,5,6 held on 4/5/2010 entry of plea set for 4/7/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Status Conference set for 4/29/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Tape #9:42-9:57.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, Tessa Van Vlerah (2) count(s) 3. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen:I.D. of Counsel Hearing as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 3/30/2010, defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 4/5/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 4/15/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman.(Tape #9:50-9:56.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010) [3:10-mj-70212-MAG] (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen:Initial Appearance as to Kenneth Martin Kyle held on 3/22/2010, Added attorney David M. Bigeleisen for Kenneth Martin Kyle. Defendant remanded to custody. Government's motion to unseal case is granted. Detention Hearing set for 3/30/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Tape #9:54-10:06.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) [3:10-mj-70212-MAG] (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALING ORDER as to Kenneth Martin Kyle. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/19/10. (rhwS, ) (Filed on 3/19/2010) (rhw, COURT STAFF). [3:10-mj-70212-MAG] (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Kenneth Martin Kyle (1). (rhwS, ) (Filed on 3/19/2010) (rhw, COURT STAFF). [3:10-mj-70212-MAG] (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 782 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?