Xilinx, Inc v. Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-04407
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 9:07 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Detelle Relay Kg, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures Funding LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Noregin Assets N.v., LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Roldan Block Ny, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Tr Technologies Foundation LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Xilinx, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Behrooz Shariati +1 650 813 5000 +1 650 813 5100

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Michael, Esq. +1 415 591 1000 +1 415 591 1400 pmichael@winston.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
No Logo Taichi Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Michelle Charrington +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 lmcharrington@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 3/17/2012, Entered: None
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/16/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
    ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Taichi Holdings, LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(A)(3), COUNTERCLAIM against Taichi Holdings, LLC byXilinx, Inc., Xilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 2/29/2012) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
      Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/24/2012 before Illston (Date Filed: 2/27/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2012 03:00 PM. () (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
        Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Xilinx, Inc. byRoldan Block NY, LLC, Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, Xilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
            AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) For Patent Non-Infringement and Invalidity against Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. Filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 2/6/2012) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
              ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (11-0671); ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (11-4407) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2012) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 02:30 PM. THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                  CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2012 04:00 PM. THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                    STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byDetelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/23/2012) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Michael, Esq (Michael, Patrick) (Filed on 1/20/2012) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Leslie Welch As Counsel for Plaintiff Xilinx, Inc. (Welch, Henry) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                          CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (105 in 3:11-cv-00671-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Public Version), (60 in 3:11-cv-04407-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version). Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 73 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Declaration of Joseph F. Chernesky ISO 77 Defendants' Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 73 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Reply in Support of 64 Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss ) XILINX'S OPP'N TO DEF'S MTD FAC (PUBLIC COPY-REDACTED VERSION) filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                  Proposed Order DENYING DEFS MTD XILINX'S FAC by Xilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 71 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - XILINX'S OPP'N TO 64 DEFS' MTD FAC by Xilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 73 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                      ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 66 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                        ORDER granting Ex Parte Application re 66 .(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                          ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal RE 65 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Ameet A. Modi in Support of 69 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint filed byDetelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                              (REDUCTED) REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss ) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version) filed byDetelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Xilinxs First Amended Complaint and Declaration of Joseph. F. Chernesky filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Andrew G. Hamill in Support of 66 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Xilinxs First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Declaration of Joseph. F. Chernesky filed byDetelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) 66 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/22/2011
                                                    Ex Parte Application for an Order to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Xilinxs First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Declaration of Joseph. F. Chernesky filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Permit Xilinx, Inc. to File Under Seal Defs.' Information Disclosed in Xilinx's Opp'n to Defs.' Mot. to Dismiss Xilinx, Inc.'s FAC by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, Xilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 62 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/4/2011) Modified on 11/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                          CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2012 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER granting 59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Declaration of Ameet A. Modi in Support of 60 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version) MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version) MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version) filed byDetelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint (Public Version) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's First Amended Complaint filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Xilinx (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xilinx, Inc. of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Latrosse Technologies, LLC served on 9/12/11, answer due on 10/3/11 (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xilinx, Inc. of Summons and Complaint as to defendnat Detelle Relay KG, LLC served on 9/12/11, answer due on 10/3/11 (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xilinx, Inc. of Summons and Complaint as to defendant TR Technologies Foundation LLC served on 9/12/11, answer due 10/3/11 (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xilinx, Inc. of Summons and Complaint as to Taichi Holdings, LLC served on 9/12/11, answer due 10/3/11 (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendants (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John Spaccarotella by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ameet A. Modi by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Eugene Chiu by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael P. Stadnick by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John M. Desmarais by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the four orders granting the pro hac vice applications were filed in error. The Court actually denied all of the applications. The proposed orders were not accurately completed (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FILED IN ERROR Modified on 10/19/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            FILED IN ERROR Modified on 10/19/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR Modified on 10/19/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                )FILED IN ERROR Modified on 10/19/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  FILED IN ERROR Modified on 10/19/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Stadnick ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065892.) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John Spaccarotella ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065892.) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ameet A. Modi ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065892.) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John M. Desmarais ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065892.) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Eugene Chiu ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065892.) filed by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 propsed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. Filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 10/17/2011) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE to 11-671. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/3/11. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011 by Xilinx, Inc. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Text modified on 9/29/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Intellectual Ventures, LLC served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011 by Xilinx, Inc. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Text modified on 9/29/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Noregin Assets N.V., LLC served on 9/12/2011 by Xilinx, Inc. Text modified on 9/29/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document ((bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Roldan Block NY, LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011 by Xilinx, Inc. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Text modified on 9/29/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011 by Xilinx, Inc. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Text modified on 9/29/2011 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              *** PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS INCOMPLETE*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Latrosse Technologies, LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                *** PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS INCOMPLETE*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Detelle Relay KG, LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  *** PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS INCOMPLETE*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Taichi Holdings, LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    *** PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS INCOMPLETE*** Summons Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc. TR Technologies Foundation, LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer to Otherwise Respond to Complaint re 1 by Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Peter H. Chang as Counsel for Defendants (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Grant Hamill on behalf of defendants Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Bradford John Black as Counsel for Defendants on behalf of Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Xilinx, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Noregin Assets N.V., LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Detelle Relay KG, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Taichi Holdings, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to TR Technologies Foundation, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Roldan Block NY, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Latrosse Technologies, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Lack of Standing, Patent Non-Infringement and Invalidity, and Violation of California Business and Professions Code 17200 (Summons Issued0 against Detelle Relay KG, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611010310). Filed by Xilinx, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 425 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?