District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Southern District Court United States Supreme Court

Low v. Trump University, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG
District Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 4, 2020 at 8:05 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brandon Keller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
No Logo Ed Oberkrom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
No Logo J.R. Everett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
No Logo JOHN BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
No Logo Patricia Murphy, Plaintiff
No Logo Sonny Low, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
No Logo Tarla Makaeff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com
Space Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com
Space Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
Space Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula M. Roach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 proach@rgrdlaw.com
Trump University, LLC Trump University, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin James Morris +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 bmorris@foley.com
Space Nancy L. Stagg +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 nstagg@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity HN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yunker & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Keith Schneider +1 619 233 5500 +1 619 233 5535 dks@yslaw.com
v.
No Logo DOES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy L. Stagg +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 nstagg@foley.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin James Morris +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 bmorris@foley.com
Space Nancy L. Stagg +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 nstagg@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity HN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com
Trump University, LLC Trump University, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin James Morris +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 bmorris@foley.com
Space Nancy L. Stagg +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 nstagg@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity HN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yunker & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Keith Schneider +1 619 233 5500 +1 619 233 5535 dks@yslaw.com
No Logo Tarla Makaeff, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space Rachel L. Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Office San Diego
Filed 4/30/2010
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Orange
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 11-55016[USCA], 14-80031[USCA]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLASS ACTION,PROTO,SEALDC
  Entries (593) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Notice re Disbursement of Funds Deposited with the Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Payment Received from Sherri B. Simpson in the amount of $ $500.00. Receipt number CAS092233 (Re 632 and 633 ) (dlg) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 634 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re 633 Notice (Other) (Friedman, Gary) (dlg). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF POSTING OF APPEAL BOND by Sherri B. Simpson re 632 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order re Appeal Bond)(Friedman, Gary) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 06/23/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 624 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Helen I. Zeldes by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Helen Irene Zeldes (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Zeldes, Helen) (dlg). (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Firm Name Change by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re 626 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, Memorandum of Law filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Gary B. Friedman, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Friedman, Gary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth). (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER of USCA as to 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. The plaintiffs-appellees' unopposed motion to expedite is granted in part. This case is expedited and shall be calendared as soon as possible upon completion of briefing. Briefing schedule issued. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) regarding streamlined extensions shall not apply to this case, and any motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) is strongly disfavored and must be supported by a showing of compelling circumstances. (akr) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Appeal Bond re 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-15 to Jensen Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in support thereof, # 5 Declaration of Charles Marr in support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 623 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            USCA Time Schedule Order as to 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/31/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/30/2017.) (cc: Court Reporters). (Attachments: # 1 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form). (akr) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              USCA Case Number 17-55635 for 621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 621 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 619 Final Judgment, 618 Order, by Sherri B. Simpson. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-10035125.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Friedman, Gary). (Modified on 5/1/2017: Edited docket text re linked Judgment and Order.) (akr). (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/30/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 619 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    FINAL JUDGMENT. Effective as of the date of the Final Approval Order, this Judgment is binding on all Parties and all Class Members and extinguishes all Released Claims of Releasing Plaintiffs and Class Members and Releasing Defendants that were released pursuant to the Agreement. The Actions, including the individual claims of Plaintiffs and Class claims resolved in them, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice without fees or costs to any Party, except as provided in the Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017.(jao) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 618 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER (1) Granting 589 Joint Motion For Final Approval of The Proposed Class Action Settlement; and (2) Granting 590 Plaintiff's Motion For Approval of Class Representative Awards. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017. (jao) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Final Approval Hearing held on 3/30/2017; Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017 re 590 - taken under submission; MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low, 589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low - taken under submission. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum and Jeffrey Stein).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin).(Gary Friedman for Objector Sherri Simpson and IIann Maazel). (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE re 614 Declaration filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Melikian in Support Thereof)(Coughlin, Patrick) (mdc.) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting re 614 Declaration. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental Documents require Court Order; No provisions for acceptance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/30/17.(dlg) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 614 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DECLARATION re 592 Objection, Supplemental Declaration of Sherri B. Simpson by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg). (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Joinder by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re 612 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 590 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards , 589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support, # 2 Reply Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support, # 3 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support, # 4 Declaration of Charles Marr, Esq. in Support, # 5 Declaration of Robert Guillo)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Regina Henriquez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (Discrepancy served via U.S. Mail to filer)(dlg). (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gary B. Friedman re 606 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/10/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ilann M. Maazel re 600 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Andrew G. Celli, Jr. re 599 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/2017.(kcm) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Cheryl and E. Hunter King. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/10/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9884059.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Rhonda Feher. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form and Accompanying Documents by Michael De Cesare. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Jayakumar Patil. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Susan Pantages. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9875566.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maazel, Ilann) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9875446.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Claude Henry. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/6/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re 596 Notice (Other), 592 Objection, 593 Objection, 595 Declaration, 594 Declaration (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent To Appear At Final Approval Hearing by Sherri B. Simpson (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 595 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION re 592 Objection, 593 Objection Declaration of Sherri B. Simpson by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 594 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      DECLARATION re 592 Objection, 593 Objection Declaration of Gary B. Friedman by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 593 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        OBJECTION by Sherri B. Simpson re 589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Memorandum In Support). (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          OBJECTION by Sherri B. Simpson re 589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Eng, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Eng on behalf of Sherri B. Simpson (Eng, Kevin)Attorney Kevin Eng added to party Sherri B. Simpson(pty:obj) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 3 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Michael Snow. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Filer not a party to the case. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/14/17.(Discrepancy mailed to filer) (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Tamasy Karoly. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Discrepancy sent via U.S. Mail to filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/1/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter from Chris Umberger. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. Information pertaining to Settlement Claim Forms is set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/23/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) Discrepancy mailed to filer. (dlg). (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1715(B) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 584 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Class Action Settlement)(Jensen, Rachel) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Objection to Settlement Letter (Ex Parte) by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Filer not a party to the case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/29/16.(discrepancy mailed to filer. dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2016: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte) filed by Carol Cunningham. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance; filer not a party to the case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/28/16.(Discrepancy mailed to filer. dlg) (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 11/18/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2017. (akr) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 579 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte) from Mireille Taar. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication prohibited; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/22/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 578 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: ex parte communication ; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/21/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2016: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing NOT held on 11/18/2016; Parties have entered into a Settlement Agreement. Ex Parte MOTION 567 to Continue Trial Date filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC,- Dismissed w/o prejudice; Ex Parte MOTION 573 For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. - Dismissed w/o prejudice. Jury Trial set for 11/28/16 - VACATED. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement due by 12/19/16. Motion Hearing to be set at a later date. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, and Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin, David Marroso). (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 576 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 573 Ex Parte MOTION For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Further Information Regarding Jury Selection filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Cochran, Brian) (dlg). (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 575 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice and Order of Document DiscrepanciesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte letter; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2016: # (1) Rejected Document) (dlg).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 574 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Defendants' [573] Ex Parte Application For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection: The Court directs Plaintiffs to file a response by 9:00 a.m. on November 17, 2016. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 573 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli In Support, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Petrocelli Declaration, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 572 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. [518],[520], [521], [522], [523], [524], [525], [526], [527], [528], [529], [530], [531], [532], [533]). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 571 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute ORDER, as to [567] Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date.( Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2016 01:45 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.)(no document attached) (ksr)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 570 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [567] Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motions in limine Hearing) held on 11/10/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2017. (akr). (Main Document 569 replaced on 11/15/2016 with transcript with correction to spelling of case name citation at page 17, line 8.) (akr).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 568 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [567] Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 567 Filed: 11/12/2016, Entered: 11/12/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli in Support, # (2) Exhibits 1 through 5, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 566 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion In Limine Hearing (Oral Arguments) held on 11/10/2016; Court issued (Tentative) Ruling Doc. [565]; Court to issue Final Order on Motions in Limine. Miscellaneous Hearing (Jury Instructions) NOT held. Court to issue (Tentative) Order on Proposed Jury Instructions. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Aaron Olsen, Brian Cochran and Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin, David Marroso and Wallace Allan). (no document attached) (ksr)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 565 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Tentative OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Tentative Ruling on Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. [518], [520], [521], [522], [523], [524], [525], [526], [527], [528], [529], [530], [531], [532], [533]). Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative. The Court will entertain additional argument at the hearing on November 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/10/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 564 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Wallace Moore Allan on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Allan, Wallace)Attorney Wallace Moore Allan added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Wallace Moore Allan added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 563 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Defendants' Ex Parte [561] Application to Strike Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/8/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 562 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David Marroso on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Marroso, David)Attorney David Marroso added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney David Marroso added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 561 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016, Terminated: 11/8/2016 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION to Strike [560] Request for Judicial Notice by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David L. Kirman In Support, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                  *** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF 563 *** REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low Request for Judicial Notice of Certain State Statutes and Regulations (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: # (2) Stricken Document) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [520] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Unrelated to Liability During Phase 1 of Trial filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [529] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-2)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [525] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses, Exhibits, and Defenses filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A-B, Exhibit 1-2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [531] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-2)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [528] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-3)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [523] In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Trump University's Purported Approval Rating and Student-Victim Evaluations] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [518] In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1: Ground Rules for Phase 1 of Trial filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [532] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [527] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [526] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 549 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [524] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [530] In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to the Court's Class Actions Orders] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [522] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [521] In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3: Motion to Limit Evidence and Argument to Class Products filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [533] In Limine MOTION [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4: Motion to Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission from a Different Location] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1-5, # (2) Plaintiffs' Attachments A-C)(Jensen, Rachel) (acc).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE [Joint Proposed Special Verdict Forms for Phase 1 of Trial] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Jensen, Rachel) (acc).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT, Declaration by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. Amendment to [534] Declaration / Amended Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-8). (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 541 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application [536] to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman. The Court grants Defendants leave to file an amended declaration in support of their motions in limine that comports with the page limits outlined in the Courts Jury Trial Preparation and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [519] Joint Stipulation Regarding Agreed Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [536] Ex Parte MOTION to Strike [534] Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 10/23/2016, Entered: 10/23/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [536] Ex Parte MOTION to Strike [534] Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine ] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike Omnibus Declaration by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [536] Ex Parte MOTION to Strike [534] Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION to Strike [534] Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-8) (Dkt. 534), and Exhibits thereto] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit A-C to Cochran Declaration)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [534] Declaration (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [531] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4, [526] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3, [524] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2, [529] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5, [522] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1, [528] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7, [527] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6, [532] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 In Support by Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6 Part 1, # (7) Exhibit 6 Part 2, # (8) Exhibit 6 Part 3, # (9) Exhibit 6 Part 4, # (10) Exhibit 6 Part 5, # (11) Exhibit 7 Part 1, # (12) Exhibit 7 Part 2, # (13) Exhibit 7 Part 3, # (14) Exhibit 7 Part 4, # (15) Exhibit 7 Part 5, # (16) Exhibit 8, # (17) Exhibit 9, # (18) Exhibit 10, # (19) Exhibit 11, # (20) Exhibit 12, # (21) Exhibit 13, # (22) Exhibit 14, # (23) Exhibit 15, # (24) Exhibit 16, # (25) Exhibit 17, # (26) Exhibit 18, # (27) Exhibit 19, # (28) Exhibit 20, # (29) Exhibit 21, # (30) Exhibit 22, # (31) Exhibit 23, # (32) Exhibit 24, # (33) Exhibit 25, # (34) Exhibit 26, # (35) Exhibit 27, # (36) Exhibit 28, # (37) Exhibit 29, # (38) Exhibit 30, # (39) Exhibit 31, # (40) Exhibit 32, # (41) Exhibit 33, # (42) Exhibit 34, # (43) Exhibit 35, # (44) Exhibit 36, # (45) Exhibit 37, # (46) Exhibit 38, # (47) Exhibit 39, # (48) Exhibit 40, # (49) Exhibit 41, # (50) Exhibit 42, # (51) Exhibit 43, # (52) Exhibit 44, # (53) Exhibit 45, # (54) Exhibit 46, # (55) Exhibit 47, # (56) Exhibit 48, # (57) Exhibit 49, # (58) Exhibit 50, # (59) Exhibit 51, # (60) Exhibit 52, # (61) Exhibit 53, # (62) Exhibit 54, # (63) Exhibit 55, # (64) Exhibit 56, # (65) Exhibit 57, # (66) Exhibit 58, # (67) Exhibit 59, # (68) Exhibit 60, # (69) Exhibit 61, # (70) Exhibit 62, # (71) Exhibit 63, # (72) Exhibit 64, # (73) Exhibit 65, # (74) Exhibit 66, # (75) Exhibit 67, # (76) Exhibit 68, # (77) Exhibit 69, # (78) Exhibit 70 Part 1, # (79) Exhibit 70 Part 2, # (80) Exhibit 70 Part 3, # (81) Exhibit 70 Part 4, # (82) Exhibit 70 Part 5, # (83) Exhibit 70 Part 6, # (84) Exhibit 70 Part 7, # (85) Exhibit 70 Part 8, # (86) Exhibit 71, # (87) Exhibit 72, # (88) Exhibit 73, # (89) Exhibit 74, # (90) Exhibit 75, # (91) Exhibit 76, # (92) Exhibit 77, # (93) Exhibit 78, # (94) Exhibit 79, # (95) Exhibit 80, # (96) Exhibit 81, # (97) Exhibit 82, # (98) Exhibit 83, # (99) Exhibit 84, # (100) Exhibit 85, # (101) Exhibit 86 Part 1, # (102) Exhibit 86 Part 2, # (103) Exhibit 86 Part 3, # (104) Exhibit 87, # (105) Exhibit 88, # (106) Exhibit 89, # (107) Exhibit 90, # (108) Exhibit 91, # (109) Exhibit 92, # (110) Exhibit 93, # (111) Exhibit 94, # (112) Exhibit 95, # (113) Exhibit 96, # (114) Exhibit 97, # (115) Exhibit 98, # (116) Exhibit 99-101, # (117) Exhibit 102, # (118) Exhibit 103-109)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2016: # (119) Stricken Document) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        In Limine MOTION [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4: Motion to Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission from a Different Location] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                          In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                            In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                              In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to the Court's Class Actions Orders] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses, Exhibits, and Defenses by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 524 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Trump University's Purported Approval Rating and Student-Victim Evaluations] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3: Motion to Limit Evidence and Argument to Class Products by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-2)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Unrelated to Liability During Phase 1 of Trial by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5)(Stein, Jeffrey) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION / Joint Stipulation Regarding Agreed Motion in Limine by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1: Ground Rules for Phase 1 of Trial by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Deadline for Submission of Amended Pretrial Conference Order re [478]. A pretrial conference was held on May 6, 2016. The amended joint pretrial conference order shall be submitted via e-mail on or before October 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/12/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 516 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Denying Defendants' [514] Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Reply in Support of the Admissibility of Testimony of Former TU Student-Witness. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/19/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 515 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Intent to Oppose by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re [514] Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the admissibility of testimony of former TU student-witnesses (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 514 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016, Terminated: 9/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the admissibility of testimony of former TU student-witnesses by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel Petrocelli in Support of Ex Parte Application, # (2) Exhibits A through F, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 513 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying Defendats' Ex Parte [510] Application to Continue the November 28, 2016 Trial Date. The Court resets the hearing on jury instructions to November 10, 2016 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/15/16. (dlg) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [510] MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge, # (2) Exhibit 1-6)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 511 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE [Notice of Plaintiffs' Intent to Oppose Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the November 28, 2016 Trial Date] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re [510] MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016, Terminated: 9/15/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel Petrocelli in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 509 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Response to Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re [505] Supplemental Briefing, [Plaintiffs' Opposition to Admission of Non-Representative Student Testimony During Phase 1 of Trial]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-30 to Jensen Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 31-51 to Jensen Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 52-57 to the Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 508 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filings in Flo & Eddie, Inc. v. Sirius XM Radio, Inc., No. 13-5693 (C.D. Cal.) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [507] Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Ex Parte Application filed in Flo & Eddie, Inc. v. Sirius XM Radio Inc., No. 13-5693 (C.D.CAL) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 506 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying Defendants' [482] Motion for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification; and Denying [489] Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/29/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [502] Scheduling Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the admissibility of former TU student-witnesses. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David Kirman, # (2) Exhibits 1 through 6 to Kirman Declaration, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [503] Objection, [Response to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order] filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-2 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) Modif (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 503 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC to Plaintiffs' Unauthorized and Improper "Proposed Order". (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David L. Kirman, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY TRIAL PREPARATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the jury/bench trial for the class representatives on the issue of liability for November 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. The Court sets a hearing on motions in limine for November 10, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. All motions in limine must be filed and served on or before October 20, 2016. Written oppositions to motions in limine, if any, must be filed and served on or before November 1, 2016. No replies shall be filed. The Court sets a hearing on jury instructions for November 18, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 501 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Defendant's [485] Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 500 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 499 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2016, [489] MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low, [482] MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC ; Motions Submitted the Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Attorney Jason Forge, X. Jay Alvarez, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 497 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 re [485] MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman). (Media Intervenor Attorney Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [489] MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [489] MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [485] MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [482] MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [485] MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-5 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Regarding [487] Joint Motion for Advancement of June 30, 2016 Hearing Date. The Court reschedules the hearing date related to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order (ECF [485]) to July 13, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [489] MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders : Any response is due on or before July 1, 2016. Any reply is due on or before July 8, 2016. A hearing is set for July 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016, Terminated: 8/29/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [482] MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit A-G to the Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016, Terminated: 6/20/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue June 30, 2016 hearing date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [485] MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order: Any response is due on or before June 22, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 27, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/16.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016, Terminated: 8/2/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Notice and Order of Document DiscrepanciesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amicus Curi filed by Non-party, Theodore Neubauer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental documents require court order, OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/9/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2016: # (1) Rejected Document) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [482] MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification: Any response is due on or before June 17, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 24, 2016. A hearing is set for July 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/7/16.(dlg)(jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 482 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016, Terminated: 8/29/2016 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Lodged-Motion for decertification, # (2) Memo of Points and Authorities, # (3) Declaration of David L. Kirman, # (4) Exhibit 1-10 to the Kirman Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 11-30 to the Kirman Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 31-35 to the Kirman Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 36-39 to the Kirman Declaration, # (8) Declaration of Mark Covais, # (9) Exhibit A-G to the Covais Declaration, # (10) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 5/6/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Irene Zeldes on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Zeldes, Helen)Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alreen Haeggquist on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Haeggquist, Alreen)Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 478 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2016, Counsel resubmit Pretrial Order. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 11/10/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Jury Instruction/Special Verdict Hearing set for 11/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck, X. Jay Alvarez, Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Stein on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Stein, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Jay Alvarez on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Alvarez, Xavier)Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's[443] Motion to Withdraw. Makaeff is hereby excused from her duties as a class representative in this action; The Court will invite briefing on fees and costs in connection with the motion to withdraw at an appropriate juncture; and This Court retains jurisdiction to resolve any disputes arising from Makaeff's withdrawal, Defendant Trump University's counterclaim, and Makaeff's eligibility to participate in any class recovery in this action and in Cohen. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/20/16. (ok to term plaintiff per dj chambers. dlg) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [473] Joint Motion for Extension to Complete the Deposition of Plaintiff Sonny Low. The deposition of Low shall take place on or before April 13, 2016. No other dates have changed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/7/16. (dlg) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension to Complete the Deposition of Plaintiff Sonny Low re [472] Order on Motion for Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 472 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw (ECF Nos. [443], [466], [470]). The Court gives Plaintiffs notice that it intends to grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's claims, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), ECF No. [443], but with the conditions that (1) Defendants are entitled to depose Low again; and (2) appropriate fees and costs will be determined at a later juncture. If Plaintiffs are not amenable to the conditions imposed by the Court, Plaintiffs must withdraw their Motion within 7 calendar days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference Hearing, ECF No. [466], is denied. Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum, ECF No. [470], is accordingly denied as moot. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/2016. (nbp) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 471 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [470] Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason)(nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016, Terminated: 3/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum and Request for Status Conference, # (2) Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # (3) Exhibits 1-2 to Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # (4) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER [459] Granting Defendants Donald J. Trump's and Trump University's Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the First Amended Protective Order Entered March 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/17/2016. (cxl) (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 466 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016, Terminated: 3/21/2016 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Status Conference Hearing, SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re [443] MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] [Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum and Request for Status Conference]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-2 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) QC email sent re incorrect event. Changed event to motion and edited docket text (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 3/11/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2016. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 464 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2016 re [443] MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Frank Rangus). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel Jensen, Jason Forge, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Bring Documentation to March 11, 2016 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/16.(dlg)(jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 462 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [443] MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-4 to Jensen Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 5 to Jensen Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 6 to Jensen Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 7 [Intentionally Omitted] to Jensen Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 8 to Jensen Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 9 to Jensen Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 10-14 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/17/2016.SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [459] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Main Document 461 replaced on 3/17/2016) (cxl). Modified on 3/17/2016 to add lodgment filing date (cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/17/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [459] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Main Document 460 replaced on 3/17/2016) (cxl). Modified on 3/17/2016 to add lodgment filing date (cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016, Terminated: 3/17/2016 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 458 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [443] MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David L. Kirman, # (2) Exhibits to the Declaration of David L. Kirman, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 456 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [454] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/22/2016. (cxl) (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/23/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [454] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl). (Main Document 455 replaced on 2/23/2016) (cxl). Modified on 2/23/2016 to add lodgment filing date(cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016, Terminated: 2/23/2016 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Exhibit List] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Jensen, Rachel)(nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Deposition Transcript Designations] (Jensen, Rachel) (nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Witness Lists] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A [Redacted], # (2) Exhibit B [Redacted])(Jensen, Rachel) (nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 450 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial Disclosures by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Application to File Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered November 17, 2011 (ECF No. [444]). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/10/2016. (cxl)(sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [446] Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw. Opposition Brief due by 2/26/2016, Reply Brief due by 3/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/10/2016. (srm) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016, Terminated: 2/10/2016 Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw (Dkt. No. 443)] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT 449 ON 2/10/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [444] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl). (Main Document 445 replaced on 2/10/2016) (cxl). Modified on 2/10/2016 to add lodgment filing date(cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016, Terminated: 2/10/2016 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016, Terminated: 4/20/2016 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof [Redacted], # (2) Declaration of Tarla Makaeff in Support thereof, # (3) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (4) Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration [Redacted])(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 442 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER [441] Rescheduling Pretrial Proceedings. The proposed final pretrial conference order shall be prepared, served and submitted via e-mail in Word or Word Perfect format on or before April 29, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held on May 6, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/8/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016, Terminated: 2/8/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [434] Scheduling Order, [Joint Motion to Amend Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Cochran on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Brandon Keller, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Cochran, Brian)Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 439 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [438] Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. Plaintiff Art Cohen's request to attend the conference telephonically is denied. Counsel for the Makaeff case is ordered to report to Judge Gallo's Chambers whether the Makaeff Named Plaintiffs will be appearing no later than Monday, January 25, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/21/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016, Terminated: 1/21/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting [436] Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump. Daniel M. Petrocelli and David L. Kirman of O'Melveny & Myers LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Trump University. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/22/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015, Terminated: 12/22/2015 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE RE NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC of Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy) QC email re worng event selected. Edited Docket text. Attorney to email proposed order to Chambers (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Coughlin on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Brandon Keller, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Coughlin, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: Status hearing held on 12/4/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/9/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Status Hearing) held on 12/4/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2016. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Status Hearing held on 12/4/2015. Court will prepare scheduling order. Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/15/2016 is vacated.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, Nancy Stagg, David Kirman, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [429] Joint Motion to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines Pending December 4, 2015 Status Conference. The pretrial deadlines set by the Court's November 18, 2015 Scheduling Order are VACATED, with the exception of the December 4, 2015 status conference. The Court will consider new pretrial deadlines at the December 4, 2015 status conference. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/30/2015. (kcm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re [419] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), [Plaintiffs' Notice of Timely Requests for Exclusion from the Class] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Letter from Class Administrator with List of Opt Outs)(Jensen, Rachel) (aef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015, Terminated: 11/30/2015 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Vacate [424] Order,, Set Hearings,, Set Scheduling Order Hearing/Deadlines, [Joint Motion to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines Pending December 4, 2015 Status Conference or, Alternatively, Reschedule Pretrial Deadlines] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Kirman on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Kirman, David)Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Petrocelli, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Order on Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [425] Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015, Terminated: 11/23/2015 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Joint Motion for Order Consolidating Cases for Trial and Aligning Pretrial Schedules] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Cohen Case Joint Discovery Plan)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. Status Hearing set for 12/4/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting In Part and Denying In Part [375] Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment; Granting In Part and Denying In Part [377] Defendant Trump University's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment. The Court Grants summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief under the UCL, FAL, and CLRA. The Court Denies summary judgment as to all other claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Notice and Order of Document DiscrepanciesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document from Michael Bailey: Request for Services and Notices. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: L.Civ.R. 83.9 - Ex parte communication is prohibited. Not parties to the case. Missing Proof of service. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/3/2015.(srm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2015: # (1) Rejected Document) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPROVING Amended Return Postcard (Doc. [420]). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/23/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re [419] [Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Filing of Amended Return Postcard for Inclusion in the Mailed Notice] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Amended Return Postcard)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [381] Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures: The Proposed Class Notices are approved for dissemination of class notice. The parties are authorized to make non-substantive changes to the notice, as long as they are acceptable to both parties, to reflect deadlines, mailing addresses, and similar information or to format the notice for printing. Plaintiffs will submit an amended Return Postcard that is consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the Order. Epiq Systems, Inc. is approved as "Notice Administrator" to supervise and carry out the notice procedure. The deadline for exclusion from the Class shall be forty-five (45) days after the Notice Date. The Notice Administrator is ordered to provide counsel for both parties with a list of all timely requests for exclusion within seven (7) business days after the Opt-Out Deadline. Plaintiffs are ordered to file such list with the Court within three (3) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part [380] Motion to Decertify Classes; Granting [410] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's Class Certification Order. The Court hereby: 1. DENIES Defendants' motion to decertify the class action on liability issues as to all causes of action; 2. GRANTS Defendants' motion to decertify on damages issues as to all causes of action and bifurcates the damage issues to follow trial on the liability phase; and 3. GRANTS Plaintiffs' application for clarification of the Court's class certification order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/18/2015. (aef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 416 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [406] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/2015. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) on (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 414 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 5/22/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2015. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2015. [380] MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, [381] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller, Ed Oberkrom ; Motions Submitted, Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE CHANGE IN TIME for Hearing on Motion [380] MOTION for Decertification of Class Action , [381] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : Court reschedules the time for Motion Hearing to 01:00 PM on 5/22/2015 in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [381] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index of Exhibits and Exhibits A-D in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq. in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015, Terminated: 9/18/2015 Motion to Clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte MOTION to Clarify [Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's Class Certification Order] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [380] MOTION for Decertification of Class Action Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump's Motion for Decertification of Class Action filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [381] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [Filed as Sealed Document on 6/29/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [406] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao). (Main Document 407 replaced on 6/29/2015) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 406 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [380] MOTION for Decertification of Class Action [Redacted] filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-16 (Public) to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (kcm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [331] Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Request for Fees and Costs. The Court awards Makaeff $790,083.40 in fees; the Court awards Makaeff $8,695.81 in costs; the Court Grants [368] Makaeff's ex parte application to file a limited response. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Trump University, LLC and Donlad J. Trump's [401] Ex Parte Motion to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication. Court vacates the 4/3/2015 1:30 PM hearing date. Court will reset the hearing as necessary. Court vacates all other pre-trial dates (aside from the 5/22/2015 motion hearings). Court will reset the pre-trial dates as necessary. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/1/2015. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [401] Ex Parte MOTION to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alter filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (kcm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015, Terminated: 4/1/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support)(Morris, Benjamin) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [399] Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action (re Dkt. No. [380]). The May 15, 2015 hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action is continued one week to May 22, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/24/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015, Terminated: 3/24/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action [Dkt. No. 380] by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg In Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [392] Objection, [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER (1) Granting [373] Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal; (2) Granting [384] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/16/2015. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting [389] Joint Motion And Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice Of Plaintiffs' Individual Non-Certified Claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/16/15. (dlg) Modified on 3/24/2015 to edit docket text (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [390] Reply to Response to Motion, [391] Reply to Response to Motion, Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Opposition to TU & DJT's Motions for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald J Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Mandatory Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/12/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 389 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015, Terminated: 3/16/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss [Joint Motion and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiffs' Individual Non-Certified Claims] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: 3/7/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment [Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Trump Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment] filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 3, # (3) Exhibit 4, # (4) Exhibit 5, # (5) Exhibit 6, # (6) Exhibit 7, # (7) Exhibit 8, # (8) Exhibit 9, # (9) Exhibit 11, # (10) Exhibit 12, # (11) Exhibit 13, # (12) Exhibit 14, # (13) Exhibit 15, # (14) Exhibit 16, # (15) Exhibit 17, # (16) Exhibit 18, # (17) Exhibit 19, # (18) Exhibit 20, # (19) Exhibit 21, # (20) Exhibit 23, # (21) Exhibit 25, # (22) Exhibit 26, # (23) Exhibit 27, # (24) Exhibit 28, # (25) Exhibit 29, # (26) Exhibit 30, # (27) Exhibit 31, # (28) Exhibit 37, # (29) Exhibit 40, # (30) Exhibit 41, # (31) Exhibit 42, # (32) Exhibit 43, # (33) Exhibit 44, # (34) Exhibit 48, # (35) Exhibit 49, # (36) Exhibit 50, # (37) Exhibit 51, # (38) Exhibit 53, # (39) Exhibit 54, # (40) Exhibit 55, # (41) Exhibit 56, # (42) Exhibit 58, # (43) Exhibit 59, # (44) Exhibit 60, # (45) Exhibit 61, # (46) Exhibit 62, # (47) Exhibit 63, # (48) Exhibit 65, # (49) Exhibit 66, # (50) Exhibit 67)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/7/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Statement of Facts and Additional Statement of Facts)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [Filed as sealed document on 3/16/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [384] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao). (Main Document 385 replaced on 3/16/2015) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015, Terminated: 3/16/2015 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [381] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : The Court set a hearing date of May 22, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendants shall file their opposition on or by April 17, 2015. Any reply shall be due by May 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [380] MOTION for Decertification of Class Action : The Court set a hearing date of May 15, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition on or by April 10, 2015. Any reply shall be due by April 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015, Terminated: 9/21/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015, Terminated: 9/18/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Decertification of Class Action by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Mtn for Decertification, # (2) Declaration of Stagg ISO Mtn for Decertification, # (3) Exhibit 1 to Stagg Decl, # (4) Exhibit 2 - Part 1 to Stagg Decl, # (5) Exhibit 2 - Part 2 to Stagg Decl, # (6) Exhibit 3-13 to Stagg Decl)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [378] Plaintiffs' Unnoposed Ex Parte Application To File Omnibus Opposition to Motions For Summary Judgment and Setting Briefing Schedule. The Court set a hearing date of April 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for both motions. Plaintiffs shall file their omnibus opposition on or by March 6, 2015. Any replies shallbe due by March 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/19/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015, Terminated: 2/19/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION Unopposed re [377] MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment [Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application to File Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015, Terminated: 11/18/2015 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, # (2) Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support, # (3) Exhibit 1 & 2 to N. Stagg Declaration, # (4) Statement of Facts in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Rescheduling Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule re [375] MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment : The Court reschedules the hearing date from April 10, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. to April 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall respond on or by March 6, 2015. Any reply shall be due by March 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015, Terminated: 11/18/2015 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities ISO MSJ, # (2) Declaration of Stagg ISO MSJ, # (3) Exhibit 1-11 to Stagg Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 12-26 to Stagg Declaration, # (5) Statement of Facts ISO MSJ)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [Filed as sealed document on 3/16/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [373] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stagg, Nancy) (sjt). (Main Document 374 replaced on 3/16/2015) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015, Terminated: 3/16/2015 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy) (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [369] Defendant Donald L. Trump's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [369] Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Setting Combined Mandatory Settlement Conference: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 12, 2015, at 8:00 a.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel shall submit settlement statements directly to chambers no later than March 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/9/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015, Terminated: 2/12/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015, Terminated: 4/9/2015 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Limited Response to Trump University, LLC's Evidentiary Objections and Requests to Strike] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Makaeff's Limited Response, # (2) Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Trump University, LLC re [331] Notice (Other), [358] Order, in Opposition to Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kathryn M.S. Catherwood in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1-5 to Catherwood Dec., # (3) Evidentiary Objection to Supp Dec of R. Jensen, # (4) Evidentiary Objection to Supp Dec of A. Eck)(Stagg, Nancy) (jpp).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Quash and Denying Defendant/Counter Claimant Trump University, LLC's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/16/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Telephonic Discovery Conference) held on 12/11/2014, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2015. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff re [331] Notice (Other), [358] Order, [363] Notice of Technical Failure [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Bill of Fees and Costs]. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen and Exs 1-2 thereto, # (2) Supplemental Declaration of Amber L. Eck)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Notice of Technical Failure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Technical Failure by Tarla Makaeff (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 & 2 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 12/11/2014. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel L. Jensen; Amber Lee Eck). (Defendant Attorney Nancy L. Stagg; Kathryn Catherwood). (no document attached) (gac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Counsel for all parties to appearing telephonically with defense counsel initiating call. (no document attached) (gac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying [355] Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/3/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/20/2014.(vam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing in Support of Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs (Doc. [331]). Makaeff shall submit her supplemental brief by December 12, 2014, and Trump University may file a supplemental brief in opposition on or before December 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [355] MOTION re [352] Order [Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support of Opposition, # (2) Exhibit 1-11)(Morris, Benjamin) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 11/10/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014, Terminated: 12/3/2014 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION re [352] Order [Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-13 to Jensen Declaration, # (3) Certificate of Compliance Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. Mueller on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Mueller, Maureen)Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 10/28/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Counsel only Discovery Conference set for 10/28/2014 07:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/27/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED Case Management Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings; Granting [346] Parties' Joint Motion to Revise Pretrial Schedule. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 5/22/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2015 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/1/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRO HAC APPROVED [347]: Jeffrey L. Goldman appearing for Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, Counter Claimant Trump University, LLC. (no document attached) (vam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7425861.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Goldman, Jeffrey) (vam).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014, Terminated: 10/1/2014 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Revise Pretrial Schedule re [309] Scheduling Order,, by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute EntryThe Court sua sponte set a telephonic Status Conference, which was conducted on September 11, 2014, to discuss the pending Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC") now set for November 19, 2014. Mr. Jason Forge and Ms. Rachel Jensen participated on behalf of Plaintiffs, and Ms. Nancy Stagg and Ms. Jill Martin participated on behalf of Defendants. Based upon the discussion held with counsel, the Court determines that the MSC will be attended by the attorneys only (with clients on telephonic standby) and will remain as now set, subject to being rescheduled depending on the timing of the ruling on the Motion for Class Certification in Cohen v. Trump, Case. No. 13-CV-2519-GPC (WVG).(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 9/11/2014 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/5/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 8/6/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute ORDER granting [337] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/29/2014. (sjt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Joint Hearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration [Redacted portions filed under seal.], # (3) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (cxl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Filed as Sealed Document [341] on 7/30/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [337] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason) (rlu). (Main Document 338 replaced on 7/30/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 7/30/2014 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014, Terminated: 7/29/2014 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Tarla Makaeff re [335] Objection to Bill of Costs,, [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Notice of Deficiency and Intended Non-Response Absent Court Request] (Jensen, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Objection to Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Bill of Costs re [331] Notice (Other), filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kathryn M.S. Catherwood in Support of Opposition, # (2) Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen, # (3) Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Amber L. Eck, # (4) Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Carol A. Sobel, # (5) Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Eric Alan Isaacson, # (6) Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Karl Olson)(Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 8/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/18/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Discovery Dispute re [330] Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court Sustains Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' ROGs Set Five. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/11/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/7/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Tarla Makaeff re [328] Order,, [Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs] (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen and Exhibits 1-7 thereto, # (2) Declaration of Amber L. Eck and Exhibits 1-4 thereto, # (3) Declaration of Eric Alan Isaacson, # (4) Declaration of Karl Olson and Exhibits A-B thereto, # (5) Declaration of Carol A. Sobel and Exhibits A-B thereto)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Joint Hearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-7 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. Telephonic, counsel only Discovery Conference set for 7/7/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/25/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant's Defamation Counterclaim (Dkt. Nos. [14], [282], [294]). Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Makaeff shall file with the Court substantiation of the reasonable attorney's fees and costs associated with bringing the Motion to Strike, related appeal, and supplemental briefing by 7/3/2014. Defendant Makaeff's bill of fees and costs shall be filed by 7/18/2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014. [28]Pursuant to Remand by 9th U.S Court of Appeals. [14] Plaintiff mot strike defendant Trump University LLC's counterclaim against her for defamation-Submitted, [31] Plaintiff Motion for Reconsideration-Submitted. Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Helen Zeldes). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Defendant's [301] Motion to File Documents Under Seal and [310] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Clerk directed to file requested documents under seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/13/2014. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting [322] Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump. It is Ordered that Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of David K. Schneider and Stephen F. Yunker of Yunker & Schneider. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 322 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014, Terminated: 5/12/2014 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) Modified on 5/2/2014. QC Mailer sent re proposed orders (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Morris on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Morris, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Stagg on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Stagg, Nancy)Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom [Plaintiffs' Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Thomas R. Merrick] (Jensen, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 318 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA in USCA Case Number 14-80031. The petition for permission to appeal is untimely because it was filed on March 10, 2014, more than 14 days after the February 21, 2014 USDC order. Petitioners' contention that the provisions of FRCP 25(a)(2)(B) apply are unpersuasive, as a petition for permission to appeal is neither a "brief or appendix." Accordingly, we deny this petition for permission to appeal as untimely. All pending motions are denied as moot. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Continuing Hearing. The hearing date of 03/28/2014 is continued to 06/13/2014 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 03/24/2014. (cc:USM)(ag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Granting [315] Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/21/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014, Terminated: 3/21/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [91] Order on Motion for Protective Order by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Order on Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the CourtroomCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [313] Trump University's Ex Party Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical/Media Equipment in the Courtroom for the March 28, 2014 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014, Terminated: 3/20/2014 Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION Allow media equipment in courtroom re [283] Order, Set Hearings,,,, Re Reconsider Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm). Modified event on 3/20/2014 (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY - Other re [294] Supplemental Briefing,, [Reply in Support of Plaintiff/Counter defendant Makaeff's Supplemental Brief Regarding Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant Trump University's Counterclaim Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. P. §425.16] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 14 thru 19 to the Jensen Declaration [REDACTED])(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/13/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [310] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu). (Main Document 311 replaced on 6/13/2014) (jah). Modified on 6/13/2014 - Added file date of lodgment(jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014, Terminated: 6/13/2014 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: On March 14, 2014, at 8:00 a.m., the Court held a telephonic Status Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/10/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/14/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014, Terminated: 4/10/2014 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 14-80031 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f) filed by Trump University, LLC, Donald J. Trump. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: the March 12, 2014 Status Conference is Vacated. The Court will instead hold a telephonic, counsel only Status Conference on 3/14/2014 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/6/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 3/12/2014 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/4/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Defendants' Ex Parte [299] Motion to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit to Defendants' Supplemental Opposition. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/28/2014. (rlu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 303 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [301] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Martin, Jill) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/13/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [301] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Martin, Jill) (rlu). (Main Document 302 replaced on 6/13/2014) (jah). Modified on 6/13/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014, Terminated: 6/13/2014 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Martin, Jill) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re [283] Trump University's Supplemental Opposition to Makaeff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jill A. Martin in Support of Supplemental Opposition, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin, # (4) Exhibit Exhibits 5-14 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin)(Martin, Jill) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014, Terminated: 2/28/2014 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Video as a Non-Electronic Document by Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 298 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part [122] Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Action, Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel; (2) Denying Motions to Strike (Docs. 138-2, [196], [211]). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [292] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/18/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 X Notice of Document Discrepancies (White Discrepancy)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Accepting Document, from Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, re [291] Notice (Supplemental documents). Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(a),(g): Docket entry does not accurately reflect the document filed, OTHER: Supplemental documents require court order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff, Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff re [283] Order, Set Hearings, [Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Makaeff's Supplemental Brief Regarding Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant Trump Universitys Counterclaim Pursuant to California Code Of Civil Procedure §425.16 [REDACTED]]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-13 [Redacted] to Jensen Declaration, # (3) Declaration of Tarla Makaeff in Support thereof and Exhibits 1 & 2 thereto)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/18/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [292] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(rlu). (Main Document 293 replaced on 2/18/2014) (rlu). Modified on 2/18/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, Supplemental Documents Just Produced By Plaintiffs (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Martin, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/8/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 11/8/2013, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY - Other re [287] Request for Judicial Notice filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [287] Request for Judicial Notice [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Judicial Notice] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Martin, Jill) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [285] Joint Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff supplemental briefing due by February 14, 2014. Defendant opposition or statement of non-opposition due by February 28, 2014. Any Reply due by March 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/17/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014, Terminated: 1/21/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Revise Briefing Schedule re [283] Order, Set Hearings, by Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to [43] Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellant's unopposed motion to transfer consideration of attorneys' fees to the USDC pursuant to Circuit Rule 39-1.8 is granted. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Rehearing Date and Issuing Briefing Schedule. The Court sets a Rehearing for 3/28/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel to reconsider Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant Trump University, LLC's counterclaim against Plaintiff for defamation, (Dkt. No. [14]), and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, (Dkt. No. [31]). Supplemental briefing due by January 31, 2014. Defendant Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition due by February 14, 2014. Any reply due by February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/12/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA reversing the decision of the USDC and remanding for further proceedings as to [43] Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 USCA OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to [43] Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellee's petition for rehearing en banc, filed April 30, 2013, is denied. Judge Watford's dissent from denial of en banc rehearing, and Judges Wardlaw and Callahan's concurrence in the denial of en banc rehearing, are filed concurrently with this Order. (See Order for full text. This Order is for publication.) (akr). (Main Document 281 replaced on 11/27/2013 with corrected Order issued by the USCA. Correction was made to indicate that Judges Wardlaw and Callahan authored the concurrence.) (akr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [279] Notice (Other), of correction re Nov. 8, 2013 hearing filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 11/16/2013, Entered: 11/16/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE [of Correction Regarding the November 8, 2013 Hearing] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re [278] Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike,, Motion Hearing, Motions Submitted (Jensen, Rachel) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2013.Motions Submitted [211] MOTION to Strike [195] Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument, [196] MOTION to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposit, [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel]. The Court will prepare written Order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Lee Eck, Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney David K. Schneider, Jill A. Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Order on Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the CourtroomCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting [276] Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for November 8, 2013 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/6/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013, Terminated: 11/6/2013 Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for the November 8, 2013 Hearing by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Notice of Related CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom of case(s) 3:13-cv-02519 . (Forge, Jason) Modified on 10/23/2013, low number order not prepared, case transferred to Judge Curiel as of 10/22/2013 (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: (1) Denying [272] Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to File Supplemental Briefing; (2) Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set on class certification and all related motions (Dkt. Nos. [122], 138-2, [196], [211]) for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/15/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [272] Ex Parte MOTION Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel re New Development re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013, Terminated: 10/15/2013 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel re New Development re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying [248] Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/07/2013. (ag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ann Martin on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC of Association of Counsel (Schneider, David) Modified on 10/1/2013, QC Mailer sent (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [256], [262] Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/11/2013. (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [264] Objection (Errata) (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re [261] Supplemental Document, . (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [262] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 263 replaced on 9/11/2013) (rlu). Modified on 9/11/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re [248] MOTION to Amend/Correct [128] Amended Complaint . (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Forge Decl., # (3) Exhibit 2 to Forge Decl.)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/30/2013, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2013. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2013. [248] MOTION to Amend/Correct [128] Amended Complaint filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom ; Motions Submitted. Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck).(Defendant Attorney David Schneider). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [256] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason) (rlu). (Main Document 258 replaced on 9/11/2013) (rlu). Modified on 9/11/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [248] MOTION to Amend/Correct [128] Amended Complaint [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (aef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [251] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [248] MOTION to Amend/Correct [128] Amended Complaint filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (2) Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (3) Exhibit 5-10 to Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (4) Exhibit 11-18 to Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/19/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [251] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 252 replaced on 8/19/2013) (rlu). Modified on 8/19/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013, Terminated: 8/19/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Court vacates hearings scheduled 8/16/2013. All Motions related Class Certification. [196] Motions to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposition filed: 02/02/2013 Filed by: Ed Oberkrom; [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion filed: 09/24/2012 Filed by: Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom; [211] MOTION to Strike [195] Reply to Response to Motion, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument Motion filed: 04/26/2013 Filed by: Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Continuing Hearing on [248] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Setting Briefing Schedule; and Vacating hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing on [248] Continued to 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Responses due by 8/16/2013 Replies due by 8/23/2013. The Court VACATES the hearing set for August 16, 2013 on Plaintiffs' motion to certify the class and related motions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/5/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013, Terminated: 10/7/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct [128] Amended Complaint by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit A to Forge Declaration - Draft [Proposed] Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, # (4) Exhibit B to Forge Declaration - Excerpt of Trump U's Response to Plaintiffs' 2nd Set of Interrogatories)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Discovery Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry. The Discovery Conference set for 7/29/2013 is hereby VACATED.(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Attorneys Only Discovery Conference set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/24/2013.(srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY - re [233] Reply to Response to Motion,, to Strike Defendants' Declarations filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting [237] Motion to File Documents Under Seal; and Granting [242] Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Defendants shall file their sur-reply by 7/16/2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (leh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013, Terminated: 7/15/2013 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [239] Supplemental Document,, filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (2) Exhibit A and B to Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to [43] Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Consumer Attorneys of California's motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in opposition to defendant-counter-claimant-appellee Trump University's Petition for Rehearing En Banc is granted. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Supplemental DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] [[Supplemental Document: Speaker Script, the Existence of Which Defendants Have Denied to Magistrate Judge Gallo and This Court]]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 [REDACTED], # (4) Exhibit 3)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/15/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [237] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (leh). (Main Document 238 replaced on 7/16/2013) (rlu). Modified on 7/16/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013, Terminated: 7/15/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason)(leh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [231] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. The Court Continues the hearing date on [122], [196], and [211] to 8/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [196] MOTION to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposit [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations (REDACTED)] filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Amber L. Eck in support thereof [REDACTED], # (2) Exhibit 145-153 [REDACTED])(Eck, Amber) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/24/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [231] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Eck, Amber) (rlu). (Main Document 232 replaced on 6/25/2013) (rlu). Modified on 6/25/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013, Terminated: 6/24/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Eck, Amber) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [211] MOTION to Strike [195] Reply to Response to Motion and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Motions to File Documents Under Seal: [204] and [219]. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/18/2013. (sjt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Discovery Hearing) held on 2/22/2013, before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [211] MOTION to Strike [195] Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof, # (2) Exhibit 138-144 [Public Version] to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Filed as Sealed Document [229] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [219] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(leh). (Main Document 220 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 6/18/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (leh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Forge on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F Yunker on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Yunker, Stephen) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to [43] Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Makaeff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc is granted. The response is now due June 13, 2013. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to [43] Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellant is directed to file a response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc filed with the USCA on April 30, 2013. Briefing and filing instructions and due date issued. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY - Other re [195] Reply to Response to Motion,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Evidence [Dkt. 195-9] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Reply - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY - Other re [192] Response in Support of Motion, to Strike Declarations of Schnackenberg, Sommer, Donnelly and Nicholas filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013, Terminated: 2/21/2014 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [195] Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities Supporting Motion to Strike and Objections to Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply, # (2) Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (3) Modified on 4/29/2013 (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [196] MOTION to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposit filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider [redacted], # (2) Exhibit 122, # (3) Exhibit 138)(Schneider, David) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Filed as Sealed Document [228] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [204] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 209 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filnig date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Filed as Sealed Document [227] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [204] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 208 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgment on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (Filed as Sealed Document [226] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [204] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 207 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgment on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Filed as Sealed Document [225] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [204] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 206 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Filed as Sealed Document [224] on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [204] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) qc email re multiple sealed lodged proposed document entries entered when only one entry was needed on 4/26/2013 (rlu). (Main Document 205 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013, Terminated: 6/18/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/12/2013. (srm) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 2/22/2013(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: Counsel Only Discovery Hearing set for 2/22/2013 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 1E, First Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/14/2013. (srm) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting [193] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/11/2013. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTION to [196] MOTION to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposit Plainitffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations [REDACTED] by Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: 2/2/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [193] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: 2/2/2013, Terminated: 2/21/2014 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike [143] Response in Opposition to Motion, [140] Response in Opposition to Motion, [139] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [141] Response in Opposition to Motion, [138] Response in Opposition to Motion,, [142] Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Declaration by Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof, # (2) Exhibit 68-71, 74, & 79 to Jensen Decl, # (3) Exhibit 80-81 to Jensen Decl, # (4) Exhibit 83, 92-93 to Jensen Decl, # (5) Exhibit 94-95, 97, 100-102, 104-105, 107 to Jensen Decl, # (6) Exhibit 110, 128-130 to Jensen Decl, # (7) Exhibit 132, 135 to Jensen Decl, # (8) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Trial Plan, # (9) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Evidence)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [193] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(rlu). (Main Document 194 replaced on 2/15/2013) (rlu). Modified on 2/15/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Amber L. Eck, # (2) Exhibit 1 Part 1, # (3) Exhibit 1 Part 2, # (4) Exhibit 2 Part 1, # (5) Exhibit 2 Part 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5)(Eck, Amber) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [122] Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel: Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/31/2013. (srm) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following listed case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Cathy Ann Bencivengo to the calendar of the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. All conference, trial or hearing dates set before District Judge Bencivengo, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before District Judge Curiel. Any dates set before any magistrate judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10CV0940-GPC WVG. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 01/30/2013.(yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 1/18/2013(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/23/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER On Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/24/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [122] Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Extending Page Limit. T IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted: An extension for submission of their class certification reply from January 14, 2013 to February 1, 2013; and A page limit extension for Plaintiffs class certification reply brief from 15 pages to 20 pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing date for the motion for class certification (currently set for February 12, 2013) is HEREBY CONTINUED to March 28, 2013 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/21/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [185] Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [119] Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Regarding Class Certification Reply Deadline and Page Limit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider, # (2) Proof of Service)(Schneider, David) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012, Terminated: 12/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [119] Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages , Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Regarding Class Certification Reply Deadline and Page Limit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof)(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 12/12/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER re [182] Notice of Discovery Hearing. On December 12, 2012, at 3:30 p.m., a Discovery Hearing will be held before United States MagistrateJudge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom F, First Floor, 221 West Broadway,San Diego, California. Only counsel must participate and shall be present before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/11/2012.(yeb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 12/12/2012 03:30 PM in Courtroom F before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (no document attached) (jmy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Defendant's [137] Application to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered November 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/3/2012. (rlu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 162 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 161 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 160 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 159 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 158 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 157 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 156 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 155 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 154 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David)(rlu). (Main Document 153 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 152 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 151 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 150 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 149 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 148 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 147 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 146 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [137] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 145 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC on Application to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered 11/17/11 (Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 17 to 121 to Opposition, Exhibits 17 to 39 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 40-70, # (2) Exhibit 71-99, # (3) Exhibit 100-121)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 10 to 16 part 13 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 10 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16 part 11, # (2) Exhibit 16 part 12, # (3) Exhibit 16 part 13)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 6 to 16 part 9 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 6 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16 part 7, # (2) Exhibit 16 part 8, # (3) Exhibit 16 part 9)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 2 to 16 part 5 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 2 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16 part 3, # (2) Exhibit 16 part 4, # (3) Exhibit 16 part 5)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 1-16 part 1 to Opposition, Exhibits 1-6 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 7 part 1, # (2) Exhibit 7 part 2, # (3) Exhibit 7 part 3, # (4) Exhibit 7 part 4, # (5) Exhibit 8-15, # (6) Exhibit 16 part 1)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [122] MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David K. Schneider in Opposition, # (2) Motion to Strike Declarations of Schnackenberg, Sommer, Nicholas and Donnelly, # (3) Declaration of David K. Schneider in Support of Motion to Strike Declarations, # (4) Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence, # (5) Objection to Plaintiffs' Trial Plan)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012, Terminated: 12/3/2012 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) qc email re pos and corresponding proposed lodged sealed filing on 12/3/2012 (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [135] Motion for Leave to Allow the Non-electronic Filing of Video as Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/29/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012, Terminated: 11/29/2012 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 11/2/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 11/2/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/1/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [128] Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump.(Schneider, David)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: This Court held a telephonic Status Conference on October 10, 2012. During the Conference, counsel brought several discovery issues to the Courts attention. The Court will hold another telephonic Status Conference on January 18, 2013, at 8:00 a.m. Only counsel must participate and the Court will initiate the call. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/18/2013 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/12/2012.(yeb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/10/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (yeb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Third Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Ed Oberkrom, Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller. New Summons Requested. (Eck, Amber) (yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [112] Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The TACC shall be filed on or before 10/5/2012. The hearing set for 10/05/2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 09/25/2012. (ag) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' [123] Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered 11/17/2011. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/25/2012. (rlu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/25/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [123] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu). (Main Document 124 replaced on 9/25/2012) (rlu). Modified on 9/25/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012, Terminated: 9/25/2012 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2014 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-20 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, # (4) Exhibit 21-39 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, # (5) Exhibit 40-66 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, # (6) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (7) Appendix I & Exhibits A-H thereto)(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct [41] Amended Complaint, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [118] Joint Motion for Leave to Allow Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2012. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [117] Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Pages Limitation Purduant to Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2012. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012, Terminated: 9/21/2012 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (knb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012, Terminated: 9/21/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (cge).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting plaintiffs' [113] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/8/12. (kaj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/8/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [113] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Jensen, Rachel)(leh). (Main Document 114 replaced on 8/9/2012) (kaj). Modified on 8/9/2012 to add file date of lodgment (kaj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012, Terminated: 8/8/2012 Motion to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Jensen, Rachel)(leh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012, Terminated: 9/25/2012 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Amend/Correct [41] Amended Complaint, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits to Jensen Declaration, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C (Redacted))(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on Discovery Disputes Involving Redactions re [110]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DENIES the request of both parties for an order that the documents at issue be un-redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 06/26/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/18/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 6/18/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/18/2012 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/12.(cge) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [106] Joint Motion to Revise Schedule; amended scheduling order regulating pre-class certification discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/10/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Motion for Class Certification due 9/24/12. Opposition to Motion due 11/30/12. Reply due 1/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/7/12. (cge) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re [106] Joint MOTION to Revise Schedule re [92] Order, Set Hearings filed by Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller, Ed Oberkrom Notice of Withdrawal of Exhibit A to Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support of Joint Motion to Revise Schedule. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012, Terminated: 6/7/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Revise Schedule re [92] Order, Set Hearings by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit A to Eck Declaration)(Eck, Amber)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [104] Motion to Revise Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012, Terminated: 5/24/2012 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION Revise Schedule re [92] Order, Set Hearings by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on Discovery Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/08/2012.(ag) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Olsen, Aaron)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re [93] Order, [95] Order Notice of Plaintiffs' Submission of Documents for In Camera Review Pursuant to the Court's Orders on Discovery Issues (Merrick, Thomas)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [98] Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 03/08/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012, Terminated: 3/8/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [93] Order, [95] Order February 13, 2012 and March 2, 2012 Orders on Discovery Disputes by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Merrick, Thomas)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Order on Motion to Terminate PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [96] Motion to Dismiss Party. Dismissing Patricia Murphy Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/06/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012, Terminated: 3/6/2012 Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Patrica Murphy's Claims with Prejudice by Patricia Murphy. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on Discovery Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/2/12.(lmt) (jcj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on Discovery Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/2/12.(lmt) (jcj). (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER: This Case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Irma E. Gonzalez to the calendar of the Honorable Cathy Ann Bencivengo. All pending motion hearing and pretrial conference dates on Judge Gonzalez's calendar are VACATED to be rescheduled by Judge Bencivengo. All other dates set forth in scheduling orders, including discovery and motion cutoffs, and all hearings calendared before the magistrate judges remain as scheduled. The new case number is 10cv940 CAB(WVG). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/15/12.(lmt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 3,191 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?