Leftridge v. Connecticut State Trooper et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-01166

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2017 at 10:35 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Connecticut State Police, Defendant
No Logo Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Defendant
No Logo Connecticut State Trooper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@po.state.ct.us
No Logo Dept Of Public Safety, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Bourgeois, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@po.state.ct.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (427) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reopen Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Reopen Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/28/13.(Sunbury, B.) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying plaintiff's 421 motion to dismiss the Court's 419 Order denying plaintiff's 418 motion for clarification. This case was dismissed without prejudice in the exercise of the Court's inherent authority to manage its docket to achieve judicial efficiency. The plaintiff may file a motion to reopen this case pursuant to the Court's 415 Order when he has complied with his discovery obligations. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Reconsideration/to Dismiss 419 Order on Motion for Clarification, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/18/2013 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Motion to Dismiss Entry No. 419 returned to Vernon Leftridge, Jr. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/28/2013.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER denying 418 Motion for Clarification as it does not comply with the Federal Rules requiring specification of the legal basis upon which relief is sought. The omnibus invocation of the Federal Rules and statutes in their entirety is insufficient. If a party disagrees with a court's ruling his recourse is to appeal. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/30/12. (Ives, D) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 418 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Clarification re: 415 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Recommended Ruling by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                      LREF
                      Blank 417 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                      JUDGMENT.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER denying 409 Motion for Status Report. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on November 27, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER denying 412 Motion to Stay; denying 412 Motion for Reconsideration; adopting Magistrate Judge Smith's 413 Recommended Ruling. This case shall be dismissed without prejudice to reopening by the Plaintiff. Plaintiff may file a motion to reopen this case after he has filed on the docket (1) a certified notice that he has complied with the Magistrate Judge's Orders to segregate responsive documents and has made such documents available to the defendant for review, accompanied by (2) a copy of Defendant's requests for production and (3) a corresponding schedule listing the documents Plaintiff has produced in compliance with Defendant's requests for production. The Clerk is directed to close this case file without prejudice to reopening as stated above. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/26/12. (Ives, D) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                            OBJECTION/REQUEST For REVIEW as to 413 Recommended Ruling filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              RECOMMENDED RULING denying 412 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, and recommending that the case be dismissed without prejudice. See attached Order. Objections due by 11/16/2012. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on November 2, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to stay or in the alternative motion for reconsideration of 406 motion for extension of time, re: 411 Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 11/22/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Grady, B.) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. The Magistrate Judge has reviewed the plaintiff's Notice of Compliance 410 . The plaintiff's renewed request, contained within the Notice of Compliance, for an extension of time until November 30, 2012 to segregate the case files at Attorney Williams' office, is denied. The Magistrate Judge adheres to his prior orders dated September 27, 2012 (Dkt. #404) and October 1, 2012 (Dkt. #408), which extended the plaintiff's original deadline to November 5, 2012. The only relevant medical documentation submitted by the plaintiff was filed prior to his July 13, 2012 Achilles surgery, and contained a statement from the plaintiff's orthopedic surgeon that the plaintiff would be "unavailable as a witness until mid September." See Dkt. #387. The plaintiff's previous two motions for extensions of time 405 and 406 to segregate the case files were denied without prejudice. The Magistrate Judge stated that he was "unwilling to further extend this deadline without explicit documentation from the plaintiff's orthopedic surgeon indicating that the plaintiff is unable to ambulate prior to [November 5, 2012]." See Dkt. #408. The plaintiff's submission of copies of his physical therapy schedule and temporary reduced fare transit identification card do not suffice. The plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that he is unable to segregate the case files at Attorney Williams' office prior to November 5, 2012. The Magistrate Judge, therefore, adheres to his prior orders. If the plaintiff does not comply, the Magistrate Judge will recommend that the District Judge dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on October 23, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr re 408 Order (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                      Request Defense Provide Status Report and Notice Re: Receipt of Received Copies by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 10/24/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER denying without prejudice 405 and 406 Motion for Extension of Time. The only medical documentation received by the Court to date consists of a letter, received approximately July 6, 2012 from the plaintiff's orthopedic surgeon, indicating that the plaintiff was scheduled to undergo Achilles surgery on July 13, 2012 "and will be immobile for ten weeks and unable to drive...He will be unavailable as a witness until mid September." The Court has already granted, without additional evidence from a medical provider, the plaintiff's motion 400 for an extension until November 5, 2012 to segregate the case files at Attorney Williams' office. The Court is unwilling to further extend this deadline without explicit documentation from the plaintiff's orthopedic surgeon indicating that the plaintiff is unable to ambulate prior to that date. The Court further notes that, despite the plaintiff's alleged limited mobility, he managed to appear in Hartford on or about September 9, 2012 to file various pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on October 1, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                          Docket Entry Correction re 402 Order. The plaintiff's Consent to Electronic Notice by Pro Se Plaintiff 401 did not include consent to receive electonic notice from opposing counsel. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for extension of time to segregate case files at John R. Williams Law Firm and status report by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (part 2 of 2)(Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for extension of time to segregate case files at John R. Williams Law Firm and status report by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (part 1 of 2) Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER. The Court has reviewed the plaintiff's "Recovery Status Notice" 400 . Construing the notice as a motion for extention of time, the motion is granted. The plaintiff is ORDERED to prepare and segregate for inspection at Attorney Williams' office the documents that are responsive to defendant's document production requests, and place a corresponding notice on the docket, no later than November 5, 2012. No further extensions will be granted. Upon receipt of the notice that the documents have been appropriately organized, defense counsel shall re-contact Attorney Williams' office to schedule a time to review the documents. The Court expects that this will be done without unreasonable delay. Once defense counsel has had a reasonable opportunity to inspect the documents at Attorney Williams' office, the defendant will have thirty days to depose the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on September 27, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 398 and 399 Motions for Order. The defendant is under no obligation to subpoena the records from any of the plaintiff's medical providers. Accordingly, to the extent the plaintiff seeks an order requiring the defendant to file a notice on the record indicating the date he subpoenas documents, or receives documents pursuant to a subpoena, the request is denied. However, in accordance with prior orders, if the defendant obtains plaintiff's medical documents, he shall, without unreasonable delay, mail a copy to the plaintiff and file a notice on the docket indicating that such records have been mailed. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on September 27, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    CORRECTED ORDER. Pursuant to prior Orders 310 and 316, the plaintiff was advised that he may contact the Court in the future if he wished to have his electronic notification and filing access restored. The plaintiff has now filed a Consent to Electronic Notice 401 . Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to restore the plaintiff's electronic notification and filing access. The Court's prior orders directing the Clerk of the Court to serve the plaintiff by mail are revoked. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on September 27, 2012. (Slitt, M.) Modified on 10/1/2012 (Sunbury, B.). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                      CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC NOTICE by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Plaintiff recovery status notice by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Grady, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for order to order defense and opposing counsel to file notice on the record by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Grady, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION/REQUEST for Order Directing to file Notices on the Record and REPLY re 397 Order on Motion for Order,, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) Modified on 9/10/2012 (Payton, R.). (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER denying 396 Motion for Order to Show Cause. There is no basis, either in law or fact, for this motion. The plaintiff has repeatedly been instructed to refrain from personal attacks against defendant's counsel. The plaintiff is advised to focus his time and energy on complying with this Court's order that, no later than October 5, 2012, he prepare and segregate for inspection at Attorney Williams' office the documents that are responsive to defendant's document production requests. The defendant shall provide plaintiff with copies of any medical records obtained from plaintiff's medical providers. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on September 4, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction & Entry of Default should not issue Request for Sanctions Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER. The defendant's Notice of Compliance 392 indicates that one of plaintiff's medical providers has objected to the defendant's document request. To the extent that any provider is unwilling to voluntarily produce documents, the defendant is free to subpoena such records. The defendant shall not obtain the plaintiff's medical documents via other attorneys in the Attorney General's Office assigned to unrelated cases involving the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on August 28, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Objection and reply to 393 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Jeffrey Bourgeois (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 389 Motion for Order. In light of the previous delays with respect to medical authorization forms and records, the defendant shall file, no later than August 24, 2012, a notice on the record advising the Court of the status of such authorization forms and records. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on August 14, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 377 Motion to Strike. The motion to seal was properly filed under Local Rule 5(e). The record does not suppport the plaintiff's allegations of false and misleading statements on the part of defendant's counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on August 14, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying 388 Motion to Seal. The plaintiff is free to seek the District Judge's review of this non-dispositive motion, with is normally governed by the "clearly erroneous" or "contrary to law" standard. 28 USC 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on July 11, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for ORDER re: Notice of Signed Releases by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Medical Information by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter from Raymond J.Sullivan, MD Re: surgery on 7/13/12 for Vernon Leftridge. (Sunbury, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Erratum. With regard to Dkt. #385, the date of the plaintiff's scheduled surgery should read "July 13, 2012," rather than "June 13, 2012." Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on July 6, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER. The Court has reviewed the recent status reports filed on the docket by the parties. In addition, the Court has received a letter from the plaintiff's orthopedic surgeon indicating that the plaintiff is scheduled to undergo Achilles surgery on June 13, 2012 "and will be immobile for ten weeks and unable to drive...He will be unavailable as a witness until mid September." A copy of the letter will be placed on the docket by the Clerk. The Court accepts the surgeon's representation regarding the plaintiff's condition. Accordingly, the time period to conduct the plaintiff's deposition must be extended again. The Court also accepts the representation of Attorney Williams, as described by defense counsel, that plaintiff's documents in Attorney Williams' possession are voluminous and not organized in a manner that segregates the documents that may be responsive to defendant's production requests in this case from the plaintiff's multiple other federal and state lawsuits. The plaintiff has an obligation to prepare and segregate for inspection at Attorney Williams' office the documents that are responsive to defendant's document production requests in this case. Given the plaintiff's medical condition, he shall complete this task no later than October 5, 2012, and place a corresponding notice on the docket. Given the repeated delays in this case, the Court instructs the plaintiff that he has a good faith obligation to perform this task sooner than October 5, 2012, if his condition should allow. Upon receipt of the notice that the documents have been appropriately organized, defense counsel shall re-contact Attorney Williams' office to schedule a time to review the documents. The Court expects that this will be done without unreasonable delay. Once defense counsel has had a reasonable opportunity to inspect the documents at Attorney Williams' office, the defendant will have thirty days to depose the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on July 6, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Jeffrey Bourgeois(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 7/11/2012 to correct filer (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER. On June 5, 2012, the Court ordered the defendant to either notice the plaintiff's deposition for July 13, 2012, or communicate via telephone with the plaintiff in order to select a mutually convenient alternative date that is no later than July 31, 2012. See Dkt. #378. As of today, no deposition notice has been filed on the docket, as ordered by the Court. The plaintiff has indicated that, at least as of June 16, 2012, he had not been contacted by defense counsel with respect to scheduling the deposition. The plaintiff has also proposed an alternative date of July 30, 2012, if defense counsel is unavailable on July 13, 2012. Accordingly, no later than July 2, defense counsel shall file a notice, on the record, indicating whether she is available on either of the dates selected by the plaintiff, and any efforts she has made to communicate her availability to the plaintiff. If the parties have already reached an agreement on scheduling, defense counsel shall immediately file the deposition notice on the record. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on June 28, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of COMPLIANCE by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT NOTICES by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 378 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Take Deposition filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying 361 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 365 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 367 Motion to Compel; denying 367 Motion to Dismiss; denying 375 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 376 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 376 Motion to Take Deposition. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on June 5, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 371 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 6/25/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for an court to moves the defendant to sign his deposition transcript and return it to plaintiff immediately and requests the court to order defendant to schedule the postponed deposition date on 07/13/2012 by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RENEWED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            OBJECTION re 367 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER. The Court's schedule does not provide an opportunity to address the substance of Defendant's Motion to Compel and Request for Dismissal 367 prior to the scheduled deposition of the plaintiff on June 4, 2012. Accordingly, the June 4, 2012 deposition is hereby POSTPONED. The Court will rule on defendant's motion in the ordinary course of business. While the motion is pending, the defendant shall attempt to obtain from providers any medical records for which he has received an authorization form. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 29, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 371 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 29, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal by Jeffrey Bourgeois. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 6/7/2012 to change event (Grady, B.). (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 370 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Sealed Document: Exhibit A by Jeffrey Bourgeois, re: 367 MOTION to Compel and Request for Dismissal. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Court is currently unable to review Defendant's Renewed Motion to Compel and Request for Dismissal (Dkt. #367), as the Clerk has not yet received the exhibit purportedly filed under seal, nor an accompanying motion to seal. No later than May 30, 2012, the defendant shall electronically file a motion to seal, and shall hand deliver to the Clerk's office the proposed sealed exhibit. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 29, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT A Filed Under Seal by Jeffrey Bourgeois re 367 MOTION to Compel. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel and Request for Dismissal by Jeffrey Bourgeois. Responses due by 6/14/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-E)Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Murphy-Osborne, Maura). Added Request for Dismissal on 5/29/2012 (Grady, B.). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Compliance by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Corriette, M.) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for ORDER re: Deposition Transcript by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) Modified on 5/21/2012 (Payton, R.)to edit text (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr re: Authorization form (Blough, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY to 360 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Strike, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Blough, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 355 Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause. See Dkt. #360. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 11, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 354 Order as to 351 MOTION for Sanctions by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/30/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 349 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Review and Modify Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 355 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Compel And Request for An Order to Show Cause; denying 358 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike And/Or Quash; denying 359 Plaintiff's Objection And Motion to Dismiss, Quash And/Or Strike. See attached Order.Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 10, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike with Objections re: 352 First MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/29/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike/Quash 355 MOTION to Compel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/28/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 357 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document: Exhibit C by Jeffrey Bourgeois, re: 355 MOTION to Compel. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT Signed By Vernon Leftridge Jr. filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel and Request for an Order to Show Cause by Jeffrey Bourgeois.Responses due by 5/28/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Renewed Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A to Memo in Support of Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit B to Memo in Support of Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit C to Memo in Support of Motion to Compel, # 5 Supplement Unreported Decisions attached to Memo In Support of Motin to Compel)Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Murphy-Osborne, Maura). Added MOTION for Order to Show Cause on 5/11/2012 (Grady, B.). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 346 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; denying 350 Motion for Judicial Notice; denying 351 Motion for Sanctions. With respect to Dkt. #346, there is no basis, either in law or in fact, to disqualify the Attorney General's Office from this case. With respect to Dkt. #350, the Court is well aware of the claims and defenses of the parties. With respet to Dkt. #351, the Court has repeatedly ruled against the plaintiff on these, or similar, allegations of misconduct against the defendant. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 4, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 352 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on May 4, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Jeffrey Bourgeois. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Sanctions by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/24/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Request for Judicial Notice by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/14/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              EXPEDITED MOTION to Review and Modify Protective Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 5/7/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Compliance re 343 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr(Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 342 Order on Motion to Vacate, 343 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, 339 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 338 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 336 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel 337 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 341 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 340 Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Disqualify The Office of Connecticut Attorney General by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jeffrey Bourgeois re 341 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 219 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Jeffrey Bourgeois.(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 335 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has given the plaintiff far more time to complete his discovery obligations than he is entitled. As stated in its April 3, 2012 Order (Dkt. No. 329), the plaintiff shall file a supplemental response to defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents no later than April 17, 2012. Such supplemental response shall include full and complete responses to the interrogatories and document requests described in Dkt. Nos. 329 and 319. To the extent that the plaintiff continues to argue that other videotapes, recordings and other documents exist, and that the defendant shall produce them, he is incorrect. As Judge Bryant has stated, "[t]here is absolutely no factual predicate for any suspicion, belief, conclusion that there is any other recording and were not going to...reopen the speculative aspects of discovery." Dkt. No. 304 at 45. The Magistrate concurs. The only outstanding discovery in this case is the plaintiff's supplemental discovery responses, which must be sent via certified mail no later than April 17, 2012, and the plaintiff's deposition scheduled for June 4, 2012. Dispositive motions shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the plaintiff's deposition. To the extent that the plaintiff requests a status conference, the request is denied. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 13, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 334 Motion to Vacate in light of the Court's Order in Dkt. #341. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 334 . See attached Order. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 331 Motion for Sanctions. The Court has no reason to believe that defendants counsel placed the plaintiffs discovery responses on the docket in bad faith. However, in light of the plaintiffs privacy concerns, the Clerk is directed to seal Exhibit A of 319 .Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 326 Motion for Extension of Time in light of Dkt. #329. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 324 Motion for Protective Order. The plaintiff has failed to establish that he is entitled to reimbursement of his deposition expenses, or other expenses related to discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 313 Motion for Protective Order. The Court has issued a protective order in this case. See Dkt. # 329. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 297 ; denying 309 ; denying 321 ; denying 322 . The Court has repeatedly ruled against the plaintiff on these, or similar, allegations of misconduct against the defendant. To the extent any of these claims are new, the plaintiff has no basis, either in law or fact, to support the relief he seeks.Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 12, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time forty five (45)day to extend Supplemental Discovery & Dispositive Deadline by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reverse, Revoke and/or Restore re: CT. State Trooper #1283 (Responses due by 4/26/2012, ), MOTION to Vacate all Pleadings filed after 10/11/2011 to Present re: Ct. State Trooper #1283 by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY/OBJECTION re 323 Notice (Other) filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Connecticut State Trooper (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sanctions with Memorandum of Law and Facts by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/25/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE re 319 Notice (Other) filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 328 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, Requiring Supplemental Discovery Responses and Issuing Standing Protective Order. Subject to any objection from defendant's counsel, the deposition of the plaintiff shall be held on June 4, 2012 at 10:00 A.M. at a location in New Haven to be selected by the defendant. In light of the recent difficulties in reaching the plaintiff by mail, the defendant shall timely file a Notice of Deposition on the record. In granting this extension, the Court notes that it accepts the plaintiff's representation regarding his mandatory new employment development training and probationary period. Treating Defendant's Notice of Receipt of Untimely and Incomplete Discovery Responses from Plaintiff 319 as a Motion to Compel, the Court agrees with the defendant that the plaintiff has inappropriately failed to respond to questions or produce documents regarding his work history, cliam of emotional distress, claim of evidence tampering, history of making similar complaints, history of traffic infractions, intended witnesses, documents that relate to the claims in the complaint, and information about electronically stored information. While some of the requested information may not be admissible at trial, these interrogatories and requests appear to be "reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(1). In particular, the requests relate to information that the plaintiff has himself placed into issue via the Complaint, and that could arguably shed light on the plaintiff's credibility. The plaintiff shall file a supplemental response to defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents no later than April 17, 2012. The responses shall be sent via certified mail, and the plaintiff shall immediately file a copy of the certified mail receipt on the docket. As the parties have contemplated the issuance of a protective order with respect to certain documents, the Court hereby issues the attached protective order. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 3, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify 318 ,Scheduling Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/23/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Counsel for the defendant has filed a notice indicating that she has received the plaintiff's discovery responses. Accordingly, at this time, the plaintiff does not need to mail another copy of his discovery responses to the defendant. The Court will take the plaintiff's request for an extension of time under advisement. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 2, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/4/2012 plaintiff's deposition date by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Compliance by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr re 318 Order, (Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/20/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jeffrey Bourgeois of Deficient Mailing Address (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 4/19/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Relief by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 4/19/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 317 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order re 315 Order filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Connecticut State Trooper Of Receipt of Untimely and Incomplete Discovery Responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 4/5/2012 too remove text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The parties were ordered to reach an agreement with respect to the date of the plaintiff's deposition, to be held within the dates previously ordered by Judge Bryant. See 295 . The Court has since received the parties' submissions regarding the scheduling of the deposition. The Court finds that the plaintiff's offer to make himself available only after 5:00 p.m. on Friday, April 20, 2012, as well as the following Saturday and Sunday, is not reasonable. The defendant has, in good faith, noticed the deposition for 10:00 a.m. on April 20, 2012, a date that was selected by the plaintiff. The Court notes that the plaintiff's submission also references his availability on Friday, May 4, 2012. Although this date is beyond the current deadline, the Court will consider extending the deadline to May 4, 2012 in order to facilitate an end to the current scheduling problem. Therefore, no later than April 3, 2012, the plaintiff shall file, on the record, a plain and concise statement indicating whether he will make himself available for a deposition to be held on either of these two dates and times: (1) April 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.; or (2) May 4, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. If the plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will issue an order to show cause requiring the plaintiff to demonstrate why this case should not be dismissed for failure to cooperate with discovery. In addition, there appears to be a dispute as to whether the plaintiff has complied with Judge Bryant's order that he respond to the defendant's discovery by March 22, 2012. Although the plaintiff's submissions indicate that his responses were mailed on March 21, 2012, counsel for the defendant has indicated that she has not received any discovery responses thus far from the plaintiff. Accordingly, the plaintiff is ordered to mail another copy of his discovery responses to the defendant, via certified mail, no later than April 3, 2012. The plaintiff shall immediately file a copy of the certified mail receipt on the docket. Defense counsel is ordered to immediately file a notice, on the docket, upon receipt of any discovery materials, regardless of whether such materials appear to have been mailed before or after the date of this Order. If the plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will issue an order to show cause requiring the plaintiff to demonstrate why this case should not be dismissed for failure to cooperate with discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 27, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Connecticut State Trooper re 315 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 305 Plaintiff's "Motion and Request That All Notices And Orders are Mailed." As previously stated in 310 , Plaintiff may contact the Court at a later time should he wish to have his electronic notification and filing access restored. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 26, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. No later than March 29, 2012, counsel for the defendant shall file, on the record, a response to the plaintiff's proposed deposition dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 26, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO re 274 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 272 Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Dismiss 309 MOTION to Compel filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Transcript Part I of II, # 2 Exhibit A Transcript Part II)(Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/11/2012 Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for all matters other than trial. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 306 Motion for Copies of Transcripts for failure to state with particularity the grounds for seeking the order. Rule 7(b)(2)(B). The Court is unable therefore to determine the grounds upon which the Plaintiff claims entitlement to transcripts sought. 28 U.S.C. 753. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Whereas by his March 19, 2012 Motion and Request that all Notices and Orders be Mailed 297 , the Plaintiff has moved not to receive pleadings electronically because he does not have access to the internet, it is hereby ordered that the order granting Plaintiff permission to file electronically is reversed and revoked, without prejudice to reentry and restoration upon notice from the Plaintiff that he has internet access and wishes his privileges restored. Both the Defendants and the Clerk of the Court are hereby ordered and directed to serve the Plaintiff by mail at the address provided by Plaintiff in his above-referenced motion until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Discovery with Memorandum of Facts and Law by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/10/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 296 Motion for Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. The Court has not entered an Order of Default against the defendant pursuant to Rule 55(a). See 214 . For the reasons addressed in 295 , the Court has no intention of doing so. The caselaw cited by the plaintiff, and the facts of this case, do not support his proposition that he is entitled to a default judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 20, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re 298 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 295 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Contempt, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION (REPLY)for copy(s)re: TRANSCRIPTS 299 and 300 by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION re: Mailing of all Notices and Orders by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/9/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on 2/21/12 (Telephonic Status Conference) before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Steve Bowles. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2012. (Bowles, S.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. In its Notice of Compliance 290 , the defendant indicated that it was "awaiting plaintiffs instructions on how he would best like to receive the audio recordings [of the internal affairs investigation] to ensure reliable delivery." The Court notes that the plaintiff has now indicated that he would like to receive the recordings via U.S. Mail to his P.O. Box. See 301 at 2. Accordingly, the defendant shall immediately comply with this request. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 20, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The transcript docketed at # 300 was docketed in error. As it cannot be deleted, it is ordered sealed. The clerk is directed to file the correct transcript forthwith. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/20/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re: 295 ORDERS by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                - ENTERED IN ERROR - TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on 2/21/12 (Telephonic Status Conference) before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Steve Bowles. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2012. (Bowles, S.) Modified on 3/21/2012 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 03/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on 6/30/11 (Status Conference) before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Steve Bowles. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2012. (Bowles, S.) (Entered: 03/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute Resolution including 296 MOTION for Ruling, 297 MOTION and Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/16/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION and Request for Judicial Notice by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 4/3/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Ruling: re: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute including 293 MOTION for Re: Defendant and his Attorney Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/13/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for ORDER Re: Defendant and his Attorney by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 290 Notice of Compliance filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Counsel for the defendant has filed a Notice of Compliance [Dkt. #290] indicating that the defendant has complied with Judge Bryant's Order [Dkt. #272] requiring that any audio tape of the internal affairs investigation be produced to the plaintiff, "and the audio tape and transcript be produced to the Court." Although the defendant delivered a copy of two CDs containing audio recordings from the investigation, the Court has not received the corresponding transcripts from the defendant. Accordingly, the defendant is ORDERED, within one business day, to deliver a copy of the transcripts to the Chambers of Hon. Thomas P. Smith. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 9, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance with court order by Connecticut State Trooper re 272 Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Dismiss (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 3/12/2012 to add text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 278 Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Security for Costs. The Court has already vacated its Order 263 requiring the plaintiff to file a bond as security for costs. See 286 .Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 8, 2012. (Slitt, M.) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute including 287 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/7/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay re: Discovery Obligations by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER VACATING 263 Order Granting Motion for Security for Costs in light of 2 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/2/12. (Hildebrand, J.) Modified text on 3/5/2012 to correct link to 263 (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute including 284 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/2/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Bourgois, MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Responses due by 3/21/2012, ), MOTION for Sanctions (Responses due by 3/21/2012, ) by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute including 282 MOTION for Re: Service Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/28/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order re: Service by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Discovery Dispute including 277 MOTION to Amend/Correct 219 Amended Complaint, 278 MOTION Waive re 262 MOTION for Security for Costs, 263 Order on Motion for Security for Costs, 280 MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions, 276 MOTION for Deposition of Plaintiff Order, 275 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/28/12. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Contempt, MOTION for Sanctions by Vernon J. Leftridge Jr. Responses due by 3/16/2012 (Payton, R.) Modified on 2/27/2012 to correct filer(Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re 274 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, as to 273 MOTION for Extension of Time re: Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Waive 262 MOTION for Security for Costs, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/16/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 219 Amended Complaint; and also a Reply to 262 MOTION for Security for Costs by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/15/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order re: Deposition of Plaintiff by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/15/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 273 Motion for Extension of Time of the Scheduling Order to extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion deadlines without prejudice to refiling including the transcript of Defendant Bourgois's deposition with the comments referred to by the Plaintiff regarding when Defendant Bourgois stated that he activated the video recorder. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/23/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time re: Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 261 Motion for Order; denying as moot 264 Motion for Order; denying as moot 256 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 258 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 258 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 258 Motion to Dismiss. The aforementioned pending motions are denied as moot in light of the Court's telephonic status conference yesterday. As Judge Bryant ordered in the telephonic status conference, Plaintiff may have 30 days to submit adequate responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Defendant may have 30 days following the Plaintiff's submissions to depose the Plaintiff. Further, if an audio tape of the internal affairs investigation exists, it is ordered that the audio tape be produced to Plaintiff and the audio tape and transcript be produced to the Court.. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/22/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 265 Motion for Security for Costs. The local rule cited by the Plaintiff, Rule 83.(3)allows either Defendants or Counterclaim Plaintiffs to request security for costs. Plaintiff, Mr. Leftridge, is neither the defendant nor a counterclaim plaintiff. Therefore this rule is inapplicable and Plaintiff has provided no support whatsoever for his motion. The Court has repeatedly reminded Plaintiff that he may not file frivolous motions with no basis in law. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to pay $10.00 in costs to the Defendant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/22/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/21/2012. Total Time: 1 hours and 12 minutes(Court Reporter R.Wood (ECRO).) (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 258 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Dismiss filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re: 266 Objection to 258 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re 262 MOTION for Security for Costs filed by Jeffrey Bourgois. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION re 258 MOTION to Compel filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Security for Costs by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Ruling Order by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 262 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 02/21/2012. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Security for Costs by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Immediate Telephonic Status Conference Order by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 3/9/2012 to change event (Grady, B.). (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply re 254 MOTION to Stay, 256 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 257 Motion for Reconsideration. As the Court has previously indicated to Plaintiff in 217 the Court's Order denying a prior motion for reconsideration, a motion for reconsideration may only be made on the basis of newly developed facts and/or law. In the Second Circuit, the standard for granting a motion for reconsideration "is strict, and reconsideration will generally be denied unless the moving party can point to controlling decisions or data that the court overlooked- matters, in other words, that might reasonably be expected to alter the conclusion reached by the court." Shrader v. CSX Transp., Inc., 70 F.3d 255, 257 (2d Cir. 1995). Here, as in Plaintiff's prior motion for reconsideration, Plaintiff has simply reiterated the same arguments and requests contained in his Motion to Stay 254 which the Court considered and subsequently denied. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Plaintiff is yet again reminded that such specious pleadings are an abuse of the judicial process and may result in the assessment of costs. Furthermore, to the extent that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration contains a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, this request is indecipherable and the Court cannot ascertain either the relief being sought or the basis for that relief. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/15/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel, for Sanction and to dismiss by Connecticut State Trooper.Responses due by 3/7/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Affidavit of Maura Murphy Osborne, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura). Added MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION to Dismiss on 2/17/2012 (Grady, B.). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 255 Order on Motion to Stay,, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/6/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by Connecticut State Trooper.Responses due by 3/6/2012 (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 254 Motion to Stay. The Court attempted on February 14th to contact Plaintiff to schedule a telephonic status conference with Plaintiff and Counsel for the Defendant but was unable to do so because the Plaintiff's voicemail box is full. The Court has previously advised Plaintiff of the need to be accessible by mail and by phone. In view of the fact that only three people were present at the time of the ten minute incident complained of, one of whom was the Plaintiff, the Court is in a quandary as to why depositions are posing such a burden. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/14/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 3/2/2012 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER the Parties are hereby notified that no further discovery shall be entered on the docket absent a specific order of the Court. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED FEBRUARY 4, 2012 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION AND DETERMINED LOCATION TO DEPOSE JEFFREY BOURGOIS by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 249 Motion to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge; denying 249 Motion to Transfer to Another District. See attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/17/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 246 MOTION to Compel, 248 Order, 247 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge, MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER in response to 245 Reply: the Court, having previously ruled on these motions, this Reply is duplicative, frivolous, and wholly lacking in legal merit. If the Plaintiff continues to file frivolous motions the Court will consider the imposition of sanctions under Rule 11. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/29/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 246 Motion to Compel. Defendant is ordered to fully comply with the Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production by 1/13/12. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/29/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel by Connecticut State Trooper.Responses due by 1/19/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO 240 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 241 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 244 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 243 Motion to Strike. There is no rule that allows the Court to strike an objection to a motion. Fed. R. Civ. Pr. 12(f) permits the Court to strike from a pleading any insufficient defense or any redundant, immaterial, impertinent or scandalous matter. A pleading is not a motion, it is a complaint, answer or counterclaim asserting a claim or defense. Plaintiff seeks to strike Defendant's Objection to his Motion for Extension of Time asserting that the objection was made in the form of an ex parte communication with the Court. An ex parte communication is a communication by one party with the Court to the exclusion of any other party. There was no communication was the Court. The communication was with the court's clerk. Moreover, the communication was not unilateral as it was sent to the Plaintiff contemporaneously with its transmittal to the Court's Clerk. Plaintiff's motion is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/14/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Insufficient Email Objection Defenses by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ALL PARTIES ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO REFRAIN FROM ANY EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS WITH THE COURT. ANY COMMUNICATIONS WITH THE COURT MUST BE MADE IN THE FORM OF A MOTION SUPPORTED BY A MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED ON THE DOCKET. EMAIL FILINGS ARE NOT PERMITTED. THE COURT HAS BLOCKED THE EMAIL ADDRESSES OF BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND WILL NOT LONGER BE ABLE TO RECEIVE EMAILS FROM THE PARTIES. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/14/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 238 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff has not established that there is an electronic recording of the internal affairs investigation. Plaintiff does not quote any material disclosed indicating that there is a recording, and therefore he has not established that one exists to be produced. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/13/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 237 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to demonstrate good cause. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/13/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION re 237 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days re: 167 Scheduling Order filed by Jeffrey Bourgois. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 236 Order on Motion to Compel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 12/26/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time 30 Days re: 167 Scheduling Order,,, by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 225 Motion to Compel in light of the Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/1/11. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/5/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Connecticut State Police of service of discovery on plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 11/10/2011 (Grady, B.). Modified on 11/14/2011 to remove text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 11/1/2011 at 04:30 PM in Chambers Room 320, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The Parties are directed to contact Chambers at 860-240-3123 with both Parties on the line. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER in light of the inclement weather, the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled to take place this afternoon, 10/31/11 at 4:30 PM will be rescheduled for tomorrow afternoon, 11/1/11 at 4:30 PM. The Parties are directed to contact Chambers at 860-240-3123 with both Parties on the line. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/31/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 4:30 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The Parties are directed to contact Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all counsel and parties on the line.(Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Amended counts in amended complaint returned to Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/24/2011. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 228 Motion for Leave to Add Adopted Counts in Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend his Second Amended Complaint is not in proper form for the Court to consider. Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides that a party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course, and in all other cases, a party may amend its pleading only with either opposing counsel's written consent, or with leave of the Court. Local Rule 7(a) requires that a motion submitted to the Court presenting disputed issues of law must be accompanied by a written memorandum of law. Local R. 7(b). If Plaintiff wishes to further amend his complaint, Plaintiff is directed to comply with both the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules, by filing a motion for leave to amend accompanied by a memorandum of law addressing why he should be granted leave to further amend the pleadings at this late juncture having already been granted leave to amend twice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/24/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The Parties are directed to contact Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all counsel and parties on the line. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Add Adopted Counts in 219 Amended Complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 11/11/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 226 Motion for Reconsideration regarding Count Four of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/20/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave re: 220 Order Striking Count Four of 219 Amended Complaint by Vernon J Leftridge, Jr .Responses due by 11/4/2011 (Payton, R.) Modified on 10/17/2011 (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Discovery by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 11/4/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jeffrey Bourgois of Compliance with Court Order (Docket #215) (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 219 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Jeffrey Bourgois.(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 221 Plaintiff's letter which the Court interprets to be a Motion to Compel. Plaintiff has not shown that the Defendant failed to use the Plaintiff's correct address. Rather, Plaintiff has only shown that the United States Post Office may have delivered the package to a post office other than the one at which the Plaintiff maintains a post office box. The rules require actual or constructive notice, not perfection. Clearly, the Plaintiff has actual notice of the delivery of the discovery documents and the ability to obtain them, as evidenced by his knowledge and use of the package tracking number to determine its location. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks the discovery he requested he may retrieve it from the post office in the manner directed in the tracking information filed in support of his motion to compel. Plaintiff is reminded that all communications with the Court must be in the form of a motion. All further communications by letter will be returned to sender. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/12/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 11/2/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking Count Four of 219 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Count Four exceeds the Court's Order 208 granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint by asserting a new claim of interference with Plaintiff's right to travel in interstate commerce for which leave of the Court was not granted. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/12/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Bourgois filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re 213 Memorandum in Opposition to 210 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendants, filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER the Court treats 216 the Plaintiff's additional reply to opposition to his Motion for Default Entry as a motion for reconsideration. A motion for reconsideration may only be made on the basis of newly developed facts and/or law which the exercise of reasonable diligence could not have been discovered and presented for the Court's consideration in the first instance. 216 Plaintiff's additional reply reiterates the same arguments contained in 210 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Entry. Such pleadings are discouraged and could be deemed an abuse of the judicial process and result in the assessment of costs. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/11/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to opposition to 210 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendants filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Defendant may have an additional 14 days from the Plaintiff's filing of his amended complaint to propound discovery requests on the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 210 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiffs motion for Default re 210 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendants filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to 210 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendants filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Default re 210 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendants filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to defendants by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding as moot 205 Motion to Adopt Each and Every Claim and Allegation of Plaintiff's Initial Complaint in light of 208 the Court's Order granting Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint to allege five causes of action, including a claim under the Civil Rights Act of 1964, but excluding a claim under the Thirteenth Amendment, which does not allow for a private cause of action. Consistent with 206 the Court's order granting Plaintiff an extension of time, the Plaintiff is directed to file his amended complaint by 10/14/11. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 189 Motion for Leave to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff may amend his complaint by filing an amended complaint setting forth his five claims in separate counts; one count under the 1866 Civil Rights Act, one count under the Fourth Amendment, one count under the Fourteenth Amendment, one count under Section 1983; and one count under the Civil Rights Act of 1964. The Plaintiff is instructed not to include in his amended complaint a claim under the Thirteenth Amendment, as the Amendment does not allow for a private right of action. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER vacating 202 Order granting Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may have an additional two weeks to file his amended complaint. The amended complaint is now due on 10/14/11. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to adopt each and every claim in plaintiff first initial civil rights complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 10/18/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time on or before October 31, 2011 to file amended 3 Complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Plaintiff is directed to file his amended complaint by 9/30/11. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/19/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VACATED...ORDER granting 189 Motion to Amend Complaint. Having read and considered 200 Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Court Ruling, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Court notes, however that Defendant's requests for extensions of time have not precluded Plaintiff from realizing the existence of a claim. Plaintiff may amend his complaint by filing an amended complaint setting forth his four claims in separate counts; one count under the 1866 Civil Rights Act, one count under the Fourth Amendment, one count under the Fourteenth Amendment, and one count under Section 1983. The Plaintiff is instructed not to include in his amended complaint a claim under the Thirteenth Amendment, as the Amendment does not allow for a private right of action. Plaintiff is also instructed not to include in his amended complaint a claim under Civil Rights Act of 1964, because the statute of limitations has expired. A cause of action arises at the time the act complained of occurred. The cause of actions incorporated into the amended complaint were or in the exercise of due diligence could have been known to the Plaintiff and included in the original complaint. After an answer is filed, a Plaintiff does not have the right to amend a complaint and may do so only with leave of the Court. In recognition of the Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court has exercised its discretion to allow him to amend his complaint, nearly four years after the original complaint was filed.. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/16/11. (Hildebrand, J.) Modified on 9/30/2011 (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER vacating 198 Order granting Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/16/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY AND OPPOSITION re 189 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint 196 MOTION for Court Ruling filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Gothers, M.) Modified on 9/16/2011 to correct file date (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER finding as moot 196 Motion for Order in light of 198 Court's Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/13/11. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VACATED...ORDER granting 189 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, and is directed to file such amended complaint by 9/27/11, absent further leave of the Court for good cause shown. Plaintiff's amended complaint must set forth each legal claim as a separate count. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint may not include a claim under the Thirteenth Amendment because the Thirteenth Amendment does not allow a private right of action. See Marshall v. National Assn of Letter Carriers BR36--, No. 03CIV13161LTSAJP, 2003 WL 22519869 (S.D.N.Y Nov. 7, 2003) (citing Alma Soc. Inc. v. Mellon, 601 F.2d 1225 (2d Cir. 1979)). Plaintiff's Amended Complaint may also not include a claim under the Civil Rights Act of 1964, because the applicable statute of limitations has expired. See Carter v. University of Connecticut, 264 Fed. Appx. 111 (2d Cir. 2008) (holding that Connecticut's three-year personal injury statute of limitations, C.G.S. §52-577, applies to a claim raised under the Civil Rights Act of 1964). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/13/11. (Hildebrand, J.) Modified on 9/16/2011 (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Entry Correction re 196 MOTION for Order modified: to correct as a motion for order. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Order by the Court by Connecticut State Trooper re 189 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, 193 Response (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 9/13/2011 - to correct as a motion for order (Gothers, M.). (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Objection to Response to 189 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to response to 189 MOTION to amend 3 Complaint filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 189 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 190 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Name and Title of October 31, 2005 Exhibit. The Court takes notice of the fact that the Plaintiff submitted a copy of his October 31, 2005 "following too close" traffic infraction as an exhibit to 185 his July 15, 2011 Notice. However, the Plaintiff is once again instructed that it is not necessary to file discovery with the Court. Instead, discovery should be provided directly to the opposing party. The Plaintiff will have an opportunity to submit evidence in support of his claim when summary judgment motions are filed. Pursuant to 167 the Court's June 30, 2011 Scheduling Order, summary judgment motions are not due until April 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/10/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Notice from Sgt Michael J. Spellman returned to Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2011. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to correct name and title of submitted evidence 10/31/2005 exhibit submitted to court by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 8/30/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 8/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Order. The Court already has the same edited version of the videotape from the Defendant's traffic camera that was provided to the Plaintiff, as well as the longer videotape which includes several days of footage. The Court has confirmed that the edited version of the videotape provided to the Plaintiff is valid. With respect to the Plaintiff's demand for the audio and videotape of the second officer who was present during his traffic stop, the Plaintiff is reminded that during the June 30, 2011 status conference, all parties agreed to a schedule whereby the Defendant has until September 30, 2011 to produce all written and physical discovery to the Plaintiff. See Doc. #167. Defense counsel agreed to conduct a search for the second officer's videotape and audiotape, and if they exist, to provide them to the Plaintiff by no later than September 30, 2011. There is no basis for requiring the Defendant to turn over discovery prior to the deadlines set by the Court which all parties agreed upon. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/21/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 186 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct 185 Notice of requested CHRO materials. The Court takes notice of the fact that the Plaintiff filed April 2005/April 2006 CHRO Complaints/Affidavits in Doc. # 185 . The Plaintiff is instructed, however, that it is not necessary to file discovery with the Court. Instead, discovery should be provided directly to the opposing party. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/21/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to correct 185 NOTICE of requested CHRO 04/24/11 affidavits/complaint materials that was filed against defendants by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 8/10/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of requested CHRO 04/24/11 affidavits/complaint materials that was filed against defendants by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for order that defendants provide court with the exact same audio and video tapes that were and are going to be provided by defendants through attorney Maura Murphy Osborne aka opposing counsel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 182 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Defense counsel's service of the 175 Motion to Seal upon the Plaintiff at the Groton address rather than the Bridgeport address appears to have been an inadvertent error, as the Plaintiff's original address of record was the Groton address at which service was made. Furthermore, the Plaintiff has suffered no prejudice because, as explained in Doc. #181, the Court has viewed the entire videotape that was the subject of the motion to seal, and has determined that there is nothing on the videotape relevant to the Plaintiff's claims other than footage of his own traffic stop, which he already has been provided. The remainder of the videotape is irrelevant to this case and not subject to disclosure. Defense counsel is ordered to serve all future filings on the Plaintiff at his current address of record in Bridgeport. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/14/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Sanctions opposing Counsel Maura Murphy Osborne for failure to mail plaintiff a copy of her #175 pleading before the court's ruling by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 8/2/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The Court has viewed the complete videotape containing footage of the traffic stop giving rise to this lawsuit. In addition to the traffic stop of the Plaintiff, the videotape contains several days worth of footage from the Defendant Officer's camera. The Court has concluded that there is nothing on the videotape, apart from the Plaintiff's traffic stop, that is relevant to this case. There is no indication whatsoever that the videotape has been edited or altered in any way. The footage of the Plaintiff's traffic stop is consistent with all of the other stops made by the Defendant Officer. The Defendant Officer only turns his camera on when he effects a traffic stop, not when he is in pursuit of a suspected traffic law violator. It appears to the Court that the purpose of the camera is for officer safety, not to document the basis for traffic stops. Therefore, the Defendant will not be required to turn over the full videotape to the Plaintiff. The Plaintiff has already been provided with the only portion of the videotape relevant to his case, that portion being his own traffic stop. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/13/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 175 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File videotape under seal; denying 178 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The videotape contains footage of traffic stops of individuals other than the Plaintiff that have no relevance to this action, and therefore the videotape will be kept under seal in chambers. The Court will determine if any portions of the videotape that have not already been provided to the Plaintiff are relevant to this action and, if so, will order that those portions to be disclosed to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/12/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 177 Plaintiff's Motion for Order. See Doc. #173. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/12/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike and objection to 175 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 8/1/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for order to vacate and/or reverse all pleadings, complaints and amended complaints that were ruled in favor of defendant Jeffrey Bourgois by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to 171 MOTION for order that defendant Jeffrey Bourgois hires his own individual private attorney filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) Modified on 7/11/2011 to fix text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 172 Plaintiff's Motion for permission to review all electronic materials, audiotapes, and videotapes in chambers. The Court does not make its chambers available for parties to review discovery materials. As the Court explained during the June 30, 2011 status conference, the Court acts as a neutral arbiter between the parties, not as an advocate for a pro se litigant. Although the Court is solicitous of the rights of pro se litigants, such a litigant is nevertheless bound by the same rules and procedures as those qualified to practice law. It is incumbent upon a pro se litigant, like any other party, to make his own arrangements for facilities to conduct discovery and review discovery materials. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/8/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 171 Plaintiff's Motion for Order requiring Defendant to hire his own private attorney. There is no basis in law for the relief requested by the Plaintiff. The Attorney General's Office regularly represents state officials sued in their individual capacities for alleged civil rights violations occurring within the scope of their employment. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/8/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for permission to review all electronic materials, materials, audiotapes and videos in chambers by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 7/28/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for order that defendant Jeffrey Bourgois hires his own individual private attorney by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) Modified on 7/11/2011 to add text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 168 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Plaintiff seeks leave to assert a claim against Officer Jeffrey Bourgeois in his official capacity. An official capacity claim against a State officer is, in effect, a claim against the State. See Edelman v. Jordan, 415 U.S. 651, 662-63 (1974). As the Court previously held 89 , the Plaintiff's claims against the State or State agencies are clearly barred by the Eleventh Amendment. See Feingold v. New York, 366 F.3d 138, 149 (2d Cir. 2004) (Section 1983 claims against states are barred by the Eleventh Amendment absent the state's consent). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/6/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Status Conference held on 6/30/2011. Total Time: 2 hours and 16 minutes(Court Reporter D.SMITH (ECRO).) (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 161 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 7/22/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER. As agreed upon during the June 30, 2011 status conference, the Court sets the following case management deadlines: Defendant will produce all written and physical discovery to Plaintiff by 9/30/11; Plaintiff shall serve written interrogatories on Defendant by 10/30/11; Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories are due by 12/15/11; Defendant will serve discovery requests on Plaintiff by 10/30/11; Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's discovery requests are due by 12/15/11; the parties will complete depositions by 2/28/12; Discovery will close on 2/28/12; Summary Judgment Motions are due by 4/31/12; and Responses to Summary Judgment Motions are due by 6/30/12. If this case survives summary judgment, the Joint Trial Memorandum will be due by 11/14/12 and Jury Selection will take place on 12/4/12 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 143 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. As explained during the status conference on June 30, 2011, defense counsel has an obligation to defend her client's interests in this adversarial proceeding, and her efforts to do so do not warrant the imposition of sanctions. Furthermore, the Plaintiff was unable to point to anything to substantiate his suspicion that defense counsel altered videotapes and audiotapes relevant to his case. To the extent that any videotapes or audiotapes exist that are relevant to the Plaintiff's case and that have not already been produced to him, they will be produced by no later than September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 136 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief. The Plaintiff has not shown that he will suffer irreparable harm absent injunctive relief, and either that he is likely to succeed on the merits or that there are sufficiently serious questions going to the merits to make them a fair ground for litigation and that the balance of hardships tips decidedly in his favor. See Moore v. Consolidated Edison Co. of New York, 409 F.3d 506, 510 (2d Cir. 2005). The Plaintiff merely asserts, without any clarifying facts, that he has been stopped several times by police officers in retaliation for filing this lawsuit. This is insufficient to carry his burden of persuasion to make a clear showing justifying the "extraordinary and drastic" remedy of a preliminary injunction. Mazurek v. Armstrong, 520 U.S. 968, 972 (1997). Moreover, the Plaintiff seeks relief from parties that are not a part of this lawsuit, which involves only claims against Trooper Bourgeois in his individual capacity. See Doc. # 161 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court has previously ruled on this issue numerous times, and found that the appointment of counsel is not warranted because the Plaintiff's position does not seem likely to be of substance, the legal issues issues are not complex, and the Plaintiff has the ability to investigate the facts of this case and present them to the Court. See [Doc. ##13, 52, 96, 112, 116]. Furthermore, the Second Circuit addressed this issue on appeal, and found no abuse of discretion in the Court's denial of Plaintiff's requests for the appointment of counsel. See [Doc. #129] at 13-14. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; 137 Plaintiff's Motion for Order and Request for Production. During the status conference held on June 30, 2011, the Court and the parties agreed upon the scope of discovery that will be conducted in this case. If the parties have a specific discovery dispute, they are instructed to file a brief joint statement outlining the nature of the dispute and both parties positions with respect thereto, and to contact chambers to schedule another status conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of 151 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. As the Court noted in its June 10, 2011 Order, the Defendant is actively defending this case and is not in default under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 134 and 146 Plaintiff's Motions to Amend Complaint. The Court has previously denied identical motions to amend the complaint. See [Doc. ## 89, 100]. As the Court previously explained, this case is restricted to the Plaintiff's traffic stop on October 31, 2005. The case remains open only as to the defendant Trooper, Jeffrey Bourgeois, in his individual capacity. All other defendants have been dismissed from this action. Permitting amendment for the purposes of asserting additional, unrelated claims at this late stage would cause undue delay and would result in substantial prejudice to the Defendant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 133 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs. The Plaintiff's motion for costs is premature because he has not prevailed on the merits of his claims. The Second Circuit expressly stated in its order remanding this case that "[n]o costs are awarded at this time. In the event that Leftridge ultimately prevails on the merits of any of his claims, the district court should award him the costs of the present appeal." [Doc. # 129 ]. Accordingly, the Plaintiff will be awarded the costs of his appeal if he ultimately prevails on the merits of any of his claims in this action. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply re 156 Status Report filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Corriette, M.) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 156 Status Report filed by Connecticut State Trooper. The court grants defendant's motion and is excused from the normal requirement to confer with plaintiff also counsel's client does not need to be present at the status conference scheduled for June 30, 2011 Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/23/11. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA dated 06/16/2011 vacating and remanding the judgment of the district court, re: 122 Notice of Appeal (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of 151 Order on Motion for Default Judgment by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 7/4/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to 133 MOTION for order, 134 MOTION for Leave to File, 135 MOTION to Compel, 136 MOTION for immediate injunctive relief filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 144 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 140 Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions. The Defendant is entitled to file an opposition to the Plaintiffs' motions. The Plaintiff may respond to the Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition by filing a Reply, which is due by June 20, 2011 pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/10/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 147 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 149 Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Default Judgment. The Defendants are actively defending this case, and therefore are not in default under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/10/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 148 Plaintiff's Motion for Exemption from electronic filing. As a pro se party, the Plaintiff is excused from electronic filing pursuant to Local Rule 5(a). In the interests of judicial economy, the Defendant will be permitted to electronically file documents with the Court as stated in Doc. #141. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/10/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental motion for default judgment as to Connecticut State Trooper, et al and defense counsel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Exemption from electronic filing by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 6/27/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 139 MOTION for Leave to File documents electronically filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 140 Memorandum in opposition to 133 MOTION for order, 134 MOTION for Leave to File, 135 MOTION to Compel, 136 MOTION for immediate injunctive relief by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 6/27/2011 (Grady, B.) Modified on 6/13/2011 to fix text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr.Responses due by 6/27/2011 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/05/2011. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 139 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Electronically. Defendants may electronically file documents with the Court accompanied by a certification that a copy of said documents has been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/5/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 133 MOTION for order, 134 MOTION for Leave to File, 135 MOTION to Compel, 136 MOTION for immediate injunctive relief filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Modified on 6/6/2011 to add text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File documents electronically by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for order and request for production by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for immediate injunctive relief by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 6/6/2011 (Grady, B.) Modified on 6/13/2011 to fix text (Grady, B.). (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to compel discovery by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. Responses due by 6/6/2011 (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to re-file 07/30/2008 first amended complaint by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for order by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appearance Pro Se by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. In-person Status Conference set for 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. In light of the Second Circuit's remand of this case, a discovery and pre-filing conference is hereby scheduled for June 30, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ordered to confer and to file a status report by June 23, 2011 delineating any issues on which they seek the Court's guidance, summarizing the status of discovery, and identifying any motions that are contemplated. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/11. (Engel, J.) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA vacating and remanding 122 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 09-2922-cv (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 126 Motion for Reconsideration, as it does not provide any different information than the plaintiff's previous motions, and the plaintiff has already filed a notice of appeal as to the Court's decision not to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/15/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Index to Record on Appeal by Vernon Leftridge re 122 Notice of Appeal, 113 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 116 Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,, 97 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, 37 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Quash, 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, 45 MOTION for directing Plaintiff not to engage in ex parte communications with represented parties Order, Case Stayed, 108 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete Discovery, 83 MOTION for Clarification 76 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion for Conference,, MOTION for Clarification 76 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion for Conference,, MOTION for Clarification 76 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion for Conference,,, 101 MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, 85 MOTION to Quash, 73 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Contempt,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, 92 MOTION for Hearing, 43 Response, 25 MOTION to Compel MOTION for instructing the USM to effectuate service Order, 3 Complaint, 114 MOTION to Compel, 50 MOTION Immediate Injunction, 104 Order on Motion for Order, 63 MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 68 MOTION for Contempt, 30 MOTION for for defendants to respond to subpoena Order MOTION for Contempt MOTION to Compel, 71 MOTION for Immediate Contempt Order, 27 Response, Update Answer Deadline, 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 35 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery MOTION for Leave to File, 72 Order on Motion for Order,, 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss until no set date requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 39 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery MOTION for Leave to File, 11 Summons Returned Executed, 75 MOTION for Pre-filing and Discovery Disputes Conference, 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Expedite, 19 MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 31 Objection, 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, 33 Response, 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion to Strike,, 6 Waiver of Service Unexecuted, 125 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 120 MOTION to Reopen Case, 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, USM Service Papers Sent, 103 MOTION for Immediate Deposition Order, 98 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 48 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 8 Waiver of Service Unexecuted, 121 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, 28 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Stay, 69 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, Order on Motion for Contempt, 59 MOTION for Extension of Time until for one week to comply with court order to produce videotape of traffic stop, 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 65 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,, Order on Motion for Order,, 34 Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion for Contempt,, Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for TRO,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion to Stay, 12 Summons Returned Executed, 57 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 36 MOTION to Quash, 66 MOTION for Extension of Time until for one additional week to comply with court order 52 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Contempt,,,, Order on, 56 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order on Motion for Order, 78 Response, 89 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Conference,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Clarification,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, 17 MOTION to Dismiss, 82 MOTION for Rule 16(a) Scheduling Conference, 81 Objection, 54 MOTION for to Require Defendants to participate in mandatory Rule 26(F) Discovery Conference Order, 46 MOTION for Contempt, USM Service Papers Sent, 44 MOTION for MOTION to Compel, 76 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion for Conference,, 119 Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 107 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Connecticut State Trooper Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, & Connecticut State Police, 51 Objection, 49 Jury Demand, 2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 38 Notice (Other), 80 MOTION for Discovery Disputes Conference, 10 Summons Returned Executed, 53 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CT State Police Internal Affairs Unit, 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to reopen the case, 61 Order on Motion for Conference, Order on Motion for Hearing, 90 MOTION for Immediate Order Compelling an Answer Order, Terminate Motions, 77 MOTION to Compel MOTION for, 84 Response,, 14 Notice of Appearance, 88 MOTION to lift stay, 99 Reply to Response to Motion, 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted, 41 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion,,, Order on Motion for TRO,, 115 Exhibit, 7 Order, 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 124 MOTION for Reconsideration re 119 Order on Motion for Order,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, 102 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 29 Summons Returned Executed, 86 MOTION for to Produce Order, 70 Response, 117 MOTION for Immeditate Order for defndants to pay all of the plaintiff's fees Order, 20 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion to Strike, 58 MOTION for 26(f) Discovery Conference MOTION for Hearing, 112 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, 47 Objection, 106 MOTION for Hearing, 18 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Officer Jeffrey Bourgeois #1283, 126 MOTION for Reconsideration re 125 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, USM Service Info to IFP Plaintiff, 60 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 67 Objection, 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, 110 Objection, 109 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, 96 Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,, Order on Motion for Clarification,,,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, 32 Objection, 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/18/07 to answer complaint 3 Complaint, 55 Notice of Appearance, 64 MOTION for Immediate Order Order, 100 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 22 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 94 MOTION for Clarification 89 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Conference,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Clarification,,,, Order on Motion to Qu, 95 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 62 Objection, 93 MOTION for Clarification 89 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Conference,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Clarification,,,, Order on Motion to Qu, 74 MOTION for to require defendants to participate in 26(f) conference Order, 123 MOTION for Reconsideration re 120 MOTION to Reopen Case, 24 Response, Update Answer Deadline, 52 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Contempt,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, 79 MOTION to Compel. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          2nd MOTION for Reconsideration to Reopen Case re 125 ORDER denying 123 and 124 plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration by Vernon Leftridge. Responses due by 8/3/2009 (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 123 and 124 plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration, as they do not provide any different information than his previous motions. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/9/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 119 Order on Motion for Order by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 7/27/2009 (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 120 MOTION to Reopen Case by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 7/28/2009 (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 121 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 120 Motion to Reopen Case, as the Court already ruled on the issue in Doc. #119. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/2/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Reopen Case by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 7/16/2009 (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 118 Motion for Extension of Time, as the plaintiff has failed to establish that an attorney is on the verge of filing an appearance for him. 117 Motion for the defendant to pay the plaintiff's fees is denied. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/29/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to reopen the case by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Immediate Order for the defendants to pay all of the plaintiff's fees by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The plaintiff filed an exhibit, Doc. # 115 , in which his psychologist confirms that the plaintiff is experiencing anxiety and stress as a result of representing himself in this case. The Court has previously declined to appoint counsel for the plaintiff because his position does not seem likely to be of substance. That ruling remains in effect, but it does not prevent the plaintiff from hiring counsel on his own. If the plaintiff wishes to pursue this case, he may attempt to hire counsel by 6/29/09, and that attorney may then pursue the plaintiff's claims. Given the present circumstances, the case should be administratively closed without prejudice to reopening by an attorney for the plaintiff. 113 Motion for TRO and 114 Motion to Compel are accordingly terminated. The Clerk is directed to administratively CLOSE this file. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/13/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT by Vernon Leftridge re 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel discovery by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 3/3/2009 (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Orders by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 111 Motion to Appoint Counsel; the Court's earlier ruling (Doc. #13) remains in effect. The plaintiff shall follow the instructions in Doc. #109 so that discovery will be completed in a timely manner and motions for summary judgment can then be filed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/10/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Defendant's Objection re 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete Discovery filed by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery shall be completed by 3/9/09 and dispositive motions shall be filed by 4/6/09. 106 Motion for Hearing and 107 Motion for Default Judgment are denied. It appears that the only remaining discovery that the plaintiff wishes to pursue is a deposition of the defendant Trooper. The plaintiff shall read Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30 and 31; Rule 30(d), for instance, explains that a deposition is limited to one day, which means 7 hours. The parties shall schedule the deposition at a mutually convenient time and complete it by 3/9/09. If the plaintiff wishes to pursue any other discovery, he shall provide the Court a specific list by 2/13/09 explaining why the proposed discovery is necessary. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/5/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete Discovery filed by Connecticut State Trooper. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default Judgment as to Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, & Connecticut State Police by Vernon Leftridge. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Immediate Discovery Hearing by Vernon Leftridge. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to complete Discovery by Vernon Leftridge. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 103 plaintiff's Motion to take a deposition of the defendant Trooper, as the Trooper has not objected to the motion. The Court reminds the parties that discovery is due for completion by 1/26/09. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/22/09. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Immediate Deposition Order by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 101 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the previous order, Doc. #100. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/12/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Order on 97 Motion to Amend by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 12/8/2008 (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 97 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. This case is nearly 15 months old, and it is restricted to Mr. Leftridge's traffic stop. The New London Branch of the NAACP would need to obtain an attorney and file a separate case. The Court sets the following deadlines for the present case: Discovery shall be completed by 1/26/09 and summary judgment motions shall be filed by 3/9/09. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/22/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to opposition to 97 MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint filed by Vernon Leftridge. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint filed by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 9/9/2008 (Attachments: # 1 proposed amended complaint, # 2 appearance to be filed after amended complaint)(D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Motions #90 through #95. The plaintiff has not provided any basis upon which the Court should reconsider its previous orders. Despite the plaintiff's representations to the contrary, he has not filed a proposed amended complaint, and, therefore, the Court cannot even consider whether to permit an amendment. The Court does not supervise the discovery process. The parties shall finish the discovery that remains and then move for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/8/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clarification 89 Order on 86 Motion for Order by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification 89 Order on 87 Motion to Amend Complaint by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Hearing by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 87 MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/22/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an Immediate Order Compelling an Answer by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. The defendants Dept. of Public Safety, Conn. State Police Internal Affairs, and Conn. State Police are dismissed because the Eleventh Amendment prohibits the plaintiff from suing them. The case remains open as to the defendant Trooper in his individual capacity. The Court has considered only the pleadings, and not the videotape, in issuing this order. The Trooper may raise any arguments previously raised, such as qualified immunity, on a motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff's numerous motions, 77 , 79 , 80 , 82 , 83 , 85 , 86 , 87 , and 88 are moot, duplicative, or unnecessary, and they do not require rulings in light of the order on the motion to dismiss. The Court notes that 87 Motion to Amend does not state what amendment is sought, and it is therefore denied as incomplete. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/30/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to lift stay by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/20/2008 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend 3 Complaint by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/20/2008 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Produce by Vernon Leftridge. (S-Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash 17 Motion to Dismiss by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/12/2008 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 76 ORDER finding as moot 73 Motion to Modify Order, as the defendants have produced a videotape and therefore represent that it contains all material in their possession that is related to the plaintiff. 74 Motion for Order regarding the Rule 26(f) conference is denied for the reason previously given twice before in Docs. #56 and 61. 75 Motion for Conference is denied for lack of specificity and because this Chambers does not hold "pre-filing conferences" in any cases. The plaintif f shall focus his attention on preparing his response to the videotape and filing the response within 30 days. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/08 filed by Vernon Leftridge. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Clarification of 76 ORDER finding as moot 73 Motion to Modify Order, as the defendants have produced a videotape and therefore represent that it contains all material in their possession that is related to the plaintiff. 74 Motion for Order regarding the Rule 26(f) conference is denied for the reason previously given twice before in Docs. #56 and 61. 75 Motion for Conference is denied for lack of specificity and because this Chambers does not hold "pre-filing conferences" in any cases. The plaintiff shall focus his attention on preparing his response to the videotape and filing the response within 30 days. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/08. by Vernon Leftridge. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Rule 16(a) Scheduling Conference by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/12/2008 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Defendants videotape received filed by Vernon Leftridge. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery Disputes Conference by Vernon Leftridge. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel discovery by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/11/2008 (Blue, A.) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Videotape filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order and MOTION to Compel (Responses due by 8/8/2008, ) by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 73 Motion to Modify Order, as the defendants have produced a videotape and therefore represent that it contains all material in their possession that is related to the plaintiff. 74 Motion for Order regarding the Rule 26(f) conference is denied for the reason previously given twice before in Docs. #56 and 61. 75 Motion for Conference is denied for lack of specificity and because this Chambers does not hold "pre-filing conferences" in any cases. The plaintiff shall focus his attention on preparing his response to the videotape and filing the response within 30 days. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pre-filing and Discovery Disputes Conferences by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to require defendants to participate in 26(f) conference by Vernon Leftridge. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify 52 Order by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 8/1/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re: Motion 71 . Although the Court understands that the plaintiff is concerned about receiving a complete videotape containing all material relating to him, that issue would be more appropriately raised after he receives and views the videotape. If it contains all of the material that the plaintiff expects it to contain, then there is no issue. At this time, neither the plaintiff nor the Court has viewed the videotape. Pursuant to Doc. #52, after the plaintiff receives the videotape, he has up to 30 days to file one response containing all issues that he wishes to raise regarding the videotape. Thereafter, the Court may rule on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/10/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Immediate Contempt Order by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION re 66 MOTION for Extension of Time until for one additional week to comply with court order 52 Order filed by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time. The videotape is due 7/15/08. 68 Motion for Contempt is denied; the defendants' request for an extension of time is reasonable because only one month has passed since the Court ordered the production of the videotape. On the basis of the defendants' request, the Court anticipates that no further request for additional time is likely to be made. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/9/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Contempt by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 7/30/2008 (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re 66 MOTION for Extension of Time until for one additional week to comply with court order 52 Order filed by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time for one additional week to comply with court order 52 Order by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re: Motions 63 and 64 : It is typical for parties to request extensions of time, and the Court routinely grants them. The Court has given both the plaintiff and the defendants extensions of time in this case. The Court understood the defendants' last request, Doc. # 59 , to be for the purpose of producing a videotape containing all material related only to the plaintiff. The Court's order, Doc. #52, obligates the defendants to produce a videotape with all material that relates only to the plaintiff, not to other people. The current deadline for the defendants to comply with that order is 7/8/08. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/7/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Immediate Order by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Order on Motion for Extension of Time and Motion to Modify re 52 Order by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 7/22/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) Modified on 7/7/2008 (S-D'Onofrio, B.). (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION re 59 MOTION for Extension of Time until for one week to comply with court order to produce videotape of traffic stop filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 58 Motion regarding Rule 26(f) conference, for the reasons previously given in Doc. #56. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time for the defendants to produce the videotape, until 7/8/08. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time for one week to comply with court order to produce videotape of traffic stop by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for 26(f) Discovery Conference and MOTION for Initial Discovery Hearing by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Vernon J. Leftridge, Jr. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 53 Motion for Default Judgment, as the defendants' attorney has formally indicated in Doc. # 55 that she represents all four of the defendants that the plaintiff named. 54 Motion to require defendants to participate in a Rule 26(f) conference is denied at this time, pending the ruling on 17 Motion to Dismiss; if that motion is denied, then the defendants must participate in the conference at that time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/16/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Murphy-Osborne on behalf of Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for to Require Defendants to participate in mandatory Rule 26(F) Discovery Conference Order by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to CT State Police Internal Affairs Unit by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Considering the plaintiff's filings in the light most favorable to him, the Court concludes that he is requesting the videotape of his traffic stop for the purpose of defending against the 17 Motion to Dismiss, and the Court therefore permits him to discover the videotape for that limited purpose. The defendants shall provide one copy of the videotape to the plaintiff and one copy to the Court by 7/1/08. The plaintiff may then file one response regarding the content of the videotape not later than 30 days after he receives it. No other discovery is permitted at this time. 42 Motion for Reconsideration of order denying appointment of counsel is denied. 45 Defendants' motion is granted; the plaintiff shall direct his communications to the defendants' attorney. To the extent that the plaintiff's other motions 44 , 46 , and 50 seek other forms of relief, they are denied at this time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/10/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re 48 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 46 MOTION for Contempt filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For Immediate Injunction by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 6/30/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 46 MOTION for Contempt filed by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to 45 MOTION for Order directing Plaintiff not to engage in ex parte communications with represented parties filed by Vernon Leftridge. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Contempt by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 6/24/2008 (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for directing Plaintiff not to engage in ex parte communications with represented parties Order by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Immediate Order & MOTION to Compel (Responses due by 6/20/2008, ) by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 6/17/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The plaintiff must file any further response to 17 Motion to Dismiss by 5/30/08. That is the final extension, and it is granted only because the plaintiff may not have received timely notice of Doc. #37. Despite that problem, the Court notes that the plaintiff previously had numerous opportunities to respond to the motion to dismiss, and yet the Court is granting one more. To the extent that Motions 39 and 40 seek other forms of relief, they are denied at this time for the reason given in Doc. #34. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss, and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery (Responses due by 5/27/2008, ), MOTION for Immediate Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Document responding to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent to Electronic Notice by Pro Se Litigant by Vernon Leftridge (Grady, B.) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 35 Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery; granting 35 Motion for Leave to File; and denying 36 Motion to Quash the motion to dismiss. If the plaintiff has any further response to 17 Motion to Dismiss, he must file it no later than 4/14/08. Further requests for extensions of time or permission for leave to file will not be granted in connection with the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/31/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash (with Objection to) 17 Motion to Dismiss by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 4/14/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery (Responses due by 4/7/2008, ), MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion to Quash and to Stay Discovery. The law requires the Court to focus on the defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss at this time. In order to ensure that the case proceeds in an orderly fashion, discovery should not go forward until the Court has sufficient time to rule on the motion to dismiss. The plaintiff's Motions 23 , 25 , and 30 are accordingly denied at this time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/5/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 28 MOTION to Stay filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION re 28 MOTION to Quash filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order for defendants to respond to subpoena, MOTION for Contempt (Responses due by 3/24/2008, ), MOTION to Compel (Responses due by 3/24/2008, ) by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vernon Leftridge. Connecticut State Trooper served on 2/19/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Subpoena, MOTION to Stay Discovery by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police.Responses due by 3/17/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR- MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Order for service by Vernon Leftridge. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) Modified on 2/25/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.). (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Discovery & an Anwer (Responses due by 2/18/2008, ), MOTION for an Order instructing the USM to effectuate service by Vernon Leftridge. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 20 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion to Strike, 22 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 2/8/2008), and/or MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. The defendant Trooper has in fact responded to the complaint because the Trooper has filed a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/15/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a), Order on Motion to Strike, by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 2/4/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 18 Motion for Default Entry 55(a), as the defendants have filed a motion to dismiss and therefore need not file an answer at this time. 19 Motion to Strike is denied. If the plaintiff wishes to file a further response to the defendants' motion to dismiss, the current deadline is 1/8/08, but the plaintiff may file a motion for additional time if he wishes. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/4/08. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Vernon Leftridge.Responses due by 1/21/2008 (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Jeffrey Bourgeois Officer #1283 by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police.Responses due by 1/8/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants shall respond to the complaint by 12/18/07. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/07. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/18/07 to respond to 3 Complaint by Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Murphy-Osborne on behalf of Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court determines that the plaintiff's position does not seem likely to be of substance. Furthermore, the legal issues are not complex and the plaintiff has demonstrated in his filings that he is able to investigate the facts of the case and present them to the Court. See Hodge v. Police Officers, 802 F.2d 58, 61-62 (2d Cir. 1986). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/1/07. (Wilson, J.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vernon Leftridge. Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit served on 9/7/2007, answer due 9/27/2007. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Department of Public Safety, served on 9/7/2007, answer due 9/27/2007 by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vernon Leftridge. Connecticut State Police served on 9/7/2007, answer due 9/27/2007. (D'Onofrio, B.) Modified on 9/19/07 to correct service made upon (D'Onofrio, B.). (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Returned Unexecuted by Vernon Leftridge as to Connecticut State Trooper, Officer #1283. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to CT State Trooper, Officer #1283, filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: Judges Chambers Practices and Standing Orders. Counsel/Parties please see attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/6/07. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Dept of Public Safety, State Police and Internal Affairs, filed by Vernon Leftridge. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon Leftridge. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/31/07.Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2007.,Discovery due by 1/30/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2008. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/07. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Connecticut State Trooper, Dept of Public Safety, Connecticut State Police Internal Affairs Unit, Connecticut State Police, filed by Vernon Leftridge.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/31/07. (Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 295 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 275 Motion to Compel Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 277 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 280 Motion for Contempt; denying 280 Motion for Sanctions; de nying 282 Motion for Order; denying 284 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 284 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 284 Motion for Sanctions; denying 287 Motion to Stay; denying 293 Motion for Order. See ATTACHED ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on March 13, 2012. (Slitt, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vernon Leftridge. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?