Round Rock Research LLC v. Fruit of the Loom Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01240
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 11:03 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Berrebi jberrebi@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Todd Hohenthaner +1 212 446 4832 +1 212 446 4900 jhohenthaner@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Fruit Of The Loom, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE 41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. (nms) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: On or before January 6, 2015, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in this Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/16/14. (cak) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORAL ORDER: If parties anticipate a problem with selected scheduling dates, they should jointly contact the Court with their concerns. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2015. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/12/2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2016. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 10/16/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/18/2015, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. The first five day Jury Trial is set for 9/19/2016, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
              PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 12/16/2014 (nms). (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: The Stay is continued until December 8, 2014,. Any unsettled cases are reopened as of December 8, 2014. Parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule no later than December 15, 2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 1:12-cv-00362-RGA(nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORAL ORDER: The Stay is Continued until 11/21/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                            STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Chiu as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fruit of the Loom Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter. It is further Ordered that the parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexaminations are complete and the stays should be lifted so that the cases may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Granting (19 in 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA, 21 in 1:11-cv-01238-RGA, 16 in 1:11-cv-01245-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01237-RGA, 20 in 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 26 in 1:11-cv-01243-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 29 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 12 in 1:12-cv-00309-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Pleadings and to Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                              Joint STIPULATION To Amend Pleadings and To Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit by Amazon.com Inc., V F Corporation, Gap Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc., American Apparel Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., Fruit of the Loom Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings Inc., Hanesbrands Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Defendant's March 30, 2012 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Response to Court's Request for Additional Case Law - re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: # 1 Elan case)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Official Transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on 03-28-12 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2012. (lad) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Request for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference Set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 3/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Fruit of the Loom Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc.. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Fruit of the Loom Inc... (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/1/2012. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc.. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to February 13, 2012 - filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc.. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, Jason Berrebi, and Eugene Chiu of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terry L. Clark - filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc.. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Fruit of the Loom, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint to February 6, 2012 - filed by Fruit of the Loom Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Fruit of the Loom Inc. served on 12/15/2011, answer due 1/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E;. (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Fruit of the Loom Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-991628.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 472 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?