Fraserside IP LLC v. Kovalchuk

Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-03040
District Judge Mark W Bennett, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mark W Bennett
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 12:54 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fraserside Ip LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Lorin Belville +1 480 203 5861 +1 602 297 6953 cbelville@azbar.org
v.
No Logo Igor Kovalchuk, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Law Offices of James C. Nemmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Constance M Alt +1 319 365 9461 +3658 365 365 8443 cma@shuttleworthlaw.com

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Marc Fray-Witzer +1 617 426 0000 +5078 507 507 8043 evan@cfwlegal.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Docket Annotation
AO 121 form mailed to Register of Copyrights with a copy of 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 23 Judgment (des) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Docket Annotation
AO 120 form mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 23 Judgment (des) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Judgment*
JUDGMENT in favor of Igor Kovalchuk, John Doe Companies 1-100, John Does 1-100 against Fraserside IP LLC. Plaintiff take nothing and this action is dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2012. (des) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss and denying Frasersides request for jurisdictional discovery. Judgment shall enter accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/5/2012. (des) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Granting 20 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadline: Scheduling Report ddl 03/01/2012. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 01/17/12. (kfs) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 UNRESISTED MOTION
UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fraserside IP LLC (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Resistance to Motion
RESISTANCE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibits J-M, # 11 Exhibit N) (filed by clerk pursuant to 18 Order) (des) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Overlength BriefCourt Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Resistance to 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/9/2012. (clerk to file documents attached to 16 Motion) (des) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Igor Kovalchuk re 14 MOTION to Dismiss - Partial Withdrawal (Rinden, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief
Motion for Leave to file overlength in RESISTANCE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Resistance to Motion To Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibits J through M, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit G) (Belville, Chad) Modified on 11/28/2011 to update text. (src) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Affidavit
DOCKETED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT re 14 MOTION to Dismiss of Igor Kovalchuk by Igor Kovalchuk (Fray-Witzer, Evan) Modified on 11/14/2011 to remove link and attach to motion at docket no. 14. Attorney's office notified. (djs). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Igor Kovalchuk Responses due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit TRO, # 3 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction, # 4 Exhibit Purported Assignment 1, # 5 Exhibit Purported Assignment 2, # 6 Exhibit Purported Assignment 3, # 7 Exhibit Purported Assignment 4, # 8 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties, # 9 Exhibit Default Memo in XonDemand, # 10 Exhibit Tucker Declaration) (Fray-Witzer, Evan) Modified on 11/14/2011 to change text (djs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2011: # 11 Affidavit) (djs). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
ORDER Granting 11 and 12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Evan Fray-Witzer and Valentin David Gurvits are admitted to practice in the Northern District of Iowa for the purpose of trying the above-captioned matter on behalf of Defendant Igor Kovalchuk. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2011. (des) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Valentin David Gurvits Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1297338) by Defendant Igor Kovalchuk (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing (Gurvits), # 2 ECF Form (Gurvits)) (Alt, Constance) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Evan Fray-Witzer Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-1297330) by Defendant Igor Kovalchuk (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing (Fray-Witzer), # 2 ECF Form (Fray-Witzer)) (Alt, Constance) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 UNRESISTED MOTION
FILED IN ERROR - UNRESISTED Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Igor Kovalchuk (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing-Fray-Witzer, # 2 ECF form-Fray-Witzer) (Alt, Constance) Modified on 10/31/2011, atty called this was filed in error, will refile (skm). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Constance M Alt on behalf of Igor Kovalchuk (Alt, Constance) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fraserside IP LLC. Igor Kovalchuk served on 10/20/2011, answer due 11/10/2011. (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2011, Entered: 8/28/2011 Disclosure Statement LR 7.1
PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Fraserside IP LLC (Belville, Chad) (Entered: 08/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Amended Complaint
AMENDED Complaint and jury demand against All Defendants, filed by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3) (Belville, Chad) Modified text on 8/29/2011 (des). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Docket Annotation
AO 121 form mailed to Register of Copyrights with copy of the complaint and documents in support. (src) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Docket Annotation
AO 120 form mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with a copy of the complaint and all attachments. (src) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to John Doe Companies 1-100, John Does 1-100, Moniker Privacy Services. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 New Civil Case Packet) (src) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-1261262) filed by Fraserside IP LLC. Scheduling Report Ddl due 1/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Compete.com analysis of site showing average daily visitors, # 3 Exhibit Alexa Ranking for DrTuber, # 4 Exhibit WhoIs showing registered owner of DrTuber.com) (Belville, Chad) Modified on 8/25/2011 to update text. (src) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Notice of New Case Filing
NOTICE of New Case Filing by Fraserside IP LLC. No conflicts identified with MWB/PAZ, parties and Attorney Belville. (src) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 154 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?