Polinovsky et al v. British Airways PLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00779
District Judge Ruben Castillo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ilona Polinovsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vladimir M. Gorokhovsky gorlawoffice@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Herrera +1 312 276 3418 +1 312 782 4485 dherrera@caffertyclobes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Winter Sprengel +1 734 769 2144 +1 734 769 2144 jsprengel@caffertyfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hank Bates +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 hbates@cauleybowman.com
No Logo Pavel Polinovsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vladimir M. Gorokhovsky gorlawoffice@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Herrera +1 312 276 3418 +1 312 782 4485 dherrera@caffertyclobes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Winter Sprengel +1 734 769 2144 +1 734 769 2144 jsprengel@caffertyfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hank Bates +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 hbates@cauleybowman.com
v.
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Usair Group, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony U. Battista +1 212 490 1900 +1 212 370 4453 abattista@condonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent R. Austin +1 312 372 2000

Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

No Logo International Airlines Group, S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent R. Austin +1 312 372 2000

Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 1/31/2012 and continued to 4/5/2012 at 09:00 a.m. In light of defendants' motion to dismiss 24 pending before the District Court, discovery is hereby stayed.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 12/21/2011 and continued to 1/31/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Status hearing held on 12/21/2011. The Court will rule by mail on the pending motion to dismiss.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by British Airways in support of British Airways PLC's Motion to dismiss PLC 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P)(Christensen, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 12/20/2011 (ea, ). (Entered: 12/19/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:This case is set for a status on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM. Counsel are specifically requested to address the following issue: why this Court should not fully adopt Judge Lefkow's Giannopoulos opinion and deny the pending motion to dismiss 24 .Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan: Status hearing set for 11/29/2011 is stricken and reset to 12/21/2011 at 09:00 a.m. Out-of-town counsel are granted leave to participate by phone.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 10/25/2011 and continued to 11/29/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Status hearing held and continued to 10/25/2011 at 9:30 a.m. Out-of-town counsel are granted leave to participatetelephonically. Defendants oral motion to stay discovery is entered and continued pending the district courtsruling on defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint 24 .Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Joseph Henry "Han Bates, III of Change of Address (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:The following cases are consolidated and referred with the above case for discovery supervision only:(1) Giannopoulos, et al v Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A., et al, No. 11 C 775 (Lefkow, J); (2)Polinovsky v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG, No. 11 C 780 (Coleman, J.); (3) Volodarskiy, et al v Delta Airlines,Inc, No. 11 C 782 (Chang, J.); (4) Gurevich v. Compagnia Aereas Italiana, SPA, No. 11 C 1890 (Coleman,J.). These cases are also placed into the Seventh Circuit E-Discovery Pilot Program. The Courttherefore will apply the standing order relating to the discovery of electronically stored information("ESI") (available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov). [ For further details see text below.]Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 7/13/2011 and continued to 9/20/2011 at 09:30 a.m. Out-of-town counsel are granted leave to participate by phone for status. Detailed order to follow. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Out-of-town counsel are granted leave to participate by phone for the initial status hearing set for 07/13/11 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                          STATUS Report Supplemental Joint Status Report by Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Out-of-town counsel is granted leave to participate by phone for the 07/13/11 status hearing.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Initial status hearing set for 7/13/2011 at 09:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Nolan in Courtroom 1858. Counsel shall file and deliver a copy of an initial status report to chambers, Room 1870, at least three (3) business days before the initial status conference. If counsel have recently prepared and filed an initial status report, the submission of a previously filed initial status report to chambers is sufficient. If applicable, counsel shall present a completed Agreed Scheduling Order, which is available on this Courts web page, at the initial status conference. Counsel are expected to follow Judge Nolans Case Management Procedures and be familiar with Important Discovery Information posted on her web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Judges.aspx), including The Sedona Conference Cooperation Proclamation and the Seventh Circuit Electronic Discovery Pilot Programs Principles Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky by Daniel O. Herrera (Herrera, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                  REPLY by Defendant British Airways PLC to motion to dismiss 24 (Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Plaintiffs' motion for reassignment in Case No. 11 C 775 [#14] under LR 40.4 is denied. The following cases are consolidated with this case for pretrial preparation only: (1) Polinovsky v. British Airways PLC, No. 11 C 779 (Castillo, J.); (2) Polinovsky v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG, No. 11 C 780 (Coleman, J.); (3) Volodarskiy v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., No. 11 C 782 (Chang, J.); and (4) Gurevich v. Compagnia Aereas Italiana, SPA, No. 11 C 1890 (Coleman, J.). The cases are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Nan Nolan to supervise discovery with the assistance of other designated magistrate judges as she sees fit. The cases also appear to be appropriate for inclusion in the Seventh Circuit E-Discovery Pilot Project. See http://www.7thcircuitbar.org/displaycommon.cfm?an=1&subarticlenbr=109.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, for reasons of judicial efficiency, coordinated pretrial proceedings in the cases listed below should be presided over by a single district judge and that a single magistrate judge should be designated for these cases; and It further appearing that the Hon. Joan H. Lefkow, the judge to whom 11 C 775, Giannopoulos vs. Iberia, the lowest-numbered of these cases, is assigned, has agreed to preside over these proceedings; and It further appearing that Magistrate Nan R. Nolan is the designated magistrate judge in 11 C 775; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Lefkow shall preside over pretrial proceedings in the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Nolan shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases, and that these cases are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Nolan for discovery supervision. It is further ordered that these cases shall remain pending on the calendars of the judges to whom they are currently assigned, and that an order be entered in each case by Judge Lefkow at such time as coordinated pretrial proceedings have concluded. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/20/2011. Mailed Notice (td, )(td, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE by Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovskyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant British Airways PLC to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages 29 is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a 25 page brief. Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Winter Sprengel for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 29 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/1/2011 at 09:45 AM. (Sprengel, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits (Sprengel, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Motion hearing held on 5/11/2011. Plaintiffs' response to defendant British Airways PLC's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 24 is due on or before 6/10/2011. Defendant's reply will be due on or before 6/24/2011. The Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 5/24/2011 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by British Airways PLC (Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM by British Airways PLC in support of motion to dismiss 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - O)(Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Defendant British Airways PLC to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Christopher R. Christensen for presentment of before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/11/2011 at 09:45 AM. (Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant British Airways PLC's unopposed motion for leave to exceed page limits 18 is granted. Motion hearing set for 5/10/2011 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant British Airways PLC by Michael J Holland (Holland, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant British Airways PLC by Anthony U. Battista (Battista, Anthony) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Brent R. Austin for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 18 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/10/2011 at 09:45 AM. (Austin, Brent) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by Defendant British Airways PLC for leave to file excess pages (UNOPPOSED) (Austin, Brent) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties' Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendant International Airlines Group, S.A. 15 is granted. Defendant International Airlines Group, S.A. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs. The statute of limitations for the claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendant International Airlines Group, S.A. in this action shall be tolled for two (2) years from the date of the filing of the stipulation. Mailed notice (tlm) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants British Airways PLC, International Airlines Group, S.A. by Christopher R. Christensen (Christensen, Christopher) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal (Austin, Brent) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Motion hearing held on 3/9/2011. Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time for defendants to answer or otherwise plead 12 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint on or before 5/6/2011. The parties are directed to hold their Rule 26(f) conference by 5/13/2011. The parties' joint status report will be due on or before 5/20/2011. Status hearing reset to 5/24/2011 at 9:45 AM. Status hearing set for 3/31/2011 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Brent R. Austin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 12 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 3/9/2011 at 09:45 AM. (Austin, Brent) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION by Defendants British Airways PLC, International Airlines Group, S.A. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Austin, Brent) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants British Airways PLC, International Airlines Group, S.A. by Brent R. Austin (Austin, Brent) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants British Airways PLC, International Airlines Group, S.A. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants British Airways PLC, International Airlines Group, S.A. by Michael Lee McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky regarding Complaint served on International Airlines Group, S.A., on 2/23/11 (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky regarding Complaint served on CT Corporation System on behalf of British Airways, PLC on 2/23/11 (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance by Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky by Vladimir Gorokhovsky. (ea, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky by Jennifer Winter Sprengel (Sprengel, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo: Parties to file a joint status report on or before 3/28/2011. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 3/31/2011 at 9:45 AM.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ilona Polinovsky, Pavel Polinovsky by Joseph Henry Bates (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Pavel Polinovsky, Ilona Polinovsky; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5672457. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 341 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?