ForeSee Results, Inc. v. Lodsys, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-03886
District Judge Ronald A. Guzman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:42 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Foresee Results, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Emil Shanahan +1 212 895 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Edward Bachtell +1 312 984 7727 +1 312 984 7700 bbachtell@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Gargano +1 312 984 7733 +1 312 984 7700 jgargano@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Allen Hawkins +1 312 984 7764 +1 312 984 7700 bhawkins@mwe.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Flachsbart +1 312 551 9500 +1 312 551 9501 wwf@fg-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 624 6800 +1 206 374 7095 goldfarb@pypfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. La Porte +1 312 201 2720 +8 312 201 2555
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Eastern District of Wisconsin the electronic record.(vmj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue to [42,45] is granted. It is hereby ordered that Clerk of Court is to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Any pending motions or schedules are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Motion by Brent Allen Hawkins for presentment of motion to change venue 45 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/27/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. to change venue Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
          Proposed Order by Lodsys, LLC (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by William W. Flachsbart for presentment of motion to change venue 42 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/27/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to change venue (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 10/13/11 is stricken. For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court denies without prejudice the parties' stipulated motion for entry of protective order 39 . Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Motion by Brent Allen Hawkins for presentment of motion for protective order 39 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/13/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. for protective order Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 9/22/2011. Joint motion for Extension of Time to Take Jurisdictional Discovery 35 is granted to and including 10/17/11. Status hearing reset to 11/4/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273158. of Christopher M. Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC 33 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273171. for attorney Michael A. Goldfarb by attorney Christopher Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC 34 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Motion by Brent Allen Hawkins for presentment of extension of time 35 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. for extension of time Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Take Jurisdictional Discovery (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273171. for attorney Michael A. Goldfarb by attorney Christopher Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC (Huck, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/12/2011.) (hp, ). (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273158. of Christopher M. Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 7/26/2011. Motion by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. for Leave to Take Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue 29 is granted as to personal jurisdiction discovery only. Status hearing reset to 9/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lodsys, LLC by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Motion by Brent Allen Hawkins for presentment of motion for discovery 29 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Minute entry dated 7/20/11 [doc. 27 ] is corrected as follows: Notice of motion set for 7/21/11 is stricken. Joint motion for extension of time for Local Patent Rule Deadlines 25 is granted. Due date for Local Patent Rule 2.1 Initial Disclosures is fourteen (14) days after Lodsys files its Answers; provided, however, if Lodsys asserts a counterclaim against ForeSee Results, Inc., the parties have fourteen (14) days after the latest date on which ForeSee Results, Inc. may file its answer to that counterclaim. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 7/21/11 is stricken. Joint motion for extension of time for Local Patent Rule Deadlines 25 is granted. Due date for Local Patent Rule 2.1 Initial Disclosures is fourteen (14) days after Lodsys files its Answers; provided, however, if Lodsys asserts a counterclaim against LivePerson, the parties have fourteen (14) days after the latest date on which LivePerson may file its answer to that counterclaim. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Motion by Brent Allen Hawkins for presentment of extension of time 25 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. for extension of time Local Patent Rule Deadlines (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 7/12/11 is stricken. Motion by Movant The New York Times Company to reassign cases 11 C 4004, 11 C 4088, and 11 C 4015 (Unopposed) 21 is granted. Briefing schedule on motion by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 14 is vacated. Court will set a consolidated briefing schedule for all motions after the cases are reassigned. Mailed notice (cjg, ) Modified on 7/11/2011 (cjg, ). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Motion by James R. Figliulo for presentment of motion to reassign case 21 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/12/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Figliulo, James) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM by The New York Times Company in support of motion to reassign case 21 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Figliulo, James) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Movant The New York Times Company to reassign case (Unopposed) (Figliulo, James) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6078837. (Shanahan, Michael) 8 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 7/7/11 is stricken. Set deadlines as to motion by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 14 : Responses due by 7/27/2011. Replies due by 8/10/2011. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                              RULE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 Disclosure Statement by Lodsys, LLC (La Porte, Michael) (Docket Text Modified on 7/6/2011.) (hp, ). (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. La Porte for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 14 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/7/2011 at 09:30 AM. (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Lodsys, LLC in Support of MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 14 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Small Declaration)(La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Lodsys, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 14 (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lodsys, LLC by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ForeSee Results, Inc.. Lodsys, LLC waiver sent on 6/9/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 8/8/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lodsys, LLC (hp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6078837. (Shanahan, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. by Jeffrey R. Gargano (Gargano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 other
                                                                                    LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE by ForeSee Results, Inc. of Claims Involving a Patent Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 (Hawkins, Brent) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/8/2011.) (hp, ). (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                                                                                      NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ForeSee Results, Inc. (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. by Brett Edward Bachtell (Bachtell, Brett) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ForeSee Results, Inc. by Brent Allen Hawkins (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 civil cover sheet
                                                                                            CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by ForeSee Results, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6076348. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 5,999,908, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,133,834, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 7,222,078, # 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent 7,620,565, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hawkins, Brent) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?