Tortorella v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10054
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 2:36 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph P. Murphy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weston Patrick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Shek +1 617 742 9310 +1 617 742 5734 jrs@wpwr.com
No Logo Louis P. Tortorella, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weston Patrick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Shek +1 617 742 9310 +1 617 742 5734 jrs@wpwr.com
No Logo Steven M. Littlefield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weston Patrick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Shek +1 617 742 9310 +1 617 742 5734 jrs@wpwr.com
No Logo Wayne Gutierrez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weston Patrick, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Shek +1 617 742 9310 +1 617 742 5734 jrs@wpwr.com
v.
No Logo Brigadier General Oliver J. Mason, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Donovan +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 brian.m.donovan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean M. Kelley +1 774 455 7303 +1 774 455 7310 jkelley@umassp.edu
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Donovan +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 brian.m.donovan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean M. Kelley +1 774 455 7303 +1 774 455 7310 jkelley@umassp.edu
No Logo David M. Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Francis J. Harvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Governor Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Donovan +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 brian.m.donovan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean M. Kelley +1 774 455 7303 +1 774 455 7310 jkelley@umassp.edu
No Logo Leonard Samorowski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Martin J. Benison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Donovan +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 brian.m.donovan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean M. Kelley +1 774 455 7303 +1 774 455 7310 jkelley@umassp.edu
No Logo Massachusetts National Guard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Donovan +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 brian.m.donovan@state.ma.us
No Logo Secretary of Defense Donald H. Rumsfeld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
Response by Louis P. Tortorella to 75 Memorandum & ORDER,. (Shek, John) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer, ENTERED. "....The claims against the United States will otherwise be TRANSFERRED to the Court of Federal Claims. The claims against the Commonwealth of MA are DISMISSED. The Clerk will, however, retain the case on the court's docket for sixty (60) days pending the report of plaintiffs' counsel."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
      MOTION to Transfer Case by United States of America.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
        BRIEF by United States of America (Supplemental). (Attachments: # 1 Suburban Mortgage Associates, Inc. v. U.S. Dept. of Housing & Urban Development, 480 F.3d 1116 (Fed. Cir. 2007))(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Motion re 71 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by all plaintiffs. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by United States of America.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/19/2007, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of J Shek re 69 Status Report & Mtn to Certify Class, Etc. by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 02/19/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT (Sixth) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeanne E. Fay Palumbo)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                  Response by Louis P. Tortorella to 66 Notice (Other). (Shek, John) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                    First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Louis P. Tortorella.(Driscoll, Constance) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 66 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by United States of America Regarding Monies Owed to the Named Plaintiffs and of the Government's Willingness to Make Such Payments (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER On Fifth Status Report of the United States, entered. "Sixth and final status report will be filed by 2/16/07. Hearing will be convened on 2/21/07 @ 12:00 noon in Courtroom 2..."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT (Fifth) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Jeanne E. Fay Palumbo)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                            Plaintiffs' Response by Louis P. Tortorella to 62 Status Report (Fourth). (Shek, John) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT (Fourth) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Jeanne E. Fay Palumbo)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                Opposition re 57 MOTION to Seal Document Regarding Plaintiffs & Cross Mtn to Rescind Order filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                  Plaintiffs' Response by Louis P. Tortorella to Defs' 3rd Status Report. (Shek, John) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/06 to File Resp to Third Status Rep by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by United States of America re 56 Status Report, of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott W. Geer, First Lieutenant, United States Army)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Seal Document Regarding Plaintiffs by United States of America.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                          STATUS REPORT (Third) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Head Count Fiscal Year 2002# 2 Exhibit Head Count Fiscal Year 2003# 3 Exhibit Head Count Fiscal Year 2004# 4 Exhibit Head Count Fiscal Year 2005# 5 Exhibit Head Count Fiscal Year 2006# 6 Exhibit Final Head Count# 7 Exhibit Payments Made To Date# 8 Exhibit Payments Mailed November 13, 2006# 9 Exhibit Payments Mailed November 15, 2006)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Memorandum and Order entered.(Giannotti, Diane) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                              Plaintiffs' Response by Louis P. Tortorella to 53 Status Report. (Shek, John) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                STATUS REPORT (Second) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott W. Geer)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph P. Murphy,, Louis P. Tortorella,, Wayne Gutierrez,, Steven M. Littlefield, "Motion for Preliminary Injunction DENIED....case STAYED."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Opposition re 48 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) filed by all plaintiffs. (Shek, John) (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 39 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott W. Geer, First Lieutenant, United States Army)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts National Guard. (Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts National Guard.(Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Opposition re 39 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts National Guard. (Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Opposition re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts National Guard. (Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs. (Shek, John) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Response by Louis P. Tortorella to 43 Status Report. (Shek, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT of the United States by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott W. Geer# 2 DA Form 1351-2)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on August 4, 2006 before Judge Stearns. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-0370 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 39 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed). (Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) filed by all plaintiffs. (Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) by all plaintiffs.(Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all plaintiffs. (Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiffs SPC Jos. P. Murphy by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by all plaintiffs.(Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing by all plaintiffs.(Shek, John) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER In Temporary Stay, ENTERED. "The United States is ORDERED to provide the court with a status report on the progress of the audit within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order and each thirty (30) days thereafter(if necessary) as ordered by the court...Plaintiffs will be served with copies of the status reports and may submit comments, if any, within ten (10) days of each filing."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jean M. Kelley (Kelley, Jean) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order filed by United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Appendix - Mat.'s Referenced in Pl.'s Opposition Memoranda) filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Lavigne, Bruce in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Littlefield, SGT Steven in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Gutierrez, Wayne - Affiant) filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/7/2006 to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order by United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr. (Kelley, Jean) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Opposition re 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order filed by Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr. (Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr.(Kelley, Jean) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr.(Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, AND Motion to STAY (with Assent) by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay re 9 MOTION to Certify Class, 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order by United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas A. Devine# 2 Declaration of Carl W.S. Chun)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski.(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Quinlivan on behalf of United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Leonard Samorowski (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis P. Tortorella re 7 Amended Complaint, 8 Amended Complaint, 9 MOTION to Certify Class, 10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order, 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION Document Preservation Order filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION Document Preservation Order by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of counsel in Support re 9 MOTION to Certify Class (Delaration of Counsel) filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) Modified on 3/6/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Certify Class by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against all defendants, filed by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            (Notice) against all defendants, filed by Louis P. Tortorella.of filing amended complaint (Shek, John) Modified on 3/6/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Louis P. Tortorella, Wayne Gutierrez, Joseph P. Murphy, Steven M. Littlefield. Acknowledgement filed by Louis P. Tortorella, Wayne Gutierrez, Joseph P. Murphy, Steven M. Littlefield. (Attachments: # 1)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Donovan on behalf of Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr (Donovan, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jean M. Kelley on behalf of Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Oliver J. Mason, Jr (Kelley, Jean) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Constance Driscoll (Local Atty - J. Shek) by Louis P. Tortorella.(Shek, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 02/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Louis P. Tortorella. United States of America served on 1/17/2006, answer due 2/6/2006; Donald H. Rumsfeld served on 1/17/2006, answer due 2/6/2006; Francis J. Harvey served on 1/17/2006, answer due 2/6/2006; David M. Walker served on 1/17/2006, answer due 2/6/2006; Commonwealth of Massachusetts served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006; Mitt Romney served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006; Martin J. Benison served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006; Massachusetts National Guard served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006; Oliver J. Mason, Jr served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006; Leonard Samorowski served on 1/13/2006, answer due 2/2/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Louis P. Tortorella. (Shek, John) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against United States of America, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, David M. Walker, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Mitt Romney, Martin J. Benison, Massachusetts National Guard, Oliver J. Mason, Jr, Leonard Samorowski Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 69494, filed by Louis P. Tortorella, Wayne Gutierrez, Joseph P. Murphy, Steven M. Littlefield. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?