Gagliardi v. Sullivan et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10545
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Gagliardi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter H. Underhill +1 617 523 5858 +1 617 523 7834 punderhill@comcast.net
v.
No Logo City of Lawrence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Bucking +1 617 832 1182 +1 617 832 7000 jbucking@foleyhoag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott C. Merrill +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 smerrill@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Governor Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary E O'Neil +6177272 200 ext2636 +1 617 727 3076 mary.e.o'neil@state.ma.us
No Logo MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Bucking +1 617 832 1182 +1 617 832 7000 jbucking@foleyhoag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott C. Merrill +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 smerrill@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Ranch C. Kimball, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary E O'Neil +6177272 200 ext2636 +1 617 727 3076 mary.e.o'neil@state.ma.us
No Logo Susan V. Lawler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary E O'Neil +6177272 200 ext2636 +1 617 727 3076 mary.e.o'neil@state.ma.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Gagliardi. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The dismissal of Michael Gagliardi's complaint is affirmed. No costs are awarded. Mandate issued in the USCA 2/8/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
    ORDER of USCA as to 20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Gagliardi. Opinion issued in the USCA 1/18/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
      USCA Judgment as to 20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Gagliardi. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The dismissal of Michael Gagliardi's complaint is affirmed. No costs are awarded. Judgment issued in the USCA 1/18/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the First Circuit by Michael Gagliardi. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 11/15/2006. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 17 Notice of Appeal to the First Circuit (Attachments: # 1)(Gawlik, Cathy) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/28/06 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at womack@megatran.com or the Clerk's Office. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the First Circuit by Michael Gagliardi. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 11/15/2006. (Underhill, Walter) Modified on 12/6/2006 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge William G. Young : ORDER OF REMAND entered. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mitt Romney,, Ranch C. Kimball,, Susan V. Lawler, Case is ordered Remanded to Essex Superior Court.(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                  Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Gagliardi. (Underhill, Walter) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/2/06 to Respond to Motion To Dismiss by Michael Gagliardi.(Underhill, Walter) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan V. Lawler, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(O'Neil, Mary) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss by Susan V. Lawler, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball.(O'Neil, Mary) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/01/2006 to File Response/Reply by Susan V. Lawler, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball.(O'Neil, Mary) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J. Sullivan, City of Lawrence.(Merrill, Scott) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 18, 2006 to File Response/Reply by Susan V. Lawler, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball.(O'Neil, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. O'Neil on behalf of Susan V. Lawler, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball (O'Neil, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/18/06 to Serve Responsive Pleading by Michael J. Sullivan, City of Lawrence.(Merrill, Scott) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 28, 2006 to File Responsive Pleading by Michael J. Sullivan, City of Lawrence.(Merrill, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Bucking on behalf of Michael J. Sullivan (Bucking, James) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C. Merrill on behalf of Michael J. Sullivan (Merrill, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C. Merrill on behalf of City of Lawrence (Merrill, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Bucking on behalf of City of Lawrence (Bucking, James) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against Susan V. Lawler, Michael J. Sullivan, City of Lawrence, Mitt Romney, Ranch C. Kimball Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 71370, filed by Michael Gagliardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?