Rivet v. Billerica, Town of, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10773
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vernon S. Rivet, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Town Farm Lane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. +1 508 423 8659
v.
No Logo Attorney General Tom Reilly, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Ferullo, Defendant
No Logo Billerica, Town of, Defendant
No Logo Boston Municipal Court, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo Elaine Krugle, Defendant
No Logo Ellen Rauling, Defendant
No Logo Fred Salvucci, Defendant
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Governor Mitt Romney"
No Logo Haliburton, Bechtel, Parsons, Brinkerhoff, Defendant
No Logo John Morris, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Matos, Defendant
No Logo Mark Lambaro, Defendant
No Logo Marty Houlne, Defendant
No Logo Mass. Transportation, Employees of, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Board of Health, Defendant
No Logo Michael Feeney, Defendant
No Logo Middlesex County, Defendant
No Logo Mike Rosa, Defendant
No Logo Milton H. Kinney, Defendant
No Logo Randy Cabral, Defendant
No Logo Richard Howe, Defendant
No Logo Rocco Longo, Defendant
No Logo Salvucci Co., Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Condon, Defendant
No Logo Troo DeRosier, Defendant
No Logo William F. McNeil, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
Pleading Received from Vernon Rivet. (Paine, Matthew) (Modified on 12/20/2011 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION to Reopen Case by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
      Letter/request (non-motion) from Carmine W. DiAdamo. (Attachments: # 1 Attached Documents)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
        EXHIBITS (EPA Papers, Area Map and Various Pleadings ) by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
          Letter/request (non-motion) from Vernon Rivet, Jr.. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
            MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (1) The Court orders that the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the Middlesex County Judicial System, the Massachusetts Board of Health, and the Boston Municipal Court be dismissed as defendants in this action; and (2) the Court directs the plaintiff to show cause, by filing an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons stated above. The plaintiff is also advised that the amended complaint will be screened pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s 1915(e). Failure to file an amended complaint will result of dismissal in this case without prejudice. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                    EXHIBITS (Letters) Submitted by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court grants plaintiff 35 (thirty-five) days from the date of this Order either to submit the fee or to file an application to proceed without prepayment of the fees. Failure to do so within the allotted time will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. (PSSA, 3) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2006 (PSSA, 3). (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                            EXHIBIT (Aerial Property Photograph), submitted by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                              Additional EXHIBITS re 1 Complaint, by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Jenness, Susan) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT against Marty Houlne, Richard Howe, Rocco Longo, Mike Rosa, Kathy Matos, Ellen Rauling, Mark Lambaro, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Mass. Transportation, Employees of, Fred Salvucci, Salvucci Co., Middlesex County, Tom Reilly, Mitt Romney, Massachusetts Board of Health, Troo DeRosier, Barbara Ferullo, Suzanne Condon, Elaine Krugle, Randy Cabral, Michael Feeney, Haliburton, Bechtel, Parsons, Brinkerhoff, Boston Municipal Court, William F. McNeil, Billerica, Town of, John Morris, Milton H. Kinney (No filing fee or application to waive the filing fee submitted)., filed by Vernon S. Rivet, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit)(Jenness, Susan) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 1,259 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?