Green v. Fishbein et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-11693
District Judge Edward F. Harrington, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Craig A. Green, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig A. Green
v.
No Logo Alan LeBovidge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne L. Sterman +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 anne.sterman@state.ma.us
No Logo April J. Sutton, Defendant
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Governor Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne L. Sterman +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 anne.sterman@state.ma.us
No Logo Joshua Fishbein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne L. Sterman +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 anne.sterman@state.ma.us
No Logo Malcolm Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Thomas P. Reilley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne L. Sterman +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 anne.sterman@state.ma.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
Plaintiff's Amendment to the Complaint, filed. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Craig A. Green. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2007 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
        Amendment to the Complaint filed by plaintiff. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Fishbein, Alan LeBovidge. (Sterman, Anne) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua Fishbein, Alan LeBovidge.(Sterman, Anne) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Sterman on behalf of Joshua Fishbein, Thomas P. Reilley, Mitt Romney, Alan LeBovidge (Sterman, Anne) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against Joshua Fishbein, Malcolm Bennett, April J. Sutton, Thomas P. Reilley, Mitt Romney, Alan LeBovidge Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 75158, filed by Craig A. Green.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 225 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?