Awuah v. Coverall North America, Inc.,
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10287
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 4:25 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aldivar Brandao, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto Zarco +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428 rzarco@zarcolaw.com
No Logo Benecira Cavalcante, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Denisse Pineda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto Zarco +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428 rzarco@zarcolaw.com
No Logo Geraldo Correia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Jai Prem, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto Zarco +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428 rzarco@zarcolaw.com
No Logo Marian Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Nilton Dos Santos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Phillip Beitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Pius Awuah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto Zarco +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428 rzarco@zarcolaw.com
No Logo Richard Barrientos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Stanley Stewart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Sulman +1 617 654 8621 +1 617 426 6567 joseph.sulman@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Coverall North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul S. Ham +1 202 307 6413

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Sullivan jennifer.sullivan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa S. Core +1 617 406 6000 +1 617 406 6100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Dienelt +1 202 861 3880 +1 202 689 7400 john.dienelt@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Iverson +1 617 406 6038 +1 617 406 6138 matthew.iverson@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Vhay +1 617 406 6000 +1 617 406 6100 michael.vhay@dlapiper.com
v.
No Logo Coverall North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul S. Ham +1 202 307 6413

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Sullivan jennifer.sullivan@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa S. Core +1 617 406 6000 +1 617 406 6100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Dienelt +1 202 861 3880 +1 202 689 7400 john.dienelt@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Iverson +1 617 406 6038 +1 617 406 6138 matthew.iverson@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Vhay +1 617 406 6000 +1 617 406 6100 michael.vhay@dlapiper.com
No Logo Aldivar Brandao, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto Zarco +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428 rzarco@zarcolaw.com
No Logo Benecira Cavalcante, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Geraldo Correia, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Jai Prem, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Marian Lewis, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Nilton Dos Santos, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo Phillip Beitz, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
No Logo Stanley Stewart, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008 Erica F. Crystal +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 erica.crystal@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerald R. Cureton +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 jcureton@curetonclark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pyle, Rome, Lichten & Ehrenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold L. Lichten +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 harold@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 sliss@prle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 367 7200 +1 617 367 4820 hschwab@prle.com
No Logo The Coolidge Corner Theatre Foundation, Inc., Third Party Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S. Rosenthal +1 617 345 6183 +9511 951 951 1295 drosenthal@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Odio +1 305 374 5418 +1 305 374 5428
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (614) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
Supersedeas BOND in the amount of $ 5,283,885.98 posted (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 615 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Jan. 10, 2014 to To Post Letter of Credit. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Jan. 10, 2014 to To Post Letter of Credit by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 613 Assented to MOTION for Bond (Supersedeas Bond) (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
          Assented to MOTION for Bond (Supersedeas Bond) by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Form of Proposed Letter of Credit)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 612 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM re Motion for Reconsideration ECF No. 543 . (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
              RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST040461 for monies received on 11/1/2013 in amount of $ 455.00, re: 607 Notice of Cross Appeal,,, filed by Pius Awuah.. (Ruane, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                USCA Case Number 13-2274 for 607 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Pius Awuah. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 600 Assented to Motion to Defer Assessment of Fees and Costs. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                    Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 607 Notice of Cross Appeal (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 598 Judgment by Pius Awuah. ( (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/29/2013. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 605 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Conclusion of Appeal to File Application for Fees (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Conclusion of Appeal to File Application for Fees by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                            MANDATE of USCA as to 533 Notice of Appeal filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. Appeal 533 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                              USCA Case Number 13-2190 for 601 Notice of Appeal filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 601 Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 598 Judgment by Coverall North America, Inc., Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-4648010 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/14/2013. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                    Assented to MOTION to Defer Assessment of Fees and Costs by Pius Awuah.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The status conference scheduled for 9/18/2013 at 2:00 PM is canceled. Counsel report to the clerk that a hearing is not necessary based on the amended judgment endorsed by the court. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. FINAL AMENDED JUDGMENT (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Amended Judgment by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 9/18/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. PLEASE NOTE: Time change only. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 9/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                  USCA Judgment as to 533 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Coverall North America, Inc., The judgment of the district court is reversed, and the matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                    OPINION of USCA as to 533 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. The denial of Coverall's motion to stay is reversed andthe case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with thisopinion. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 585 Motion to Strike Prejudgment Interest Claims and Claims for Trebling of Franchise Fees Paid "Up-front" by Coverall North America, Inc. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 583 Motion for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER on Prong Two of G.L. c. 149, s 148B in Light of Depianti v. Jan-Pro Franchising Int'l, Inc. by Coverall North America, Inc. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Hillary A. Schwab (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Opposition re 585 MOTION to Strike Prejudgment Interest Claims and Claims for Trebling of Franchise Fees Paid "Up-front" filed by Pius Awuah. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Opposition re 583 MOTION for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER, on Prong Two of G.L. c. 149, s 148B in Light of Depianti v. Jan-Pro Franchising Int'l, Inc. filed by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jani-King Transcript of SJ Order, # 2 Exhibit System4 Order Enjoining Releases, # 3 Exhibit All-Pro Decision, # 4 Exhibit Bill H3513, # 5 Exhibit Franchisees win with MA Lawmakers, # 6 Exhibit FedEx-Summary Judgment Decision, # 7 Exhibit King Arthur's Summary Judgement Decision, # 8 Exhibit AG Advisory 2008)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 585 MOTION to Strike Prejudgment Interest Claims and Claims for Trebling of Franchise Fees Paid "Up-front" filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Chart of Annual Rates, # 2 Exhibit B--Complaint, Cooks v. Coverall N.A.)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Strike Prejudgment Interest Claims and Claims for Trebling of Franchise Fees Paid "Up-front" by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 583 MOTION for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER, on Prong Two of G.L. c. 149, s 148B in Light of Depianti v. Jan-Pro Franchising Int'l, Inc. filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER, on Prong Two of G.L. c. 149, s 148B in Light of Depianti v. Jan-Pro Franchising Int'l, Inc. by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 578 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Opposition re 578 MOTION for Reconsideration ON COURTS ORDER GRANTING COVERALL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO THE CLAIMS OF WORKERS WHO PERFORMED WORK THROUGH A CONTRACT WITH A COVERALL "MASTER FRANCHISEE" filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered : "The Court will entertain an opposition to this motion."re 578 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 577 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 578 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration ON COURTS ORDER GRANTING COVERALL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO THE CLAIMS OF WORKERS WHO PERFORMED WORK THROUGH A CONTRACT WITH A COVERALL "MASTER FRANCHISEE" by Pius Awuah, Richard Barrientos, Phillip Beitz, Aldivar Brandao, Benecira Cavalcante, Geraldo Correia, Nilton Dos Santos, Anthony Graffeo, Marian Lewis, Denisse Pineda, Jai Prem, Stanley Stewart.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Ruling that Plaintiffs Benecira Cavalcante and Geraldo Correia Could Not Recover Damages On Their Wage Claims Arising From Their Misclassification as Independent Contractors by Pius Awuah, Richard Barrientos, Phillip Beitz, Aldivar Brandao, Benecira Cavalcante, Geraldo Correia, Manuel DaSilva, Nilton Dos Santos, Anthony Graffeo, Marian Lewis, Denisse Pineda, Jai Prem, Stanley Stewart.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Claret M. Vargas (Vargas, Claret) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 544 Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Award of Damages Incurred Prior to February 15, 2004 by Coverall North America, Inc. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motion denied. The Supreme Judicial Court was simply interpreting a statute that pre-existed the contracts in question. re 572 Motion for Reconsideration (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 573 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 572 MOTION for Reconsideration re 565 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 565 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 571 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "Motion DENIED. The nine individuals involved in this motion must arbitrate their differences with Coverall." re 532 MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Subsequent Termination Agreements Superseding Their Arbitration Clauses and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Pius Awuah (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA as to 450 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. Appeal 450 Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 2/21/2013 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    USCA Judgment as to 450 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coverall North America, Inc. The matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day, including issuance of a stay of the Unbound Owners' claims pending arbitration. So ordered. No costs are awarded. Judgment issued in the USCA 12/27/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Transcript of Conference and Hearing held on February 7, 2013, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. 12-2495. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 3/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2013. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting 542 Motion for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Status Conference held on 2/7/2013. The Court reviews outstanding issues with the parties and takes matter under advisement. A form of final judgment should be drafted by the parties for the Court's approval. After judgment enters an application for attorney's fees may be filed. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Liss-Riordan and Schwab for the pltfs., Vhay, Leon and Iverson for the deft.) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Motion re 543 MOTION for Reconsideration on the Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Motion re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 559 Motion for Leave to File Document and granting 560 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (Unopposed) by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (Unopposed) by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Michael D. Vhay (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Pius Awuah. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 543 MOTION for Reconsideration on the Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Pius Awuah. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 553 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of their Motion for Reconsideration on Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause (Doc. 543); granting 554 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of their Motion for Reconsideration on Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of their Motion for Reconsideration on Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of their Motion for Reconsideration on Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause (Doc. 543) by Anthony Graffeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Opposition, part 5) filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V-1--Press compendium, part A, # 2 Exhibit V-2--Press compendium, part B)(Vhay, Michael)( Modified on 1/28/2013 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Opposition addendum, part 4) filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R--Globe article, # 2 Exhibit S--MBN article, # 3 Exhibit T--Globe article, # 4 Exhibit U--NY Times article)(Vhay, Michael) (Modified on 1/28/2013 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Opposition addendum, part 3) filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L--Silva release, # 2 Exhibit M--Souza release, # 3 Exhibit N--Spencer release, # 4 Exhibit O--Veiga release, # 5 Exhibit P--Waugh release, # 6 Exhibit Q--Taulman affidavit)(Vhay, Michael) (Modified on 1/28/2013 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Opposition addendum, part 2) filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F--Farias release, # 2 Exhibit G--Mateo release, # 3 Exhibit H--Medina release, # 4 Exhibit I--Nascimento release, # 5 Exhibit J--Neto release, # 6 Exhibit K--Nunes release)(Vhay, Michael) (Modified on 1/28/2013 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. (Opposition, part 1) filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Model Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B--Alencar release, # 3 Exhibit C--Costa release, # 4 Exhibit D--Cunha release, # 5 Exhibit E--Escobar release)(Vhay, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2013 to COrrect Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 542 MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 546 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 543 MOTION for Reconsideration on the Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 2/7/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration of Award of Damages Incurred Prior to February 15, 2004 by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 543 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration on the Enforceability of Coverall's Arbitration Clause in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 455 Order on the Enforceability of Releases Signed by Cleaning Workers in the Ordinary Course of Coverall's Business in Light of the Supreme Judicial Court's Decision in Crocker v. Townsend Oil Co. by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            USCA Judgment as to 450 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.... The matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the opnion issued this day, including issuance of a stay of the Unbound Owners' claims pending arbitration, FILED. (Gawlik, Cathy) (Modified on 9/26/2013 to Correct Docket Text and Document Linkage) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              OPINION of USCA as to 450 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Coverall North America, Inc... We Reverse the District Court's 2/10/12 Order granting Ps Motion for ruling on scope of class to the extent it expanded the class certified on 9/22/11 to include the Unbound Owners, and its Feb 24, 2012 order deying Coverall's Motion to Stay proceedings pending arbitration. We Remand for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, including issuance of a stay of the Unbound Owners' claims pending arbitration. (Gawlik, Cathy) (Modified on 9/26/2013 to Correct Docket and Document Linkage) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Shannon Liss-Riordan, Esq. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 12-2495 for 533 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 533 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Page 2)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "Motion denied, not on the merits, but because an appeal has been taken in this case and this Court is presently without jurisdiction." re 532 MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Subsequent Termination Agreements Superseding Their Arbitration Clauses (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 532 MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Subsequent Termination Agreements Superseding Their Arbitration Clauses and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Shelley Taulman, Esq., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 533 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 523 Order on Motion to Stay by Coverall North America, Inc., Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-4193560 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 11/28/2012. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Subsequent Termination Agreements Superseding Their Arbitration Clauses and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 504 Joint MOTION to Include in Currently Certified Class Certain Individuals Who Signed Termination Agreements With Coverall (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Motion re 528 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief Regarding Calculation of Prejudgment Interest filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 528 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief Regarding Calculation of Prejudgment Interest ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief Regarding Calculation of Prejudgment Interest by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by Pius Awuah to 511 Brief, 515 Brief Regarding Calculation of Pre-Judgment Interest. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 525 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief Regarding Calculation of Pre-Judgment Interest, Unopposed ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief Regarding Calculation of Pre-Judgment Interest, Unopposed by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "denied. The initial determination of arbitrability vel non is for the arbitrator" re 513 Motion For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Transfer Agreements (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 514 Motion to Stay (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 514 MOTION to Stay re 501 Order Pending Arbitration and For Reconsideration of Order filed by Pius Awuah. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 513 MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Transfer Agreements filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "The motion to expand the class is denied. The claims in Group II are not amenable to class treatment as they turn on the individual circumstances under which the releases were secured. The claims in Group I and III are not presently amenable to being added to the class because the Court does not now find the arbitration remedy to be illusory." re 499 Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Motion re 499 MOTION Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 516 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 515 Brief On Prejudgment Interest. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF by Coverall North America, Inc., to 511 Brief Regarding Calculation of Prejudgment Interest. (Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay re 501 Order Pending Arbitration and For Reconsideration of Order by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For Ruling That Currently Certified Class Includes Workers Who Signed Transfer Agreements by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 499 MOTION Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by Pius Awuah Regarding Calculation of Pre-Judgment Interest. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 509 MOTION Joint Proposal for Briefing Schedule (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Joint Proposal for Briefing Schedule by Pius Awuah.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender. Mail sent to Michelle Odio (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 506 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements by Pius Awuah.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 502 MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Regarding Franchise Fees and Additional Business Fees Paid Outside of Wage Act's Three-Year Limitations Period (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Include in Currently Certified Class Certain Individuals Who Signed Termination Agreements With Coverall by Pius Awuah.(Schwab, Hillary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2012: # 1 Exhibit - 1) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 504 replaced on 9/4/2012) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 502 MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Regarding Franchise Fees and Additional Business Fees Paid Outside of Wage Act's Three-Year Limitations Period filed by Pius Awuah. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 502 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Regarding Franchise Fees and Additional Business Fees Paid Outside of Wage Act's Three-Year Limitations Period by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Notices of AAA Claims, # 2 Exhibit B--E-mail correspondence, # 3 Exhibit C--E-mail correspondence, # 4 Exhibit D--E-mail correspondence, # 5 Exhibit E--E-mail correspondence, # 6 Exhibit F--E-mail correspondence)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 501 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 499 MOTION Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--AAA end-of-stay announcement, # 2 Exhibit B(1)--Lopez Scheduling Order, # 3 Exhibit B(2)--Rivera Scheduling Order, # 4 Exhibit B(3)--Henriquez Scheduling Order)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Renewed Motion to Expand Class to Include Workers Who Signed Arbitration Agreements by Pius Awuah.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Paul S. Ham (Ham, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 494 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 24, 2012 to File Material Referenced in July 11 Order (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Coverall North America, Inc., (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lisa S. Core (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to July 24, 2012 to File Material Referenced in July 11 Order by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice 466 Motion to Expand Class (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2012 re 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Pius Awuah. After hearing from the parties the Court makes rulings on the record with an opinion to follow. The Court Orders Coverall to produce the the Court and to the AAA the arbitration agreements of all those who seek to arbitrate where no agreements have been presented by noon on 7/23/2012. The Court denies without prejudice the motion to expand the class on the ground that a renewed motion with adequate class representatives may be filed within 20 days of this date for the Court to consider. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Liss-Riordan, Schwab and Vargas for the pltf., Vhay, Iverson and Leon for the deft.) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Pius Awuah Regarding Coverall's Ongoing Obstruction of AAA Arbitrations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 11, 2012, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 8/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplement re 466 MOTION to Expand Class and Response to Coverall's Sur-Reply by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Modified on 7/12/2012 to Correct Text and CM/ECF Documnet Linkage) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their Motion to Expand Class And Respond to Coverall's Sur-Reply by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Motion re 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--AAA e-mail, # 2 Exhibit B--Felos Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit C--Tamayo List of Arbitrators, # 4 Exhibit D--Henriquez List of Arbitrators, # 5 Exhibit E--AAA e-mail, # 6 Exhibit F--Letter to AAA, # 7 Exhibit G--E-mail to AAA, # 8 Exhibit H--Vhay Affidavit)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Expand Class by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply, # 2 Exhibit A--AAA e-mail, # 3 Exhibit B--Felos Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit C--AAA List (Tamayo), # 5 Exhibit D--AAA List (Henriquez), # 6 Exhibit E--AAA e-mail, # 7 Exhibit F--Coverall letter to AAA, # 8 Exhibit G--Claimants' e-mail to AAA, # 9 Exhibit H--Vhay Affidavit)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to 463 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. Appeal 463 Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 6/27/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Judgment as to 463 Notice of Appeal, filed by Coverall North America, Inc. Upon consideration of stipulation, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Mandate to issued forthwith. Judgment issued in the USCA 6/27/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 474 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Claimants to Submit Allegations of Illusoriness to Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Affirm Court's Prior Ruling on Illusoriness or to Schedule Hearing on Illusoriness filed by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 475 MOTION to Stay Arbitrations filed by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Pius Awuah. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 22, 2012 to File Response/Reply as to 475 MOTION to Stay Arbitrations, 474 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Claimants to Submit Allegations of Illusoriness to Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Affirm Court's Prior Ruling on Illusoriness or to Schedule Hearing on Illusoriness , Grant Leave to File Reply as to 466 Motion to Expand the Class, and to Continue July 9, 2012 Hearing Date by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Clarification re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Defer Assessment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Pius Awuah.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Iskanian v. CLS Transportation Los Angeles, LLC)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Motion re 467 MOTION on Outstanding Issues Relating to Entry of Judgment for Currently Certified Class Leave to FIle Granted 6/4/2012 filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Shelley Taulman, # 2 1989 UFOC)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Arbitrations by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AAA Letter)(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Arbitration Claimants to Submit Allegations of Illusoriness to Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Affirm Court's Prior Ruling on Illusoriness or to Schedule Hearing on Illusoriness by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs A-Q (AAA & parties' correspondence))(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Regarding Outstanding Issues by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply, # 2 Attached Affidavit, # 3 UFOC Excerpt)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 7, 2012 to File Response/Reply as to 466 MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Response by Pius Awuah to 467 MOTION on Outstanding Issues Relating to Entry of Judgment for Currently Certified Class . (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 468 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Coverall North America, Inc., to 462 Judgment Regarding Outstanding Issues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION on Outstanding Issues Relating to Entry of Judgment for Currently Certified Class by Anthony Graffeo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Schwab, Hillary) Modified on 1/23/2013 to terminate as pending motion. Document is a brief, not a motion (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expand Class to Include Workers who Signed Arbitration Agreements by Pius Awuah. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 463 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Page 2)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 461 Memorandum in Support of Motion, and Exhibits attached to Memorandum in Support of Coverall's Motion for Reconsideration by Pius Awuah.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 462 Judgment by Coverall North America, Inc., Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 0101-3941912 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/31/2012. (Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 462 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT - See Judgment for Details (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 460 MOTION for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER, filed by Coverall North America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 232 Memorandum & ORDER, by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Iverson, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Pius Awuah. Document received: Form of Judgment - Joint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 10, 2012 to Submit Proposed Forms of Judgment by Pius Awuah.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to May 7, 2012 to Submit Proposed Forms of Judgment by Pius Awuah.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2012 to File Parties' Proposed Forms of Judgment by Coverall North America, Inc.,.(Vhay, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 455 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 447 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: 2/13/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 430 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: 1/9/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: 1/9/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: 10/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/2/2011, Entered: 10/2/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/9/2010, Entered: 5/9/2010 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/8/2010, Entered: 5/8/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Proposed Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Proposed Jury Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Because Coverall failed to establish the second prong of the Independent Contractor Statute, the Court holds that the Massachusetts franchisees were misclassified as independent contractors. Accordingly, the plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment Docket No. 200 is ALLOWED. SO ORDERED... (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on February 9, 2010, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 4/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Order Referring Case to ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?