Robinson v. Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:11-cv-02569-DKC
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 6:55 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Devon Robinson, Plaintiff

Represented by HARTEL KANE DESANTIS MACDONALD & HOWIE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Edward Howie +1 301 313 3263 +1 301 486 0935 thowie@hartelkane.com

Represented by Semmes, Bowen & Semmes PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Emrick +1 410 539 5040 +1 410 539 5223 gemrick@semmes.com
v.
No Logo Ali Zarrabi, Defendant
No Logo Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Henry Scroggin, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER approving 42 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Henry Scroggin, Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Ali Zarrabi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 02/22/2013. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion to Compel based upon the submissions of the defense and confirmation by Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 01/24/2013. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 39 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 01/23/2013. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Continue Date fpr Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by Devon Robinson Responses due by 2/8/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emrick, Gregory) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 2/25/2013 at 10:00 a.m. to be held in the chambers of Magistrate Judge William Connelly (Room 355A). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 1/10/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc.. Responses due by 1/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Henry Scroggin. Responses due by 1/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ali Zarrabi. Responses due by 1/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/19/12. (kdm, Chambers) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Deposition filed by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi. Replies due by 12/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Devon Robinson. (Emrick, Gregory) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Discovery and Deposition by Devon Robinson Responses due by 12/6/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Emrick, Gregory) Courtesy copy received, sent to chambers on 11/20/2012 (eb2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 29 Motion to Continue. There will be no further continuances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/15/2012. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue All Scheduling Order Dates by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi Responses due by 10/22/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 07/16/12. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline Date by Devon Robinson. Responses due by 7/30/2012 (Emrick, Gregory) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 25 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 05/22/2012. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 26 (a) (2) disclosures by Devon Robinson Responses due by 6/7/2012 (Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S Emrick on behalf of Devon Robinson (Emrick, Gregory) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/9/12. (jmw, Chambers) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT Initial Report by Devon Robinson. (Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and a status report due by 8/6/2012, motions due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 14 partial motion to dismiss, DISMISSING Count One as to all Defendants, DISMISSING Count Four as to Defendants Zarrabi and Scroggin, and DISMISSING Count Five as to Defendant Zarrabi. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/12. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
Correspondence/Return Pleading letter re: Notice of Service of Discovery sent to Timothy Howie. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Service of Discovery Materials)(cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi. (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum and Corresponding Subpoena to US EEOC (Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint filed by Devon Robinson. Replies due by 11/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi Responses due by 10/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi.(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Supplemental to 9 Red-Lined Version of AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Devon Robinson.(Howie, Timothy) Modified to edit text on 10/4/2011 (cms, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to supplement 9 Plaintiffs second amended complaint with a red-lined version (in accordance with Electronic Filing Requirements and Procedures III.C.9.d and Local Rule 103.6.c.). Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/28/11. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Devon Robinson. Replies due by 10/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Opposition, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Devon Robinson.(Howie, Timothy) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi identifying Corporate Parent Mariam, Inc. for Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc... (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/13/2011. (cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi. Responses due by 9/26/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi.(cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Henry Scroggin. (cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Writ of Summons Issued 30 days as to Ali Zarrabi. (cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Henry Scroggin, Ali Zarrabi, filed by Devon Robinson.(cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL 11-13598. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637017830), filed by Darcars of New Carrollton, Inc., Ali Zarrabi, Henry Scroggin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 14 partial motion to dismiss, DISMISSING Count One as to all Defendants, DISMISSING Count Four as to Defendants Zarrabi and Scroggin, and DISMISSING Count Five as to Defendant Zarrabi. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/12. (sat, Chambers)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/12. (sat, Chambers)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 43 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?