USA v. Petters, et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:08-cv-05348
District Judge Ann D. Montgomery, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2021 at 12:15 PM DT (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Surya Saxena +1 612 492 6125 +1 612 340 2868 saxena.surya@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Kohn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad A Blumenfield +1 312 863 7137 +1 312 863 7837 chad.blumenfield@goldbergkohn.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo Deanna Coleman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplan & Tamburino Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allan H Caplan +1 612 341 4570 +1 612 341 0507 acaplan@caplanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Garry, Attorney, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Garry +1 612 436 3051 +1 866 524 3056 ryan@ryangarry.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skolnick & Shiff, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean A Shiff +1 612 677 7600 +1 612 677 7601 sshiff@skolnick-shiff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Skolnick +1 612 677 7600 +1 612 677 7601 wskolnick@skolnick-shiff.com
No Logo Frank E. Vennes, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesseca R.F. Cockson +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 jcockson@faegre.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah A Ellingboe +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 dellingboe@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Volling +1 612 766 7758 +1 612 766 1600 jvolling@faegre.com
No Logo James Wehmhoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster & Brever, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Brever +1 612 436 3291 +1 612 788 9879 tbrever@fosterbrever.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Wallace-Jackson +1 612 373 8329 +1 612 373 0929 dwallace-jackson@greeneespel.com
No Logo Larry Reynolds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bruno & Nelson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederic K Bruno +1 763 545 7900 +1 763 545 0834 bruno@brunolaw.com
No Logo Michael Catain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Colich +1 612 333 7007 +1 612 333 0492 mcolich@colichlaw.com
No Logo Robert White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph S Friedberg +1 612 339 8626 +1 612 339 8627 joefriedberg@hotmail.com
No Logo Thomas Joseph Petters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul C Engh +1 612 252 1100 engh4@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald G. Heeman +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dheeman@felhaber.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Hopeman +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 jhopeman@felhaber.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica M Marsh +1 612 373 8549 +1 612 338 0535 jmarsh@felhaber.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Riensche +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 eriensche@felhaber.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Salmen +1 612 373 8413 +1 612 338 4608 rsalmen@felhaber.com
No Logo Allen J. Munson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mansfield Tanick & Cohen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa J Ayling +1 612 341 1214 +1 612 339 3161 tayling@mansfieldtanick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall H Tanick +1 612 339 4295 +1 612 339 3161 mtanick@mansfieldtanick.com
No Logo Antoinette Reynolds, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arlo H Vande Vegte +1 952 475 2219 +1 952 475 0634 vande74@earthlink.net
No Logo Barry E Mukamal, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter D. Russin, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S Feldman +1 305 358 6363 +1 305 358 1221 jfeldman@melandrussin.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Solomon B Genet +1 305 358 6363 sgenet@melandrussin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker Rosen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel N Lovejoy +1 612 767 3000 lovejoy@parkerrosen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel N Rosen +1 612 767 3000 +1 612 767 3001 rosen@parkerrosen.com
No Logo Crown Bank, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Galle +1 612 607 7572 +1 612 607 7100 Dgalle@oppenheimer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine N Lindblad +1 612 607 7000 +1 612 607 7100 clindblad@oppenheimer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie L van Uitert +1 612 607 7000 +1 612 607 7100 mvanuitert@oppenheimer.com
No Logo Jon McGaunn, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph W Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 janthony@aoblr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Pincus +1 612 349 6969 spincus@aoblaw.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Intervenor
Officer/Director, Vodavi Technology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nagendra Setty +1 404 688 0770 +1 404 688 9880

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/21/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rasheed M McWilliams +1 404 892 5005 +1 404 892 5002 McWilliams@fr.com
No Logo Minnwest Bank M.V., Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Thomas +1 757 640 5300 jctlex@gmail.com
No Logo Minnwest Bank Metro, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John Charles Thomas +1 757 640 5300 jctlex@gmail.com
No Logo Ritchie Capital Management, et al., Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rabea J. Zayed +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 rzayed@ccvl.com
No Logo William Procida, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fafinski Mark & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Connie A Lahn +1 952 995 9500 +1 952 995 9577 connie.lahn@fmjlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Runck +1 952 224 7944 +1 952 995 9577 david.runck@fmjlaw.com
No Logo Zenith Electronics LLC, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo-NA Rodriguez
TERMINATED: 01/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle- NA S. Rhyu

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Fenske & Sund PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Sund +1 952 975 0050 +1 952 975 0058 bsund@morrisonsund.com
No Logo Douglas A Kelley, Receiver

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E Wolter

Toggle Switch Represented by Blanscet Sutherland Hooper & Hale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D Smith +1 972 739 4083 +1 214 764 7981 jsmith@metrocrestlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fruth Jamison & Elsass PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terence M Fruth +1 612 344 9700 +1 612 344 9705 tfruth@fruthlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Jamison +1 612 344 9700 +1 612 344 9705 tjamison@fruthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy L Kabele +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 skabele@kelleywolter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A Kelley +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dkelley@kelleywolter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A Pedersen +1 612 371 9090
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam C Ballinger +1 612 371 6203 aballinger@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A Banker +1 612 371 3969 +1 612 371 3207 pbanker@lindquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D Larsen +1 612 371 3211 +1 612 371 3207 mlarsen@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly G Laudon +1 612 371 3957 +1 612 371 3207 klaudon@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Lodoen +1 612 371 3234 +1 612 371 3207 jlodoen@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Olafson +1 612 371 3211 +1 612 371 3207 molafson@lindquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole M Siemens +1 612 371 2407 +1 612 371 3207 nsiemens@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George H Singer +1 612 371 2493 gsinger@lindquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra S. Smalley-Fleming +1 612 371 3958 +1 612 371 3207 ssmalley-fleming@lindquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryle L Uphoff +1 612 371 3230 +1 612 371 3207 duphoff@lindquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Gary Hansen, Receiver

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hansen +1 612 607 7584 +1 612 607 7100 ghansen@oppenheimer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ranelle A. Leier +1 612 607 7000 +1 612 607 7100 rleier@oppenheimer.com
No Logo Liquidating Trustee Gary Hansen, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hansen +1 612 607 7584 +1 612 607 7100 ghansen@oppenheimer.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3731
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (1564) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3275 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3274 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3271 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3223 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3212 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3211 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3171 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3156 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3152 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3142 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3120 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Lift Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 2532 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2486 Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/26/2013. (GS) cc: Peter J. Leveton. Modified on 7/26/2013 (lmb).
                          LREF
                          Blank 2469 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER AUTHORIZING AND CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN THE RETREAT AND DOUGLAS A. KELLEY, RECEIVER; granting 2447 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/26/2013. (TLU)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2187 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2133 Mukamal's Motion to Intervene; denying 2136 Mukamal's Motion to Lift Stay (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/12/2012. (TLU) cc: Peter J. Leveton Modified on 3/12/2012 (jam).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Blank 2101
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2100
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2083
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Peter J. Leveton. (kt) Modified on 8/25/2011 QC'd by CLW. (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2025 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2014 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders dated 12/8/08 Freezing Assets : First Amended Notice of Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2024 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John T. Petters Foundation of Moving Papers re Motion to Unfreeze (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by John T. Petters Foundation re 2020 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John T. Petters Foundation. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2022 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Seth Leventhal in Support of 2020 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John T. Petters Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Email Exchange, # 2 Exhibit(s) Email Exchange)(Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2021 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Robert D. Lawson in Support of 2020 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John T. Petters Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Accnt Stmt, Acct Summary)(Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2020 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 2014 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders dated 12/8/08 Freezing Assets filed by John T. Petters Foundation. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2019 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion to Approve Settlement [Docket No. 1952] held on July 8, 2011 before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (6 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette (E-mail: Tim_Willette@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5108). Redaction Request due 9/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (TJW) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2018 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcript is associated with this filing. (TJW) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2017 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 1979 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1982 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1985 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1988 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1991 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1994 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1997 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 2000 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 2003 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/10/2011. (GS) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2016 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER re 2012 Stipulation filed by Antoinette Reynolds, United States of America. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/9/2011. (GS) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2015 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2014 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders dated 12/8/08 Freezing Assets : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2014 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders dated 12/8/08 Freezing Assets by John T. Petters Foundation. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2013 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Seth J S Leventhal on behalf of John T. Petters Foundation. (Leventhal, Seth) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2012 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION Cancelling Receivership Payments to Antoinette Reynolds by Antoinette Reynolds, United States of America. (Saxena, Surya) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2011 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TEXT ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ann D. Montgomery: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2011 re 1979 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1988 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Consultant) of Tonya Rosso filed by Douglas A Kelley, 2000 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley, 2003 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1982 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1994 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1997 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1985 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, P.A. filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1991 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (GS) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2010 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE re 1979 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC, 1988 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Consultant) of Tonya Rosso, 2000 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, 2003 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP, 1982 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A., 1994 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, 1997 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, 1985 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, P.A., 1991 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Saxena, Surya) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 2009 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            STATUS REPORT (Seventeenth Receiver's Report) by Douglas A Kelley. (Kelley, Douglas) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2008 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas A Kelley re 2006 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2007 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas A Kelley re 1976 Order to Show Cause, (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2006 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2005 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 2003 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2004 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2003 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2003 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2002 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 2000 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2001 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2000 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2000 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1999 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1997 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1998 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1997 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1997 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1996 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1994 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1994 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1994 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1991 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1992 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1991 MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1991 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1990 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1988 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Consultant) of Tonya Rosso filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1989 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1988 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Consultant) of Tonya Rosso : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1988 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees (Consultant) of Tonya Rosso by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1987 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1985 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, P.A. filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1986 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1985 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, P.A. : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1985 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, P.A. by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1984 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1982 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1982 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1982 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1981 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Steven E. Wolter in SUPPORT OF 1979 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1980 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1979 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1979 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC by Douglas A Kelley. (Wolter, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1978 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by James Wehmhoff re 1977 Objection. (Brever, Thomas) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1977 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION re 1976 Order to Show Cause, filed by James Wehmhoff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brever, Thomas) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1976 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Douglas A Kelley. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. Show Cause Response due by 8/4/2011.Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/19/2011. (TLU) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Douglas A Kelley re 1967 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 1969 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 1966 Declaration in Support, 1970 Affidavit (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1974 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service by Douglas A Kelley re 1967 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 1969 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 1966 Declaration in Support, 1970 Affidavit (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1973 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Douglas A Kelley re 1967 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 1969 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 1966 Declaration in Support, 1970 Affidavit (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1972 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Douglas A Kelley re 1967 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 1969 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 1966 Declaration in Support, 1970 Affidavit (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1971 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Garrett Vail (kt) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Pamela K. Myre re 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Douglas A Kelley. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/12/11. (Laudon, Kelly) Modified on 7/13/2011 (akl). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1969 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Douglas A Kelley re 1965 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1962 Motion to file the Affidavit of Pamela K. Myre conventionally and under seal. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/12/2011. (TLU) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kelly G. Laudon in Support of 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-M, # 2 Exhibit(s) N-V)(Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE*** NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1963 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Laudon, Kelly) Modified text on 7/11/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Douglas A Kelley. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Pleading/Motion/Other Document Affidavit of Pamela K. Myre by Douglas A Kelley. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1952 Motion for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/8/2011. (GS) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ann D. Montgomery: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2011 re 1952 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release filed by Douglas A Kelley. Motion is GRANTED and an order will be issued. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (GS) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 1952 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Saxena, Surya) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly G Laudon on behalf of Douglas A Kelley. (Laudon, Kelly) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1957 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1946 Motion for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/24/2011. (TLU) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Douglas A Kelley re 1955 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Lodoen, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 1952 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Lodoen, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of James A. Lodoen in Support of 1952 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Lodoen, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1953 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1952 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release : Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Lodoen, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release by Douglas A Kelley. (Lodoen, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1951 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann D. Montgomery: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2011 re 1946 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed filed by Douglas A Kelley. Sale Approved; Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (TLU) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 1946 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Saxena, Surya) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1949 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 1927 Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement, by Douglas A Kelley. (Pedersen, Patricia) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Douglas A. Kelley, Receiver in SUPPORT OF 1946 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-D, # 2 Exhibit(s) E-G)(Kelley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1947 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 1946 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed : Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Ann D. Montgomery. (Kelley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1946 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property at 29380 and 29402 Lilac Road, St. Joseph, Minnesota Belonging to Thomas J. Petters and Directing Delivery of a Deed by Douglas A Kelley. (Kelley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1945 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENTS; granting in part and denying in part 1931 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting 1934 Motion for Attorney Fees of Tonya Rosso. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/09/2011. (TLU) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ann D. Montgomery: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2011 re 1931 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. filed by Douglas A Kelley, 1934 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Tonya Rosso filed by Douglas A Kelley. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (GS) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1943 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Sixteenth) of Receiver Douglas A. Kelley by Douglas A Kelley. (Kelley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Cockson, Jesseca) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1455 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1452 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1446 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1442 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Motion for Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1424 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1422 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1417 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1414 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1413 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1411 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1409 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1400 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1393 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Amended Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1360 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1359 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Motion for Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Contempt Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Show Cause Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1298 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1297 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1296 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1294 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Letter From Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1292 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Order on Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1291 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1290 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1289 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Letter From Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1248 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1246 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1229 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1221 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1187 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1181 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Letter to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1087 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Order to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1068 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 551 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?