USA v. O'MALLEY et al

Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:2010-cr-00578-DMC
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 4:40 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo RONALD J. O'MALLEY, Defendant (1)

Represented by Suite 325

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEIGH-ANNE MULREY +1 973 241 4646 lmulrey@mulreylaw.com

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com

Represented by Walder Hayden, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES ATKINSON PLAISTED +1 973 992 5300 +1 973 992 1006 james.plaisted@walderhayden.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/27/2014, Entered: None
Notice by U.S. Attorney's Office requesting cancellation of Recognizance Number NEW3425, as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO,, in the amount of 250,000. (GREWAL, GURBIR) (Entered: 09/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY re 42 USCA Judgment(Use if Mandate will follow), 35 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(Craven, Shannon) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY re 35 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Ronald O'Malley by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY held on 2/7/12, before Judge Cavanaugh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charles McGuire (215-840-7030). Tape Number: Sentence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (tjg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter ORDER granting request for extension of surrender date from 3/27/12 to 4/18/12 as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/9/12. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying defendant's motion for bail pending appeal as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/12/12. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE MAUREEN NAKLY appearing for USA. (NAKLY, MAUREEN) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by RONALD J. O'MALLEY Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0312-4212129. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (PLAISTED, JAMES) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (2), Count(s) 1, 2 years Probation, Fine waived, $100 Special Assessment; Count(s) Count(s) 6, 8-10, 14, 16, 18-24, 26, 30-32, 39, 41-45, 47, 51-53, 60, 62-66, 68, Dismissed by motion from prosecution, 11-13, 15, 17, 25, 27-29, 33-38, 40, 46, 48-50, 54-59, 61, 67, Defendant not involved in count even though JS3 opened; LAURA- JEAN ARVELO terminated.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 7 February 2012. (spc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh:Sentencing held on 2/7/2012 for LAURA JEAN ARVELO (2) Ct. 1 2 years Probation, Fine waived, $100 Special Assessment; Count(s) 6, 8-10, 14, 16, 18-24, 26, 30-32, 39, 41-45, 47, 51-53, 60, 62-66, & 68 Dismissed by motion form prosecution; Count(s) 11-13, 15, 17, 25, 27-29, 33-38, 40, 46, 48-50, 54-59, 61, 67, Defendant not involved in even though JS3 was opened. (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (spc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1), Count(s) 1, 24 Months Imprisonment, 3 years Supervised Rlelease, $25,000 Fine, $100 Special Assessment; Count(s) 2-26, 27-47, 48-68, Dismissed by Motion, RONALD J. O'MALLEY terminated.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 7 February 2012. (spc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh:Sentencing held on 2/7/2012 for RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1) Ct. 1 24 months Imprisonment, 3 years Supervised release, $25,000.00 Fine and $100 Special Assessment; Count(s) 2-26, 27-47, 48-68, Dismissed by Motion from Governemnt. Defentdant to Voluntary surrender as designated by BOP, Bail continued pending designation (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (spc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
Letter from United States (supplement) (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
Letter from United States requesting extension (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY held on 8/23/11, before Judge Cavanaugh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charles P. McGuire, Telephone number 215 840 7030. Tape Number: Proceedings. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (tjg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO held on 8/23/11, before Judge Cavanaugh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charles P. McGuire, Telephone number 215 840 7030. Tape Number: Proceedings. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (tjg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY. (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh:Change of Plea Hearing as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY held on 8/23/2011, Plea entered by RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1) Guilty Count 1., ( Sentencing set for 12/12/2011 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4 before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh.) Bail Continued(Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO. (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh:Change of Plea Hearing as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO held on 8/23/2011, Plea entered by LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (2) Guilty Count 1., ( Sentencing set for 12/12/2011 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4 before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh.) bail continued(Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (spc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RONALD J. O'MALLEY as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO re 14 Omnibus MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lauren Hoffman)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Letter from James Plaisted (WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO re 14 Omnibus MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JAMES ATKINSON PLAISTED appearing for RONALD J. O'MALLEY (PLAISTED, JAMES) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: LEIGH-ANNE MULREY appearing for RONALD J. O'MALLEY (MULREY, LEIGH-ANNE) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE CHRISTINE INGRID MAGDO appearing for USA. (MAGDO, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
Omnibus MOTION by RONALD J. O'MALLEY as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of Lauren Hoffman, # 3 Exhibit A-B to Hoffman Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit C-F to Hoffman Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit G-J to Hoffman Affidavit, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO Time excluded from 3/24/11 until 10/3/11., ( Defense Pre-Trial motions due by 6/27/2011, Replies due by 7/18/2011. Trial 10/3/11.). Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/24/11. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO Time excluded from 1/10/11 until 3/14/11., SCHEDULING ORDER as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO( Pretrial management Conference set for 3/14/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh.). Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/10/11. (jn, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO Time excluded from 9/29/10 to 120 days., SCHEDULING ORDER as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO( case management Conference set for 1/10/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh.). Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 9/29/10. (jn, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Discovery and Inspection as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO. Trial set for 11/9/10. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 20 September 2010. (spc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh:Arraignment as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1) Count 1,2-26,27-47,48-68 and LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (2) Count 1,2-26,27-47,48-68 held on 9/20/2010, Plea entered by RONALD J. O'MALLEY, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO Not Guilty on counts 1-68. Motions due 10/11/10, Opposition by 10/25/2010, O/A to be held 11/1/2010 & Trial date set for 11/9/10. Bail continued on both deft's (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (spc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOSEPH PAUL REM, JR appearing for LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (REM, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1) $250,000 Unsecured.Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/3/2010. (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JUSTIN P. WALDER appearing for RONALD J. O'MALLEY. (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo:Initial Appearance as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY held on 9/3/2010, Defendant Advised of Rights, Bail Hearing as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY held on 9/3/2010, and Bail Set at $250,000 Unsecured. (CD #10-09K, 2:01.) (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (2) $250,000 Unsecured.Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/2/2010. (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo:Initial Appearance as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO held on 9/2/2010, Defendant Advised of Rights, Bail Hearing as to LAURA- JEAN ARVELO held on 9/2/2010, and Bail set at $250,000 Unsecured. (CD #10-09K, 3:23.) (kd) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement by USA (mrd, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY (1) count(s) 1, 2-26, 27-47, 48-68, LAURA- JEAN ARVELO (2) count(s) 1, 2-26, 27-47, 48-68. (mrd, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter ORDER granting request for extension of surrender date from 3/27/12 to 4/18/12 as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/9/12. (jn, )
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying defendant's motion for bail pending appeal as to RONALD J. O'MALLEY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/12/12. (jn, )
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 18 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?