United States v. Tassev
Criminal Case New York Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cr-00228

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2019 at 3:42 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/02/2014 Gwendolyn E. Carroll +1 315 448 0672 +1 315 448 0954 gwendolyn.e.carroll@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Hanlon +1 518 431 0247
TERMINATED: 07/16/2018 Sean K. O'dowd +1 518 431 0247 +1 518 431 0249 sean.odowd@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Suarez +1 518 431 0247 alicia.g.suarez@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Iani S. Tassev, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2016 Gaspar M. Castillo +1 518 463 0380 +1 518 427 6720 gmcastillojr@Hotmail.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2017 Michael D. Jurena +1 518 463 2280 +1 518 677 1856 mike.jurena@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LaMarche, Safranko Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Edward Lamarche +1 518 982 0770 +1 518 982 0773 gel@lamarchesafrankolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Robert Safranko +1 518 982 0770 ars@lamarchesafrankolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/07/2018 Heather Marie Boxeth +1 619 233 3843 heather@boxethlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Text Only Order - Government's request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the January 29, 2019 sentencing date (Dkt. No. 107) is GRANTED. Sentencing has been rescheduled for March 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Sentencing memoranda are to be filed on or before March 6, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/9/2019. (jel, ) Modified on 1/9/2019 (jel, ). (Entered: 01/09/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Text Only Order - Government's request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the November 28, 2018 sentencing date, (Dkt. No. 105), is GRANTED. Sentencing has been rescheduled for January 29, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Sentencing memoranda are to be filed on or before January 8, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/8/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Text Only Order - On July 26, 2018, the court received a bounce-back from the email address of Attorney Heather Boxeth for service of the text order issued by the court that same day. On August 3, 2018, the court was advised by Attorney Andrew Safranko, by electronic mail, that Ms. Boxeth is no longer counsel for defendant and all notifications can be sent to their office. The court directs the Clerk to terminate Heather Boxeth, Esq., as counsel for defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/7/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Text Only Order - Defendant's request for an adjournment of the August 8, 2018 sentencing date (Dkt. No. 102) is GRANTED. Sentencing has been rescheduled for November 26, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Sentencing memoranda are to be filed on or before November 5, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/26/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Letter from Andrew R. Safranko, Esq. as to Iani S. Tassev requesting Adjournment of Sentencing (Safranko, Andrew) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alicia Suarez appearing for USA as substituted counsel for Attorney Sean K. O'Dowd for the forfeiture aspect of the case; (Suarez, Alicia) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Text Only Order - Defendant's request for an adjournment of the June 6, 2018 sentencing date, (Dkt. No. 99), is GRANTED. Sentencing has been rescheduled for August 16, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Sentencing memorandums are to be filed on or before July 26, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/21/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Letter from Andrew R. Safranko, Esq. as to Iani S. Tassev requesting Adjournment (Safranko, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Text Only Order - The parties joint request to adjourn sentencing, (Dkt. No. 97), is GRANTED but not necessarily to the extent requested by the parties. The parties are directed to advise the court as soon as the current impediment to sentencing has been resolved at which time the court will set a sentencing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/30/2017. (jel, ) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              LETTER dated October 30, 2017 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a thirty (30) day adjournment of the November 20, 2017 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/29/2017, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/29/2017, Sentencing has been reset for 12/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/31/2017. (jel, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Text Only Order - The government's request for a sixty day adjournment of the August 22, 2017 sentencing, (Dkt. No. 93), is GRANTED. Sentencing has been rescheduled for November 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Sentencing memorandums are to be filed on or before October 30, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/4/2017. (jel, ) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Letter from Daniel Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentencing (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER dated May 18, 2017 from George E. LaMarche, Esq., and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for ninety (90) day adjournment of the June 14, 2017 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/21/2017, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/21/2017, Sentencing has been reset for 9/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/23/2017. (jel, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Letter from George E. LaMarche III as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentencing (LaMarche, George) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Iani S. Tassev: Change of Plea Hearing held on May 12, 2011, before Judge Gary L. Sharpe, Court Reporter: Lisa L. Tennyson,Telephone number: (518) 257-1823. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 3/13/2017 (lt, ) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew R. Safranko appearing for Iani S. Tassev as co-counsel (Safranko, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST certificate of service by Iani S. Tassev for proceedings held on 5/12/2011 before Judge Sharpe. (LaMarche, George) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Iani S. Tassev for proceedings held on 5/12/2011 before Judge Sharpe. (LaMarche, George) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER dated February 21, 2017 by Heather M. Boxeth, Esq., and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev GRANTING request for a 90-day adjournment of the March 14, 2017 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/24/2017, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/24/2017, Sentencing has been reset for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/21/2017. (jel, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Letter from Heather M. Boxeth as to Iani S. Tassev requesting Adjournment of Sentencing (Boxeth, Heather) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather Marie Boxeth appearing for Iani S. Tassev (Boxeth, Heather) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 82 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather M. Boxeth as to Iani S. Tassev (1). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/14/2016.(jel, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather M. Boxeth Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-3874308.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order/Judgment, # 2 Supplement)(LaMarche, George)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER dated December 8, 2016 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for an adjournment of the December 16, 2016 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/21/2017, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/21/2017, Sentencing has been reset for 3/14/2017 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/9/2016. (jel, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Receipt for Non-Cash Collateral: Return of Non-Cash Collateral as to Iani S. Tassev Description of Collateral: Deed for Property located at East Dorset, VT, retrieved from Vault in Albany. *** Returned to Sureties pursuant to the TEXT Order @ Dkt # 77. (mgh) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (AMENDED) [LODGED] as to Iani S. Tassev. The Presentence Investigation Report and/or Addendum have been AMENDED and supersede any previously submitted versions. This final version includes all revisions and the most recent Addendum, and will be used by the Court at the time of sentencing. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. It is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (bam2, ) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    TEXT ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev: The Court held a Bond Hearing in this matter on November 29, 2016. Based upon the discussions held during the hearing, the bond signed on behalf of Defendant on May 13, 2011 is VACATED and Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva are relieved as sureties of that bond. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the deed posted with the Court on May 13, 2011 to Mr. Stanoy and Ms. Raytcheva. Defendant's conditions of release were modified to include a new surety, Kelly Flood-Myers, who appeared and signed a bond in the unsecured amount of $150,000.00. All other conditions previously set for Defendant's release remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/5/2016. (mab) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Appearance Bond as to Iani S. Tassev in the amount of $150,000.00 unsecured and signed by Defendant and surety Kelly Flood-Myers. (mab) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        TEXT ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev: A Bond Hearing is set for 11/29/2016 at 2:00 PM before the undersigned. Counsel, Defendant, the sureties on the bond and counsel for the sureties are directed to appear IN-PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Courtroom No. 2, Albany, NY on the scheduled and time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/23/2016. (mab) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER dated November 8, 2016 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for an adjournment of the November 22, 2016 sentencing date. Sentencing has been reset for 12/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/14/2016. (jel, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STATUS REPORT regarding request by sureties to be relieved as sureties for defendant's bond by USA as to Iani S. Tassev (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                TEXT ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev: Government is directed to respond to the 70 Letter Request filed by Isabelle Kirshner, Esq. on behalf of the sureties by October 25, 2016. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/21/2016. (mab) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Letter Request from Isabelle Kirshner, Esq., on behalf of Anna Raytcheva and Stanoy Tassev, requesting to be released as sureties and to remove any encumbrance on their home which was posted as collateral in this matter submitted to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (mab) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER dated August 9, 2016 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a forty-five (45) day adjournment of the August 29, 2016 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/1/2016, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/1/2016, Sentencing has been reset for 11/22/2016 at 01:00 PM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/15/2016. (jel, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER/ORDER - Attorney Gaspar Castillo's letter requesting withdraw as retained counsel, (Dkt. No. 65), is GRANTED. On July 18, 2016, Attorney Michael Jurena filed a notice of appearance as retained counsel for defendant Iani Tassev. (Dkt. No. 66.) IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/18/2016. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael D. Jurena appearing for Iani S. Tassev (Jurena, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Letter from Gaspar Castillo as to Iani S. Tassev requesting Leave to Withdraw (Castillo, Gaspar) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER dated May 25, 2016 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the June 14, 2016 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/8/2016, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/8/2016, Sentencing has been reset for 8/29/2016 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/26/2016. (jel, ) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER dated March 7, 2016 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the March 14, 2016 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/24/2016, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/24/2016, Sentencing has been reset for 6/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/7/2016. (jel, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Letter from Daniel Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentencing (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER dated December 15, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the January 5, 2016 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/22/2016, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/22/2016, Sentencing has been reset for 3/14/2016 at 12:15 PM in Albany before Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/16/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER dated October 14, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the November 3, 2015 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 12/15/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 12/15/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 1/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/15/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER dated July 28, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the August 13, 2015 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/13/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/13/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 11/3/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/29/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER dated June 3, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a forty-five (45) day adjournment of the June 23, 2015 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 7/23/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 7/23/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 8/13/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/4/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER dated April 21, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a thirty (30) day adjournment of the May 11, 2015 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/2/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/2/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 6/23/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/22/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER dated February 26, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a thirty (30) day adjournment of the March 20, 2015 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 4/20/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 4/20/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 5/11/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/26/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER dated January 23, 2015 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a thirty (30) day adjournment of the February 13, 2015 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/27/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/27/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 3/20/2015 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/27/2015. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sean K. O'Dowd appearing for USA for the forfeiture aspect of the case, replacing Gwendolyn E. Carroll (O'Dowd, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated November 25, 2014 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the December 1, 2014 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 1/23/2015, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 1/23/2015, Sentencing has been reset for 2/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/25/2014. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated July 8, 2014 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the July 22, 2014 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/10/2014, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/10/2014, Sentencing has been reset for 12/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/9/2014. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated May 9, 2014 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a thirty (30) day adjournment of the June 2, 2014 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 7/1/2014, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 7/1/2014, Sentencing has been reset for 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/12/2014. (jel, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated March 3, 2014 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the March 24, 2014 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/12/2014, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 5/12/2014, Sentencing has been reset for 6/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/4/2014. (jel, ) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated January 6, 2014 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for sixty (60) day adjournment of the January 22, 2014 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 3/3/2014, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 3/3/2014, Sentencing has been reset for 3/24/2014 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/6/2014. (jel, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated October 30, 2013 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the November 20, 2013 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 1/2/2014, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 1/2/2014, Sentencing has been reset for 1/22/2014 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/31/2013. (jel, ) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated August 13, 2013 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the September 9, 2013 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/30/2013, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/30/2013, Sentencing has been reset for 11/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/14/2013. (jel, ) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated June 17, 2013 by Dan Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the July 8, 2013 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/19/2013, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/19/2013, Sentencing has been reset for 9/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/18/2013. (jel, ) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned executed on 5/8/2013 filed by USA (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Gwendolyn E. Carroll appearing for USA for the forfeiture aspect of the case (Carroll, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated April 18, 2013 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA, and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the May 9, 2013 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/17/2013, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/17/2013, Sentencing set for 7/8/2013 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/19/2013. (jel, ) Modified on 4/19/2013 (jel, ). (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated February 6, 2013 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a sixty (60) day adjournment of the February 27, 2013 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 4/18/2013, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 4/18/2013, Sentencing set for 5/9/2013 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/7/2013. (jel, ) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated October 24, 2012 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a ninety (90) day adjournment of the November 14, 2012 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/6/2013, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/6/2013, Sentencing set for 2/27/2013 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/25/2012. (jel, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated June 18, 2012 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a ninety (90) day adjournment of the July 9, 2012 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/24/2012, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/24/2012, Sentencing has been reset for 11/14/2012 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/19/2012. (jel, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceedings (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated February 21, 2012 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a ninety (90) day adjournment of the March 12, 2012 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/18/2012, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 6/18/2012, Sentencing set for 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/22/2012. (jel, ) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT - FINAL DISCLOSURE [LODGED] as to Iani S. Tassev. The final version of the Presentence Investigation Report, including all revisions and the most recent Addendum is now available for review. This version of the report will be used by the Court at the time of sentencing. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (bam2, ) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated November 15, 2011 by Dan Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a ninety (90) day adjournment of the December 6, 2011 sentencing date. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/20/2012, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 2/20/2012, Sentencing has been reset for 3/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/16/2011. (jel, ) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated August 15, 2011 by Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA and ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev granting request for a ninety (90) day adjournment of the September 8, 2011 sentencing date. ( Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/15/2011, Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 11/15/2011, Sentencing has been reset for 12/6/2011 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Judge Gary L. Sharpe). Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 08/16/2011. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from AUSA Dan Hanlon as to Iani S. Tassev requesting adjournment of sentence proceeding (Hanlon, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SERVICE by Publication of Notice of Publication; Last publication date 7/8/11 in the official government internet site: www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days Claim deadline 8/8/2011 filed by USA (Capezza, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Iani S. Tassev. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/2/2011. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Thomas A. Capezza as to Iani S. Tassev requesting that the proposed Preliminary Order of Forfeiture be signed and filed and copies returned (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order/Judgment Preliminary Order of Forfeiture)(Capezza, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt for Non-Cash Collateral: Surrender of Non-Cash Collateral as to Iani S. Tassev. Description of Collateral: Copy of Deed for 94 Goodwood Lane, East Dorset, VT 05253-0715, placed in vault in Albany, NY (Receipt No. 1143). (mab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREEMENT to Forfeit Property as to Iani S. Tassev by Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva of the following property: 94 Goodwood Lane, East Dorset, VT 05253-0715. (mab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***VACATED*** Appearance Bond as to Iani S. Tassev posted by Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva in amount of $1,000,000 secured by $500,000 of a property. Non-Cash Collateral Receipt No. 1143. (mab) Modified on 12/5/2016 (mab).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Iani S. Tassev (1). $1,000,000 to be secured by $500,000 (property) and signatures of two financially secured individuals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 5/13/2011. (mab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNIFORM PRESENTENCE/GUIDELINE ORDER as to Iani S. Tassev: Sentencing set for 9/8/2011 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/18/2011. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 8/18/2011. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/12/2011. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Iani S. Tassev (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gary L. Sharpe: CRD: John Law. Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Iani S. Tassev held on 5/12/2011. Appearances Made: Daniel Hanlon, AUSA, for the USA, Gaspar Castillo, Esq., for the defendant and Melyssa Inman for Probation. Waiver of Indictment in executed, accepted and filed along with the Information. Information is read by Judge Sharpe. Plea entered by Iani S. Tassev (1) Guilty Count 1,2. Court accepts guilty plea. Plea Agreement is handed up and accepted as to Iani S. Tassev. Counts in Indictment 1:10-cr-583 will be dismissed at the time of sentencing. Sentencing is scheduled for September 8, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. in Albany, New York. Presentence Report is ordered. Defendant is referred to the underlying Magistrate Judge for bail hearing. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson) Time: 10:00-10:30 a.m. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INFORMATION as to Iani S. Tassev (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Iani S. Tassev. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, Sentencing has been reset for 11/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, Sentencing has been reset for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Sentencing has been set for 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, Sentencing has been reset for 8/22/2017 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Iani S. Tassev. Attorney Michael D. Jurena terminated. (dpk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Sentencing has been reset for 3/14/2017 at 12:00 PM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Minute Entry for proceedings (2:03PM-2:30PM) held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Bond Hearing as to Iani S. Tassev held on 11/29/2016. Appearances: AUSA Daniel Hanlon, Heather Boxeth, Esq. (by phone), Isabelle Kirshner, Esq. (by phone) with sureties Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva and USPO Ron LaCoy. The Court held a hearing based upon Atty Kirshner's request to have her clients removed as sureties from the bond. Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva had previously signed a bond in May 2011 in the amount of 1 Million Dollars secured by $500,000.00 property which was posted with the Clerk's Office. Atty Kirshner advises that due to family issues, the sureties would like to be removed from the bond. The Court turns to Atty Boxeth who advises that she has been retained as counsel for Defendant Iani Tassev and is working on her admission to the NDNY. The Court directs her to complete the admission process within 1 week. Atty Boxeth advises that there is no objection to releasing the current sureties and has made arrangements for a new surety to sign a bond on behalf of Defendant. Kelly Flood-Myers is present in Court and advises that she would be willing to sign a bond. The Court releases Stanoy Tassev and Anna Raytcheva from the bond and will issue an Order. The sureties and Atty Kirshner were dismissed from the proceeding. Prior to signing a new bond, AUSA Hanlon would like to address the Court in a closed proceeding. The Court clears the Courtroom except for counsel, Defendant, USPO LaCoy and Court personnel and directs that the transcript containing the portion of this discussion be SEALED. Following that discussion, the Court requests that Ms. Flood-Myers be allowed back into the Courtroom and questions her as to her willingness to sign a bond on behalf of Defendant. Ms. Flood-Myers states that she is willing and able to do so. The Court directs Defendant and Ms. Flood-Myers to sign an unsecured bond in the amount of $150,000.00. Bond is signed. Defendant is released pending sentence on previously set conditions. (Court Reporter: Theresa Casal/CRD: Maria Blunt). (mab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar with civil trial 3:10-cv-597 Miller v. City of Ithaca, et al., the Sentencing has been reset for 8/31/2016 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, the Sentencing has been reset for 6/14/2016 at 02:00 PM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Sentencing has been reset for 3/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to USA. Attorney Gwendolyn E. Carroll terminated. (dpk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Iani S. Tassev: Attorney Representation Hearing set for 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (jel, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece: AUSA Dan Hanlon; Gaspar Castillo, Esq.; Bond Hearing as to Iani S. Tassev held on 5/13/2011; Judge advises Deft that he is setting the bond and conditions of release in accordance with direction of Judge Sharpe. Bond is set in the amount of $1,000,000 to be secured by $500,000 (property) and signatures of two financially secure individuals; Deft is remanded to be transported to the Eastern District of New York on pending charges. (rzh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 332 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?