County of Erie, New York v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00157-WMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 12:37 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Erie, New York, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
ORDER making the 38 USCA Mandate the judgment of this Court. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 4/11/13. (SG) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 35 Notice of Appeal filed by County of Erie, New York; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (SG) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE by County of Erie, New York Second Circuit Court of Appeals Order lifting automatic bankruptcy stay (Duggan, James) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by County of Erie, New York. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0209-1576202. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE by County of Erie, New York Consent to Change Attorney (Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT in favor of Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. against County of Erie, New York. Signed by Michael J. Roemer, Clerk of Court on 3/27/12. (SG) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING the Amended Complaint; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/25/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by County of Erie, New York Substitution of Counsel for plaintiff County of Erie (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Parker, Michelle) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F. Kirkpatrick, Jr on behalf of County of Erie, New York (Kirkpatrick, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Declaration of Barry, # 5 Memorandum in Support, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss, 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) filed by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT Corrected in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss, 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) filed by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Defendants' 22 Request for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the ten page limit is GRANTED. Defendants' brief shall not exceed 20 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 5/12/2010. (MEAL) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss, 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) filed by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss, 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) filed by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Reply, Motion to Dismiss) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp..(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Pursuant to Western District of New York Local Rule 83.2. GRANTING Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc.'s 20 Motion to proceed without local counsel. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. (MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                        MOTION To Proceed Without Local Counsel by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File its response to Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is now due 5/12/2010. Defendants' deadline to file replies is now 6/1/2010. FURTHER, Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Schedule Status Conference is DENIED as unnecessary. This District's mediation program does not stay consideration of dispositive or other motions. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/24/2010. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) filed by County of Erie, New York. (Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION signed by James J. Duggan filed by County of Erie, New York filed by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-NTSB Report, # 2 Exhibit B- Damages Spreadsheet, # 3 Exhibit C- Original Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D- Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT and Certificate of Service against all defendants, filed by County of Erie, New York.(Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Joinder with the Multi-District Litigation and Certificate of Service by County of Erie, New York.(Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants Motion to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to schedule a status conference filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to schedule status conference by County of Erie (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Duggan, James) Modified to show as pending motion on 4/15/2010 (SG). (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants Motion to Dismiss by County of Erie, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Duggan, James) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER on 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/21/2010. Reply due by 5/11/2010. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss (Amended - correcting signature blocks/filing error as directed by Clerk) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Memorandum in Support (Amended), # 3 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver K. Beiersdorf on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Notice only) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) Modified filers on 3/31/2010 (SG). (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Harrington on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dimiss, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service upon defendants served on Continental Airlines, Colgan Air and Pinnacle Airlines on 3/9/2010, filed by County of Erie, New York. (Duggan, James) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING the Amended Complaint; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/25/2012. (MEAL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT against Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 16956.), filed by County of Erie, New York.(SG) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?