216 Jamaica Avenue v. S & R Playhouse Realty Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01288
District Judge Christopher A. Boyko, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 216 Jamaica Avenue, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by elect judge don adams Campaign

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B. Niehaus +1 216 515 1660 jniehaus@frantzward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G. Keim +1 216 515 1629 +1 216 515 1650 ckeim@frantzward.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
No Logo S & R Playhouse Realty Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly H. Little +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 holly.armstrong@thompsonhine.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary L. Walters +1 216 566 5730 +1 216 566 5800 gary.walters@thompsonhine.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Williger +1 216 566 5655 +1 216 566 5800 stephen.williger@thompsonhine.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 70 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Court Filing
Stipulation and Order of Case Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and the Court's minute order of August 5, 2009, the parties stipulate to the dismissal of this case with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 08/19/09. (M,M) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
    LREF
    Blank 69 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009
    Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 68 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Court Filing
      Notice of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 8/5/2009 at 10:00 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Plaintiff shall initiate the call, join opposing counsel and this Court at (216) 357-7151. (M,M) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
        LREF
        Blank 67 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Court Filing
        Order denying as moot Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 48 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 06/30/09.(M,M) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
          LREF
          Blank 66 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009
          Joint Status Report of Mediation filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
            LREF
            Blank 65 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009
            Joint Motion for to Amend the Schedule filed by Plaintiff 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
              LREF
              Blank 64 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Court Filing
              Trial Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 04/06/09. (M,M) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                LREF
                Blank 63 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009
                Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 62 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009
                  Unopposed Motion for a Rescheduled Status Conference filed by Plaintiff 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                    LREF
                    Blank 61 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Court Filing
                    Notice of Hearing. Status/Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2009 10:00 AM in Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Lead counsel only required to attend. (M,M) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                      LREF
                      Blank 60 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009
                      Attorney Appearance by Holly H. Armstrong filed by on behalf of S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Armstrong, Holly) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                        LREF
                        Blank 59 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Court Filing
                        Order granting in part Defendant S&R's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer Instanter and Orders the Amended Answer filed no later than March 4, 2009. The Court will contact the parties to set a new discovery schedule (Related Doc # 50 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 02/25/09.(M,M) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                          LREF
                          Blank 58 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009
                          Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or For Leave to File Surreply filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 57 . (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                            LREF
                            Blank 57 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008
                            Opposition to 56 Motion to strike or For Leave to File Surreply filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uszak v. Yellow Transportation, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B - Coveney v. U.S. Bank, # 3 Exhibit C - Cenveo v. Tant)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                              LREF
                              Blank 56 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008
                              Motion to strike or For Leave to File Surreply filed by Plaintiff 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 54 , 55 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A : Plaintiff's Proposed Surreply, # 2 Exhibit B -- Whiteside v. Parrish, # 3 Exhibit C -- 1988 Tenant Estoppel Certificate, FCID 0008-12, # 4 Exhibit D -- 1988 Tenant Estoppel Certificate, FCID 0113-17, # 5 Exhibit E -- 9/29-06 Letter from G. Walters to J. Niehaus, # 6 Exhibit F -- 12/22/88 Memo from P. Tenenbaum to R. Marques, # 7 Exhibit G -- 12/28/98 Letter from P. Tenenbaum to J. Krogalecki, # 8 Exhibit H -- 12/27/88 Note from P. Tenenbaum to "Sam", # 9 Exhibit I -- Kegg v. Mansfield, # 10 Exhibit J -- Westgate Village Shopping Ctr. v. Lion Dry Goods Co., # 11 Exhibit K -- Cenveo, Inc. v. Tant)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                LREF
                                Blank 55 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008
                                Reply to response to 51 Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 54 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008
                                  Reply to response to 50 Motion for leave to Amend Answer Instanter filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 53 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008
                                    Opposition to 51 Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Gary L. Walters, # 2 Exhibit B: Longazel v. Fort Dearborn Life Ins. Co, # 3 Exhibit C: In re Aredia & Zometa Prods. Liab. Litig., # 4 Exhibit D: Slam Jams II v. Capitol Indem. Corp., # 5 Exhibit E: Scott v. City of Dayton, # 6 Exhibit F: Nelson v. Tenn. Gas Pipeline Co., # 7 Exhibit G: 9-11-06 Lehn to Walters, # 8 Exhibit H: 9-29-06 Walters to Niehaus, # 9 Exhibit I: Def.'s First Request for Prod. of Docs., # 10 Exhibit J: S&R Subpoena of Halle Cleveland LLC, # 11 Exhibit K: Affidavit of Robert Quesada, # 12 Exhibit L: Deed, # 13 Exhibit M: Affidavit of William Ross, # 14 Exhibit N: Pl.'s Notice of Dep. of Def. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), # 15 Exhibit O: Deposotion of Patrick Lott, # 16 Exhibit P: Affidavit of Thomas R. Ketteler)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 52 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008
                                      Opposition to 50 Motion for leave to Amend Answer Instanter filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Jacobs v. Jacobs, # 2 Exhibit B -- Broad v. Barnes, # 3 Exhibit C -- Rogan v. Lane, # 4 Exhibit D -- Maiden v. APA Transp. Corp., # 5 Exhibit E -- Kegg v. Mansfield, # 6 Exhibit F -- Deed, # 7 Exhibit G -- Affidavit of Robert Quesada, # 8 Exhibit H -- Venner Deposition Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit I -- 2001 Certificate, # 10 Exhibit J -- Frank B. Thomas Trust v. Imperial 400 Nat'l, Inc., # 11 Exhibit K -- Hill v. City of Urbana, # 12 Exhibit L -- Hatry v. Painesville & Youngstown Ry. Co., # 13 Exhibit M -- Kilgus v. Minnesota Mut. Life Ins., # 14 Exhibit N -- Hill v. Osborne, # 15 Exhibit O -- Bahner's Auto Parts v. Banher)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008
                                        Motion to continue Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F) filed by Defendant S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendant S&R Playhouse Realty Co.'s Motion for Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F), # 2 Exhibit Motion for Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F), # 3 Exhibit Motion for Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F), # 4 Exhibit Motion for Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F), # 5 Exhibit Motion for Continuance Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 56(F))(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 50 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008
                                          Motion for leave to Amend Answer Instanter filed by Defendant S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support for Motion to Amend Answer, # 2 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, # 3 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend Answer)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 49 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008
                                            True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The judgment of the District Court is reversed and the case is remanded as to 44 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 07-3967). Date issued as mandate 9/22/08 (H, SP) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 48 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              Motion for summary judgment (Renewed) filed by Plaintiff 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 29 , 20 , 26 . (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                Information Copy of opinion from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The judgment of the District Court is reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion re 44 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 07-3967). This is not a mandate order. Circuit Judges: Keith and Sutton, District Judge: Ackerman. Date issued by USCA 8/27/08 (Attachments: # 1 Judgment) (H, SP) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                                                  First Address Change Notice by David H. Thompson, Charles J. Cooper filed by on behalf of 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007
                                                    Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of 44 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 07-3967). Date filed in USCA 7/31/07. (H, SP) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to USCA for the 6th Circuit from 7/2/07 opinion and judgment 42 and 43 filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Filing fee $455 paid; receipt number 2557906) (Cooper, Charles) Modified text 7/20/2007 (C, K). (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                        Judgment Entry in favor of S & R Playhouse Realty Co. against 216 Jamaica Avenue re 42 Order on Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 07/02/07.(M,M) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                          Opinion and Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 20 ); granting Defendant's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 21 ). Signed by Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 07/02/07.(M,M) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                            Reply in support of 35 Motion for leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Notice of deposition -- S&R 30(b)(6))# 2 Exhibit B (Collateral Mortgage Modification Agreement (Dec. 19, 2001))# 3 Exhibit C (Collateral Assignment of Leases and Rents (Feb. 15, 1995))# 4 Exhibit D (Confidential Memorandum No. 48 (Sept. 17, 1984)))(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Deposition Transcript (copy) of Stuart Venner taken on December 14-15, 2006. Complete document on file, (Volume 1) 145 pages; (Volume 2) 109 pages. filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co. Related document(s) 37 . (E,P) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Deposition Transcript (copy) of Grace Chang Venner taken on 12/14/06. Complete document on file, 46 pages. filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 38 . (E,P) Modified filing date on 5/14/2007 (E, P). (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007
                                                                  Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Grace Chang Venner filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007
                                                                    Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Stuart Venner filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                      Supplemental Memorandum In Support of 21 Motion for summary judgment and Opposed to Plaintiff 216 Jamaica's Supplemental Motion in Support of Summary Judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Transcript# 2 Exhibit B Transcript# 3 Exhibit C Transcript)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                                                        Motion for leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Patrick M. Lott)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007
                                                                          Motion for leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Instanter Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                            Motion for leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Instanter Motion for Leave to File Supplement To Defendant's Motion for SUmmary Judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief# 2 Exhibit B - Ketteler Deposition)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006
                                                                              Reply to response to Motion for leave to file Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 30 . (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/27/2006)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                                                Opposition to Motion for leave to file Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 30 . (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
                                                                                  Motion for leave to file Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 21 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment))(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006
                                                                                    Reply to response to Motion for summary judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 20 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Equitable Life v. Freda)# 2 Exhibit B (Zilka v. Central South)# 3 Exhibit C (Davis v. DiFilippo))(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006
                                                                                      Reply to response to Motion for summary judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 21 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                        Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 21 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K)(Walters, Gary) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                          Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 21 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit December 2005 estoppel certificate)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006
                                                                                            Opposition to Emergency Motion for extension of summary judgment briefing schedule and to hold in temporary abeyance the depostion of Mr. Thomas Ketteler filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 23 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                              Opposition to Motion for leave (Instanter) to file supplement to defendant's motion for summary judgment filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 22 . (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                                Emergency Motion for extension of summary judgment briefing schedule and to hold in temporary abeyance the depostion of Mr. Thomas Ketteler filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                                                                                                  Motion for leave (Instanter) to file supplement to defendant's motion for summary judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                    Motion for summary judgment filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 15 . (Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                      Motion for summary judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Plaintiff 216 Jamaica Avenue LLC for Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum# 4 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(f))(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                                                                        Answer to Amended Complaint (Related Doc # 17 ) filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                                                                                          First Submission fo Joint Stipulated Facts filed by all parties. (Walters, Gary) Modified on 9/13/2006 (S, R). (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                                                                                            Amended complaint with Jury Demand against S & R Playhouse Realty Co. Filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Niehaus, James) Modified on 9/13/2006 (S, R). (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                                                                                              Motion to withdraw document Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. Related document(s) 15 . (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                Motion to dismiss filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                                                                                                  Initial Disclosures filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Walters, Gary) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                    Joint Proposed Stipulation and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead filed by S & R Playhouse Realty Co.. (Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                                                                      Report of Parties' Planning Meeting under Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Niehaus, James) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                                                                                                        Attorney Appearance by Christopher G. Keim filed by on behalf of 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Keim, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee 190, receipt number 14660002411. filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Filing fee paid; receipt number 14660002411. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Niehaus, James) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                            Motion for attorney David M. Lehn to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee 190, receipt number 14660002411. filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Filing fee paid; receipt number 14660002411. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Niehaus, James) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                              Motion for attorney David H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee 190, receipt number 14660002411. filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Filing fee paid; receipt number 14660002411. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Niehaus, James) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                                                                                Joint Motion for extension of time until August 7, 2006 to answer , Move or Otherwise Plead filed by all parties. (Williger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/15/2006 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 15B before Honorable Christopher A. Boyko. Signed by Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 06/22/06. (Attachments: # 1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(M, M) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed upon S & R Playhouse Realty Co. by Personal Service on May 26, 2006 filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue (Niehaus, James) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                      Praecipe to issue summons for defendant filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. Related document(s) 1 . (M, P) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Hemann (M, P) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                                                                                                            Complaint with jury demand against S & R Playhouse Realty Co. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 14660001383.). Filed by 216 Jamaica Avenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(M, P) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?