Gellman v. ADT Security Services Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00282
Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 1:43 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tobi Gellman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Califf Teal Cooper +1 713 581 3013 +1 713 581 3020 califf@ahtlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
No Logo ADT Security Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Napco Security Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Telular Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Visonic Inc, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo ADT Security Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Haltom Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jdoan@haltomdoan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
Space James Patrick Kelley +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 patkelley@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin N. Benn +1 312 521 2770 +1 312 521 2870 mbenn@muchshelist.com
Space Steven P. Blonder +1 312 521 2000 sblonder@muchshelist.com
Space James P. Hanrath +1 312 521 2760 jhanrath@muchshelist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
Space CHARLES S. MARION +1 215 981 4119 +1 215 754 4291 marionc@pepperlaw.com
Space M. Kelly Tillery +1 215 981 4000 +1 215 981 4750 tilleryk@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan Day Vaughan +1 806 775 1100 +1 806 775 7930 morgandvaughan@gmail.com
No Logo Alarm.com Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Alarm.com Incorporated"
No Logo Bosch Security Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diebold, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Diebold, Incorporated"
No Logo Digital Security Controls, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Europlex Technologies (USA) Inc., Defendant
No Logo Napco Security Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert B. Reizner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Robert Mugno +1 212 925 3474 +1 212 925 3665 johnmugno@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Aline Abraham +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 aa@rothfirm.com
Space Brendan Clay Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 br@rothfirm.com
No Logo Numerex Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Numerex Corp."
No Logo Protection One, Inc., Defendant
Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. Siemens Building Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Telular Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tyco Fire & Security LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder ngalli@beneschlaw.com
No Logo Visonic Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Collin Michael Maloney +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julianne Marie Hartzell +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 jhartzell@marshallip.com
Space Benjamin T Horton +1 312 474 6300 bhorton@marshallip.com
Space Thomas Irving Ross +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 tross@marshallip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Tobi Gellman, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (199) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 196 Notice of Appeal filed by Tobi Gellman # 1 opinion) (ehs, ). (Entered: 01/12/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
    USCA JUDGMENT as to 196 Notice of Appeal filed by Tobi Gellman. Judgment affirmed the decision of the district court (no mandate issued) (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
      USCA Case Number 2011-1196 for 196 Notice of Appeal filed by Tobi Gellman. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 194 Memorandum & Opinion, 195 Order Dismissing Case, by Tobi Gellman. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-2840104. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER DISMISSING CASE - In light of the Courts memorandum opinion and order dismissing Plaintiffs complaint without prejudice for lack of standing (Dkt. No. 194), the remaining motions pending before the Court are denied as moot. All claims, counterclaims, and defenses are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Because standing to bring this civil action depends on legal rather than equitable title, and all parties holding legal title were not joined as Plaintiffs, Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of standing is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may refile in the future if she gains full legal title to the patent in suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Tobi Gellman, Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visonic Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants be granted an extension of the letter briefing deadlin for seeking permission to file motions for summary judgment and motions to strike expert testimony/Daubert motions as contained in the January 15, 2010 Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 134) through and including November 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Briefing by Telular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 189 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Deadline for seeking permission to file motions for summary judgment and motions to strike expert testimony/Daubert motions as contained in the 1/15/2010 Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 134) through and including 10/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/10/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visonic Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to 186 Supplemental Brief re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing filed by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visonic Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Hartzell, Julianne) Modified on 9/2/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jennifer Doan and Morgan Vaughan of the law firm of Haltom & Doan and Marvin Benn, James Hanrath, and Steven Blonder of the law firm of Much Shelist Denenberg Ament & Rubenstein, PC, are hereby withdrawn as attorneys of record for ADT Security Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                            SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing : Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Tobi Gellman. (Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 8/27/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO DISMISS held on 8/18/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (55 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2010. (tja, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 8/18/2010, Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2010 re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing filed by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Tobi Gellman Regarding Need for Third Party Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subponea Notices of: D. Scott Hemingway; Elizabeth Ann Seivert Ganter; Lynnea Rose Seivert Hall; and Susan Louis Seivert Armanovs)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment That Claim 21 Of The '451 Patent Is Invalid For Failure To Provide A Written Description Of The Claimed Invention And For Indefiniteness filed by Visonic Inc. (Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by James Seivert Heirs Second Supplement Status Report on Status of Subpoenas, Search For Documents and Production of Responsive, Non-Privileged Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4, Email Agreement, Order Quashing Subpoena, and Cover Letters)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment That Claim 21 Of The '451 Patent Is Invalid For Failure To Provide A Written Description Of The Claimed Invention And For Indefiniteness filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                            Plaintiff's REPLY Claim Construction Brief to 177 Defendants' Claim Construction Brief, filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visonic Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment That Claim 21 Of The '451 Patent Is Invalid For Failure To Provide A Written Description Of The Claimed Invention And For Indefiniteness by Visonic Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julianne Hartzell in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER - granting 168 Unopposed Motion for Hearing on their Motion to Dismiss 160 Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Plainitff's Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER - On 6/25/2010, the court granted leave for the defendant Visionic, Inc. to file its motion for summary judgment. The court amends the prior order to allow all defendants to move jointly for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/25/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER - granting 166 Notice of letter requesting permission to file a motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 6/25/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Compliance by Tobi Gellman re 134 Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ehs, ) Modified on 6/23/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of compliance by Visionic Inc. re 166 Notice seeking leave to file a motion for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rml, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Tobi Gellman re 166 Notice (Other) Filing Answer Letter Brief to Defendants Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by James Seivert Heirs of Motions to Quash Third Party Subpoenas Issued by Tobi Gellman in Other Courts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Quash, N.D. Texas Subpoenas, # 2 Exhibit B, Motion to Quash, S.D. Texas Subpoenas)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Visionic Inc. of Letter Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing filed by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc.. (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Patent Local Rule 4-3 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART and Prehearing Statement filed by Tobi Gellman, Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc. (Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Tobi Gellman in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, # 2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Tobi Gellman, # 3 Exhibit B: Declaration of Tobi Gellman, # 4 Exhibit C: Declaration of Tobi Gellman, # 5 Exhibit D: Declaration of Tobi Gellman, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Telular Corporation (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 160 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Standing by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Benn)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Vaughan, Morgan) Modified on 4/26/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Benn)(Vaughan, Morgan) Modified on 4/26/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc. pursuant to patent Rule 4-2 (Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Tobi Gellman (Plaintiff served it's Claim Construction and the Identification of Extrinsic Evidence on all remaining Defendants pursuant to Patent Rule 4-2) (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 154 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff and Dft ADT Security Systems Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorney fees, costs of court and expenses are to be borne by party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 4/13/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice for ADT Security Services, Inc. Only by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Collin Michael Maloney terminated as counsel for Visonic Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Visionic Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Tobi Gellman of Service of Plaintiff's Preliminary Damages Computation (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Tobi Gellman of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by ADT Security Services Inc, Napco Security Systems, Inc., Telular Corporation, Visionic Inc. regarding Compliance with PR 4-1 (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Tobi Gellman (Plaintiff Served its Additional Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Order - Dkt. # 133) (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by ADT Security Services Inc (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by ADT Security Services Inc of Compliance with P.R.3-3 and 3-4 (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Napco Security Systems, Inc. PR 3-3 & 3-4 (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Napco Security Systems, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Visionic Inc. (Hartzell, Julianne) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Telular Corporation of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Telular Corporation (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Protective Order Entry by Telular Corporation, ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Appendix A - Undertaking of Experts and Consultants Regarding Protective Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles S Marion for ADT Security Services Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-21175 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney M Kelly Tillery for ADT Security Services Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-21175 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of ADT Security Services Inc (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Napco Security Systems, Inc. (Roth, Brendan) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2010., Discovery due by 11/15/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2010., Markman Hearing set for 8/18/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 2/18/2011., Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2011., Jury Selection set for 3/1/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Tobi Gellman (Plaintiff served its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions on all remaining defendants pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2) (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of ADT Security Services Inc (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Kelley on behalf of ADT Security Services Inc (Kelley, James) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Telular Corporation, ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed docket control order, # 2 Exhibit B - proposed discovery order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2010: # 3 REVISED Discovery Order, # 4 Appendix C to Discovery Order, # 5 Revised Docket Control Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 127 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jack Wesley Hill for Visionic Inc.. Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr terminated as counsel for Dft Visionic Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Visionic Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/30/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. In view of the holidays, the parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on January 14, 2010. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreements concerning these orders, the parties shall submit to the court their competing proposals along with a summary of their disagreements. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems January 29, 2010 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on January 14, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/24/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 120 Motion to Dismiss deft Europlex Technologies without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 119 Motion to Dismiss deft Digital Security Controls Inc without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 118 Motion to Dismiss deft Bosch Security Systems without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Europlex Technologies (USA) Inc. Without Prejudice by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Digital Security Controls, Inc. Without Prejudice by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Bosch Security Systems, Inc. Without Prejudice by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill terminated for Defendants Visonic Inc. and Tyco Fire & Security LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/8/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Visionic Inc., Tyco Fire & Security LLC (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Visionic Inc., Tyco Fire & Security LLC (Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Visionic Inc., Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Tobi Gellman (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Corby R. Vowell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - granting 84 Notice of Dismissal. Dft Alarm.com, Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension to Respond to Defendant Tyco Fire & Security LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's deadline to respond is September 4, 2009. Defendant's deadline to file Reply is September 14, 2009. Plaintiff may conduct limited discovery as outlined herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on August 7, 2009. (jml) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Tyco Fire & Security LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplement)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 Motion to Dismiss deft Siemens Building Technologies Inc without prejudice,each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/16/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Siemens Building Technologies, Inc.)(Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEASE IGNORE, THIS DOCUMENT IS MOOT SINCE ATTORNEY IS HAVING TO REFILE DOC #103 NOTICE by Tobi Gellman Notice of Errata regarding the Notice of Dismissal Against Defendant Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - "Correct" Notice of Dismissal of Siemens)(Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 7/15/2009 (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE AS A MOTION NOTICE by Tobi Gellman of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Dismissal with Prejudice against Defendant Siemens)(Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 7/15/2009 (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Tyco Fire & Security LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tyco Fire & Security LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International Ltd for Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Tyco Fire & Security LLC re 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Filing Corrected Affidavit (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney M Kelly Tillery for Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-18361 (ch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicole D Galli for Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-18361 (ch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Siemens Building Technologies Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 6/16/2009 (djh, ). (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 86 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Visonic Inc. by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Tyco has up to and including June 19, 2009, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/21/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 73 Amended Complaint for Tyco Fire & Casuality by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Visionic Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Visonic Marketing, Ltd., Corporate Parent Visonic Limited for Visionic Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas I Ross for Visionic Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-17959. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin T Horton for Visionic Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-17959. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julianne Hartzell for Visionic Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-17959. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Telular Corporation by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 79 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of ADT Security Services, Inc. by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Tobi Gellman by Visionic Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Siemens has up to and including June 15, 2009, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/11/09. (ch, ) Modified on 5/11/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Tobi Gellman of Dismissal With Prejudice of Alarm.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 73 Amended Complaint for Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Tyco Fire & Security LLC served on 5/4/2009, answer due 5/26/2009. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding motions to be submitted in recently filed patent cases. Proceedures for filing set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/30/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Telular's ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Tobi Gellman(As Trustee of the MML Trust) by Telular Corporation.(Benn, Marvin) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Tobi Gellman(As Trustee of the MML Trust) by ADT Security Services Inc.(Benn, Marvin) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Visionic Inc. served on 4/21/2009 CM RRR, answer due 5/11/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Siemens Building Technologies, Inc. served on 4/22/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 5/12/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Bosch Security Systems, Inc. served on 4/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 5/11/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Alarm.com Incorporated served on 4/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 5/11/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated, Visionic Inc., Bosch Security Systems, Inc., Siemens Building Technologies, Inc., Tyco Fire & Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Bosch Security, # 2 Siemens Building Tech, # 3 Tyco Fire & Security, # 4 Visonic Inc)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to File pltf's first amended complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/15/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER from USCA for the Federal Circuit denying the petition for a writ of mandamus Misc #899 (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Day Vaughan on behalf of Telular Corporation, ADT Security Services Inc (Vaughan, Morgan) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Federal Circuit assigned Petition for writ of mandamus filed on 2/26/09 MISC No 899 (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Corby R. Vowell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Defendant ADT Security Services, Inc.'s Limited Objection to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 61 Notice of Pltf's Voluntary Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice of claims against Numerex Corp. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/3/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 - U.S.P. 6,075,451, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 63 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Telular Corporation by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/20/2008, Entered: 9/20/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Tobi Gellman by Telulr Corporation.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION that the dfts have failed to satisfy their burden of showing either that this court l acks personal jurisdiction over them or that there is good cause that necessitates a transfer in this case. The court finds that the competing factors do n ot justify a transfer. Dfts' motion to is denied. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/10/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Tobi Gellman Of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims Against Numerex Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Numerex deadline reset to 8/30/08 to file answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/1/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint for Numerex by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Numerex deadline is extended to 7/30/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/2/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint For Numerex Corp. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Numerex deadline is extended to 6/30/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/13/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Numerex Corp. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Mugno for Napco Security Systems, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3770. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Numerex deadline is extended to 5/30/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/8/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint For Numerex Corp. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Napco Security Systems, Inc. by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Napco Security Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Tobi Gellman by Napco Security Systems, Inc..(Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 4/15/08 for deft Numerex. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for deft Napco extended to 4/15/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint : Agreed Motion for Extension for Numerex Corp. to Respond to the Complaint. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension for Napco Security Systems to Respond to the Complaint by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal Document. Defendant Telular Corporation is permitted to and is hereby directed to file its reply to Plaintiffs opposition to motion to dismiss or transfer venue, along with all exhibits and attachments thereto, under seal with the Court. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief, 43 MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed Motion to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Under Seal) filed by Telulr Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed Motion to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Under Seal) by Telulr Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File Pltf's opposition to Telular's motion to dismiss or transfer under seal. Document # 38 filed under seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/5/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File :Unopposed Motion to for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Telular Corporation Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Under Seal by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Telular Corporation Notice of Service of Discovery (Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories) (Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 3/3/2009 (ehs, ). (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Tobi Gellman. (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Vowell Declaration# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F)(Goldstein, Edward) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief, 25 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/3/2008, Deft. Replies due by 3/13/2008.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/25/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief, 25 MOTION to Change Venue - Unopposed Motion by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Napco's deadline is extended to 3/15/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/15/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Numerex deadline is extended to 3/15/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/15/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Napco Security Systems, Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Numerex Corp. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/2/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Reply/ ANSWER to Counterclaim of ADT Security Services, Inc by Tobi Gellman.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Napco deadline is extended to 1/18/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/19/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Napco Security Systems, Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marvin Benn for ADT Security Services Inc, James P Hanrath for Telular Corporation,ADT Security Services Inc,ADT Security Services Inc, Steven P Blonder for Telular Corporation,ADT Security Services Inc,ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 PHV James Hanrath# 2 PHV Steven Blonder (RECEIPT 5-1-1186))(rml, ) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Motion to Change Venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Change Venue by ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by ADT Security Services Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 1/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer and Supporting Brief by Telular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of George Brody)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Telular Corporation, ADT Security Services Inc (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Numerex set for 1/15/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/20/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Napco Security Systems to answer set for 12/19/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/20/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Numerex Corp. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint for Napco Security Systems, Inc. by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ADT Security Services, Inc. and Telular Corporation deadline is extended to 12/9/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/14/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Agreed Motion to Enlarge Time for Defendants ADT Security Services, Inc. and Telular Corporation to Answer, Object, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Napco Security Systems, Inc. served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Europlex Technologies (USA) Inc. served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Numerex Corp. served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. Telular Corporation served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tobi Gellman. ADT Security Services Inc served on 10/29/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - granting 6 Notice of Dismissal. Dft Diebold Incorporated is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - grantin 7 Notice of Dismissal. Protection One, Inc. is with dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Tobi Gellman (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Tobi Gellman of Voluntary Dismissal as to Protection One, Inc. ONLY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward). Modified on 10/11/2007 to add corrected proposed order (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Tobi Gellman of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Diebold, Incorporated ONLY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corby R Vowell on behalf of Tobi Gellman (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Tobi Gellman of Filing Form AO 120 (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document (EXHIBIT): 1 Complaint.. (Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 7/10/2007 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Telular Corporation, Numerex Corp., ADT Security Services Inc, Diebold, Incorporated, Digital Security Controls, Inc., Europlex Technologies (USA) Inc., Napco Security Systems, Inc., Protection One, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1184492.), filed by Tobi Gellman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 List of Parties)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?