Soverain Software LLC v. CDW Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:07-cv-00511-LED
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 10:45 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cdw Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Duston

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Juister +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 cjuister@marshallip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Newegg, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Redcats Usa, LP, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TONYA R. DEEM +1 336 607 7485 +1 336 734 2653 tdeem@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Systemax, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2008 Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

No Logo The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TONYA R. DEEM +1 336 607 7485 +1 336 734 2653 tdeem@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo TigerDirect, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

No Logo Zappos.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Duston

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2008 Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Theodore T. Herhold +1 650 326 2400 +1 650 326 2422 ttherhold@townsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Juister +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 cjuister@marshallip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C. Nielsen +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 MNielsen@marshallip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Redcats USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TONYA R. DEEM +1 336 607 7485 +1 336 734 2653 tdeem@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clark Craddock +1 212 326 8320 +1 212 755 7306 ccraddock@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 02/15/2011 Jennifer Seraphine +1 415 875 5892 +1 415 875 5700 jseraphine@jonesday.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stela Cristina Tipi +2123263 939 326 8311 +1 212 755 7306 schincisan@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/15/2011 Kenneth Robert Adamo +1 312 862 2671 +1 312 862 2200 kradamo@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/15/2011 Thomas L Giannetti +1 212 596 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Aline Abraham +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 aa@rothfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan Clay Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 br@rothfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com
No Logo Systemax, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2008 Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

No Logo Michael Philip Patterson, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Mike Patterson Mediation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Philip Patterson +1 903 592 4433 mike@mikepattersonmediation.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (490) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Bill of Costs
BILL OF COSTS by Newegg Inc. Costs Taxed in the amount of $60,507.32. (mll, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Order on Motion for Bill of CostsCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [470] Motion for Bill of Costs. The clerk shall tax costs to Newegg in the amount of $60,507.32. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/12/14. (mll, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014, Terminated: 2/12/2014 Motion for Bill of Costs
      Agreed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Bill of Costs, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B-1 to Declaration, # (4) Exhibit B-2 to Declaration, # (5) Exhibit B-3 to Declaration, # (6) Exhibit B-4 to Declaration, # (7) Exhibit B-5 to Declaration, # (8) Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [468] Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing the bill of costs in this matter is hereby extended to 2-10-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/24/14. (mll, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014, Terminated: 1/24/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Order on Motion for Release of Bond ObligationCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [466] Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. The supersedeas bond posted by Newegg to stay execution of this Court's Final Judgment is hereby discharged, released, and exonerated, and the surety of such bond, as well as its parents, affiliates and subsidiaries, are hereby released from any and all past, present or future liability in connection with the issuance of this bond. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/13. (mll, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013, Terminated: 12/9/2013 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation
              Unopposed MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [464] Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs; denying as moot [463] Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/13. (mll, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013, Terminated: 10/7/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Newegg Inc.'s Bill of Costs by Newegg Inc., Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013, Terminated: 10/7/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Bill of Costs by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 USCA MandateCourt Filing
                      MANDATE of US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in accordance with the judgment of this Court, as to [449] Notice of Appeal filed by Newegg Inc. REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART. Circuit Judges: Newman, Prost, and Reyna (Attachments: # (1) USCA Judgment, # (2) USCA Opinion)(dlc, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 USCA JudgmentCourt Filing
                        USCA JUDGMENT confirming claim 34 is representative of the "shopping cart" claims, including claim 35, and conclude that dependent claim 35 is invalid on the ground of obviousness as to [449] Notice of Appeal-FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Newegg Inc. The court's judgment is amended accordingly. Rehearing Granted; Judgment Amended. Circuit Judges: Newman, Prost, and Reyna. (dlc, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Appeal Remark
                          Appeal Remark re [445] Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, [449] Notice of Appeal : Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion. JUDGMENT reversing in part, vacating in part. The mandate will be issued in due course. (mll, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [449] Notice of Appeal - transmitting one CD of documents no. 170-458 and one CD of sealed documents. Fed Ex tracking no. 869464879150. (mjc, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [452] Motion to Withdraw Jones Day as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re [452] MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC of Ruling by Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Jan. 27, 2011 Order)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [452] MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC in response to opposition filed by Soverain [455] filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [452] MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC , Pro Se, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [452] MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC , Reply to Sealed Response [ECF No. 453] filed by Newegg, Inc., filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [452] MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Baldauf, Kent) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: # (3) Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 452 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010, Terminated: 2/15/2011 Motion to Withdraw
                                          MOTION to Withdraw of Jones Day as Counsel for Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                            NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA Federal Circuit re [445] Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Newegg Inc., [449] Notice of Appeal filed by Newegg Inc.. USCA Case Number 2011-1009 (mll, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Appeal Remark
                                              Appeal Remark re [445] Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, [449] Notice of Appeal : Received by USCA Federal Circuit on 10-08-10. (mll, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010, Terminated: 9/4/2013 Notice of Appeal
                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [435] Judgment,,,,,, [448] Order on Sealed Motion, by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert) Modified on 10/6/2010 (mjc, ). (Edited text to add Amended.)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [442] Sealed Motion; denying [443] Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10 (mll, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                    Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re [445] Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE (mll, ) Modified on 10/1/2010 (mll, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Newegg Inc. (mll, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Newegg Inc. (mll, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 445 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to [435] Judgment,,,,,, by Newegg Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-2663849. (Baldauf, Kent)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [443] SEALED MOTION Newegg's Renewed Post-Judgment Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur, [442] SEALED MOTION Newegg's Renewed Post-Judgment Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010, Terminated: 10/1/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                              SEALED MOTION Newegg's Renewed Post-Judgment Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 442 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010, Terminated: 10/1/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                SEALED MOTION Newegg's Renewed Post-Judgment Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Order on Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [440] Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/10. cc:attys 9-02-10 (mll, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010, Terminated: 9/2/2010 Motion for Bond
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Bond Newegg Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond for Purpose of Obtaining A Stay Pending Appeal by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Supersedeas Bond, # (2) Power of Attorney of James E. Bass, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Bill of Costs
                                                                      BILL OF COSTS by Soverain Software LLC. Costs Taxed in the amount of $66,246.87. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(mll, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010, Terminated: 8/30/2010 Motion for Bill of Costs
                                                                        MOTION for Bill of Costs (AGREED) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit)(Smith, Debra)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010, Terminated: 8/25/2010 Motion for Bill of Costs
                                                                          MOTION for Bill of Costs (AGREED) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit)(Smith, Debra)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 437, Bill of Costs. PLEASE IGNORE. To be refiled by Attorney*** (gsg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 435 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                              ***REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, See USCA Mandate, Document no. 462***FINAL JUDGMENT. Deft Newegg Inc is found to have unlawfully infringed US Patent Nos 5,715,314; 5,909,492; and 7,272,639. The patents-in-suit are not invalid and are enforceable. The Court awards damages to Soverain Software LLC for Newegg's infringement of the '314 and '492 patents in the amount of $2,500,000. Soverain is further awarded a new trial on damages for Newegg's infringement of the '639 patent, to be held after all appeals have been exhausted. Soverain is further awarded post-verdict damages of $2,900 per day from 5-01-2010 until the date of this Final Judgment. Soverain is further awarded prejudgment interest on the actual damages found by the jury calculated at the prime rate as of the date of this Final Judgment compounded monthly through 7-31-2010 and compounded daily for the month of August, 2010. Soverain is awarded its prejudgment Costs of Court. Soverain is entitled to post-judgment interest for any time period between the entry of this Final Judgment and the date upon which Soverain receives payment from Newegg as ordered herein. For reasons stated in the Court's contemporaneouos Memorandum Opinion and Order, Newegg is ordered for the remaining life of the '314 and '492 patents to pay Soverain an ongoing royalty of $0.15 per infringing transaction. All relief not granted in this Final Judgment is DENIED. All pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10(mll, ) Modified on 9/11/2013 (dlc, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 434 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part [402] Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part [403] Sealed Motion for Permanent Injunction or in the alternative Ongoing Royalties; granting in part [404] Sealed Motion for prejudgment interest, post-verdict damages, and post-judgment interest. All other motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                  Exhibit List: Newegg Inc'S FINAL EXHIBIT LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTED DURING TRIAL (4.26.10 - 4.30.10) (rlf, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                    Exhibit List: Soverain Software LLC's FINAL EXHIBIT LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTED DURING TRIAL (4.26.10 - 4.30.10) (rlf, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Remark
                                                                                      TRIAL EXHIBITS PLACED AND STORED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. (rlf, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post-Verdict Motion Hearing held on 6/29/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 82 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post-Verdict Hearing Proceedings held on 7/22/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 62 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2010. (sms, ) (Transcript sealed by the Court.) Modified on 7/28/2010 (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2010: # (1) Notice) (mjc, ).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [426] Emergency Motion to Strike [425] Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/02/10. cc:attys 7-02-10 (mll, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [426] Emergency MOTION to Strike [425] Sealed Document filed by Newegg Inc.. (Baldauf, Kent)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010, Terminated: 7/2/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Strike [425] Sealed Document by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                  ***STRIKEN PER [428] ORDER*** Sealed Document - Dft Supplemental Submission of Evidence by Newegg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Baldauf, Kent) Modified on 7/1/2010 (sm, ). Modified on 7/2/2010 (mll, ).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    6.29.10 Minute Entry (Post-Verdict Motion Hrg): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post Verdict Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 424 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re [403] SEALED MOTION For an Injunction or, in the Alternative, Ongoing Royalties filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [406] SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2010: # (1) Signature Page of Reply) (gsg, ).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                          Plaintiff Soverain's SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Defendant Newegg's Sealed Motion [407] Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 24 - Grimes testimony, # (2) Exhibit 25 - Tittel testimony, # (3) Exhibit 26 - 4-29-10 PM trial transcript)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to Renewed Motion re [402] Opposed SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Infringement of the 314, 492, and 639 Patents and for a New Trial on 639 Patent Damages filed by Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY In Support of Motion re [406] SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur filed by Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 419 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY In Support of Motion re [407]SEALED MOTION Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial filed by Newegg Inc.(Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [403] SEALED MOTION For an Injunction or, in the Alternative, Ongoing Royalties filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Dr. Jack Grimes, # (2) Declaration of Dr. Michael Shamos)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [404] SEALED MOTION For Prejudgment Interest and Costs, Post-Verdict Damages to Judgment, and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Soverain's SEALED REPLY to Newegg's Response [413] to Soverain's Opposed SEALED MOTION [402] for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Infringement of the 314, 492, and 639 Patents and for a New Trial on 639 Patent Damages filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 13 - Grimes testimony; (2) Exhibit 14 - Shamos testimony; (3) Exhibit 15 - 4-30-10 trial transcript)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Soverain's SEALED RESPONSE to Newegg's Opposed SEALED MOTION (Dkt. 411) To Strike Certain Evidence Submitted in Support of Soverain's Post-Trial Motions filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [404] SEALED MOTION For Prejudgment Interest and Costs, Post-Verdict Damages to Judgment, and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [402] Opposed SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Infringement of the 314, 492, and 639 Patents and for a New Trial on 639 Patent Damages filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit D, #(5) Exhibit E) (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [403] SEALED MOTION For an Injunction or, in the Alternative, Ongoing Royalties filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2, #(3) Exhibit 3, #(4) Exhibit 4)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike Certain Evidence Submitted in Support of Soverain's Post-Trial Motions by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [406] SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4/26/10 AM Tr., # (2) Exhibit 4/26/10 PM Tr., # (3) Exhibit 4/27/10 AM Tr., # (4) Exhibit 4/27/10 PM Tr., # (5) Exhibit 4/28/10 AM Tr., # (6) Exhibit 4/29/10 PM Tr., # (7) Exhibit 4/30/10 Tr., # (8) Exhibit Nawrocki Dep. Tr.)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [407] SEALED MOTION Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Grimes testimony, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Cheng testimony, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Trevor testimony, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Tittel testimony, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Shamos testimony, # (6) Exhibit 6 - 42610 AM transcript, # (7) Exhibit 7 - 43010 transcript, # (8) Exhibit 8 - P-008, # (9) Exhibit 9 - P-014, # (10) Exhibit 10 - P-015, # (11) Exhibit 11 - P-018, # (12) Exhibit 12 - P-027A, # (13) Exhibit 13 - P-038, # (14) Exhibit 14 - P-062A, # (15) Exhibit 15 - P-062B, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Grimes trial demonstratives, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Amazon claim construction order, # (18) Exhibit 18 - P-010, # (19) Exhibit 19 - P-016, # (20) Exhibit 20 - P-017, # (21) Exhibit 21 - P-033, # (22) Exhibit 22 - Golden Hour final judgment, # (23) Exhibit 23 - 41910 PM pretrial hearing transcript)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Order on Motion to RedactTranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [405] Motion to Redact re [389] Transcript. The original page 50 the the transcript of the morning session of the proceedings held before Judge Davis on 4-26-2010 is ordered sealed and that the court reporter shall redact all publicly available versions of the transcript of those proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/25/10. cc:attys 5-26-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 407 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of the Asserted Claims and Alternative Motions for New Trial by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages and Alternative Motion for New Trial or Remittitur by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 5/25/2010 Motion to Redact Transcript
                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Redact [389] Transcript,,, by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION For Prejudgment Interest and Costs, Post-Verdict Damages to Judgment, and Post-Judgment Interest by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Grantley v. Clear Channel, Slip Op., # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION For an Injunction or, in the Alternative, Ongoing Royalties by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, Declaration of K. Wolanyk, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, Declaration of J. Nawrocki, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, Trial Testimony of K. Wolanyk, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, Trial Testimony of C. Bakewell, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, Trial Testimony of J. Nawrocki, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, Ex. P-149, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, Ex. P-245, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, Ex. P-162, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, Trial Testimony of S. Ghosh, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, Trial Testimony of J. Wu, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, Trial Testimony of L. Cheng, # (12) Text of Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Infringement of the 314, 492, and 639 Patents and for a New Trial on 639 Patent Damages by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Grimes testimony, # (2) Exhibit 2 - P-008, # (3) Exhibit 3 - P-027A, # (4) Exhibit 4 - P-038, # (5) Exhibit 5 - P-062A, # (6) Exhibit 6 - P-062B, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Grimes demonstratives, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Pretrial hearing transcript, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Tittel testimony, # (10) Exhibit 10 - P-014, # (11) Exhibit 11 - P-015, # (12) Exhibit 12 - P-018, # (13) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [400] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/21/10. cc:attys 5-21-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010, Terminated: 5/21/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Debra)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Newegg Inc. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: not settled(Patterson, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/29/10- Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger,Telephone number: 903-590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/28/10 - Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, Telephone number: 903-590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/10 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/10 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 392 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 391 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 390 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Sloan/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 389 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shea Sloan/J Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/590-1171. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (lss, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Sealed Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                              Proceedings held on 3/17/10 before Leonard Davis - Sealed Portion of the Transcript. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing Proceedings held on 3/17/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 39 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/19/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. 58 pages. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Proceedings held on 4/19/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 73 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [366] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying [367] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying [368] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying [369] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER appointing Mike Patterson as Mediator in this case. The mediation session should be conducted before 5-24-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that all post-verdict motions be filed by 5-24-2010; responses by 6-07-2010; replies by 6-14-2010; and surreplies by 6-21-2010. The Court sets all post verdict motions for hearing on 6-29-2010 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Filed by Newegg Inc. during Trial (4.26.2010 - 4.30.2010):Main Document: Defendant's Exhibit List 1 Attachments: # (1) - Defendant's Exhibit List 2;# (2) - Defendant's Exhibit List 3; # (3) - Defendant's Exhibit List - Final(rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit Lists Filed by Soverain Software LLC during Jury Trial (4.26.2010 - 4.30.2010):Main Document: Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1A Attachments: # (1) - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1B; # (2) - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2; # (3) - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3;# (4) - Plaintiff's Exhibit List - Final)(rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                Post-Verdict Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Instructions. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF filed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) Modified on 5/5/2010 (kls, ).***(Corrects Entry #370)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [364] Motion to Strike [364] MOTION to Strike The Trevor Trial Testimony. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/30/2010. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 377 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JURY VERDICT. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 375 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Jury Notes. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              4.30.2010 Minute Entry (Jury Trial - Day 5): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 4/30/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #370 Brief filed as Motion PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  4.29.10 Minute Entry (Jury Trial - Day 4): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/29/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Newegg Inc.. (Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 4/30/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - TO BE REFILED*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Supplemental Brief in Suport of, by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) Modified on 4/30/2010 (kls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 369 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 5/6/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 5/6/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 5/6/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 5/6/2010 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Noninfringing Alternatives by Newegg Inc.. (Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010, Terminated: 4/30/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike The Trevor Trial Testimony by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    4.28.10 Minute Entry (Jury Trial - Day 3): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/28/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Soverain's Memorandum in Support of Admitting Summary Charts and Slides Prepared by Soverain's Expert Jack Grimes by Soverain Software LLC. (Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        4.27.10 Minute Entry (Jury Trial - Day 2): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/27/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          4.26.10 Minute Entry (Jury Trial - Day 1): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/26/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: REVISED JOINT PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT SUBMISSION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: Exhibit A: Claim Construction Chart)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [326] Motion to Exclude the Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, the CompuServe Manuals as Corroborating Evidence, and Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony ; granting in part and denying in part [305] Motion in Limine -- GRANTED as to matters 1,9, 14, and 15; DENIED as to matters 8, 12, and 13; denying [306] Sealed Patent Motion in Limine as to matter 2. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/10. cc:attys 4-20-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  4.19.10 Minute Entry (Motion Hearing): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2010 re [306] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine filed by Newegg Inc., [305] MOTION in Limine Soverain's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 29 filed by Soverain Software LLC, [326] Opposed MOTION to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 356 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Jury Questionnaires (Pages 1-8) (Attachments: # (1) - Questionnaires (Pages 8-17), # (2) - Questionnaires (Pages 18-25))(rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4.19.10 Minute Entry (Jury Selection): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 4/19/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Joint Proposed Charge of the Court)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that parties meet and confer on a claim construction chart to be submitted to the jurors and for use at trial containing the Court's constructions of the terms in the 314, 492, and 639 patents. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/10. cc:attys 4-16-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for the parties to meet, confer and submit a proposed Charge to the Court by 4/21/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/14/10. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [306] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine, [326] Opposed MOTION to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony, [305] MOTION in Limine Soverain's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 29 : Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2010 immediately after Jury Selection before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 351 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re [326] Opposed MOTION to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 350 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Opposition [346] to Opposed Motion [326] to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Shamos Tr., # (2) Exhibit 2 - Trevor Tr.)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List: Defendant Newegg's Exhhibits Admitted During 3.17.10 Hearing. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List: Plaintiff's Exhibits Admitted During 3.17.10 Hearing. (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 346 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [326] Opposed MOTION to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony filed by Newegg Inc.(Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit D, #(5) Exhibit E)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 345 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Newegg Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/18/2010. (kls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 344 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/17/10. cc:attys 3-18-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              3.17.10 Minute Entry(Evidentiary Hrg): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2010 re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Newegg Inc.. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Plaintiff's Objections to Newegg's Supplemental and Second Supplemental Exhibit Lists (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 342 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document - Joint Stipulation Regarding Evidentiary Hearing on Attorney Disqualification Issue. (Frost, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George T Manning for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas Demitrack for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [335] Order Setting Hearing on Motion. The Court expects the principal declarants to be present and available for direct and cross examination regarding their declarations. Parties are directed to meet and confer in person or telephone to determine if either party expects any other declarants to be present and available to testify at the evidentiary hearing. Should any disputes arise, parties shall notify the Court by 3-12-2010 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/10/10. cc:attys 3-10-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [333] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/10. cc:attys 3-09-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [332] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-09-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [329] Sealed Motion to Substitute Exhibit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-09-10 (mll, ) Modified on 3/9/2010 (mll, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day : Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/10. cc:attys 3-09-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 334 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SURREPLY in Support of Soverain's RESPONSE to Motion re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit I)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010, Terminated: 3/9/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Soverain's surreply to Newegg's Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010, Terminated: 3/9/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Newegg's Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Jones Day by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [328] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-08-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 330 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010, Terminated: 3/9/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed SEALED MOTION To Enter Substitute Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Satine, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010, Terminated: 3/8/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 327 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (2) Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (3) Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (4) Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (5) Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (6) Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (7) Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (8) Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein, # (9) Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein (See #(27)Replacement Exhibit), # (10) Exhibit B Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (11) Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (12) Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (13) Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (14) Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (15) Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (16) Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (17) Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (18) Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (19) Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (20) Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Marc K. Callahan, # (21) Exhibit C Katharine A. Wolanyk Declaration, # (22) Exhibit D Kenneth R. Adamo Declaration, # (23) Exhibit E Thomas L. Giannetti Declaration, # (24) Exhibit F Barry R. Satine Declaration, # (25) Exhibit G Jennifer Seraphine Declaration, # (26) Exhibit H Ognjan V. Shentov Declaration)(Adamo, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2010: # (27) Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Mark A. Finkelstein) (mll, ). Modified on 3/9/2010 per [336] Order (mll, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010, Terminated: 4/20/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Strike The Belatedly-Produced CompuServe Documents, The CompuServe Manuals As Corroborating Evidence, And Trevor's Uncorroborated Testimony by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 325 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re [324] Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day filed by Newegg Inc. Response to Motion is due 3-05-2010 at 12:00 p.m. Reply is due 3-08-2010 at 12:00 p.m. Surreply is due 3-09-2010 at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/02/10. cc:attys 3-02-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010, Terminated: 3/18/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency SEALED MOTION Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Jones Day by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Lee Cheng, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Mira Wolff, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 323 Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: 2/15/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 1/21/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 90 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2010. (sms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 321 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [319] Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Pltf's complaint against Zappos is now dismissed with prejudice. Zappos's counterclaims against pltf are now dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/10. cc:attys 1-29-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Joint Certificate of Conference in Compliance with the Court's Order to Meet and Confer on the Parties' Motions in Limine (Satine, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010, Terminated: 1/29/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION To Substitute Prior Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice with Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 318 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [317] Motion to Continue Trial Date. The Court sets this case for jury selection on 4-19-2010 at 9:00 a.m., with trial to commence on 4-26-2010 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/10. cc:attys 1-28-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010, Terminated: 1/27/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (2) Supplement Declaration of Michael Ian Shamos)(Adamo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Selection reset for 4/19/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial reset for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (per [318] Order) (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 316 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that this case is set for jury trial on February 1-2, 2010; February 8-9, 2010; and February 16-17, 2010. Trial will commence immediately following jury selection on 2-01-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/10. cc:attys 1-26-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 315 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [221] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot [242] Motion to Strike and Preclude Expert Trial Testimony and Evidence; denying [243] Sealed Motion to Strike Portions of Newegg's Damages Expert Report; denying [247] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying [252] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki; denying [253] Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward R Tittel; denying [254] Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of W Christopher Bakewell; denying [287] Motion in Limine; granting [312] Motion Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire: The first page of instructions will be read aloud to the potential jurors and the second page of questions will be handed to and filled out by the potential jurors prior to voir dire. The Court CARRIES [230] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and CARRIES [248] Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS in part, DENIES in part and CARRIES in part [305] Motion in Limine; and CARRIES [306] Motion in Limine. The parties shall meet and confer on all motions in limine not ruled on and notify the Court of any issues that need to be resolved by 1-28-2010. If parties cannot resolve all the issues, the Court will hear them before jury selection on 2-01-2010. Parties shall meet and confer on the Court's Charge and submit a proposed Charge to the Court by 2-03-2010. The Court will allow the parties 30 minutes for voir dire, 30 minutes for opening statements, 12 hours for direct and cross examinations, and 60 minutes for closing arguments. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/10. cc:attys 1-25-10 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/23/2010, Entered: 1/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Newegg Inc. of Compliance with 35 USC 282 (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            1.21.2010 Minute Entry (Pretrial): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/21/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Newegg Inc. Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Estimate of Time (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Submission of Juror Questionnaire by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) [Proposed] Joint Juror Questionnaire, # (2) Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Joint Juror Questionnaire)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's Trial Time Requests (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re [305] MOTION in Limine Soverain's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 29 filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [306] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Jason Gaston on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Gaston, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Frost, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010, Terminated: 4/20/2010 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010, Terminated: 4/20/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Soverain's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 29 by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1: Brief in Support of Soverain's Motion in Limine No. 20, # (2) Attachment 2: Brief in Support of Soverain's Motion in Limine No. 22, # (3) Attachment 3: Brief in Support of Soverain's Motion in Limine No. 23, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [303] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages with Respect to Motion in Limine Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/10. cc:attys 1-13-10(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010, Terminated: 1/13/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion in Limine Briefing by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Newegg Inc. Re: Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/9/2010, Entered: 1/9/2010 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Newegg Inc. Re: Objections to Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Paragraph 2(A) of the Discovery Order (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Newegg Inc. re: Rebuttal Deposition Designation (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Paragraph 2(A) of the Discovery Order (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [287] MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Alexander Trevor at Trial filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 295 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Newegg Inc. (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Paragraphs 6(B) and 6(C) of the Discovery Order (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [287] MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Alexander Trevor at Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [287] MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Alexander Trevor at Trial filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: 11/27/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [282] Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Dkt. No. 248)Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Dkt. No. 248) Soverain's Response to Newegg's Supplemental Brief filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 289 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrects Entry [288] Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Soverain Software LLC, Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Witness List, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Witness List, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Defendant's Proposed Verdict Form)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 11/25/2009 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed in Error. Please Disregard. To be Refiled by Attorney. Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Soverain Software LLC, Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Witness List, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Witness List, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Defendant's Proposed Verdict Form)(Smith, Michael) Changed one word for Exhibit 2 from exhibit to witness. Modified on 11/25/2009 (mjc, ). Modified on 11/25/2009 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Alexander Trevor at Trial by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel H Brean for Newegg Inc. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [284] Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to exchange their trial exhibits is extended to 12-11-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/09. cc:attys 11-18-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009, Terminated: 11/18/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to Exchange Trial Exhibits by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [282] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009, Terminated: 11/17/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Dkt. No. 248) by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the parties substantively meet and confer on all limine issues before filing any motions in limine. Motions in limine shall be filed by 1-13-2010 and responses are due by 1-15-2010. The Court also withdraws its general request for any pending motion notebooks or courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/09/09. cc:attys 11-09-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Daniel Strachan on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Strachan, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Sayles on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Sayles, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re [243] Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of Newegg Damages Expert Report Relying On "Design Around" Memo, Preclude Testimony On Those Portions, And Preclude Newegg From Offering "Design Around" Memo As Evidence filed by Newegg Inc. Attachments: #(1)Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 277 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re [254] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit K)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 276 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re [252] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Daubert Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Debra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [248] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,272,639, 5,715,314, and 5,909,492 filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Golden Hour JMOL Brief, # (2) Exhibit Golden Hour Opposition, # (3) Exhibit GOlden Hour Final Judgment)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re [252] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Daubert Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Tipi, Stela) Modified on 10/30/2009 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [247] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the "Shopping Cart Claims" in U.S. Patents No. 5,715,314 and No. 5,909,492 filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [253] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF EDWARD R. TITTEL filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [242] Opposed MOTION to Strike A. Trevor as Expert Witness, To Preclude E. Tittel's Testimony Based on Trevor Report, and To Exclude Trevor Report from Evidence filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 270 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [243] Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of Newegg Damages Expert Report Relying On "Design Around" Memo, Preclude Testimony On Those Portions, And Preclude Newegg From Offering "Design Around" Memo As Evidence filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 269 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re [254] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Debra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [230] First SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of the '492 Patent filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 267 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [252] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Daubert Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki filed by Newegg Inc. Attachments: #(1) Exhibit M (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [247] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the "Shopping Cart Claims" in U.S. Patents No. 5,715,314 and No. 5,909,492 filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [248] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,272,639, 5,715,314, and 5,909,492 filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [252] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Daubert Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Tipi, Stela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 263 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [254] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 262 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT Sovreain's Opposition to SEALED PATENT MOTION re [248] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,272,639, 5,715,314, and 5,909,492 filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Soverain's Response to Statement of Facts, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Jack Grimes, Ph.D. and supporting documents, # (3) Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of Edward Tittel, # (4) Exhibit System Diagram, # (5) Exhibit Excerpts from Deposition Transcript Wu, # (6) Exhibit Sponsored Links, # (7) Exhibit Newegg email 1, # (8) Exhibit Newegg email 2, # (9) Exhibit Response to RFA, # (10) Exhibit FAQ page)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 261 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [243] Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of Newegg Damages Expert Report Relying On "Design Around" Memo, Preclude Testimony On Those Portions, And Preclude Newegg From Offering "Design Around" Memo As Evidence filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 260 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [242] Opposed MOTION to Strike A. Trevor as Expert Witness, To Preclude E. Tittel's Testimony Based on Trevor Report, and To Exclude Trevor Report from Evidence filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 259 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [253] Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF EDWARD R. TITTEL filed by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Newegg's Opposition to PATENT Motion re [230] First SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of the '492 Patent filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 25- '492 patent, # (2) Exhibit 26 - Appendix G to the '492 patent, # (3) Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from the Deposition Transctipt of Edward Tittel)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [247] SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the "Shopping Cart Claims" in U.S. Patents No. 5,715,314 and No. 5,909,492 filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Soverain's Statement of Genuine Issues, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [255] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [230] First SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of the '492 Patent; Replies due by 10/13/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/09. cc:attys 10-06-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009, Terminated: 10/6/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Opposition to Soverain's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of US Pat 5,909,492 (Dkt. 250) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Tipi, Stela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF EDWARD R. TITTEL by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(Tipi, Stela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 252 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION Defendant's Daubert Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Opinions of James Nawrocki by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the [244], [245], [246] Sealed Motions submitted by Soverain Software LLC, Newegg Inc. The motions do not contain a certificate of conference as required per Local Rule CV-7, and document [245] exceeds the page limit. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [249] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages With Respect to Summary Judgment Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [230] First SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of the '492 Patent filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 9/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages With Respect to Summary Judgment Briefing by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,272,639, 5,715,314, and 5,909,492 by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the "Shopping Cart Claims" in U.S. Patents No. 5,715,314 and No. 5,909,492 by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 16A, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Exhibit 17A, # (21) Exhibit 18, # (22) Exhibit 19, # (23) Exhibit 20, # (24) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION Soverain's Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Edward Tittel by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit July 23 Expert Report, # (2) Exhibit August 18 Rebuttal Expert Report, # (3) Exhibit August 28 Supplemental Expert Report, # (4) Exhibit Tittel Dep Transcript Vol 1 September 2, 2009, # (5) Exhibit Tittel Dep Transcript Vol 2, September 2, 2009, # (6) Exhibit Tittel Dep Transcript Vol 3, September 3, 2009, # (7) Exhibit Amazon Claim Construction Order adopted by Dkt 192, # (8) Exhibit Markman Order May 2009, # (9) Exhibit Excerpts from Newegg's April 30 2009 Invalidity Contentions, # (10) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shentov, Ognjan) Modified on 9/30/2009 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION Defendant's Motion and Supporting Brief to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James Nawrocki by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) Modified on 9/30/2009 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Tipi, Stela) Modified on 9/30/2009 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of Newegg Damages Expert Report Relying On "Design Around" Memo, Preclude Testimony On Those Portions, And Preclude Newegg From Offering "Design Around" Memo As Evidence by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Strike A. Trevor as Expert Witness, To Preclude E. Tittel's Testimony Based on Trevor Report, and To Exclude Trevor Report from Evidence by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [221] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rebuttal Witness List by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Debra R Smith for Soverain Software LLC. Receipt #6-1-19352. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement)(gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. See Corrected Entry [238]. Document sealed because of of Supplemental ResponseNOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra R Smith on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (kls, ) Modified on 9/21/2009 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [221] MOTION for Summary Judgment Newegg's Reply to Plaintiff Soverain's Opposition to Newegg's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Improper Priority Claim and Invalidity of the '639 Patent filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [234] Motion for Extension of Time. Newegg Inc is granted an extension of time to file its Opposition to Soverain Software LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment through 9-28-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/09. cc:attys 9-17-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009, Terminated: 9/17/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Soverain Software LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,909,492 by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trial Witness List by Newegg Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trial Witness List by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [221] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the '639 Patent filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Soverain's Statement of Genuine Issues, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009, Terminated: 8/11/2010 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of the '492 Patent by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Jack Grimes, # (4) Exhibit Amazon Markman Order, # (5) Exhibit Markman Order, # (6) Exhibit Excerpts from Tittle Opening Report, # (7) Exhibit Excerpts from Tittle Deposition Transcript, # (8) Exhibit Excerpts from Tittle Deposition Transcript of 09-02, # (9) Exhibit Letter from Newegg Counsel, # (10) Exhibit Transaction January 2008, # (11) Exhibit Transaction June 2009, # (12) Exhibit Excerpts from Wu Deposition Transcript, # (13) Exhibit Excerpts from Wu Deposition Transcript 07-09, # (14) Exhibit RFC 791, # (15) Exhibit Newegg System Diagram 1, # (16) Exhibit Newegg System Diagram 2, # (17) Exhibit Newegg FAQ pages, # (18) Exhibit Newegg flowchart, # (19) Exhibit IEEE Dictionary, # (20) Exhibit Excerpts from Tanenbaum, # (21) Exhibit RFC 2616, # (22) Exhibit Newegg's Responses to RFAs, # (23) Exhibit Newegg Supplemental Interrogatory Responses, # (24) Exhibit RFC1808, # (25) Exhibit Tittel Rebuttal Report on Infringement, # (26) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [228] Motion to Amend and Enter Substitute Statement of Undisputed Material Facts. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/31/09. cc:attys 8-31-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009, Terminated: 8/31/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [221] MOTION for Summary Judgment Newegg's Unopposed Motion to Enter Substitute Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [226] Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Newegg Inc is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve the said Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the pltf. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/27/09. cc:attys 8-28-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009, Terminated: 8/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [223] Motion to Amend/Correct and for extension of time. The discovery deadline in this action is extended through 9-10-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/09. cc:attys 8-26-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [222] Motion for Extension of Time. Soverain Software LLC shall file its Opposition to Newegg Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and/or Denial of Priority Claim of the '639 Patent by 9-11-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/09. cc:attys 8-26-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009, Terminated: 8/25/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [216] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009, Terminated: 8/25/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Soverain's Opposition to Newegg's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and/or Denial of Priority Claim of the '639 Patent by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Soverain's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009, Terminated: 1/25/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (2) Declaration of Kent E. Baldauf, Jr., # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B-1, # (5) Exhibit B-2, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit H, # (12) Exhibit I, # (13) Exhibit J, # (14) Exhibit K, # (15) Exhibit L, # (16) Exhibit M, # (17) Exhibit N, # (18) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Order on Sealed Patent MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [219] Sealed Patent Motion for leave to amend/supplement its Infringement Contentions. It is Ordered that the 7-23-09 Expert Report of Jack D Grimes, Ph.D. regarding US Patent Nos 7,272,639; 5,715,314, and 5,909,492 be deemed as Soverain's amended and supplemented infringement contentions for defendant Newegg. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/09. cc:attys 8-03-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009, Terminated: 8/3/2009 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Amend and Supplement Infringement Contentions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Amend and Supplement Infringement Contentions, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [217] Motion for Extension of Time regarding pre-trial deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/24/09. cc:attys 7-24-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009, Terminated: 7/24/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Pre-Trial Deadlines by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [215] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/09. cc:attys 7-22-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009, Terminated: 7/22/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. The Court having been advised that the parties have agreed on the constructions for the remaining claim terms hereby adopts the parties' agreed constructions as set out in Appendix A to this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/28/09. cc:attys 5-28-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that pltf and defts pay $12,500.00 each to Michael McLemore, the technical consultant to the Court, for services through 5-21-09, for the total amount of $25,000.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/27/09. cc:attys 5-27-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC, Newegg Inc. of Joint Agreement re: Remaining Claim Terms (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Revised 4-5(d) submission, # (2) Text of Proposed Order - with Appendix A)(Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [209] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. Pltf's complaint against Systemax Inc and TigerDirect Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Systemax's counterclaims against pltf are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/09. cc:attys 5-26-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Newegg Inc. of Withdrawal of Dispute as to Certain Claim Terms (Baldauf, Kent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and Defendants Systemax Inc. and TigerDirect, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Joint Notice of Compliance with PR 4-5(d) (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Notice Regarding Estimated Time for Markman Hearing, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to [203] Newegg's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh 14, Excerpts from Appendix A to the '492 Patent)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to [204] Systemax and TigerDirect's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Tiger Direct Inc, Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Mary-Olga Lovett, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Part 1 of 3, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Part 2 of 3, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Part 3 of 3, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Part 1 of 2, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Part 2 of 2, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to [199] Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Baldauf, Kent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Notice of Withdrawal of Dispute as to Certain Clam Terms filed by Systemax Inc.. (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Dispute as to Certian Claims filed by Systemax Inc.. (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Newegg Inc. of Complaince (Baldauf, Kent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit '314 Patent, # (2) Exhibit '492 Patent, # (3) Exhibit '639 Patent, # (4) Exhibit US Patent 5,708,780, # (5) Exhibit US Patent 5,724,424, # (6) Exhibit Order - Dkt 192, # (7) Exhibit Excerpt from Defendants' PR 4-3 Exhibit C, # (8) Exhibit Excerpt from Defendants PR 4-3 Exhibit D, # (9) Exhibit Excerpt from File History of '639 Patent, # (10) Exhibit Excerpt 2 from File History of '639 Patent, # (11) Exhibit Amazon Markman Order, # (12) Exhibit Appendices A-D title pages to Application 08/328,133, # (13) Exhibit Excerpt from a Soverain internal document)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC OF SUBMISSION OF MARKMAN TUTORIAL (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/09. cc:attys 4-8-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of No Objection to Proposed Technical Advisor (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT AMENDED P.R. 4-3 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit a - Claim Construction Comparison Chart, # (2) Exhibit B - Soverain's Claim Constructions and Support, # (3) Exhibit C - Defendants' Joint Claim Constructions and Support, # (4) Exhibit D - Defendants' SM and TD Claim construction for a term, # (5) Exhibit E - Defendants' adopted Amazon claim constructions)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the parties file any objections they have to the appointment of Michael T McLemore as the Court's technical advisor, by 4-3-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/09. cc:attys 3-26-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 193, Amended PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED WITH SIGNATURES OF ATTORNEYS FOR ALL PARTIES.*** (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***JOINT AMENDED P.R. 4-3 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Claim Construction Comparison Chart, # (2) Exhibit B - Soverain's Proposed Claim Constructions and support, # (3) Exhibit C - Defendants' Joint Proposed Claim Constructions and support, # (4) Exhibit D - SM and TD Claim Construction and support for a claim term, # (5) Exhibit E - Defendants' adopted Amazon claim constructions)(Shentov, Ognjan) Modified on 3/26/2009 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [191] Motion for Leave to File Amended Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/09. cc:attys 3-24-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009, Terminated: 3/24/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended P.R. 4-3 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order, # (2) Appendix Amazon Markman Order, # (3) Supplement Amended P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # (4) Exhibit Claim Construction Comparison Chart, # (5) Exhibit Soverain's Constructions and Support, # (6) Exhibit Defendants' Joint Constructions and Support, # (7) Exhibit Defendants SM and TD Constructions for a Claim term, # (8) Exhibit Defendants' adopted Amazon constructions and support)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance With Docket Control Order Regarding Technical Advisors (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [188] Claim Construction Chart, filed by Soverain Software LLC. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer and narrow the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number. The Court also reminds the parties that the page limits governing dispositive motions apply to claim construction briefing and will not be extended absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/17/09. cc:attys 3-17-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PR 4-3 Joint Submission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Claim Construction Comparison Chart, # (2) Exhibit Soverain's Claim Constructions and Support, # (3) Exhibit Defendants' Joint Claim Constructions and Support, # (4) Exhibit SM and TD's Claim Construction and Support exhibit, # (5) Exhibit Defendants' Adopted Constructions)(Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [186] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. Pltf's complaint against deft CDW Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. CDW's counterclaims against pltf are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/16/09. cc:attys 3-16-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and Defendant CDW Corporation by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Newegg Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by CDW Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CDW Corporation of Compliance with Docket Control Order Regarding Privilege (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Tiger Direct Inc regarding Privilege (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Systemax Inc. regarding Privilege (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Tiger Direct Inc of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Systemax Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ognjan V Shentov on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Shentov, Ognjan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [175] Motion to Vacate [174] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for complying with PR 4-2 is set to 2-20-09 for all parties. The deadline for the exchange of privilege logs is set to 2-20-09 for all parties. The deadline for complying with PR 4-3 is set to 3-16-09 for all parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/09. cc:attys 2-11-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009, Terminated: 2/11/2009 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Vacate ORDER (DKT. NO. 174) AND TO ENTER A CORRECTED ORDER by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [173] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting [173] Motion for Extension of Time. Defts are granted an extension of time through 2-20-09 to comply with PR 4-2 to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence and to exchange privilege log, and the date for filing joint claim construction and prehearing statement under PR 4-3 is extended through 3-16-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/09. cc:attys 2-9-09 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009, Terminated: 2/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Comply with P.R. 4-2 to Exchange with Plaintiff Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence and to Exchange Privilege Logs, Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (P.R. 4-3) by Tiger Direct Inc, Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Agreed Motion For Extension of Time for Defendants to Comply with Patent Rules 4-2 and 4-3)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CDW Corporation Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/09. cc:attys 1-14-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [149] Motion for Protective Order. The Court further orders Soverain to direct its attorneys and experts that they shall not access Tiger Direct's and Systemax's customer information when reviewing those parties' source code. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/09. cc:attys 1-14-09(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re [168] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. Pltf's complaint against Licensee is dismissed without prejudice. Licensee's counterclaims against pltf are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/08. cc:attys 12-03-08(mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and Defendant Zappos.com, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Systemax Inc. of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Tiger Direct Inc of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW Corporation, Zappos.Com, Inc. of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements (Hartzell, Julianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Newegg Inc. of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (pursuant to P.R. 4-1) (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [149] MOTION for Protective Order (Reply to Systemax and TigerDirect's Response) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit N)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [149] MOTION for Protective Order (Reply to CDW's Response) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit M)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [159] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [149] MOTION for Protective Order; Replies due by 10/23/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/08. cc:attys 10-20-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008, Terminated: 10/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY by Soverain Software LLC. (Tipi, Stela) Modified on 10/17/2008 (mjc ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [149] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tiger Direct Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # (2) Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # (3) Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # (4) Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # (5) Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # (6) Exhibit EXHIBIT F)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply ANSWER to [138] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of CDW, Newegg, and Zappos by Soverain Software LLC.(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [153] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [149] MOTION for Protective Order ; Responses due by 10/10/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/08. cc:attys 10-07-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [149] MOTION for Protective Order filed by CDW Corporation. (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008, Terminated: 10/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order by TigerDirect, Inc. and by Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants Systemax, Inc. and TigerDirect, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: [149] MOTION for Protective Order, Exhibit G. (Giannetti, Thomas) Modified on 9/19/2008 (mjc ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [149] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Seraphine, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [149] MOTION for Protective Order Certificate of Conference filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008, Terminated: 1/13/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***SEE [150] FOR CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE*** MOTION for Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Text of Proposed Order)(Giannetti, Thomas) Modified on 9/19/2008 (mjc ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [145] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Kent E Baldauf, Jr., John W McIlvaine, III, David C Hanson, and Mira S Wolff for Newegg Inc. Attorney Julianne Hartzell; Charles Edward Juister; Matthew C Nielsen; Scott A Sanderson; Thomas L Duston and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/19/08. cc:attys 9-19-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [146] Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Parties are granted an extension of time until 10-31-08 to exchange proposed terms and claim elements for construction in compliance with PR 4-1. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/08. cc:attys 9-17-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008, Terminated: 9/17/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Newegg, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008, Terminated: 9/19/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [143] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [143] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [138] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Reply or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims of Defendants Responses due by 10/10/2008 Replies due by 10/10/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/5/2008. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [138] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Reply or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims of Defendants by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Soverain Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Reply or Otherwise Respond to Defendants Counterclaims)(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Hanson for Newegg Inc.. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W McIlvaine, III for Newegg Inc.. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kent E Baldauf, Jr for Newegg Inc.. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mira S Wolff for Newegg Inc.. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to [13] Amended Complaint, First, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by CDW Corporation, Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc.. (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Systemax, Docket Entry #130 by Soverain Software LLC.(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [129] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Soverain Software LLC.(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [134] Motion for Extension of Time. Defts are granted an extension of time through 8-20-08 to (1) assert any counterclaims without leave of Court; and (2) add any inequitable conduct allegations to pleadings without leave of Court, and the date for the exchange of terms and claim elements for construction is extended through 9-19-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/08. cc:attys 7-31-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims and to Exchange Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [126] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC.(Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Systemax Inc. Notice of Compliance (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Tiger Direct Inc Notice of Compliance (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Systemax Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Systemax Inc. by Systemax Inc..(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TigerDirect Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to [13] Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Soverain Software LLC by Tiger Direct Inc.(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Zappos.Com, Inc. on 6/16/2007, answer due: 7/6/2007. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re [125] Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Soverain Software LLC, Redcats USA LP; Redcats USA, Inc.; The Sportsman's Guide Inc; The Sportsman's Guide Inc; The Sportsman's Guide Inc; The Sportsman's Guide Inc; The Sportsman's Guide Inc; Redcats USA LP and Redcats USA LP terminated. Plaintiff's complaint against Licensee is dismissed with prejudice. Licensee's counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/7/08. (mpv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Zappos.Com, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal bertween Plaintiff and Defendants Redcats USA, Inc., Redcats USA, L.P. and The Sportsmans Guide, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE)(Craddock, Clark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2009. Expert Witness List due by 7/21/2009. Identify trial witnesses by 9/14/2009, Jury instructions due by 11/24/2009, Mediation Completion due by 5/14/2008. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 11/24/2009, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2009. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/25/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [120] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting [122] Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/25/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/21/2008, Entered: 6/21/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct [87] Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediator,,, Set Hearings,, by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [120] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order to Extend Deadlines filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tipi, Stela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order to Extend Deadlines by Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) ORDER)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [118] Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order to Extend Specific Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/19/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 6/19/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct [86] Notice (Other) Docket Control Order by The Sportsman's Guide Inc, Redcats USA LP. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Leak, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: Soverain settled with RedCats(Patterson, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Zappos.Com, Inc.. (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: still negotiating(Patterson, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julianne Hartzell for CDW Corporation, Zappos.com, Inc. and Newegg Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-13755. Approved 5/15/08.(mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Discovery Order (Tipi, Stela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Systemax Inc. on 11/15/2007, answer due: 12/5/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Newegg Inc. on 11/19/2007, answer due: 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to CDW Corporation on 11/19/2007, answer due: 12/9/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Zappos.Com, Inc. on 11/13/2007, answer due: 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Tiger Direct Inc on 12/13/2007, answer due: 1/2/2008. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to The Sportsman's Guide Inc on 12/8/2007, answer due: 12/28/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Systemax Inc. (McSwane, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Tiger Direct Inc (McSwane, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Roth, Brendan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Abraham, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Roth, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW Corporation , Newegg, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Systemax Inc. DEFENDANT SYSTEMAX, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 1 OF FEBRUARY 19, 2008 DISCOVERY ORDER (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Tiger Direct Inc DEFENDANT TIGERDIRECT, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 1 OF FEBRUARY 19, 2008 DISCOVERY ORDER (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by The Sportsman's Guide Inc, Redcats USA LP Regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Compliance with Paragraph 1 of Discovery Order (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Duston on behalf of Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Duston, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Edward Juister on behalf of Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Juister, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Nielsen on behalf of Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Nielsen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott A Sanderson on behalf of Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Sanderson, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER entered in furtherance of the management of the Court's docket under FRCP 16. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/5/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew C Nielsen for CDW Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-12864. Approved 2/27/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stela Cristina Tipi for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-12861. Approved 2/27/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Clark Craddock for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-12863. Approved 2/27/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATOR: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Discovery due by 8/31/2009. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Michael Philip Patterson rep by Michael Philip Patterson added as Mediator.Expert Witness List due by 7/21/2009. Identify trial witnesses by 9/14/2009. Jury instructions due by 11/24/2009. Mediation Completion due by 5/14/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2009. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/28/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/22/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by CDW Corporation Agreed Notice of Compliance Regarding the Court's February 6, 2008 Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth Canfield for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-12724. Approved 2/12/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [81] Status Conference - Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/28/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by 2/19/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/5/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrey Belenky for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-12648. Approved 2/5/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love : Status Conference held on 2/4/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # (1) Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John D. Love : Status Conference held on 2/4/2008. See Doc # [81]. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for The Sportsman's Guide Inc and Redcats USA LP. Fee pd., 6-1-12616. Approved 2/4/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Defendant TigerDirect, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tiger Direct Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 1/30/2008 (mjc ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Defendant Systemax Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement by Systemax Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 1/30/2008 (mjc ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lynda Q Nguyen for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-12491. Approved 1/23/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [64] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Soverain's Reply to Counterclaims of Redcats and The Sportsman's Guide by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [60] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Soverain's Reply to Counterclaims of CDW, Newegg and Zappos by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [57] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Soverain's Reply to Counterclaims of TigerDirect by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [58] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Soverain's Reply to Counterclaims of Systemax by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - Status Conference set for 2/4/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Judge Davis' courtroom in Tyler to set a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting and to determine whether parties will consent to trial before Judge Love. Proposed Discovery Order is Appendix A; Proposed Docket Control Order is Appendix B. Agreed docket control and discovery orders are due 14 days after the status conference, and Plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures are due four days after the status conference. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/08. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Sportsman's Guide Inc identifying VLP Corporation, Redcats USA, Inc., Redcats USA, LLC, Redcats UK, Plc, Redcats, S.A. and PPR, S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redcats USA LP identifying VLP Corporation, Chadwick's of Boston, Inc., Redcats USA, Inc., Redcats USA, LLC, Redcats UK, Plc, Redcats, S.A. and PPR, S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [67] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Theodore Herhold terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/3/08. (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [65] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric William Buether terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/3/08. (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Defendant Zappos.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Theodore T. Herhold and the law firm of Townsend and Townsend and Crew LLP as Counsel) by Zappos.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Herhold, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [59] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III terminated as to deft Zappos.com Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/02/08. cc:attys 1-2-08 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by The Sportsman's Guide Inc, Redcats USA LP.(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zappos.Com, Inc. identifying Zappos.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW Corporation identifying VH Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newegg Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by CDW Corporation, Newegg Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007, Terminated: 1/2/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Defendant Zappos.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of S. Calvin Capshaw and the law firm of Brown McCarroll, LLP as Counsel) by Zappos.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Systemax Inc..(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Tiger Direct Inc.(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re [52] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC, dismissing without prejudice Defendant Redcats USA, Inc. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/28/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott A Sanderson for CDW Corporation. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles Edward Juister for CDW Corporation. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas L Duston for CDW Corporation. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Redcats USA, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2007 (rvw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Tiger Direct Inc (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2007 (djh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Tiger Direct Inc (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2007 (djh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Tiger Direct Inc (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2007 (djh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Zappos.Com, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tonya R Deem for The Sportsman's Guide Inc and Redcats USA, Inc. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W Leak, Jr for The Sportsman's Guide Inc and Redcats USA, Inc. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Gardner for The Sportsman's Guide Inc and Redcats USA, Inc. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time to File. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED, that Tiger Direct,Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise respond in any manner to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended to December 31, 2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/07. (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time to File. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED,that Systemax Inc time to answer or otherwise respond in any manner to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended to December 31, 2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/07. (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Steven Gardner, Frank Leak, and Tonya Deem; Fee: $75, receipt number: 6-1-12070 (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Due Deadline Updated for Systemax Inc 12/31/2007 (fnt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Redcats USA LP on 11/28/2007, by personal service on CT Corporation System, Houston, Texas; answer due: 12/18/2007. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Redcats USA LP on 11/29/2007, by personal service on The Corporation Trust Company; answer due: 12/19/2007. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to The Sportsman's Guide Inc on 11/28/2007, by personal service; answer due: 12/18/2007. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Tiger Direct Inc on 11/28/2007, by personal service; answer due: 12/18/2007. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer Seraphine for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Tme in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Tiger Direct Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Tiger Direct Inc (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Systemax Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [31] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [31] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [13] Amended Complaint, Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [13] Amended Complaint, Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff. CDW Corporation's answer is due 12/31/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [29] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [13] Amended Complaint, [Unopposed]. Defendants Redcats USA, L.P. and The Sportsman's Guide's answers are due by 12/31/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: CDW Corporation answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: The Sportsman's Guide Inc answer due 12/31/2007; Redcats USA LP answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007, Terminated: 12/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [13] Amended Complaint, Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [28] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement. Defendant Zappos.com, Inc.'s answer is due by 12/31/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007, Terminated: 12/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [13] Amended Complaint, [Unopposed] by Redcats USA LP, The Sportsman's Guide Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Zappos.Com, Inc. answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007, Terminated: 12/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Zappos.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Herhold, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry R Satine for Soverain Software LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11943. Approved 12/4/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gaston Kroub for Systemax Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-11903. Approved 11/29/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry J Schindler for Systemax Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-11903. Approved 11/29/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Nicodema for Systemax Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-11903. Approved 11/29/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [21] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant, Newegg Inc.'s, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Newegg's answer is due by 12/31/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Newegg Inc. answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Service (Howland, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 11/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant, Newegg Inc.'s, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [12] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, [Unopposed]. Redcats USA, Inc.'s answer is due by 12/31/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (mjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [11] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint. Systemax Inc.'s answer is due by 12/31/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Tiger Direct Inc, The Sportsman's Guide Inc, Redcats USA, Inc.. (rvw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Giannetti on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Giannetti, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Redcats USA, Inc. answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Systemax Inc. answer due 12/31/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Howland, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Howland on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Howland, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against all defendants, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit Exhibit E)(Adamo, Kenneth) Modified on 11/27/2007 (rvw, ). (SEE DOC # [22] FOR CERT OF SVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, [Unopposed] by Redcats USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by Systemax Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to CDW Corporation on 11/6/2007, answer due: 11/26/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Newegg Inc. on 11/6/2007, answer due: 11/26/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Redcats USA, Inc. on 11/6/2007, answer due: 11/26/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Systemax Inc. on 11/6/2007, answer due: 11/26/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Zappos.Com, Inc. on 11/7/2007, answer due: 11/27/2007. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CDW Corporation, Newegg Inc., Redcats USA, Inc., Systemax Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) CDW Corporation/Illinois Corp. Service Co. Summons # (2) Newegg, Inc. Summons# (3) Newegg, Inc. via Corp. Service Co. Summons# (4) Zappos.com, Inc. Summons# (5) Zappos.com, Inc. via Incorporating Svs., Ltd. Summons# (6) Systemax, Inc. via Corp. Service Co. Summons# (7) Systemax Inc., Summons# (8) Redcats USA, Inc. Summons# (9) Redcats USA, Inc. via The Corp. Trust Co. Summons)(mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying no Corporate Parent. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Patent/Trademark Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.) (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Soverain Software LLC. (mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CDW Corporation, Newegg Inc., Redcats USA, Inc., Systemax Inc., Zappos.Com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00 pd. 6-1-11611) , filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Civil Cover Sheet)(mjc )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 399 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?