Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00270
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Kyocera America, Inc. Kyocera America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Don F Livornese +1 213 892 1800

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
Kyocera Communications, Inc. Kyocera Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don F Livornese +1 213 892 1800
Kyocera Corporation Kyocera Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don F Livornese +1 213 892 1800

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
Kyocera International, Inc. Kyocera International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Don F Livornese +1 213 892 1800

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
Kyocera Wireless Corporation Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don F Livornese +1 213 892 1800

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Shepard Exposition Services, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Panasonic Corporation of North America"
No Logo Sanyo Electric Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd."
No Logo Sanyo North America Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sushila Chanana +1 415 371 1200 +1 415 371 1211 schanana@thelen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Frank Lopez +1 415 369 7339 +1 415 371 1211 rflopez@thelen.com
No Logo Sierra Wireless, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Numerex Corp /pa/

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sushila Chanana +1 415 371 1200 +1 415 371 1211 schanana@thelen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Frank Lopez +1 415 369 7339 +1 415 371 1211 rflopez@thelen.com
No Logo Utstarcom, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Audiovox Corp
Officer/Director, Techedge Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/25/2010 Alison Margaret Tucher +1 415 268 7269 +1 415 268 7522 atucher@mofo.com
No Logo Casio Computer Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Casio Computer Co., Ltd."
No Logo Casio Corporation of America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Panasonic Communications Corporation of America, Defendant
Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Defendant
Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation Of America Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Saxon Innovations, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Renaud +1 617 204 5103 +1 617 204 5150 renaudm@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Smith +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 bsmith@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

No Logo Michael T McLemore, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (211) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 211 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Parties shall take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims and counterclaims in this suit are DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice as to certain parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 209 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications Inc, and Kyocera Wireless Corp are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 207 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 4-12-2011 to file papers to dismiss the present case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/11. cc:attys 3-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time. Pltf and Kyocera defts shall have to 3-30-2011 to file papers to dismiss the present case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/07/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER for Plaintiffs to pay one half, $8,250.00, and Defendants, collectively, to pay one half, $8,250.00 to technical advisor by January 21, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDERED that counsel shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court on or before February 8, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER that the Court will allow no more than three hours total for the Markman Hearing. Parties are encouraged to continue to discuss the potential for reducing the total number of terms to be construed at the upcoming Markman Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/28/10. cc:attys 12-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Time Requested for the Markman Hearing (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                            REPLY to 194 Claim Construction Brief filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Livornese Dec., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Negus Dec, # 2 Livornese Dec, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                  USCA for the Federal Circuit ORDER granting motions to withdraw and dismissing the petition for writ of mandamus. Issued by the Clerk for the Court, 12-06-10. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                          USCA for the Federal Circuit ORDER for Saxon Innovations LLC to respond to Sierra Wireless Inc et al's Petition for Writ of Mandamus, no later than 12-03-2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                            USCA for the Federal Circuit NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. Assigned cause Misc No. 969 - In Re Sierra Wireless. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-15-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER GRANTING 186 Notice of Technical Advisor filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Michael T McLemore added as Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/8/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC re Proposed Technical Advisors (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 183 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for parties to file their proposed technical advisor submissions is extended to 11-05-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/29/10. cc:attys 10-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to complete mediation is 11-15-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/29/10. cc:attys 10-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION extend proposed technical advisors submission deadline by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Joint MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 132 Alternative Motion to Transfer to the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/27/10. cc:attys 10-27-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/10. cc:attys 10-26-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER adopting 161 Report & Recommendations; denying 113 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 115 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 132 Motion to Dismiss. The Court also adopts 160 Order of the US Magistrate Judge regarding substitution of parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/10. cc:attys 10-25-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Parties' proposed constructions)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. The new deadline for the parties to file the joint claim construction and prehearing statement pursuant to Patent Rule 4-3 is October 21, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The new deadline for parties to exchange Patent Rule 4-2 disclosures is 10-05-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 161 Report and Recommendations,,, Sur-reply by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  OBJECTION to 161 Report and Recommendations REPLY by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE to 162 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 167 Joint Motion to extend mediation deadline. ORDERED that the parties have until and through October 29, 2010 to complete mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/14/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION Responses to Defendants Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation re 162 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 9/17/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER to 159 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sierra Wireless America, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 158 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sierra Wireless, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 156 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Communications, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 155 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 161 Report and Recommendations by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation; 132 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation; 113 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. Recommending motions be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/12/10. cc:attys 8-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 118 Motion to Substitute Party. The Court orders that Norman IP Holdings LLC be SUBSTITUTED for Saxon Innovations LLC for all purposes of this litigation, including as named plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/110. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ANSWER to 121 Amended Complaint, (Fourth) for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC by Sierra Wireless America, Inc..(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER to 121 Amended Complaint, (Fourth) for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC by Sierra Wireless, Inc..(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER to 121 Amended Complaint, by Kyocera Wireless Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ANSWER to 121 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Communications, Inc..(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 121 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/10. cc:attys 8-09-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and P.R. 4-1, 4-2 Exchanges by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher L Ogden (Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/10. cc:attys 7-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Agreed Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2010 re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, 132 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC, 113 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 145 Motion to Seal the Reply and Exhibits in Support of Defts' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/10. cc:attys 6-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Kyocera defts have up to and including 7-06-2010 to comply with paragraph 2B of the Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/10. cc:attys 6-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 6/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support filed by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher L. Ogden, # 2 Exhibit A to Ogden Decl.)(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply and Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Extension of 2B Deadline by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Saxon Innovations, LLC Initial Disclosures Served (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. Notice of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Court ORDERS Defendants to submit their reply within two business days of taking the relevant depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/14/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Saxon Innovations, LLC re 138 Order, 137 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA)Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA)Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA) (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that pltf file notice of its position as to the requested relief for extension of time, by 4:00 p.m. CDT, 6-11-2010. If pltf opposes the motion, the Court orders pltf to file a response by 9:00 CDT on 6-14-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/10. cc:attys 6-11-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA) by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Don Livornese, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition of Saxon Innovations, LLC, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Deposition of Anthony Grillo, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Subpoena, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Livornese Dec., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Livornese Dec.)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            *** Filed in Error. Please Disregard. *** RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Durell, Matthew) Modified on 6/7/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Norman IP Holdings, LLC's and Saxon Innovations, LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to Southern District of California; Memorandum in Support by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Don F. Livornese, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Livornese Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Livornese Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Livornese Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Livornese Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Livornese Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Livornese Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Livornese Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Livornese Decl., # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Ogden, Christopher) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to FRCP 25(c) filed by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James Kirkpatrick, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Klein, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Don F. Livornese, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Livornese Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Livornese Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Livornese Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Livornese Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Livornese Declaration)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 5/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/17/10. cc:attys 5-17-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 118 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 126 Motion for Leave to Serve Corrected Patent Rule 3-1 (e) Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /Serve Corrected Patent Rule 3-1(e) Disclosures by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 113 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexandra C. Fennell, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alexandra C. Fennell, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alexandra C. Fennell, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Alexandra C. Fennell, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ***DISREGARD. SEE ENTRY 125 FOR CORRECTION.*** AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 113 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Declaration of Alexandra C. Fennell In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions To Dismiss filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 5/7/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 125 FOR CORRECTION.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 113 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 5/7/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Saxon Innovations, LLC (Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth) against Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 119 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against Sanyo and Sanyo's claims and/or counterclaims for relief against Saxon are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/10. cc:attys 4-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. and Sanyo North America Corporation by Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2010: # 2 Corrected Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Anthony Grillo, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation of Related Cases (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. Notice to the Court of Related Cases (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Don F. Livornese, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don F. Livornese, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don F. Livornese, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Joinder in Motion To Dismiss by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (Livornese, Don) Modified on 4/23/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher L. Ogden, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher L. Ogden, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher L. Ogden, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/10. cc:attys 3-31-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/10. cc:attys 3-31-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Saxon Innovations, LLC of Submission of Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Discovery Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Mayo and Alison M Tucher terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/10. cc:attys 3-25-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant UTStarcom, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucher, Alison) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher L Kelley for Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, and Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 88 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Wireless Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 87 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Communications, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Utstarcom, Inc., of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit their agreed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 3-29-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/16/10. cc:attys 3-16-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Submit Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 99 Motion to Extend Disclosure Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/8/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION Extend Disclosure Deadlines by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due on 3-15-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/10. cc:attys 3-04-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/02/10. cc:attys 3-02-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        3.1.2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L Rambo on behalf of Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 93 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against UTStarcom Inc, and UTStarcom's counterclaims for relief against Saxon, are dismissed without prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/10. cc:attys 3-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss UTStarcom, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce A Smith on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Smith, Bruce) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Kyocera Communications, Inc. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Utstarcom, Inc., (Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Kyocera Corporation's ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Wireless Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Kyocera Communications, Inc.'s ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Communications, Inc..(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Don F Livornese on behalf of Kyocera Communications, Inc. (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against defts Casio Computer Co Ltd, and Casio Corporation of America Inc, and Casio's claims and/or counterclaims for relif against Saxon are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court, and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against defts Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America are dismissed with prejudice, and Panasonic's counterclaims for relief against Saxon are dismissed without prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/1/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10(mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Saxon Innovations, LLC re 3 Order, of Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Belanger, William) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 2/3/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kyocera Communications, Inc., Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Communications Corporation of America, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Utstarcom, Inc., Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Casio Corporation of America, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(mjc, ) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Belanger, William) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Durell on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Saxon's Motion to dismiss without prejudice defts Kyocera International Inc and Kyocera America Inc is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/10. cc:attys 2-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 64 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 65 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera International, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 67 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera America, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Kyocera Wireless Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 59 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sanyo North America Corporation and Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 56 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Utstarcom, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA'S ANSWER to Complaint THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  KYOCERA AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera America, Inc..(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    KYOCERA WIRELESS CORP.'S ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Wireless Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera International, Inc..(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        KYOCERA CORPORATION'S ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Kyocera Corporation.(Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc. (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Don F Livornese on behalf of Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc. (Livornese, Don) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Casio Corporation has until 2-10-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/28/09. cc:atys 12-28-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. for Sanyo North America Corporation; Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation for Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.. (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation.(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Dismiss Certain Kyocera Dfendants by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Utstarcom, Inc., (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Casio Corporation of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Mayo for Utstarcom, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison M Tucher for Utstarcom, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 40 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sierra Wireless, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 39 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sierra Wireless America, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Sierra Wireless Inc's deadline to file its Amended Answer to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended to 12-28-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/09. cc:attys 12-16-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Sierra Wireless America Inc's deadline to file its Amended Answer to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended to 12-28-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/09. cc:attys 12-16-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Frank Lopez on behalf of Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Lopez, Ronald) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher L Ogden for Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sushila Chanana for Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald Frank Lopez for Sierra Wireless America, Inc., and Sierra Wireless, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Utstarcom, Inc has to 12-28-2009 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/09. cc:attys 12-01-09(mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 37 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Pltf's entry of default against Sierra Wireless America Inc is set aside in this cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/09. cc:attys 11-30-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sierra Wireless, Inc.'s ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Sierra Wireless, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sierra Wireless America, Inc.'s ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Sierra Wireless America, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint,, Or Otherwise Respond by Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment Under FRCP 60(b) by Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Sierra Wireless, Inc. on 11/6/2009, by personal service; answer due: 11/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SET ASIDE PER 41 ORDER Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sierra Wireless America, Inc. (mll, ) Modified on 11/30/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Order on Motion for Entry of DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 31 Motion for Entry of Default, and that the Clerk enter a default against Sierra Wireless America, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/09. cc:attys 11-03-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Entry of Default Against Sierra Wireless America, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen P. Cole, # 2 Exhibit A to Stephen P. Cole Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 28 Defendants Sanyo North America Corporation and Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ORDERED that Defendants Sanyo North America Corporation and Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. have until and through December 28, 2009, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corp, Kyocera International, Inc and Kyocera America Inc have through 12-28-2009 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/09. cc:attys 10-28-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. All claims for relief asserted by Saxon against Panasonic Consumer Electronics Devices, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, and Panasonic Communications Corporation of America are dismissed without prejudice. Panasonic shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Saxon's Second Amended Complaint on or before 1-11-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/26/09. cc:attys 10-26-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Utstarcom, Inc.,.( Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint,, by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint,,, Joint MOTION to Dismiss Panasonic Consumer Electronics Devices, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, and Panasonic Communications Corporation of America by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Kyocera America, Inc. on 10/8/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ORDERED that Defendant Casio Corporation of America has until and through December 28, 2009, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/2009. (gsg) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Kyocera International, Inc. on 10/8/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. Casio Computer Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 10/1/2009, answer due 12/30/2009. (mll, ) Modified on 10/21/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sierra Wireless, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) Modified on 10/15/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Casio Corporation of America, Inc. on 10/7/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Sanyo North America Corporation on 10/7/2009, by personal service, c/o United States Corporation Company; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Sanyo North America Corporation on 10/7/2009, by personal service c/o The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Sierra Wireless America, Inc. on 10/7/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Kyocera Wireless Corporation on 10/7/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Utstarcom, Inc., on 10/7/2009, by personal service; answer due: 10/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009, Terminated: 10/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Casio Corporation of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: 10/12/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Casio Corporation of America, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/05/09. cc:attys 10-05-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Casio Corporation of America, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D Belanger for Saxon Innovations, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-19365. Approved 9/22/09. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Renaud for Saxon Innovations, LLC. Receipt #6-1-19365. (gsg) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/22/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Casio Corporation of America, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera International, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002039144.), filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?