Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Sony Corporation of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00373
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 1:18 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 816 374 3326 +1 816 374 3300 megan.redmond@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 BWEBB@shb.com
No Logo Borland Software Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Borland Software Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo Mcafee, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Benson +1 512 536 3003 +1 512 536 4598 cbenson@fulbright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Brinn Hall +1 713 651 5627 +1 713 651 5246 eric.hall@nortonrosefulbright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Scott Leventhal +1 713 651 8360 +1 713 651 5246 dleventhal@fulbright.com
No Logo Quark, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 816 374 3326 +1 816 374 3300 megan.redmond@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 BWEBB@shb.com
Sony Corporation of America Sony Corporation of America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
Sony DADC US, Inc. Sony DADC US, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo Aspyr Media, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/15/2011 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 07/15/2011 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2011 Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2011 Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (266) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that parties meet and confer and Plaintiffs shall file a notice in the new case by 5-10-2013 regarding whether the case management conference should go forward on 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 256 Sealed Motion to Dismiss. All claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 256 SEALED MOTION Uniloc's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice Uniloc's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/25/13 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan,shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. re 256 SEALED MOTION Uniloc's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice Notice of Non-Opposition (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
            RESPONSE to Motion re 256 SEALED MOTION Uniloc's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice by Defendants filed by Aspyr Media, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., McAfee, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Sage Software, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc., Wildpackets, Inc.. (McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 259 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft Stat-Ease Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Stat-Ease, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Borland Software Corp. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                    Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal): 256 SEALED MOTION Uniloc's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice.. (Casto, Edward) Modified on 3/22/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                      SEALED MOTION Uniloc's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J-1, # 12 Exhibit J-2, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Renewed Motion to Dismiss Sur-Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 252 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants Manifold Net Ltd. and Microlead Corporation areDISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/13. cc:attys 3-18-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Manifold Net Ltd. and Microlead Corporation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER that all claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Methodsmarket.com Incorporated are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/13. cc:attys 3-12-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Weed on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4040276. (Weed, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4040240. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey on behalf of Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty (Dunlavey, Dean) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathy Yu on behalf of Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty (Yu, Kathy) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order 133 , and Protective Order 191 will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 234 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 244 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Barry Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 234 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Robert Benson (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan M James on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (James, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION - Renewed Motion to Dismiss by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Leventhal, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 042611 Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 060311 Pltff Infringement Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 062411 Benson Ltr to Etheridge, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 063011 Leventhal Ltr to Etheridge, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Hopkins Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 091211 Bumgardner email to Benson, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 0912-19 emails of Bumgardner and Benson, # 9 Exhibit 8 - 0921-22 emails of Bumgardner and Benson, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kaustuv M Das on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Das, Kaustuv) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan J McBrayer on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Albert F Harris, III on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Harris, Albert) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 228 Motion to Lift Stay and Setting Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 228 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 228 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., McAfee, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Megan J Redmond terminated as counsel for deft Activision Blizzard Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/12. cc:attys 3-13-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Redmond, Megan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 220 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 222 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Borland Software Corp., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/29/11. cc:attys 11-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Borland Software Corp. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions (and on Behalf of and Permission with All Defendants) by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by McAfee, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 217 Motion to Stay All Deadlines for Defendant Borland Software Corp. through 11/21/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines for Defendant Borland Software Corp. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brittany A Boswell on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying 175 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. This Order is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman and Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2011 re 175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 206 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Borland Software Corporation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to 202 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Borland Software Corp.. (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to 202 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 73 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6, # 11 Exhibit D7, part 1, # 12 Exhibit D7, part 2, # 13 Exhibit D8, # 14 Exhibit D9, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2011: # 17 Exhibit E Searchable, # 18 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 200 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 195 Motion for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/09/11. cc:attys 9-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION and Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceeding and to Withdraw Docket No. 195 re 195 MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 198 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 193 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 193 MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation. The mediation deadline is extended to 9-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Conduct Mediation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Order)(Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Filing of Patent Rule 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 184 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Borland Software Corp. of Compliance (PR 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, Additional Disclosures) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 185 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions by Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc. filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III in support of Unilocs Opposition to Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc.s Motion to Strike Under Seal by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aspyr Media, Inc. of Patent Rule 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, and Additional Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, and Defendants Aspyr Media, Inc., Digital River, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. is extended to 9-01-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 176 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Parties shall submit briefing regarding Activisions 175 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs First Amended Infringement Contentions as follows: Unilocs Response to Activisions Motion to Strike shall be submitted by 8-22-2011; Activisions Reply to Unilocs Response shall be submitted on or before 8-25-2011 as needed; andUnilocs Surreply shall be submitted on or before 8-30-2011 as needed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/17/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice 105 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McAfee, Inc. re Patent Rule 3-3, 3-4, and 4-1 (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend the First Mediation Deadline by Aspyr Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. re PR 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, and Additional Disclosures (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Briefing for its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's' First Amended Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for Aspyr Media, Inc. is extended 14 days to 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-05-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aspyr Media, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Borland Software Corp. of Compliance - Initial Disclosures (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which Defendants Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US Inc. must conduct first mediation is hereby extended to 8-11-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Borland Software Corp. (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McAfee, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Aspyr Media, Inc. of Compliance of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) Modified on 8/2/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. of Compliance of Initial Disclosures (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Conduct First Mediation) by Aspyr Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Conduct First Mediation) by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 155 Motion to Extend the First Mediation Deadline to 8/4/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter Shea Sloan,shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 154 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Christopher Kenneth Larus (Lead), Mathew John Yang, Charles W Goehringer, Jr, Lawrence Louis Germer for Aspyr Media, Inc.. Attorney John M Guaragna and Brian Erickson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,,,,, Mediation Deadline by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Aspyr Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Mediation Deadline. The first mediation deadline is extended to 8-03-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/12/11. cc:attys 7-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 147 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Edward R Nelson, III (Lead), Barry Bumgardner, and Steven Wayne Hartsell for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, and Uniloc USA, Inc. Attorney Dean G Bostock and Paul J Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend The First Mediation Deadline by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Borland Software Corp. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by McAfee, Inc. of Voluntary Source Code Disclosure, Pursuant to Docket Control Order (D.I. 134) (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. of Voluntary Source Code Disclosure Pursuant to Court's Docket Control Order (Dkt. 134) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine A Guastello for Activision Blizzard, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. of Voluntary Source Code Disclosure Pursuant to the Court's Docket Control Order [Dkt. 134] (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McAfee, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intel Corporation for McAfee, Inc.. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. (Gewirtz, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. (of Accused Product Sales Data) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp. of Compliance (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by McAfee, Inc. of it's Compliance with Court Order, Dkt. No. 134 (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. of Its Compliance With Court Order (134) (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp. of Designation of Co-Lead Counsel (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File the proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is extended to 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. of Designation of Lead Attorney B. Trent Webb (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 118 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Hayes (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Paul J Hayes on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 123 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Hayes (Hayes, Paul) Modified on 4/20/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DISREGARD ENTRY - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY*** NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Paul J Hayes on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) Modified on 4/20/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 117 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims in this action by pltfs against deft Quark Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All counterclaims by deft against pltfs are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Quark, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 105 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brittany A Boswell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/21/11. cc:attys 3-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (Boswell, Brittany) Modified on 3/17/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 105 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/03/11. cc:attys 3-03-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Uniloc's Surreply in Support of Uniloc's Opposition to defts' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 102 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/3/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Uniloc's Sur-Reply in Support of Uniloc's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Amended ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by McAfee, Inc..(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            2.7.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 2/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (CORRECTED) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Lin, # 2 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock, # 3 Declaration of Dianna Case, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 5 Exhibit Bto Declaration of Dianna Case, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Brief in Opposition to defts' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/10/11. cc:attys 2-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File SurReply in Opposition to defts' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/11. cc:attys 2-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404 by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fahd K Majiduddin for Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defts shall have to 1-26-2011 to file their reply in support of defts' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sony Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Activision Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Quark Declaration)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (Redmond, Megan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Reply ANSWER to 84 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Quark, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Reply ANSWER to 82 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Reply ANSWER to 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Activision Blizzard, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Reply ANSWER to 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, by Aspyr Media, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, by Borland Software Corp..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Quark, Inc's. ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM of Quark, Inc. against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Quark, Inc..(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Activision Blizzard, Inc's. ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM of Activision, Blizzard Inc. against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Activision Blizzard, Inc..(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by McAfee, Inc..(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc..(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) ; Replies due by 1/24/2011. Defts shall have to 1-21-2011 to answer, object or otherwise respond to pltfs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), 76 Amended Complaint, by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/7/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Lin, # 2 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock, # 3 Declaration of Dianna Case, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of Dianna Case, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc., filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) . Responses due by 1/7/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/2010. (gsg) Modified on 12/17/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Raymond B. Churchill, # 2 Exhibit 1- DRI Denial of Request for Recusal, # 3 Exhibit 2 - RI Docket Report-Uniloc v. Microsoft, # 4 Exhibit 3 - DRI Claim Construction Order, # 5 Exhibit 4 - DRI Summary Judgment Order, # 6 Exhibit 5 - DRI JMOL, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Complaints I-III, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Rhode Island Sec of State, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Complaints IV - VIII, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Texas Sec of State - Uniloc, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Etchegoyen Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 - In Re Apple Order, # 13 Exhibit 12 - MGM Well Services Order Granting Transfer, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Sony Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Activision Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Aspyr Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Borland Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 17 - McAfee Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Quark Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 19 - DRI Ct Stats, # 21 Exhibit 20 - ED Tex Ct Stats, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 61 Notice (Other), 71 Order, Amended Notice that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/10. cc:attys 12-06-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 53 MOTION to Dismiss; Responses due by 12/3/2010; Replies due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/10. cc:attys 12-03-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 53 MOTION to Dismiss by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing on Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (JOINTLY FILED) by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McAfee, Inc. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Filed by McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Filed by Quark, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for pltfs to opposed deft Activision Blizzard Inc's Motion to Dismiss is extended to 11-17-2010, and the time for Activision Blizzard Inc to file a reply is extended to 12-01-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/04/10. cc:attys 11-04-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing on Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alejandro Prati on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Leventhal on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Brinn Hall on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Hall, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by McAfee, Inc..(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robert Benson on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Lujin, Patrick) Modified on 10/15/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/2/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quark, Inc. (Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Quark, Inc..(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Filed by Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan J Redmond for Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Borland Software Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Micro Focus International plc for Borland Software Corp.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Borland Software Corp..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aspyr Media, Inc. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Aspyr Media, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft McAfee Inc shall have to 10-18-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint; denying as moot 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/10. cc:attys 10-06-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Quark Inc shall have to 10-06-2010 to file an answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/10. cc:attys 10-06-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brittany A Boswell for Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Basil Trent Webb for Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quark, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick A Lujin for Activision Blizzard, Inc., Quark, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Quark, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony DADC US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony DADC US Inc.. (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Corporation of America identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Corporation of America. (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc..(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Borland Software Corp..( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aspyr Media, Inc..( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Quark, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Quark, Inc. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint on behalf of Defendant Quark, Inc. Having considered the matter and that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion and extends Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint until and including September 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/23/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond Churchill for Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Gewirtz for Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Quark, Inc. on 8/9/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 8/30/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aspyr Media, Inc..( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Aspyr Media, Inc. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony DADC US Inc..( Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Corporation of America.( Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Quark, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to McAfee, Inc. on 8/12/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/2/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Sony DADC US Inc. on 8/12/2010, by cert mail by the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 9/2/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Sony Corporation of America on 8/4/2010, by cert mail by the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 8/25/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Activision Blizzard, Inc. on 8/9/2010 by cert mail by the Texas Secretary of State. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Borland Software Corp..( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Borland Software Corp. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Borland Software Corp. (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dean G Bostock for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Hayes for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to McAfee, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Aspyr Media, Inc. on 8/2/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 8/23/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Borland Software Corp. on 8/2/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 8/23/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Activision Blizzard, Inc., Aspyr Media, Inc., Borland Software Corp., McAfee, Inc., Quark, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2596790.), filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: # 3 Searchable Patent) (mjc, ). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 542 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?