Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Canon USA, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:11-cv-00084
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 10:52 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

FUJIFILM Corporation FUJIFILM Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Fujifilm North America Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Hoya Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Hoya Corporation, Usa, Counter-Claimant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.s.a., Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Counter-Claimant
Lenovo (United States), Inc. Lenovo (United States), Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Russell B. Hill +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 hillr@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A Trusso +1 949 622 2711 +1 949 622 2739 jennifer.trusso@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Nikon Americas Inc. , Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rick L. Rambo +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 rick.rambo@morganlewis.com
No Logo Nikon Americas Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo Nikon Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo Nikon, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rick L. Rambo +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 rick.rambo@morganlewis.com
No Logo Nikon Precision, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo Pentax Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Canon USA, Inc. Canon USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher P. Borello

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Carpenter +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 jcarpenter@fchs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper & Scinto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NICHOLAS M. CANNELLA +1 212 218 2265 +2182 218 218 2200 ncannella@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 11/14/2011 Thomas S. Gabriel +1 212 218 2205 +1 212 218 2200 tgabriel@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 11/14/2011 Edmund J. Haughey, III +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 ehaughey@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 09/12/2011 Preston H. Heard +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 pheard@fchs.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Sandonato +1 212 218 2100 +1 212 218 2200 msandonato@fchs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Canon Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, T2 Biosystems, Inc.
Canon USA, Inc. Officer/Director, Canon USA, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Cella, Harper & Scinto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NICHOLAS M. CANNELLA +1 212 218 2265 +2182 218 218 2200 ncannella@fchs.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Carpenter +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 jcarpenter@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 11/14/2011 Thomas S. Gabriel +1 212 218 2205 +1 212 218 2200 tgabriel@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 11/14/2011 Edmund J. Haughey, III +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 ehaughey@fchs.com
TERMINATED: 09/12/2011 Preston H. Heard +1 202 530 1010 +1 202 530 1055 pheard@fchs.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Sandonato +1 212 218 2100 +1 212 218 2200 msandonato@fchs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Eastman Kodak Company Eastman Kodak Company, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Lance Johnson +1 713 276 7650 +1 713 276 7673 Jeffrey.Johnson@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Lenovo Group Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lenovo Group Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Russell B. Hill +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 hillr@howrey.com

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A Trusso +1 949 622 2711 +1 949 622 2739 jennifer.trusso@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Nikon Americas Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MILLER HALL & TRIGGS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R Davis +1 309 671 9600 +1 309 671 9616 thomas.davis@mhtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo Nikon, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MILLER HALL & TRIGGS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R Davis +1 309 671 9600 +1 309 671 9616 thomas.davis@mhtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo Olympus America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011 Peter Giunta +1 212 908 6843 peter.giunta@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Kenny +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jkenny@kenyon.com

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Olympus Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Olympus Corp."
Officer/Director, Macropore, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011 Peter Giunta +1 212 908 6843 peter.giunta@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Kenny +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jkenny@kenyon.com

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Olympus Corporation Of The Americas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011 Peter Giunta +1 212 908 6843 peter.giunta@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Kenny +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jkenny@kenyon.com

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Olympus Imaging America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011 Peter Giunta +1 212 908 6843 peter.giunta@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Kenny +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jkenny@kenyon.com

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Olympus Imaging Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2011 Peter Giunta +1 212 908 6843 peter.giunta@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Kenny +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jkenny@kenyon.com

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (222) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
      BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $2,499.61. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
        JOINT PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bill of Costs)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 217 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. USCA Case Number 13-1256 (dlc, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Transmission of 217 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 187 Report and Recommendations, 198 Order, 213 Final Judgment, and certified copy of docket sheet.(dlc, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 187 Sealed Report and Recommendation, 198 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment, 213 Final Judgment, $455.00 Filing fee paid, Receipt No. 0540-4044150, by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (dlc, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                ORDER of USCA dismissing the appeal as of March 14, 2013, pursuant to appellant's motion as to 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter)(dlc, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                  ***FILED IN ERROR, Appeal to Federal Circuit, Atty notified to refile, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE OF APPEAL by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-4044150. (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 3/14/2013 (dlc, ). (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Filing Motion to Dismiss Appeal (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      FINAL JUDGMENT. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s declaratory judgment claims of Noninfringement; by virtue of Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s license, Lenovo (United States) Inc. does not directly or indirectly infringe U.S. Patent Nos. 5,530,597; 5,502,689; 5,608,873 and 5,592,555; Judgment is hereby entered against Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings LLC on Norman IP Holdings LLC's claims of direct and indirect infringement against Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.;Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s other claims against Norman IP Holdings LLC aredismissed without prejudice; and Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s costs of court should be taxed against Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/13. cc:attys 3-07-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. of Filing Proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 212 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. of Filing Proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 3/5/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING 206 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Pentax of America, Inc., Hoya Corporation, and Hoya Corporation USA filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Norman) against Defendant Pentax and all counterclaims of Defendant Pentax against Norman shall be, and are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/26/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER administratively closing this action as to Kodak per 148 Order staying deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                REDACTED COPY OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. REDACTED VERSION docketed per Order 207 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/20/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 203 Motion to Unseal Document 198 Sealed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Pentax of America, Inc., Hoya Corporation, and Hoya Corporation USA by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. of Filing Proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. USCA Case Number 13-40200 (dlc, ) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document Order (Dkt No. 198) and File Redacted Report and Recommendations (Dkt No. 187) by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Norman IP Holdings, LLC re orders 187 and 198 . Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-4003072. (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 2/15/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              THE COURT ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and jointly submit to the Court a claim construction chart no later than March 12, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/25/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER denying 196 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/25/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 10/31/12 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carla A. Sims,Telephone number: 903-517-5120. (53 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2013. (tja, ) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    UNSEALED PER ORDER 207 ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/13. (mll, ) Modified on 2/26/2013 (mjc, ). Modified on 2/26/2013 (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company, Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Claim Construction Hearing, Pre-trial and Trial Dates in Light of Magistrate's Ruling of Summary Judgment by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/12. cc:attys 12-21-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 192 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Lance Johnson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File of Certain Deadlines Under the Court's Docket Control Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eastman Kodak Company, Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. to 190 Sealed Document filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Sealed Document. Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's Objection to 187 Sealed Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 License Agreement (SEALED), # 2 Exhibit 2 (NOT SEALED))(Price, Adam) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 188 Motion to Extend Deadlines and Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines Under the Court's Docket Control Order (Dkt. No.122) by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing, Document #154 held on 10/31/2012. (Court Reporter Carla Sims) (mjm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 177 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief advising the Court of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/28/12. cc:attys 10-01-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 181 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendants Fujifilm Corporation and Fujifilm North America Corporation and all counterclaims of Fujifilm Defendants against Norman shall be, and are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/15/12. cc:attys 8-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 180 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendants Konica Minolta Holdings USA Inc and Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA Inc and all counterclaims of Konica Minolta Defendants against Norman shall be, and are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/15/12. cc:attys 8-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/13/12. cc:attys 8-13-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants FUJIFILM Corporation and FUJIFILM North America Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. and Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Re: Certain Deadlines Under Docket Control Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER setting Markman Hearing for 3/19/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms for Construction (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc of Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms for Construction (Yamashita, Brent) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. of Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms for Construction (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 172 Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines in the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines Under the Court's Docket Control Order by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 170 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John D Kinton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/31/12. cc:attys 5-31-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John D. Kinton by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 169 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16)(Price, Adam) Modified on 5/18/2012 To Read 'Sur-Reply'(gsg). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 169 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16)(Price, Adam) Modified on 5/18/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer A. Trusso (Supplemental), # 2 Exhibit 15 to Trusso Decl.)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 163 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/12. cc:attys 4-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14 Declaration of Adam G. Price, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE ENTRY 165 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14 Declaration of Adam G. Price, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) Modified on 4/30/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Response to Lenovo (United States) Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo Has a License to the Patents by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brent K Yamashita for Hoya Corporation, Pentax of America Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Peter Broderick terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/12. cc:attys 4-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION Counterclaim-Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s (Lenovo) Opening Brief In Support Of Lenovo's Motion for Summary Judgment that Lenovo has a License to the Patents-In-Suit by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer A. Trusso, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Trusso Decl., # 3 Exhibit 9 to Trusso Decl., # 4 Exhibit 10 to Trusso Decl., # 5 Exhibit 11 to Trusso Decl., # 6 Exhibit 12 to Trusso Decl., # 7 Exhibit 13 to Trusso Decl., # 8 Exhibit 14 to Trusso Decl., # 9 Affidavit of Scott Reid, # 10 Exhibit 2 to Reid Decl., # 11 Exhibit 3 to Reid Decl., # 12 Exhibit 4 to Reid Decl., # 13 Exhibit 5 to Reid Decl., # 14 Exhibit 6 to Reid Decl., # 15 Exhibit 7 to Reid Decl., # 16 Exhibit 8 to Reid Decl., # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 2/26/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 157 Motion to Dismiss. Normans claim of patent infringement with respect to the 555 patent and FUJIFILMs counterclaims for declaratory judgment of invalidity and non-infringement with respect to the 555 patent are hereby dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/12. cc:attys 4-04-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) FUJIFILM by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard de Bodo on behalf of Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc (de Bodo, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Carpenter, James) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/9/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(A) (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(A) (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(A) (Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation, Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Pentax of America Inc of Service of Defendants' Joint Invalidity Contentions (Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER staying all deadlines as to deft Eastman Kodak Company until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/12. cc:attys 1-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Eastman Kodak Company by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Petition)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Certain Discovery and Docket Control Order Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/28/11. cc:attys 12-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Extend Certain Discovery and Docket Control Order Deadlines by Eastman Kodak Company, Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation, Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice of Defendants Canon Inc and Canon USA Inc. Order granting 141 Joint Motion for Dismissal. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings LlC against Defendants Canon Inc and Canon USA are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS CANON INC. AND CANON U.S.A., INC. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp. of Request for Termination of ECF Notices (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Corp., Olympus Imaging Corp., Olympus Imaging America Inc. and Olympus America Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 137 Motion for Limited Discovery and Early Summary Judgment Consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/02/11. cc:attys 11-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Limited Discovery and Early Summary Judgment Consideration by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark L Blake for Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc. of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Haughey, Edmund) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Lenovo (United States) Inc shall have to 10-27-2011 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/21/11. cc:attys 10-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 125 Motion for Extension of Time. Eastman Kodak Company will have through 10-27-2011 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/21/11. cc:attys 10-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 124 Motion to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/21/11. cc:attys 10-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Serve Initial Disclosures by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Initial Disclosures by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Olympus by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 9-04-2012. Discovery due by 2/12/2013. Expert Witness List due by 12/20/2012; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 1-11-2013. Identify trial witnesses by 2/22/2013; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 3-07-2013. Joinder of Parties due by 12/28/2011, for defts. Jury instructions due by 7/11/2013. Mediation Completion due by 6/15/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2013; Response to Dispositive Motions due 3-27-2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2013. Jury Selection set for 10/7/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Expected length of trial 6 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/11. cc:attys 10-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/11. cc:attys 10-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling and Discovery Orders by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Deadline is 10/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell B Hill terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James R Carpenter for Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Receipt #6-5211) (mll, ) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Russell B. Hill by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit a proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order is 9-30-2011. The deadline by which Norman must provide its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures is 10-14-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and for P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline by which Norman must provide its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures is extended to 9-26-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 96 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Preston H Heard terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/12/11. cc:attys 9-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due by 9-23-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/09/11. cc:attys 9-12-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/07/11. cc:attys 9-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/6/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lance Johnson on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lance Johnson on behalf of Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision, Inc., and Nikon Americas Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/11. cc:attys 8-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice of Defendants Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision, Inc., and Nikon Americas Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc..(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation.(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc..(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Defendants Pentax of America, Inc., Hoya Corporation, and Hoya Corporation USA by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to 56 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Defendants Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. and Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to 54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Defendants FUJIFILM Corporation and FUJIFILM North America Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw, and withdrawing 37 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/6/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/11. cc:attys 8-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims filed by Defendants Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Precision, Inc., and Nikon Americas Inc by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to 74 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by DEFENDANT LENOVO (UNITED STATES), INC. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 37 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC re 22 Order, of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 62 Amended Complaint. Answer due by 8/17/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Dismissal. Deadline is extended to 7/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Davis on behalf of Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Nikon Precision Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Nikon Precision Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nikon Americas Inc. for Nikon Inc., Nikon Precision Inc.; Corporate Parent Nikon Corporation for Nikon Americas Inc.. (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Nikon Precision Inc., Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation.(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Eastman Kodak Company to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, by Eastman Kodak Company.(Kinton, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Hoya Corporation, Pentax of America Inc, Hoya Corporation USA.(Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Canon defts shall have to 8-16-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pltf has to 8-10-2011 to answer counterclaims by defts Pentax of America Inc, Hoya Corporation, and Hoya Corporation USA. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - License Agreement)(Findlay, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2011: # 2 Darker Copy of License Agreement) (mjc, ). (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 62 Amended Complaint,, by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re 37 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc..( Routh, Steven) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation.( Routh, Steven) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims, and extending deadline to 8-10-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims, and extending deadline to answer counterclaims to 8-10-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 62 Amended Complaint,, by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims filed by Defendants Pentax of America, Inc., Hoya Corporation, and Hoya Corporation USA by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims filed by Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. and Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims filed by Defendants FUJIFILM Corporation and FUJIFILM North America Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nikon Precision Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation, Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp., Pentax of America Inc, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 37 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL UNDER RULE 12(B)(6); Responses due by 7/15/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/01/11. cc:attys 7-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Defendants Canon USA, Inc. and Canon, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter L Giunta for Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp.. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 51 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendants Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation and Nikon Americas Inc. have until and through July 18, 2011, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/20/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc. for Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc.; Corporate Parent Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings, Inc., Konica Minolta Medical & Graphic, Inc., Konica Minolta Photo Imaging, Inc., Konica Minolta Sensing, Inc. and Konica Minolta T for Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc.. (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc..(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation, Corporate Parent Fujifilm Corporation for Fujifilm North America Corporation; Corporate Parent Fujifilm holdings Corporation for Fujifilm Corporation. (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Fujifilm North America Corporation, Fujifilm Corporation.(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eastman Kodak Company (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Eastman Kodak Company.(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Hoya Corporation for Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc. (Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Hoya Corporation, Pentax of America Inc, Hoya Corporation USA.(Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Olympus Corp. for Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas; Corporate Parent Olympus Corporation of the Americas for Olympus America Inc., Olympus Imaging America Inc.; Corporate Parent olympus corp for Olympus Imaging Corp.. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OLYMPUS DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Lenovos deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint will be July 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/16/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Peter Broderick on behalf of Hoya Corporation, Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc (Broderick, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving 26 Stipulation filed by Eastman Kodak Company. Defendant Eastman Kodak Company's deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until June 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/14/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN INCORRECT CASE.*** ORDERED that the following dates be incorporated into the Docket Control Order which is due by June 24, 2011. Markman Hearing set for 2/23/2012 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 6/27/2013 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 7/8/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/14/2011. (gsg) Modified on 6/15/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Canon, Inc. for Canon USA, Inc.. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Canon, Inc.. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/1/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc..(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Trusso for Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell B Hill for Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean C Cunningham for Eastman Kodak Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John D Kinton for Eastman Kodak Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tiffany C Miller for Eastman Kodak Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Knudson for Eastman Kodak Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Lenovo (United States) Inc shall have to 6-16-2011 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Hoya Corporation USA and Pentax of America Inc shall have through 6-16-2011 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, (Agreed Extension of Time to Respond) by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/11. cc:attys 4-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Hoya Corporation USA, Pentax of America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Canon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Konica Minolta's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 6-16-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Fujifilm's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 6-16-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routh, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Kenny for Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nikon defts shall have to 6-16-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael P Sandonato,Nicholas M Cannella,Preston H Heard,Thomas S Gabriel,Edmund J Haughey for Canon USA, Inc.,Michael P Sandonato,Nicholas M Cannella,Preston H Heard,Thomas S Gabriel,Edmund J Haughey for Canon, Inc. (FEE PAID). (Attachments: # 1 PHV Cannella, # 2 PHV Heard, # 3 PHV Gabriel, # 4 PHV Haughey)(rml, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Olympus defts shall have to 6-16-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/21/11. cc:attys 3-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation by Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hoya Corporation USA.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pentax of America Inc.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Canon, Inc..( Lee, Lance) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Canon USA, Inc..( Lee, Lance) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo Group Limited, Nikon Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Pentax of America Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation, Hoya Corporation, Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/16/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Canon USA, Inc., Canon, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Fujifilm Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation, Hoya Corporation, Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., Konica Minolta Holdings U.S.A., Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Olympus America Inc., Olympus Corp., Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Imaging America Inc., Olympus Imaging Corp., Pentax of America Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2894449.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 338 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?