Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
764 |
Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None |
Memorandum and Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
763 |
Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None |
AO435 Transcript Request |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
762 |
Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None |
Mail Returned Undeliverable |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
761 |
Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None |
Mail Returned Undeliverable |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
760 |
Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None |
Mail Returned Undeliverable |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
759 |
Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
758 |
Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None |
Supreme Court Writ of Certiorari |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
757 |
Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
756 |
Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None |
Mail Returned Undeliverable |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
755 |
Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
754 |
Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
753 |
Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None |
Transcript |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
752 |
Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None |
Response to Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
751 |
Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
750 |
Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
749 |
Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None |
Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
748 |
Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None |
Sealed Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
747 |
Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
746 |
Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None |
Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
745 |
Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
744 |
Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None |
Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
743 |
Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None |
Status Report |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
742 |
Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None |
Other Notice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
741 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
USCA Bill of Costs |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
740 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
USCA Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
739 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
USCA Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
736 |
Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None |
USCA Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
735 |
Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None |
Transmittal Letter on Appeal (FORM, noticing) - Civil |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
734 |
Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None |
Request for Record |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
733 |
Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None |
Request for Record |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
732 |
Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
731 |
Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript - Appeal |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
730 |
Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None |
USCA Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
729 |
Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
728 |
Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
727 |
Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
726 |
Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None |
Reply |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
725 |
Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
724 |
Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript - Appeal |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
723 |
Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None |
USCA Letter to Court Reporter |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
722 |
Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None |
Objections |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
721 |
Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
720 |
Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript - Appeal |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
719 |
Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
718 |
Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None |
Transmittal Letter on Appeal (FORM, noticing) - Civil |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
717 |
Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript Order Form - AO 435 |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
716 |
Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript Order Form - AO 435 |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
715 |
Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
714 |
Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript Order Form - AO 435 |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
713 |
Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None |
Transcript Order Form - AO 435 |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
712 |
Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None |
extension of time |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
711 |
Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None |
Brief |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
710 |
Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None |
Bill of Costs |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
709 |
Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None |
Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
707 |
Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None |
Notice of Appeal |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
706 |
Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
705 |
Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None |
extension of time |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
704 |
Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None |
Judgment - Final |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
703 |
Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None |
Miscellaneous Relief |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
702 |
Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
701 |
Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None |
extension of time |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
700 |
Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None |
Memorandum and Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
699 |
Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None |
Other Notice |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
698 |
Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
697 |
Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
696 |
Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
695 |
Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None |
Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
694 |
Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None |
Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
693 |
Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
692 |
Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
691 |
Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None |
Proposed Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
690 |
Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None |
Joinder |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
689 |
Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
688 |
Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None |
Stipulation |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
687 |
Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None |
Dismiss |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
686 |
Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None |
Amend |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
685 |
Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None |
Sealed Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
684 |
Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None |
Withdraw as Attorney |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
617 |
Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
616 |
Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 8/22/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Stephanie Carlisle, filed. (ckrus, ) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
615 |
Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
614 |
Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Order Memorandum and Order, filed. (Entered: 08/21/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
613 |
Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 611 Notice (Other),, , filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
612 |
Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 611 Notice (Other),, of Recent Supplemental Authority, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
611 |
Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Recent Supplemental Authority re: 588 Sealed Event by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
610 |
Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 609 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority Relevant to Daoud's Pending Motion (Dkt. 570), filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
609 |
Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Recent Supplemental Authority re: 570 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment by Daoud & Partners, filed. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
608 |
Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 607 Notice (Other) of Recent Supplemental Authority, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
607 |
Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Recent Supplemental Authority re: 570 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment by Daoud & Partners, filed. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
606 |
Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 586 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ganesh Gurung, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
605 |
Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 579 Sealed Event, 580 MOTION to Dismiss 579 Sealed Event , filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
604 |
Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 570 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
603 |
Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
602 |
Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 576 MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
601 |
Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 561 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment on Extraterritoriality in Light of Kiobel v. Dutch Petroleum Co. and Morrison v. National Austrialia Bank, Ltd., filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Appendix Appendix - part 1 of 10, # 4 Appendix Appendix - part 2 of 10, # 5 Appendix Appendix - part 3 of 10, # 6 Appendix Appendix - part 4 of 10, # 7 Appendix Appendix - part 5 of 10, # 8 Appendix Appendix - part 6 of 10, # 9 Appendix Appendix - part 7 of 10, # 10 Appendix Appendix - part 8 of 10, # 11 Appendix Appendix - part 9 of 10, # 12 Appendix Appendix - part 10 of 10)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
600 |
Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 586 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ganesh Gurung, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
599 |
Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 586 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ganesh Gurung, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul L. Hoffman, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
598 |
Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER denying 596 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
597 |
Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 596 MOTION to Amend 595 Order on Motion to Strike filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
596 |
Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Amend 595 Order on Motion to Strike by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2013. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
595 |
Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 594 Motion to Strike.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
594 |
Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Strike 588 Sealed Event, 591 Brief And Objections to Plaintiffs' and Amici's Refusal to Provide Cited Authorities [EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED] by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
593 |
Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 570 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment, 561 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment on Extraterritoriality in Light of Kiobel v. Dutch Petroleum Co. and Morrison v. National Austrialia Bank, Ltd., filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
592 |
Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 579 Sealed Event, 580 MOTION to Dismiss 579 Sealed Event , filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration & Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
591 |
Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by Philip Alston, Cherif Bassiouni, Douglass Cassel, Andrew Chapham, Jenny Martinez, David Scheffer, Dinah Shelton, filed.(glyons) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
590 |
Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 587 Motion for Leave to File Brief.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
589 |
Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 576 MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration & Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
588 |
Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
587 |
Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions by Philip Alston, Cherif Bassiouni, Douglass Cassel, Andrew Chapham, Jenny Martinez, David Scheffer, Dinah Shelton, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief Amicus Curiae)(Harrington, James) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
586 |
Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Deposition of Ganesh Gurung by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
585 |
Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER denying motions 426 Sealed Motion, 427 Motion to Compel, and 493 JOINDER in 427 MOTION to Compel..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
584 |
Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER Granting 582 Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing on Pending Motions.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
583 |
Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
PROPOSED ORDER re: 582 Stipulation, filed.(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
582 |
Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION re: Briefing on Pending Motions by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
581 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER in 576 MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party, 579 Sealed Event , filed by Daoud & Partners. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
580 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Dismiss 579 Sealed Event by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hamrock Dec., # 2 Exhibit 1-5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9 (1 of 4), # 7 Exhibit 9 (2 of 4), # 8 Exhibit 9 (3 of 4), # 9 Exhibit 9 (4 of 4), # 10 Exhibit 10-14, # 11 Exhibit 15 (1 of 3), # 12 Exhibit 15 (2 of 3), # 13 Exhibit 15 (3 of 3), # 14 Exhibit 16-25, # 15 Affidavit Hill Dec., # 16 Appendix, # 17 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
579 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
578 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 575 Motion for Mindy L. Rattan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
577 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 574 Motion for Raymond Biagini to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
576 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
575 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Mindy L. Rattan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2013. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
574 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Raymond B. Biagini to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2013. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
573 |
Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 572 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
572 |
Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on May 23, 2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter J. Sanchez. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2013., filed. (jsanchez, ) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
571 |
Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 563 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
570 |
Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
569 |
Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendant Kellogg, Brown & Root, Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File (Doc. Nos. 426 , 427 ) and Defendant Daoud & Partners' Joinder of the Motion (Doc. No. 493 . The Court heard agruments on these motions on May 23, 2013, and took the matter under advisement. Having reviewed the facts and applicable law, the Court finds and holds that an in camera review of the documents that appear on Plaintiffs' privilege log is necessary. A bound, tabbed copy of the documents must be submitted by Monday, June 10, 2013. Parties notified.(sloewe, ) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
568 |
Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Agreement with the KBR Defendants re: 561 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment on Extraterritoriality in Light of Kiobel v. Dutch Petroleum Co. and Morrison v. National Austrialia Bank, Ltd. by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
567 |
Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 5/23/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (mmapps, ) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
566 |
Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
565 |
Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Additional Legal Argument Incorporated and Attached to KBR's Motion to Strike by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
564 |
Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
563 |
Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
562 |
Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
561 |
Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment on Extraterritoriality in Light of Kiobel v. Dutch Petroleum Co. and Morrison v. National Austrialia Bank, Ltd. by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
560 |
Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 559 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike (All Responses due by 5/21/2013.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
559 |
Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
558 |
Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (glyons) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
557 |
Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint Request for Hearing on Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File (Dkt. 427, 493) by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
556 |
Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
555 |
Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
554 |
Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 553 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
553 |
Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: hearing held on 4/11/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita Manley. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2013., filed. (amanley, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
552 |
Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 539 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
551 |
Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Geoffrey H. Bracken. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 4/11/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Manley, filed. (hler, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
550 |
Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael W. Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Summary Judgment Hearing held on 4/11/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber: A. Manley, filed. (klinds, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
549 |
Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 534 Motion for Hope Metcalf to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
548 |
Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 533 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
547 |
Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental BRIEF in Support of KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiffs' Discovery Status Report re: 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 432 Sealed Event by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
546 |
Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
545 |
Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 539 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
544 |
Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 504 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
543 |
Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 541 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
542 |
Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
541 |
Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
540 |
Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
539 |
Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
538 |
Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 532 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
537 |
Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
536 |
Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 531 Amicus Curiae Appearance, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
535 |
Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 493 Joinder, KBR's Motion to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
534 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Hope Metcalf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Civil Liberties Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2013. (Robertson, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
533 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Steven Watt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Civil Liberties Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2013. (Robertson, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
532 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by American Civil Liberties Union, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed order)(Robertson, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
531 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by American Civil Liberties Union, filed.(Robertson, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
530 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
529 |
Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
528 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
KBR Defendants' Objections to And Motion to Strike Declarations and Documents Attached to Plaintiffs' Opposition to KBR's Motion for Sanctions by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(glyons) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
527 |
Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 522 Motion to Withdraw 516 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarr) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
526 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 521 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
524 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 520 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
523 |
Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 519 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (klinds, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
522 |
Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Withdraw 516 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Donley, Billy) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
521 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave, # 2 Motion to Strike, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Proposed Order on Motion to Strike)(Donley, Billy) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
520 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply in Support of KBR's Motion for Sanctions, # 3 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 6 Appendix)(Donley, Billy) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
519 |
Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013, filed. (kmetzger) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
518 |
Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
517 |
Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
516 |
Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Donley, Billy) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
515 |
Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael W. Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 3/26/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original expedited). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (gsalinas) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
514 |
Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
513 |
Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 494 Renewed MOTION to Compel the Production of KBR's Disciplinary Records, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Appendix, # 9 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
512 |
Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 511 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (klinds, ) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
511 |
Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Conference held on February 6, 2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber S. Carlisle. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2013., filed. (scarlisle) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
510 |
Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 509 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
509 |
Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: hearing held on 3/7/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita Manley. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2013., filed. (amanley, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
508 |
Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 490 MOTION to Compel A Response to a Single Interrogatory from Plaintiff Chittij Limbu's First Set of Interrogatories to the KBR Defendants, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
507 |
Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael W Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 3/7/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita G Manley, filed. (smurdock, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
506 |
Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from mmcowen@cohenmilstein.com on the account of Agnieszka M Fryszman. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
505 |
Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
504 |
Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
503 |
Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 03/07/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Manley, filed. (sroque, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
502 |
Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
EXHIBITS re: 498 Sealed Event, Farrell A Hochmuth, filed.(cfelchak, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
501 |
Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
500 |
Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Resetting as to 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 346 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (kpicota, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
499 |
Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER re: Doc Nos. 346 and 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. The Court will allow supplemental briefing on the Motion, which must be filed by NOON on Tuesday, April 9, 2013. Doc. Nos. 426 , 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation, 490 MOTION to Compel; 494 Renewed MOTION to Compel the Production of KBR's Disciplinary Records; and Doc No. 498 . Motion Hearing regarding these four motions is hereby set for 3/15/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
498 |
Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
497 |
Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 490 MOTION to Compel A Response to a Single Interrogatory from Plaintiff Chittij Limbu's First Set of Interrogatories to the KBR Defendants, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
496 |
Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
495 |
Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
494 |
Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Renewed MOTION to Compel the Production of KBR's Disciplinary Records by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-18, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
493 |
Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER in 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File and Statement in Support, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2, # 3 Appendix Part 3)(Krug, Zachary) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
492 |
Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE Plaintiffs have file a 490 Motion to Compel A Response to a Single Interrogatory From Plaintiff Chittij LImbu's First Set of Interrogatories to the KBR Defendants. A response to this filing is required on on expedited basis. All responses should be filed no later than NOON on Wednesday, March 6, 2013. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (dmorales) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
491 |
Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 02/27/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
490 |
Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel A Response to a Single Interrogatory from Plaintiff Chittij Limbu's First Set of Interrogatories to the KBR Defendants by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Appendix of Authorities, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
489 |
Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to Response to 478 Renewed MOTION to Compel Limited Categories of Non-Electronic Documents, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
488 |
Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 473 Status Report,,, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
487 |
Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
486 |
Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 478 Renewed MOTION to Compel Limited Categories of Non-Electronic Documents, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
485 |
Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from mhandley@cohenmilstein.com on the account of Agnieszka M Fryszman. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
484 |
Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from mhandley@cohenmilstein.com on the account of Matthew Keith Handley. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
483 |
Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File, 426 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
482 |
Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 471 Motion for Anthony P. DiCaprio to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
481 |
Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
480 |
Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Sanctions by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Appendix, # 32 Proposed Order)(Donley, Billy) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
479 |
Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
478 |
Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Renewed MOTION to Compel Limited Categories of Non-Electronic Documents by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
477 |
Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 3/7/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
476 |
Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael W. Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 2/6/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Deposit amount $54.75. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Carlisle, filed. (klinds, ) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
475 |
Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/6/2013 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
474 |
Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 473 Status Report,, 426 Sealed Event, 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File, 470 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Continuance, 472 Status Report,. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (kpicota, ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
473 |
Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix I, # 2 Appendix II, # 3 Exhibit 1-3, # 4 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
472 |
Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
471 |
Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Anthony P. DiCaprio to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/22/2013. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
470 |
Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER denies 355 , 356 Motion to Compel; granting 404 Motion for Continuance (30) days.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(mmapps, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
469 |
Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 01/24/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
468 |
Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
SURREPLY to 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
467 |
Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
466 |
Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 465 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
465 |
Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
464 |
Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 463 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Additional Briefing.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
463 |
Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Additional Briefing by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Appendix of Authorities, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
462 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 436 MOTION to Strike 433 Sealed Event MOTION to Strike 433 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit A (redacted), # 3 Exhibit B (redacted), # 4 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
461 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hochmuth Aff., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (redacted), # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G (redacted), # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) Modified on 12/24/2012 (bthomas, ). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
460 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to Response to 428 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
459 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
458 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
457 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 12/21/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
456 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Michael Henson re: 401 Sealed Event, filed.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
455 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 446 Motion to Substitute Henson Declaration.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
454 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 428 Sealed Event filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-16, # 3 Appendix Of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
453 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 433 Sealed Event filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
452 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
451 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 427 MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
450 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
449 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
448 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 434 Objections & Request to Strike Plaintiffs' Third-Party Declarations in Support of their Opposition to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
447 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Motion held on 12/6/12 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: J Sanchez, filed. (ckrus, ) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
446 |
Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Henson Declaration by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
445 |
Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Matthew K Handley 413 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; New address found and renoticed, filed. (cfelchak) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
444 |
Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 12/05/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
443 |
Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 439 Sealed Event, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
442 |
Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 12/05/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
441 |
Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
SURREPLY to 404 Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d)Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d)Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d), filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
440 |
Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Order granting 439 Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 12/05/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
439 |
Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments). (Entered: 12/04/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
438 |
Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
437 |
Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER in 416 Reply in Support of Motion, 387 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
436 |
Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Strike 433 Sealed Event by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
435 |
Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to 432 Sealed Event Reply Brief in Support of KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Farrell Hochmuth Declaration, # 3 Ex. A, # 4 Ex. B, # 5 Ex. C, # 6 Ex. D, # 7 Ex. E, # 8 Ex. F, # 9 Ex. G, # 10 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
434 |
Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
OBJECTIONS and Request to Strike Plaintiffs' Third-Party Declarations in Support of Their Opposition to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
433 |
Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
432 |
Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
431 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER in 428 Sealed Event re KBR's Motion to Show Cause, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
430 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
429 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 414 MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
428 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
427 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Pre-Suit Investigation File by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Appendix, # 13 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
426 |
Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
425 |
Filed: 11/17/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 424 Motion.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, ) (Entered: 11/17/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
424 |
Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION to Reallocate Page Limits by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
423 |
Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 414 MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Appendix, # 9 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
422 |
Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
421 |
Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in opposition (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
420 |
Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 387 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
419 |
Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 417 Surreply to Motion,,, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
418 |
Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 11/13/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
417 |
Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
SURREPLY to 387 Sealed Event, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew K. Handley, # 2 Affidavit of Agnieszka M. Fryszman, # 3 Appendix of Authorities, # 4 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
416 |
Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 387 Sealed Event, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
415 |
Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER for Expedited Response ; Motion-related deadline set re: 387 Sealed Event Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. Responses due by 11/15/2012. Reply to Response due by 11/20/2012(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
414 |
Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information Pursuant to a Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
413 |
Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 411 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas N. Saunders.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
412 |
Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 404 Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d)Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d)Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d), filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
411 |
Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Thomas N. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2012. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
410 |
Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
409 |
Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 407 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 407 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages( Replies due by 11/21/2012).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
408 |
Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 387 Sealed Event, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew K. Handley, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
407 |
Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO REPLY AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS( Motion Docket Date 11/16/2012.), MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
406 |
Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 400 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
405 |
Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Redacted Response to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Part 1 - Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Part 2 - Statement of Material Facts, # 4 Affidavit of Sanjay Prasad Raut, # 5 Affidavit of Duane Banks, # 6 Affidavit of Michael Henson, # 7 Affidavit of Maureen McOwen, # 8 Exhibit 1-15, # 9 Exhibit 16-32, # 10 Exhibit 33-44, # 11 Exhibit 45-52, # 12 Exhibit 53-58, # 13 Exhibit 59-62, # 14 Exhibit 63-81, # 15 Exhibit 82-102, # 16 Exhibit 103-123, # 17 Exhibit 124-138, # 18 Exhibit 139-145, # 19 Exhibit 146-151, # 20 Exhibit 152-153, # 21 Exhibit 154-159, # 22 Exhibit 160-167, # 23 Exhibit 168-173a, # 24 Exhibit 173b, # 25 Exhibit 174, # 26 Exhibit 175, # 27 Exhibit 176-228, # 28 Exhibit 229-249, # 29 Exhibit 250-273, # 30 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
404 |
Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Renewed MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d) by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2012. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
403 |
Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
APPENDIX re: 402 Response in Opposition to Motion, by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
402 |
Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 400 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
401 |
Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
400 |
Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix of Authority)(McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
399 |
Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER. The parties to provide a Status Report to the Court. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
398 |
Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order [Doc. No. 385] by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
397 |
Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 328 Motion to Compel.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
396 |
Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 388 Joint Motion to Bifurcate Indemnification and Breach of Contract Claims.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
395 |
Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental RESPONSE to 385 Order,, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
394 |
Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 393 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (klinds, ) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
393 |
Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on September 25, 2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber S. Carlisle. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2013., filed. (scarlisle) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
392 |
Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 390 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
391 |
Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 385 Order,, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
390 |
Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Court Order DE 385 by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
389 |
Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Maureen McOwen. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 9/25/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original), filed. (amwilliams) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
388 |
Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Idemnification and Breach of Contract Claims by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sarles, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
387 |
Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
386 |
Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Geoffrey H. Bracken. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 9/25/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
385 |
Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER. The Court asks that Plaintiff and Defendants respond, either seperately or together, to the United Staes Embassy as to its offer to host the depositions in Nepal. The rsponse(s) should be filed by October 9, 2012, and a copy furnished to the Court.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
384 |
Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Motions Hearing held on 09/25/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Stephanie Kay Carlisle. EXPEDITED, filed. (gkelner, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
383 |
Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 379 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
382 |
Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
OBJECTIONS to 378 Status Report,,, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
381 |
Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to Response to 359 MOTION to Compel Discovery, 358 Sealed Event, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
380 |
Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 375 MOTION for Continuance of Under Rule 56(d) MOTION for Continuance of Under Rule 56(d) MOTION for Continuance of Under Rule 56(d), 374 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits D - J)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
379 |
Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF: 1) COUNTS IV AND V OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND 2) ALL REMAINING COUNTS OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFFS RENUKA KARKI SHRESTHA, RAM KUMAR SHRESTHA, NIRMAYA SHRESTHA AND DHANA ROKA MAGAR by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
378 |
Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed.(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
377 |
Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 356 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions in Houston, 355 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
376 |
Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting re: 366 MOTION for Discovery, 374 Sealed Event. Parties notified. These two additional motions will be handled at the hearing. No responses or briefing need be filed regarding these two motions. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (bthomas) (bthomas, ). (Entered: 09/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
375 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Continuance of Under Rule 56(d) by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
374 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
373 |
Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER GRANTED in part and DENIED in part 368 ; Motion-related deadline set re: 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 10/1/2012.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
372 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 359 MOTION to Compel Discovery, 358 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - D, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits H - K, # 7 Appendix, # 8 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
371 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
370 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 361 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
369 |
Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 356 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions in Houston, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew Handley, # 2 Affidavit of Maureen McOwen, # 3 Appendix of Authorities, # 4 Proposed Order)(McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
368 |
Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 361 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - D, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits E - F, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 5 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
367 |
Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
366 |
Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Discovery by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits C1 - C2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits D - G, # 5 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
365 |
Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 335 MOTION to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff Buddi Gurung's Deposition, 334 Sealed Event, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
364 |
Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER for Expedited Response granting 361 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment ; Motion-related deadline set re: 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 9/17/2012.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
363 |
Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 329 Sealed Event, 335 MOTION to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff Buddi Gurung's Deposition, 328 MOTION to Compel Production of KBR's Ethics Hotline Reports, 336 Sealed Event, 334 Sealed Event. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF CARLOS RAMOS-MROSOVSKY AS COUNSEL FOR KBR DEFENDANTS by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
361 |
Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to KBR's Motion for Summary Judgment by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
360 |
Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Motion-related deadline set re: 358 Motion to Compel (Sealed Event). Response due by 9/19/2012. Replies due by 9/24/2012(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
359 |
Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13, # 2 Exhibit 14-17, # 3 Appendix of Authorities, # 4 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
358 |
Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
357 |
Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Response due by 9/17/2012. Reply due by 9/21/2012(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
356 |
Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions in Houston by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Appendix, # 14 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
355 |
Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
354 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 335 MOTION to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff Buddi Gurung's Deposition, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of K. McKeon, # 2 Affidavit of J. Eby, # 3 Affidavit of J. Hunter, # 4 Affidavit of M. Handley, # 5 Affidavit of C. Sweetser with Exhibits, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
353 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 336 Sealed Event, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of K. McKeon, # 2 Affidavit of J. Eby, # 3 Affidavit of J. Hunter, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
351 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY in Support of 328 MOTION to Compel Production of KBR's Ethics Hotline Reports, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of M. McOwen, # 2 Exhibit 1-5, # 3 Appendix of Authorities)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
350 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
349 |
Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
348 |
Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 288 MOTION for Protective Order. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 9/12/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number 713-250-5238. (sloewe) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
347 |
Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Summary Judgment by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11a, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 36 Appendix, # 37 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
346 |
Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
345 |
Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 344 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
344 |
Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
343 |
Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
342 |
Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 328 MOTION to Compel Production of KBR's Ethics Hotline Reports filed by Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits B - D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 10 Appendix, # 11 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
341 |
Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
340 |
Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 339 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
339 |
Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on August 10, 2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2012., filed. (gdye, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
338 |
Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michel W. Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
337 |
Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
PROPOSED ORDER re: 335 MOTION to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff Buddi Gurung's Deposition, 334 Sealed Event, filed.(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
336 |
Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
335 |
Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel the Completion of Plaintiff Buddi Gurung's Deposition by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - D, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits E - F, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits G - I, # 5 Appendix)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
334 |
Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
333 |
Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 10 days. Jury Trial. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/9/2013. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/9/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2013. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
332 |
Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: 10 Days. JURY. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/9/2013. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/9/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2013. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
331 |
Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 330 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
330 |
Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 & 2, # 3 Appendix of Cases)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
329 |
Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 08/02/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
328 |
Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Production of KBR's Ethics Hotline Reports by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 2-3, # 3 Exhibit 4-6, # 4 Appendix of Cases, # 5 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
327 |
Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint MOTION to Amend 291 Scheduling Order,, by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Daoud & Partners, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
326 |
Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 319 Response to Motion,, 325 Reply to Response to Motion, 312 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
325 |
Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to Response to 312 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Farrell Hochmuth in Support)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
324 |
Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Handley on behalf of Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
323 |
Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/13/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
322 |
Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Resetting as to 320 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/28/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
321 |
Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Geoffrey H. Bracken. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 5/30/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy Order). Court Reporter: A. Manley, filed. (pcrawford, ) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
320 |
Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 314 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/20/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
319 |
Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 312 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Appendix of Unpublished Cases, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
318 |
Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 317 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (kcraig, ) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
317 |
Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: status conference held on 5/30/12 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita Manley. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2012., filed. (amanley, ) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
316 |
Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER for Expedited Reponse(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
315 |
Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael W. Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 5/30/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Deposit amount $$200.00. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Manley, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
314 |
Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/13/2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
313 |
Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Farrell Hochmuth re: 312 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed.(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
312 |
Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Compel Discovery by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits D through I, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits J through K, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits L through S, # 5 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
311 |
Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER Extending the Protective Order and Agreement to the Daoud & Partners Entities.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
310 |
Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 5/30/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
309 |
Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 2)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Protective Order and Agreement to the Daoud & Partners Entities re: 307 Stipulation, filed.(Krug, Zachary) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION re: Extension of Confidentiality Order and Agreement (Docket 205) to Daoud & Partners by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Tayback, Christopher) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Plaintiff Kul Prasad Thapa by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed.(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed.(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 303 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dclark, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on 4/11/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012, filed. (kmetzger) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
302 |
Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed.(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 4/11/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (mmapps, ) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 298 Status Report,,, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
299 |
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
298 |
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michael Mengis. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 03/13/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (kgilyard, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 293 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to Response to 288 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
294 |
Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 288 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 Redacted, # 3 Exhibit 2 Redacted, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Appendix)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Joseph Sarles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2012. (Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: 10-14 DAYS. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 10/15/2012. Pltf Expert Report due by 10/15/2012 Deft Expert Witness List due by 9/26/2012. Deft Expert Report due by 9/26/2012 Discovery due by 9/15/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/18/2013. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/18/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2013. Jury Trial set for 4/29/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING Daoud's Motion to Certify.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 288 MOTION for Protective Order. Parties notified. ALL RESPONSES DUE 3/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Protective Order by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - L, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Scheduling/Docket Control Order by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Daoud & Partners, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Overseas Employment Administration, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling/Docket Control Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 278 Answer to Crossclaim,, Counterclaim,, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
285 |
Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 283 Motion for Extension of Time; Response to Counter-claim due for KBR Defendants' by 2/22/2012.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
284 |
Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY to 274 Stipulation, 276 Document (Consolidated Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Request to Certify December 12, 2011 Order on Motions to Dismiss for Interlocutory Review Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Daoud Entities' Counter-Claim by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
282 |
Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM in Support re: 281 Response, by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2, # 3 Appendix Part 3, # 4 Appendix Part 4)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 276 Document, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc.. (Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from afryszman@cohenmilstein.com, efilings@cohenmilstein.com, mhandley@cohenmilstein.com, and mmcowen@cohenmilstein.com on the account of Agnieszka M Fryszman. The referenced email addresses have been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE to 276 Document Daoud & Partners' Request to Certify Order under 1292(b), filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Part 1, # 3 Appendix Part 2, # 4 Appendix Part 3)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING Daoud's Motion to Certify.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 |
Answer to Crossclaim |
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 |
Response |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 |
Document |
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 |
Stipulation |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 |
Sealed Order |
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 |
Sealed Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 |
Response |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 |
Transcript |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/28/2011 |
Objections |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
267 |
Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 |
Transcript Order Form - AO 435 |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 |
~Notice (other) |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
265 |
Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 |
Notice of Resetting |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 |
Notice of Resetting |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 |
Notice of Setting |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 |
Notice of Setting |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 |
Surreply to Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
259 |
Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 |
Order on Motion For Leave to File. |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 |
Response |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 |
Appendix |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 |
Motion for Leave to File Document |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: 10/6/2011 |
Stipulation |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
243 |
Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/20/2011 |
Order |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 |
Status Report |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 |
Appendix |
|
APPENDIX re: 239 Memorandum, 237 Memorandum by Daoud & Partners, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Tab 1, # 2 Appendix Tab 2, # 3 Appendix Tab 3, # 4 Appendix Tab 4, # 5 Appendix Tab 5, # 6 Appendix Tab 6, # 7 Appendix Tab 7, # 8 Appendix Tab 8, # 9 Appendix Tab 9, # 10 Appendix Tab 10, # 11 Appendix Tab 11, # 12 Appendix Tab 12, # 13 Appendix Tab 13, # 14 Appendix Tab 14, # 15 Appendix Tab 15, # 16 Appendix Tab 16, # 17 Appendix Tab 17, # 18 Appendix Tab 18, # 19 Appendix Tab 19, # 20 Appendix Tab 20, # 21 Appendix Tab 21, # 22 Appendix Tab 22, # 23 Appendix Tab 23, # 24 Appendix Tab 24, # 25 Appendix Tab 25, # 26 Appendix Tab 26)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 |
Memorandum |
|
Supplemental MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF re: 238 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss THE KBR DEFENDANTS' CROSS-CLAIMS by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
Renewed MOTION to Dismiss THE KBR DEFENDANTS' CROSS-CLAIMS by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 |
Memorandum |
|
Supplemental MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF re: 236 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
236 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
Renewed MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
234 |
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 |
Status Report |
|
STATUS REPORT by Daoud & Partners, filed.(Watson, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 |
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
ORDER granting 232 Matiangai Sirleaf's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 |
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
MOTION for Matiangai Sirleaf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2011. (pyebernetsky, ) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
231 |
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 |
Order on Motion to Dismiss |
|
ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice to Refiling.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (aalonzo) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 |
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript |
|
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 229 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: 2/21/2011 |
Transcript |
|
TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on February 11, 2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Reed. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2011., filed. (ereed, ) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: 2/21/2011 |
Notice of Change of Address |
|
NOTICE of Change of Address by Dow Golub Remels & Beverly, LLP, counsel for Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Golub, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 |
Motion to Amend |
|
Joint MOTION to Amend 219 Scheduling Order, by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amending Scheduling Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
226 |
Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 |
Sealed Event |
|
Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE re: 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 |
Notice of Resetting |
|
NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number at 713-250-5238. (sloewe ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 |
Notice of Resetting |
|
NOTICE of Resetting as to 222 Notice of Setting,,. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number at 713-250-5238. (sloewe) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 |
Notice of Setting |
|
NOTICE of Setting as to 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, 212 MOTION to Dismiss 197 Crossclaim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), 211 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Declawrations in Part. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number at 713-250-5238. (sloewe) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 |
Response |
|
RESPONSE to 220 Brief,, Defendants' Submission of Supplemental Authority, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 |
Brief |
|
BRIEF in Support re: 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Morrison decision, # 2 Exhibit Kiobel decision, # 3 Exhibit Norex decision, # 4 Exhibit Cedeno decision)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 |
Scheduling Order |
|
SCHEDULING /DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 10-14 days. Jury trial.Fact Discovery due by 2/11/2011 Pltf Expert Report due by 2/25/2011 Deft Expert Report due by 4/22/2011 Discovery due by 6/3/2011 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/27/2011 Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/27/2011 Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2011 Jury Trial set for 9/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 |
Motion to Amend |
|
Joint MOTION to Amend 182 Scheduling Order, by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
REPLY in Support of 212 MOTION to Dismiss 197 Crossclaim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Watson, Scott) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
216 |
Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 |
Brief |
|
BRIEF Opposition re: 212 MOTION to Dismiss 197 Crossclaim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix Tabs 1-8, # 2 Appendix Appendix Tabs 9-14, # 3 Appendix Appendix Tabs 15-23, # 4 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
REPLY in Support of 211 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Declawrations in Part, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Tabs 1-3)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 211 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Declawrations in Part, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 |
Memorandum |
|
MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of its re: 212 MOTION to Dismiss 197 Crossclaim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Daoud & Partners, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Appendices, # 2 Appendix Tabs 1-5, # 3 Appendix Tabs 6-13)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss 197 Crossclaim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 |
Motion to Strike |
|
MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Declawrations in Part by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2010. (Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
210 |
Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 |
Appendix |
|
Joint APPENDIX re: 209 Reply, 208 Reply in Support of Motion by Daoud & Partners, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 1, # 2 Exhibit Tabs 2-8, # 3 Exhibit Tabs 9-12, # 4 Exhibit Tabs 13-17, # 5 Exhibit Tabs 18-23, # 6 Exhibit Tabs 24-28, # 7 Exhibit Tabs 29-35)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
209 |
Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 |
Reply |
|
REPLY to the KBR Defendants' Response to its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
208 |
Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 |
Reply in Support of Motion |
|
REPLY in Support of 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by Daoud & Partners. (Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 |
Order on Motion For Leave to File. |
|
ORDER granting 206 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 |
Motion for Leave to File Document |
|
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Over-Length Brief in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 |
Order on Motion for Protective Order |
|
Confidentiality Order and Agreement 203 Motion for Protective Order.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
204 |
Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
ORDER granting 202 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 7/16/2010.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 |
Motion for Protective Order |
|
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Overseas Administration Services, Service Employees International Inc., Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
202 |
Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 |
Motion for Extension of Time |
|
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to KBR's Crossclaim by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
201 |
Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
ORDER granting 200 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 |
Motion for Extension of Time |
|
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS by Daoud & Partners, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Bracken, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Overseas Administration Services, Overseas Employment Administration, Service Employees International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Cover and Table of Contents, # 2 Appendix Appendix Tabs 1-7, # 3 Appendix Appendix Tabs 8-14, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to 187 MOTION to Dismiss 58 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by Devaka Adhikari, Ramchandra Adhikari, Buddi Prasad Gurung, Jit Bahdur Khadka, Radhika Khadka, Bindeshore Singh Koiri, Pukari Devi Koiri, Chittij Limbu, Dhana Roka Magar, Kamala Thapa Magar, Maya Thapa Magar, Satya Narayan Shah, Dil Bahadur Shrestha, Ganga Maya Shrestha, Nirmaya Shrestha, Nischal Shrestha, Ram Kumar Shrestha, Renuka Karki Shrestha, Tara Shrestha, Ram Dulari Sudi, Jitini Devi Thakur, Ram Naryan Thakur, Samundri Devi Thakur, Bhim Bahadur Thapa, Bhuji Thapa, Bishnu Maya Thapa, Kul Prasad Thapa, Bhakti Maya Thapa Magar. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Cover, # 2 Appendix Tab 1 Part 1, # 3 Appendix Tab 1 Part 2, # 4 Appendix Tab 1 Part 3, # 5 Appendix Tab 1 Part 4, # 6 Appendix Tab 1 Part 5, # 7 Appendix Tabs 2-5, # 8 Appendix Tabs 6-10, # 9 Appendix Tabs 11-15, # 10 Appendix Tabs 16-20, # 11 Appendix Tabs 21-25, # 12 Appendix Tabs 26-28)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 |
Crossclaim |
|
CROSSCLAIM against Daoud & Partners filed by Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., KBR Holdings, LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Mengis, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
196 |
Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
ORDER granting 195 Motion for Extension of Time; Responses to 187 MOTION to Dismiss due by 5/24/2010.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
No calendar events were found for this docket.
|