FieldTurf USA, Inc. v. TenCate Thiolon Middle East, LLC

Federal Court Proceeding Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:12-mc-00105-LY
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 2:48 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fieldturf Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pearline M. Kyi +1 212 833 1100 pkyi@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsey Rudd Skibell +1 212 833 1133 +1 212 833 7933 rskibell@fklaw.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara P Ellis +1 512 305 4830 +1 512 305 4800 bellis@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M. Fincher +1 512 305 4700 +1 512 305 4800 lfincher@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon L. Gillum +1 512 305 4717 +1 512 305 4800 jgillum@lockeliddell.com
No Logo FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, Plaintiff

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pearline M. Kyi +1 212 833 1100 pkyi@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsey Rudd Skibell +1 212 833 1133 +1 212 833 7933 rskibell@fklaw.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara P Ellis +1 512 305 4830 +1 512 305 4800 bellis@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M. Fincher +1 512 305 4700 +1 512 305 4800 lfincher@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon L. Gillum +1 512 305 4717 +1 512 305 4800 jgillum@lockeliddell.com
No Logo Fieldturf Usa, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsey Rudd Skibell +1 212 833 1133 +1 212 833 7933 rskibell@fklaw.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pearline M. Kyi +1 212 833 1100 pkyi@fklaw.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara P Ellis +1 512 305 4830 +1 512 305 4800 bellis@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren M. Fincher +1 512 305 4700 +1 512 305 4800 lfincher@lockelord.com

Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon L. Gillum +1 512 305 4717 +1 512 305 4800 jgillum@lockeliddell.com
v.
No Logo Polyloom Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo Ten Cate Thiolon B.v., Defendant
No Logo TenCate Thiolon Middle East, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Breslin
No Logo Fieldturf Inc., Respondent
No Logo FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, Respondent
No Logo Fieldturf Usa, Inc., Respondent
Other Parties
No Logo Hellas Construction Inc., Movant

Represented by Waller Lanseden Dortch & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Curtis Taylor +1 512 685 6400 +1 512 685 6417 mark.taylor@wallerlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Motion to Quash
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER MOOTING 12 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Amended Concerning Agreed Resolution of Motion to Compel by FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc.. (Ellis, Barbara) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Concerning Agreed Resolution of Motion to Compel by FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc.. (Ellis, Barbara) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 12 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Hellas Construction, Inc. filed by FieldTurf Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Hellas Construction, Inc., re 12 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Hellas Construction, Inc. filed by Plaintiff FieldTurf Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Mark) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Hellas Construction, Inc. by FieldTurf Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Barbara) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bruce Kaplan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey Skibell. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Pearline Kyi. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce S. Kaplan ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100013013) by on behalf of FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc.. (td) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey R. Skibell ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100013012) by on behalf of FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc.. (td) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pearline M. Kyi ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100013011) by on behalf of FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc.. (td) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Hellas Construction, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Ellis, Barbara) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION by FieldTurf Inc., FieldTurf Tarkett SAS, FieldTurf USA, Inc., Hellas Construction, Inc.. (dm, ) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Hellas Construction, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Deposition ($46.00 paid; Receipt #100012765) by Hellas Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Receipt)(os, ) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING 1 Motion to Quash and Notice of Deposition. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm, )
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 65 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?