Qimonda AG v. LSI Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00735-JRS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 11:31 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Qimonda Ag, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CLEMENT & WHEATLEY PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Patrick Gould +1 434 793 8200 +1 434 793 8436 goulds@clementwheatley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/18/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Louis Sophir +1 202 408 6400 +1 202 408 6399 eric.sophir@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dawn-Marie Bey +1 202 626 8978 +1 202 626 3737 dbey@kslaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Kolassa +1 212 556 2130 +1 212 552 2222 skolassa@kslaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles D. Lee +1 212 556 2156 clee@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Schapira +1 650 590 0737 +1 650 590 1900 lschapira@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Risdon Hanes +1 804 643 1991 +1 804 783 6507 phanes@williamsmullen.com
v.
No Logo LSI CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Spotts Fain PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Duane McDaniel +1 804 697 2065 +1 804 697 2165 dmcdaniel@spottsfain.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greg Binns +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 Gregory.Binns@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Politz Brandt +1 214 969 1105 +1 214 969 1751 jane.brandt@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Ciccarelli +1 214 969 1599 max@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert J. Hammond +1 214 969 1607 +1 214 880 3256 herbert.hammond@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Michael Heinlen +1 214 969 2539 +1 214 969 1751 michael.heinlen@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vishal Hemant Patel +1 214 969 1224 +1 214 880 3224 vishal.patel@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Schonberg +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 mike.schonberg@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S Sostek +1 214 969 1237 +1 214 969 1751 bruce.sostek@tklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 281
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 26 LSI Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing; for reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS the motion. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 3/7/2012. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 62 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 3/7/2012. Copies to counsel.(cmcc, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      SO-ORDER granting 54 Motion for Pro hac vice; Appointed Scott Edward Kolassa for Qimonda AG. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 1/10/12. (jtho, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        SO-ORDER granting 55 Motion for Pro hac vice; Appointed Lisa Schapira for Qimonda AG. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 1/10/12. (jtho, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO-ORDER granting 56 Motion for Pro hac vice; Appointed Charles David Lee for Qimonda AG. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 1/10/12. (jtho, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James R. Spencer: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2012 re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing filed by LSI Corporation. Dft's Motion to Dismiss - GRANTED (Court Reporter Jeff Kull, OCR.) (khan, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              Decline Consent of Election to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Qimonda AG. (Hanes, Patrick) Modified on 1/6/2012 to edit event text. (cmcc, ). (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles David Lee and Certification of Local Counsel Steven P. Gould Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2853413. by Qimonda AG. (Gould, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                  Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Schapira and Certification of Local Counsel Steven P. Gould Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2853394. by Qimonda AG. (Gould, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Edward Kolassa and Certification of Local Counsel Steven P. Gould Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2853343. by Qimonda AG. (Gould, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Decline Consent of Election to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by LSI Corporation (McDaniel, Dana) Modified on 1/6/2012 to edit event text. (cmcc, ). (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Qimonda AG re 51 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Hanes, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Qimonda AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hanes, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Patrick Gould on behalf of Qimonda AG (Gould, Steven) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Risdon Hanes on behalf of Qimonda AG (Hanes, Patrick) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing filed by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 36 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Vishal Patel for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 35 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed J. Michael Heinlen for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 34 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Bruce Steven Sostek for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Max Ciccarelli for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 32 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 31 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Herbert Hammond for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 30 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Michael Schonberg for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Gregory D. Binns for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion for Pro hac vice. Appointed Jane Politz Brandt for LSI Corporation. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/28/2011. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing filed by Qimonda AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bey, Dawn-Marie) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric L. Sophir, counsel for Plaintiff Qimonda AG; the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove Eric L. Sophir as counsel of record. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/18/2011. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Vishal Patel and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2788027. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Michael Heinlen and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2788015. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Steven Sostek and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2788000. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Max Ciccarelli and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787983. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787948. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Herbert Hammond and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787926. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael D. Schonberg and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787895. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory D. Binns and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787883. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Politz Brandt and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-2787869. by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing filed by LSI Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Standing by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Qimonda AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sophir, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (khan, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER lifting stay in this matter, upon the parties' recent notification to the Court that the determination of the International Trade Commission has become final. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/1/2011. Copies to counsel.(cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn-Marie Bey on behalf of Qimonda AG (Bey, Dawn-Marie) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Joint) by LSI Corporation, Qimonda AG. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Joint) by LSI Corporation, Qimonda AG. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER that the parties are DIRECTED to file a written status report within eleven (11) days of the date of this Order is entered, informing the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 2/22/2011. Copies sent as directed.(lhin, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay for the Limited Purpose of Filing an Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 8/24/2009. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Reply to 16 Response in Opposition to 14 MOTION to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint filed by Qimonda AG. (Sophir, Eric). Modified docket entry on 7/16/2009. (walk, ). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint by Qimonda AG filed by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana). Modified docket entry on 7/16/2009. (walk, ). (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint filed by Qimonda AG. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, # 6 Proposed Order). (Sophir, Eric). Modified docket entry on 07/16/2009. (walk, ). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint filed by Qimonda AG. (Sophir, Eric). Modified docket entry on 7/16/2009. (walk, ). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion to Stay; the Court will STAY the proceedings until the determination of the U.S. International Trade Commission becomes final. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 1/6/2009. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by LSI Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McDaniel, Dana) Modified on 1/2/2009 to edit text (cmcc, ). (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay by LSI Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Dana) Modified on 1/2/2009 to edit text.(cmcc, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion by Qimonda AG for the Admissiion of Robert A. Whitman, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/16/2008. (lhin, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2009: # 1 Signature-local counsel) (cmcc, ). (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Robert Whitman to appear Pro hac vice; fee paid $50.00, receipt no. 34683001638; by Qimonda AG. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 5 Defendant LSI Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; LSI Corporation answer/response due 1/6/2009. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/12/2008. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qimonda AG. LSI Corporation served on 11/17/2008, answer due 12/8/2008. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by LSI Corporation. (McDaniel, Dana) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Complaint, by LSI Corporation until 1/6/09. (jtho, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (mailed to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office).(cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to LSI Corporation (delivered to courier). (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Qimonda AG. (cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 3/7/2012. Copies to counsel.(cmcc, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against LSI Corporation; filing fee paid $ 350, receipt number 34683001255; filed by Qimonda AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Receipt)(cmcc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?