Ameur v. Gates et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01671
District Judge John C. Coughenour, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mammar Ameur, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTEREST LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hank L Balson +1 206 838 1800 +1 206 838 3330 hbalson@pilg.org
TERMINATED: 03/02/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy S. Chupp +1 206 447 0103 nchupp@pilg.org

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLAMETTE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW LAW CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwynne L Skinner +1 503 370 6140 gskinner@willamette.edu
v.
No Logo Adolph McQueen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Bantz J. Craddock, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Brigadier General Jay Hood, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Bruce Vargo, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Daniel K McNeill, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Donald Rumsfeld, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Esteban Rodriguez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Geoffrey D. Miller, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Gordon England, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Gregory J Ihde, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Harry B. Harris, Jr., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo James M MCGarrah, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo James T Hill, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe I, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, II, Defendant
No Logo John Doe III, Defendant
No Logo John Does 4-100, Defendant
No Logo Mark H. Buzby, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Bumgarner, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Glenn Mullen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Nelson Cannon, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Paul Wolfowitz, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Peter Pace, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Richard Bowman Myers, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Wade, Dennis, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order to Transfer) Noting Date 4/6/2012, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Mammar Ameur.(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ON STAGGERED BRIEFING by Judge John C Coughenour; The Court GRANTS defts' 40 Stipulated Motion and the parties are directed to brief the issues of venue and personal jurisdiction before other possible defenses are addressed. (TF) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting Pltf's 37 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Judge John C Coughenour; Attorneys Hank L Balson and Nancy S. Chupp and The Public Interest Law Group are withdrawn as counsel for pltf. Attorney Gwynne Skinner is substituted as primary local counsel of record. (TF) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca Shapiro Cohen on behalf of Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Cohen, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
            Stipulated MOTION Unopposed Motion for Staggered Briefing and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/29/2012, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Elias Werner on behalf of Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Gwynne L Skinner for Plaintiff Mammar Ameur from March 23, 2012 to March 30, 2012. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/24/2012, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET to TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Attorney, Western District of Washington; U.S. Attorney General; Robert Easton, on behalf of individual defendants on 1/9/2012, filed by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                        Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Robert M Gates, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Bumgarner, # 2 Summons Buzby, # 3 Summons Cannon, # 4 Summons Craddock, # 5 Summons Dennis, # 6 Summons England, # 7 Summons Harris, # 8 Summons Hill, # 9 Summons Hood, # 10 Summons Ihde, # 11 Summons McGarrah, # 12 Summons McNeill, # 13 Summons McQueen, # 14 Summons Miller, # 15 Summons Mullen, # 16 Summons Myers, # 17 Summons Pace, # 18 Summons Rodriquez, # 19 Summons Rumsfeld, # 20 Summons Vargo, # 21 Summons Wolfowitz)(TF) sent to pltf's counsel via CM/ECF (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Wolfowitz by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Vargo by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Rumsfeld by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Rodriguez by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Pace by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Myers by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Mullen by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Miller by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant McQueen by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant McNeill by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant McGarrah by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Ihde by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Hood by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Hill by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Harris by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant England by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Dennis by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Craddock by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Cannon by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Buzby by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Baumgarner by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Gates by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Gwynne L. Skinner for Mammar Ameur, by Clerk William M McCool. (DS) Modified attorney's name on 11/8/2011 (DS). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        APPLICATION for pro hac vice - recipt number 0981-2604308 by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur . (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Summons Electronically Issued as to US Attorney. (TF) sent to pltf's counsel via CM/ECF (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Summons Electronically Issued as to the US Department of Justice. (TF) sent to pltf's counsel via CM/ECF (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case shall attend the conference and be fully prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Counsel and pro se parties are REQUIRED to appear at the Status Conference. If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at "paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov" at least TEN (10) DAYS prior to the proceeding. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is now set for TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR FORCED DISAPPEARANCE; PROLONGED ARBITRARY DETENTION; CRUEL, INHUMAN, AND DEGRADING TREATMENT; TORTURE; WAR CRIMES FOR TARGETING A CIVILIAN; AND VIOLATION OF DUE PROCESS, ALL IN VIOLATION OF THE LAWS OF NATIONS PURSUANT TO THE ALIEN TORT STATUTE, AND THE FIFTH AMENDMENT OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION (BIVENS CLAIM) against defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, John Doe I, John Doe II, John Doe III, John Does 4-100, Gordon England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Mammar Ameur.(TF) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER Granting Pltf's 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TF) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to U.S. Attorney by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to U.S. Attorney General by Plaintiff Mammar Ameur. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Mammar Ameur. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit CCS Attachment, # 4 Exhibit Written Consent for Payment of Costs, # 5 Exhibit Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?