Project Paperless, LLC v. UAV Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00039
District Judge Robert E. Payne, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Project Paperless, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com
v.
No Logo Uav Communications, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Project Paperless, LLC, UAV Communications, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 6 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time; the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Compliant by March 29, 2012. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/28/12. (kyou, ) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Consent Motion by UAV Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Poynter, William) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        AGREED ORDER Granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the complaint; ORDERED that Bosh shall have through and including March 19, 2012 in which to answer, plead and otherwise respond to the complaint without waiving any challenges to jurisdiction or venue; Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/14/12 (lsal) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UAV Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Poynter, William) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to UAV Communications, Inc. (placed in pick up box for counsel) (kyou, ) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
              Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Project Paperless, LLC. (kyou, ) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against UAV Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24683014339.), filed by Project Paperless, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Receipt)(kyou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2012: # 5 Patent Form) (kyou, ). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 418 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?