Project Paperless, LLC v. BlueWave Computing, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00995
District Judge Steve C Jones, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 7:05 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Project Paperless, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
v.
No Logo BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Grunewald Fort +1 404 853 8493 +1 404 853 8806 ann.fort@sutherland.com
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Project Paperless, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo BlueWave Computing, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Brother International Corporation, Third Party Defendant
Canon USA, Inc. Canon USA, Inc., Third Party Defendant
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Third Party Defendant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Third Party Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Third Party Complaint filed by BlueWave Computing, LLC (Fort, Ann) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims by BlueWave Computing, LLC, Project Paperless, LLC. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of John Does filed by Project Paperless, LLC (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
        Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to 12 Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Project Paperless, LLC.(Hill, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Brother International Corporation. (aaq) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company. (aaq) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Canon U.S.A., Inc. (aaq) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Xerox Corporation. (aaq) Modified on 7/13/2012 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation, Canon U.S.A., Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Brother International Corporation with Jury Demand, filed by BlueWave Computing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Xerox Materials, # 2 Exhibit B - Canon Materials, # 3 Exhibit C - HP Materials, # 4 Exhibit D - Brother Materials, # 5 Summons Xerox, # 6 Summons Canon, # 7 Summons HP, # 8 Summons Brother)(Fort, Ann) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/25/2013.), COUNTERCLAIM against Project Paperless, LLC with Jury Demand by BlueWave Computing, LLC.(Fort, Ann) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting the 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BlueWave Computing, LLC's Answer due 6/26/2012. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 06/08/12. (aaq) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by BlueWave Computing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Further Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Fort, Ann) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER Granting 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to 1 Complaint. BlueWave Computing, LLC's Answer due 6/12/2012. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 5/24/2012. (mdy) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by BlueWave Computing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extention of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Fort, Ann) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                              COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Grunewald Fort on behalf of BlueWave Computing, LLC (Fort, Ann) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE Of Filing Substitute Signature Page for Complaint by Project Paperless, LLC re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to BlueWave Computing, LLC. (adg) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                      Corrected AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the USPTO. (adg) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                        AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the USPTO. (adg) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Project Paperless, LLC. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 113E-3841517) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 771 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?