ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-01736
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Electronic Privacy Information Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Order granting 7 defendant's motion to dismiss and that this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 24, 2004. (FL, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Reply to opposition to Motion
    REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2004 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/28/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (See document #3 for image). (lc, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 defendant's motion to dismiss filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 8 Proceed with Scheduled Hearing filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Please see Document No. 7 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION to Proceed with Scheduled Hearing by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Please see Document No. 5 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Proceed with October 15 Hearing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER and Request to Proceed With Scheduled Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    Order re 3 combining plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order and its motion for preliminary injunction for the purposes of a hearing scheduled for October 15, 2004, at 11:30 a.m., Courtroom 14. Defendant and plaintiff shall have up to and including October 14, 2004, within which to file their responses and replies. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on October 13, 2004. (FL, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2004 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Motion for TRO
                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marcia Hofmann# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Certificate of Counsel# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                        LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (lc, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER.(lc, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 67 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?