Round Rock Research LLC v. Gap Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01241
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 4:50 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED, Granting 45 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. (nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 45 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ORDER: The Stay is continued until December 8, 2014,. Any unsettled cases are reopened as of December 8, 2014. Parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule no later than December 15, 2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 1:12-cv-00362-RGA(nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER: The Stay is Continued until 11/21/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Aleine M. Porterfield by Gap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Chiu as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                            Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of Gap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gap Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter. It is further Ordered that the parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexaminations are complete and the stays should be lifted so that the cases may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Granting (19 in 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA, 21 in 1:11-cv-01238-RGA, 16 in 1:11-cv-01245-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01237-RGA, 20 in 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 26 in 1:11-cv-01243-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 29 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 12 in 1:12-cv-00309-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Pleadings and to Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          Joint STIPULATION To Amend Pleadings and To Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit by Amazon.com Inc., V F Corporation, Gap Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc., American Apparel Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., Fruit of the Loom Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings Inc., Hanesbrands Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (D.I. 12 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, D.I. 18 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, D.I. 14 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA) MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Of The Patents-In-Suit. The parties shall submit a status report no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter; and the parties should promptly advise the Court if and when the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/6/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01242-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Laura D. Hatcher on behalf of Gap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hatcher, Laura) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Postponing Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Main Document 24 replaced on 3/27/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 28 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Request for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference Set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 3/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Scheduling Conference on March 28, 2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Of The Patents-In-Suit, filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/23/2012. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 3/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Of The Patents-In-Suit - filed by Gap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 3/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas G. Papastavros and Maya Prakash - filed by Gap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Nicholas G. Papastavros, # 3 Certification of Maya Prakash, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2012. (nms) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Gap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand of Defendant The Gap, Inc, COUNTERCLAIM against Round Rock Research LLC by Gap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 2/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant The Gap, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to February 13, 2012 - filed by Gap Inc.. (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on The Gap, Inc. on 1/6/2012, filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, Jason Berrebi, and Eugene Chiu of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of Gap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to February 6, 2012 - filed by Gap Inc.. (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of Gap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gap Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Gap Inc. served on 12/15/2011, answer due 1/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E;. (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Gap Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-991638.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 587 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?