Shubert v. Bush
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00693
District Judge Vaughn R. Walker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 12, 2019 at 2:19 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

No Logo Hilary Botein, Plaintiff
No Logo Noha Arafa, Plaintiff
No Logo Sarah Dranoff, Plaintiff
No Logo Virginia Shubert, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Defendant
Officially listed as "Attorney General Eric H. Holder"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Keith B. Alexander, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo President Barack Obama, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Remand
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            JUDGMENT ON FOURTH AMENDMENT CLAIM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON FOURTH AMENDMENT CLAIM. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXCESS PAGES; DENYING REQUEST TO STRIKE CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/30/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Court's Order of July 11, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Response to the Court's Order of July 11, 2014, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Response to Court's Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                            Final Brief re 134 Reply Memorandum re Compliance With Preservation Orders(Pursuant to the Court's June 6, 2014 Order), filed by Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Related document(s) 134 ) (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/24/2014) Modified on 7/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by All Plaintiffs, Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 07/11/14. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # 1 Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # 3 Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to June 23, 2014 Order filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marcia Berman, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Document to be filed under seal)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ERRATA to 134 Reply Memorandum, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Corrected Government Defendants' Reply Brief Regarding Compliance With Preservation Orders))(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Reply Memorandum re Compliance With Preservation Orders, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Gilligan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to 131 Order, filed by Virginia Shubert (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # 1 Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # 3 Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 06/23/14. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # 1 Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # 4 Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER RE REQUEST by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 06/13/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Letter to Judge Jeffrey S. White re Telephonic Hearing Held on 06/06/14, from Marica Berman, dated 06/12/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plalintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce Court's Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Phone Number for Government Counsel for Emergency Hearing re 127 Order, filed by Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER SETTING HEARING. APPLICATION TO ENFORCE Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 6/6/2014 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Stay re 125 Order Emergency Motion to Stay the Court's June 5, 2014 Order filed by Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. Responses due by 6/6/2014. Replies due by 6/13/2014. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER RE EMERGENCY APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief re 118 Plaintiffs' Brief Concerning The Government's Violation, of the Court's Preservation Orders, filed by Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re: The Government's Violation of the Court's Preservation Orders)(Related document(s) 118 ) (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 122 Stipulation CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, filed by Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lodging of Classified NSA Declaration for In Camera, Ex Parte Review, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Anthony J. Coppolino, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      [REDACTED] Classified Declaration of Miriam P., National Security Agency Ex Parte, In Camera Submission, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief re Compliance with Preservation Orders, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed REQUEST Concerning Briefing Set Forth in March 19, 2014 Order (Jewel Doc. #95), filed by Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER RE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to the Court's Question About Rule 11 Certifications by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ERRATA re 113 Response ( Non Motion ), Gvt. Defs.' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the Sept. 27, 2013 Status Conference by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Gvt. Defs.' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Court's Threshold Questions (Government Defendants' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the September 27, 2013, Status Conference) by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief Plaintiffs' Responses to the Court's Four Questions filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Response to Defendant's Public Declarations byAll Plaintiffs. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America of Filing Declassified Declarations (Attachments: # 1 2007 Declaration of J. Michael McConnell, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # 2 2007 Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Director, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # 3 2009 Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA, # 4 2009 Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Shubert v. Obama, # 5 2009 Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA, # 6 2009 Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Director, National Security Agency, filed in Shubert v. Obama, # 7 2012 Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # 8 2012 Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America re 105 Supplemental Brief, of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch, Acting Deputy Director of the National Security Agency (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America re 105 Supplemental Brief, of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch, National Security Agency in Support of 105 Supplemental Brief, filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of James R. Clapper in Support of 105 Supplemental Brief, filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Brief of Govt. Defs. on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the Sept. 27, 2013 Case Management Conference filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED Minute Entry: (CORRECTION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE) Status Conference held (Date Filed: 9/30/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Status Conference held (Date Filed: 9/30/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman (Whitman, James) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 99 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 5, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 99 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 5, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 23, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 23, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 95 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/16/2013) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT ENTERED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/8/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART and DEFERRING RULING IN PART 69 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. Responses due by 7/12/2013. Replies due by 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Response re 91 Response ( Non Motion ) Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' June 7, 2013 Notice byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Ilann Maazel in Opposition to 90 Notice (Other), Defendants' Motion for a Stay filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-P)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 6/14/2013) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 90 Notice (Other), Opposition to Defendants' Motion for a Stay by All Plaintiffs. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 6/14/2013) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America re 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment Notice and Request that the Court Hold the Pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment in Abeyance (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief re 87 Order filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) 87 ) (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 3/13/2013) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Brief by Govt. Defs. Addressing Clapper v. Amnesty Int'l filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/6/2013) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 27, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Clapper v. Amnesty International)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 2/13/2013) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2012, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2012 before Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/14/2012). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2012) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment ) Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Third Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/2/2012) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING (78 in 3:07-cv-00693-JSW) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Govt. Defs. to File their Reply in Supp. of Summ. Judgment. Replies due by 11/2/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Govt. Defs. to File their Reply in Supp. of Summ. Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Ilann M. Maazel in Opposition to 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment ) filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 74 STIPULATION TO DEEM CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FILED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DEEM CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FILED filed by All Plaintiffs, Noha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 10/16/2012) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Set Briefing Schedule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/2/2012) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America re 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified NSA Declaration (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America re 69 Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified DNI Declaration (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/18/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - DNI Public Declaration, # 2 Ex. B - NSA Public Declaration)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 67 STIPULATION RE: Request to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 10/18/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 67 STIPULATION RE: Request to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 10/18/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Request to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule filed by Keith B. Alexander, Eric H. Holder, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/24/2012) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White, on 09/17/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REASSIGNMENT ORDER OF JUDGE YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers. Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers. Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) Modified on 9/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Ilann M. Maazel to Judge Wilken. (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Adam Pulver Requesting Judge Assignment. (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 8/20/2012) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Toll Defendants' Response to Second Amended Complaint filed by Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Barack Obama, Eric H. Holder. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/21/2012) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Memorandum as to 49 Notice of Appeal filed by Virginia Shubert (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Pulver (Pulver, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2012) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change in MDL Master Case Number Format (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/15/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM for proceedings held on 12/15/09 before Judge Walker. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 10-15638 9th Circuit for 49 Notice of Appeal filed by Virginia Shubert. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (46 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW) Order on Motion to Dismiss (47 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW) Judgment by Virginia Shubert. Appeal Fee $455, Receipt Number 34611043712. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re (Doc #46 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, Doc #703 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 21, 2010 Order, judgment is hereby entered in member caseShubert et al v Bush et al, No C 07-0693 in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting (680) Motion to Dismiss in case M:06-cv-01791-VRW; granting (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:07-cv-00693-VRW; granting Motion to Dismiss in 3:08-cv-4373 VRW. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re doc 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America ; the court submitted the matter, the court to issue order. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2009) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum re 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 12/8/2009) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byNoha Arafa, Hilary Botein, Sarah Dranoff, Virginia Shubert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 12/3/2009) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 36 THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by United States of America re 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by United States of America re 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Lieutenant General Keith B. Alexander, Director of the National Security Agency (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by United States of America re 38 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Public Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, # 2 Exhibit 2, Public Declaration of Keith B. Alexander, Director of the National Security Agency, # 3 Exhibit 3, Policies and Procedures Governing Invocation of the State Secrets Privilege)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2009) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER. Government's motion due 10/30/09; plaintiffs' opposition due 12/04/09; reply due 12/08/09; hearing 12/15/09 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/28/09. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION (Third) to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2009) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Govt to file motion no later than 10/27/2009. Opposition due no later than 12/2/2009. Reply due no later than 12/8/2009. Hearing on Govt Defendants motion to dismiss and for summary judgment 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/21/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION (Second) to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2009) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER granting doc 32 in C07-0693 Shubert v Bush filed by United States of America. The government defendants' renewed motion to dismiss and for summary judgment shall be filed no later than 10/20/2009. The plaintiffs' opposition to that motion shall be filed no later than 11/24/2009. Reply shall be filed no later than 12/4/2009. The hearing shall remain set for 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/7/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Renew Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2009) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Case Management Conference (Telephonic) held on 9/10/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Attorneys : For Plaintiff(s): Ilann Maazel (by phone). Cindy Cohn. For Defendant(s): Anthony Coppolino (by phone). James Whitman (phone). Govt to File Motion: 10/8/2009. Opposition: 11/5/2009. Reply: 11/19/2009. Hearing: 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2009) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/27/2009) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY - Please ignoreNOTICE OF APPEAL. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 2nd part of Notice of Appeal)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009) Modified on 8/7/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE : PER COUNSEL'S REQUEST, Case Management Conference has been scheduled in this case for September 3, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. Parties joint case management statement shall be due one week prior to the conference. Counsel for the plaintiffs and the defendants has been granted leave to appear telephonically. The clerk shall initiate the call. Parties requesting a continuance shall submit a stipulation and proposed order. If parties are unable to reach a stipulation, the requesting party shall submit an exparte application with a proposed order. Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2009 03:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Request to Schedule Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2009) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 25 Letter filed by Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Sarah Dranoff, Noha Arafa. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/14/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Ilann M. Maazel to Judge Vaughn R. Walker re 9th circuit authority. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 5/5/2009) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2008) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER re (370 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order filed September 10, 2007 signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by George W. Bush, Michael V. Hayden, Keith B. Alexander, Alberto Gonzales, John Ashcroft of Manual Filing (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Response in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 14 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/2/2007) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by George W. Bush, Michael V. Hayden, Keith B. Alexander, Alberto Gonzales, John Ashcroft re 19 Memorandum in Opposition,,, of Lodging of Classified Supplement & accompanying Declaration (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence, 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byGeorge W. Bush, Michael V. Hayden, Keith B. Alexander, Alberto Gonzales, John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Coppolino Declaration & Exhibits Thereto)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cover sheet of TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/30/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell. Complete transcript is in MDL 06-1791 VRW. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order [Proposed] Interim Order to Preserve Evidence by All Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 8/30/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS:1. Verizon's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. 2. Verizon's Motion toDismiss Complaint in Chulsky, Riordan and Bready. 3. Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Master Complaint.4. United States' Motion to Dismiss Complaints on State Secrets Grounds (Chulsky, Riordan, Bready). 4. United States' Motion to Dismiss in Shubert. 5. United States' Motion to Intervene - granted. RESULTS:The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court took the matter(s) under-submission.Court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2007). (Entered: 09/04/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Declaration of Ilann M. Maazel Pursuant to Rule 56(f) in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed bySarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed bySarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 filed by Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Sarah Dranoff, Noha Arafa. On or before 7/20/2007, Plaintiffs will file an opposition to the Government's dispositive motion in Shubert v Bush, C07-0693. On or before 8/16/2007, the Government will file a reply brief in support of its dispositive motion. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/13/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadlines for Motion to Dismiss and Related Briefing in Shubert v. Bush, Case No. 07-693 by Sarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa. (Maazel, Ilann) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2007, Entered: 6/23/2007 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix re (6 in 3:07-cv-00464-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01187-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06254-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05576-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-07934-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02029-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06434-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05269-VRW, 67 in 3:06-cv-03596-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06570-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06224-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06294-VRW, 70 in 3:06-cv-03574-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05268-VRW, 12 in 3:06-cv-06387-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01323-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05066-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06222-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06435-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05063-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06253-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-01396-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06295-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-06313-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05065-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05067-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-05452-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05340-VRW, 319 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05064-VRW, 32 in 3:06-cv-03467-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01326-VRW, 9 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06225-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01242-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06388-VRW, 13 in 3:07-cv-01324-VRW, 351 in 3:06-cv-00672-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05267-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06385-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05341-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01243-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-05485-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05343-VRW, 4 in 3:06-cv-06924-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02538-VRW, 14 in 3:06-cv-04221-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition, to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Master Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tabs 4-12# 2 Exhibit Tabs 13-20)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007) (Entered: 06/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/23/2007, Entered: 6/23/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re (273 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007) (Entered: 06/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Candace J. Morey in Support of (315 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by the United States filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Z# 2 Exhibit AA-II# 3 Exhibit JJ-KK)(Morey, Candace) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re (253 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on State Secrets Grounds filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING to extend briefing and hearing schedule in Shubert v. Bush re 3 Stipulation, filed by Alberto Gonzales,, George W. Bush,, Keith B. Alexander,, Michael V. Hayden. On or 5/25/2007, the Government will file a dispositive motion, opposition to be filed on or before 7/13/2007, any reply in support of the dispositive motion shall be filed on or before 8/3/2007. The hearing is set for 8/30/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/11/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2007) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Briefing and Hearing Schedule in Shubert v. Bush, Case No. 07-00693 filed by Government Defendants in their official capacity by George W. Bush, Michael V. Hayden, Keith B. Alexander, Alberto Gonzales. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/9/2007) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IT IS SO ORDERED AS MODIFIED: Pursuant to the stipulation: On or before 5/18/2007, the Government may file a dispositive motion and any assertion of the military and state secrets privilege in Shubert v. Bush, on or before 6/29/2007, Plaintiffs may file opposition to the dispositive motion; on or before 7/20/2007, the Government may file a reply brief in support of its dispositive motion. Oral argument on the dispositive motion has been set for 8/16/2007 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/20/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case transferred in from the Eastern District of New York; Case Number 1:06-cv2282 FB-MDG. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.. Filed bySarah Dranoff, Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?