District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

v. In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-mc-80113-JW
District Judge James Ware, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 9:01 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office San Francisco
Filed 5/1/2012
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County
Terminated 5/31/2012
Origin
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 12-16373[]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 4 Notice of Appeal filed by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
      USCA OPINION (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None USCA Order
        ORDER of USCA as to [4] Notice of Appeal filed by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA as to [4] Notice of Appeal filed by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None USCA Case Number
            USCA Case Number 12-16373 for [4] Notice of Appeal filed by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett re [4] Notice of Appeal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. Appeal of Order[3] (Appeal fee of $455 paid.Receipt #34611075149) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying application. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 16, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying application. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 16, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett re [1] Notice (Other) RENEWED APPLICATION FOR EXEMPTION FROM PACER FEES (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE OF HEARING RE: REVOCATION OF EXEMPTION FROM ELECTRONIC PUBLIC ACCESS FEES by In re Application for Exemption form Electronic Public Access Fees by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 171 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?