Zhu v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00304-JCS
District Judge Joseph C. Spero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jianliang Zhu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baughman & Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin X. Wang +1 415 576 9923 +1 415 576 9929 justin@lawbw.com
v.
No Logo Christina Poulos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 1/16/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO HOLD CASE IN ABEYANCE. The Initial Case Management Conference, prev. set for 7/25/8 at 1:30 PM, has been continued to 11/14/2008 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/21/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Hold Case in Abeyance; and Proposed Order by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Stipulation
      PLEASE DISREGARD. ERRONEOUS FILING. DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED WITH CORRECT CASE NUMBER AND CAPTION . STIPULATION to Hold Case in Abeyance; and Proposed Order by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 7/18/2008) Modified on 7/21/2008 (klh, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Stipulation
        PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER. SHOULD BE FILED IN C08-1186 SC. Counsel to refile document in correct case. . STIPULATION to Dismiss and Proposed Order by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2008) Modified on 7/17/2008 (klh, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING re [13] Joint Request to be Exempt from Formal ADR Process filed by Jianliang Zhu and Michael Chertoff, et al. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/20/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Parties' Joint Request to be Exempt from Format ADR Process (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint byMichael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATES. Initial Case Management Conference re-set for 7/25/2008 at 1:30 PM. Joint case management statement due 7/18/8. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/4/8. ***NOTE: Court modified due date for cmc statement and cmc date (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Stipulation
                  STIPULATION (Second) to Extend Dates and Proposed Order by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATES. Initial Case Management Conference prev. set for 4/25/8 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled for 5/9/2008 at 01:30 PM. Joint case management statement due by 5/2/8. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/24/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION to Extend Dates and [Proposed] Order by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                        CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice.. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                          CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jianliang Zhu.. (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                            CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by March 5, 2008. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                              CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 2/14/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jianliang Zhu (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 1/17/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2008. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order for Judge Spero, # (2) re ntc of rule discontinuning service by mail, # (3) Standing Order for all Judges)(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
                                    Complaint for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611014689; summons issued). Filed by Jianliang Zhu. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008) (gba, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                      CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Summons Issued
                                        Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?