United States of America (ex rel), et al v. Westchester County, New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02860
District Judge Denise L. Cote, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2021 at 6:36 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen +1 703 368 5416
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Relman

Toggle Switch Represented by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Gurian +1 212 346 7600 +1 212 346 7667 craiggurian@antibiaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meiselman Denlea Packman Carton & Eberz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Russell Marc Yankwitt +1 914 686 1500 +1 212 637 2730 russell@yankwitt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Dane +1 202 728 1888 +1 202 728 0848 sdane@relmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Chance Cenawood +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2717 Sean.Cenawood@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Lloyd Cott +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2730 James.Cott@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Westchester County, New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie Corcoran +1 212 351 4500 +1 212 878 8724 ccorcoran@ebglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Michael Gerson +1 202 861 4180 +1 202 296 2882 sgerson@ebglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Kalish +1 212 351 4500 +1 212 878 8738 mkalish@ebglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Thaddeus Miklave +1 212 351 4663 +1 212 661 0989 MMiklave@ebglaw.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (520) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated September 26, 2014 re: Letter addressed to Helen R. Kanovsky from James E. Johnson re: Huntington analysis. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER regarding 480 Motion to Compel...For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on July 24, 2014, it was ORDERED that the June 26 motion to compel and take sworn depositions was granted to the extent described on the record. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/27/2014) (gr) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated 08/26/2014 re: Letter from James E. Johnson to Kevin J. Plunkett in response to his correspondence of August 25, 2014. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated August 22, 2014 re: Letter addressed to Kevin J. Plunkett and Robert F. Meehan from James E. Johnson re: Huntington analysis. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/24/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/24/2014 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER...a conference with the Monitor, the County, and the United States is scheduled for July 24, 2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/23/2014) (gr) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58. . Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J. Kennedy dated July 21, 2014 re: Reply to County's Opposition to Monitor's Motion. Document filed by United States of America.(Kennedy, David) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Robert F. Meehan in Opposition re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Norma V. Drummond in Opposition re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E-1, # 6 Exhibit E-2, # 7 Exhibit F-1, # 8 Exhibit F-2, # 9 Exhibit F-3, # 10 Exhibit F-4, # 11 Exhibit F-5, # 12 Exhibit F-6, # 13 Exhibit G)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58. . Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J. Kennedy dated 7/8/2014 re: In Support of Motion by the Monitor. ENDORSEMENT: The Government may reply on July 22, if it wishes to do so. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/8/2014) (gr) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J Kennedy dated July 8 2014 re: In Support of Motion by the Monitor. Document filed by United States of America.(Kennedy, David) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 490 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 480 MOTION to Compel. Granted. The reply is due 7/22/2014. Responses due by 7/14/2014. Replies due by 7/22/2014. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/3/2014) (cd) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58. addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Meehan dated July 3, 2014. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- July 2, 2014 Letter from Monitor)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of James E. Johnson [RE-FILED TO INCLUDE MISSING EXHIBITS] in Support re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58.. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: On June 26, 2014, the Monitor James E. Johnson (Monitor) filed a motion to compel and take sworn depositions of certain officials and employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County (County). It is hereby ORDERED that any opposition from the County is due July 8, 2014. Any reply from the Monitor is due July 11. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two (2) courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/27/2014) (gr) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #6 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 70 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 70 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 70 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 70 - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 70 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 70 - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 70 - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 70 - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 70 - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 70 - Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 70 - Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 70 - Part 12, # 13 Exhibit 70 - Part 13, # 14 Exhibit 70 - Part 14, # 15 Exhibit 70 - Part 15, # 16 Exhibit 71, # 17 Exhibit 72, # 18 Exhibit 73 - Part 1, # 19 Exhibit 73 - Part 2, # 20 Exhibit 73 - Part 3, # 21 Exhibit 73 - Part 4, # 22 Exhibit 73 - Part 5, # 23 Exhibit 73 - Part 6, # 24 Exhibit 73 - Part 7, # 25 Exhibit 74, # 26 Exhibit 75, # 27 Exhibit 76, # 28 Exhibit 77 - Part 1, # 29 Exhibit 77 - Part 2, # 30 Exhibit 77 - Part 3, # 31 Exhibit 77 - Part 4, # 32 Exhibit 77 - Part 5, # 33 Exhibit 78, # 34 Exhibit 79, # 35 Exhibit 80 - Part 1, # 36 Exhibit 80 - Part 2, # 37 Exhibit 80 - Part 3, # 38 Exhibit 80 - Part 4, # 39 Exhibit 81 - Part 1, # 40 Exhibit 81 - Part 2, # 41 Exhibit 81 - Part 3, # 42 Exhibit 81 - Part 4, # 43 Exhibit 81 - Part 5, # 44 Exhibit 81 - Part 6, # 45 Exhibit 81 - Part 7, # 46 Exhibit 82, # 47 Exhibit 83, # 48 Exhibit 84 - Part 1, # 49 Exhibit 84 - Part 2, # 50 Exhibit 84 - Part 3, # 51 Exhibit 85 - Part 1, # 52 Exhibit 85 - Part 2, # 53 Exhibit 85 - Part 3, # 54 Exhibit 85 - Part 4, # 55 Exhibit 85 - Part 5, # 56 Exhibit 86, # 57 Exhibit 87 - Part 1, # 58 Exhibit 87 - Part 2, # 59 Exhibit 87 - Part 3, # 60 Exhibit 87 - Part 4, # 61 Exhibit 88, # 62 Exhibit 89 - Part 1, # 63 Exhibit 89 - Part 2, # 64 Exhibit 89 - Part 3, # 65 Exhibit 89 - Part 4, # 66 Exhibit 90, # 67 Exhibit 91, # 68 Exhibit 92)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #5 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 68 - Part 61, # 2 Exhibit 68 - Part 62, # 3 Exhibit 68 - Part 63, # 4 Exhibit 68 - Part 64, # 5 Exhibit 68 - Part 65, # 6 Exhibit 68 - Part 66, # 7 Exhibit 68 - Part 67, # 8 Exhibit 68 - Part 68, # 9 Exhibit 68 - Part 69, # 10 Exhibit 68 - Part 70, # 11 Exhibit 68 - Part 71, # 12 Exhibit 68 - Part 72, # 13 Exhibit 68 - Part 73, # 14 Exhibit 68 - Part 74, # 15 Exhibit 68 - Part 75, # 16 Exhibit 68 - Part 76, # 17 Exhibit 68 - Part 77, # 18 Exhibit 68 - Part 78, # 19 Exhibit 68 - Part 79, # 20 Exhibit 68 - Part 80, # 21 Exhibit 68 - Part 81, # 22 Exhibit 68 - Part 82, # 23 Exhibit 68 - Part 83, # 24 Exhibit 68 - Part 84, # 25 Exhibit 68 - Part 85, # 26 Exhibit 68 - Part 86, # 27 Exhibit 68 - Part 87, # 28 Exhibit 68 - Part 88, # 29 Exhibit 68 - Part 89, # 30 Exhibit 68 - Part 90, # 31 Exhibit 68 - Part 91, # 32 Exhibit 69)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #4 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 68 - Part 16, # 2 Exhibit 68 - Part 17, # 3 Exhibit 68 - Part 18, # 4 Exhibit 68 - Part 19, # 5 Exhibit 68 - Part 20, # 6 Exhibit 68 - Part 21, # 7 Exhibit 68 - Part 22, # 8 Exhibit 68 - Part 23, # 9 Exhibit 68 - Part 24, # 10 Exhibit 68 - Part 25, # 11 Exhibit 68 - Part 26, # 12 Exhibit 68 - Part 27, # 13 Exhibit 68 - Part 28, # 14 Exhibit 68 - Part 29, # 15 Exhibit 68 - Part 30, # 16 Exhibit 68 - Part 31, # 17 Exhibit 68 - Part 32, # 18 Exhibit 68 - Part 33, # 19 Exhibit 68 - Part 34, # 20 Exhibit 68 - Part 35, # 21 Exhibit 68 - Part 36, # 22 Exhibit 68 - Part 37, # 23 Exhibit 68 - Part 38, # 24 Exhibit 68 - Part 39, # 25 Exhibit 68 - Part 40, # 26 Exhibit 68 - Part 41, # 27 Exhibit 68 - Part 42, # 28 Exhibit 68 - Part 43, # 29 Exhibit 68 - Part 44, # 30 Exhibit 68 - Part 45, # 31 Exhibit 68 - Part 46, # 32 Exhibit 68 - Part 47, # 33 Exhibit 68 - Part 48, # 34 Exhibit 68 - Part 49, # 35 Exhibit 68 - Part 50, # 36 Exhibit 68 - Part 51, # 37 Exhibit 68 - Part 52, # 38 Exhibit 68 - Part 53, # 39 Exhibit 68 - Part 54, # 40 Exhibit 68 - Part 55, # 41 Exhibit 68 - Part 56, # 42 Exhibit 68 - Part 57, # 43 Exhibit 68 - Part 58, # 44 Exhibit 68 - Part 59, # 45 Exhibit 68 - Part 60)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #3 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 41 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 41 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 41 - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 41 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 41 - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 41 - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 41 - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 41 - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 41 - Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 41 - Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 41 - Part 12, # 13 Exhibit 41 - Part 13, # 14 Exhibit 41 - Part 14, # 15 Exhibit 41 - Part 15, # 16 Exhibit 41 - Part 16, # 17 Exhibit 41 - Part 17, # 18 Exhibit 41 - Part 18, # 19 Exhibit 41 - Part 19, # 20 Exhibit 42, # 21 Exhibit 43, # 22 Exhibit 44, # 23 Exhibit 45, # 24 Exhibit 46, # 25 Exhibit 47, # 26 Exhibit 48, # 27 Exhibit 49, # 28 Exhibit 50, # 29 Exhibit 51, # 30 Exhibit 52, # 31 Exhibit 53, # 32 Exhibit 54, # 33 Exhibit 55, # 34 Exhibit 56, # 35 Exhibit 57, # 36 Exhibit 58, # 37 Exhibit 59, # 38 Exhibit 60, # 39 Exhibit 61 - Part 1, # 40 Exhibit 61 - Part 2, # 41 Exhibit 62, # 42 Exhibit 63, # 43 Exhibit 64 - Part 1, # 44 Exhibit 64 - Part 2, # 45 Exhibit 65 - Part 1, # 46 Exhibit 65 - Part 2, # 47 Exhibit 65 - Part 3, # 48 Exhibit 65 - Part 4, # 49 Exhibit 65 - Part 5, # 50 Exhibit 65 - Part 6, # 51 Exhibit 65 - Part 7, # 52 Exhibit 65 - Part 8, # 53 Exhibit 65 - Part 9, # 54 Exhibit 66, # 55 Exhibit 67 - Part 1, # 56 Exhibit 67 - Part 2, # 57 Exhibit 67 - Part 3, # 58 Exhibit 67 - Part 4, # 59 Exhibit 68 - Part 1, # 60 Exhibit 68 - Part 2, # 61 Exhibit 68 - Part 3, # 62 Exhibit 68 - Part 4, # 63 Exhibit 68 - Part 5, # 64 Exhibit 68 - Part 6, # 65 Exhibit 68 - Part 7, # 66 Exhibit 68 - Part 8, # 67 Exhibit 68 - Part 9, # 68 Exhibit 68 - Part 10, # 69 Exhibit 68 - Part 11, # 70 Exhibit 68 - Part 12, # 71 Exhibit 68 - Part 13, # 72 Exhibit 68 - Part 14, # 73 Exhibit 68 - Part 15)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #2 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 16 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 16 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 16 - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 16 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 16 - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 16 - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 16 - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 16 - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 16 - Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 16 - Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 18 - Part 1, # 14 Exhibit 18 - Part 2, # 15 Exhibit 18 - Part 3, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 20, # 18 Exhibit 21, # 19 Exhibit 22, # 20 Exhibit 23 - Part 1, # 21 Exhibit 23 - Part 2, # 22 Exhibit 24, # 23 Exhibit 25 - Part 1, # 24 Exhibit 25 - Part 2, # 25 Exhibit 26 - Part 1, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Part 2, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Part 1, # 28 Exhibit 27 - Part 2, # 29 Exhibit 28 - Part 1, # 30 Exhibit 28 - Part 2, # 31 Exhibit 29 - Part 1, # 32 Exhibit 29 - Part 2, # 33 Exhibit 29 - Part 3, # 34 Exhibit 30 - Part 1, # 35 Exhibit 30 - Part 2, # 36 Exhibit 31, # 37 Exhibit 32, # 38 Exhibit 33 - Part 1, # 39 Exhibit 33 - Part 2, # 40 Exhibit 34, # 41 Exhibit 35, # 42 Exhibit 36, # 43 Exhibit 37, # 44 Exhibit 38, # 45 Exhibit 39, # 46 Exhibit 40 - Part 1, # 47 Exhibit 40 - Part 2, # 48 Exhibit 40 - Part 3)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58. . Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 489 Declaration) - DECLARATION of James E. Johnson in Support re: 480 MOTION to Compel Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County to Take Sworn Oral Depositions if Authority Granted Pursuant to Settlement Paragraphs 13(g) and 58.. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Johnson, James) Modified on 7/3/2014 (db). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Compel and take sworn oral depositions of Certain Officials and Employees of the Office of the County Executive of Westchester County. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) Modified on 6/27/2014 (ka). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE #1 re Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 01 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 02, # 4 Exhibit 03, # 5 Exhibit 04, # 6 Exhibit 05, # 7 Exhibit 06, # 8 Exhibit 07, # 9 Exhibit 08, # 10 Exhibit 09, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Part 1, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Part 2, # 15 Exhibit 12 - Part 3, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Part 4, # 17 Exhibit 12 - Part 5, # 18 Exhibit 12 - Part 6, # 19 Exhibit 12 - Part 7, # 20 Exhibit 13 - Part 1, # 21 Exhibit 13 - Part 2, # 22 Exhibit 13 - Part 3, # 23 Exhibit 13 - Part 4, # 24 Exhibit 13 - Part 5, # 25 Exhibit 13 - Part 6, # 26 Exhibit 13 - Part 7, # 27 Exhibit 13 - Part 8, # 28 Exhibit 13 - Part 9, # 29 Exhibit 13 - Part 10, # 30 Exhibit 13 - Part 11, # 31 Exhibit 13 - Part 12, # 32 Exhibit 13 - Part 13, # 33 Exhibit 13 - Part 14, # 34 Exhibit 13 - Part 15, # 35 Exhibit 13 - Part 16, # 36 Exhibit 13 - Part 17, # 37 Exhibit 13 - Part 18, # 38 Exhibit 13 - Part 19, # 39 Exhibit 13 - Part 20, # 40 Exhibit 13 - Part 21, # 41 Exhibit 13 - Part 22, # 42 Exhibit 14 - Part 1, # 43 Exhibit 14 - Part 2, # 44 Exhibit 14 - Part 3, # 45 Exhibit 14 - Part 4, # 46 Exhibit 14 - Part 5, # 47 Exhibit 15 - Part 1, # 48 Exhibit 15 - Part 2)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. (Monitor's Second Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Compliance) Covering Activities for dates of January 1, 2012 to March 31, 2014. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Meehan dated June 5, 2014 re: May 27, 2014 Letter from James E. Johnson. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from / Letter addressed to Monitor from Craig Gurian dated May 30, 2014 re: Letter from Monitor dated May 29, 2014. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages from transcript of May 2, 2014 conference, # 2 Exhibit Letter from ADC to AUSA Kennedy, dated May 6, 2014, # 3 Exhibit Letter from ADC to Monitor, dated May 6, 2014)(Gurian, Craig) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from /Letter addressed to Craig Gurian of the Anti-Discrimination Center, Inc. dated May 29, 2014 re: Analysis Methodology. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Methodology)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated May 27, 2014 re: Letter addressed to Holly Leicht, Regional Administrator for U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, Michael Kaplowitz, Chairman, Westchester County Board of Legislators, and Robert Meehan, Westchester County Attorney, dated 5/27/2014, re: Analysis of Impediments methodology. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Letter: Proposed Methodology for the Monitor's Supplement to the Westchester County AI)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/2/2014 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated May 9, 2014 re: correspondence between the Westchester County Board of Legislators and the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Letter of May 6, 2014 from Michael B. Kaplowitz, Chair, Westchester County Board of Legislators, # 2 Exhibit B: Letter of May 8, 2014 from Holly Leicht, Regional Administrator, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Craig Gurian dated 05/01/2014 re: Response to April 30th letter from AUSA Kennedy (Dkt 469). Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center.(Gurian, Craig) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J Kennedy dated April 30, 2014 re: Report by ADC. Document filed by United States of America.(Kennedy, David) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Mark Johnston from Michael B. Kaplowitz, Chairman, Westchester County Board of Legislators dated 4/24/2014 re: Letter received from the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) declaring its intent to reallocate over $5.2 million of Westchester's formula grant funds for FY 2012.... (gr) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Robert P. Astorino, County Executive, Westchester County from Mark Johnston, Deputy Assistant Secretary for Special Needs, U.S. Department of Housing And Urban Development dated 4/23/2014 re: Westchester County's FY 2011 HUD formula grant funds...(gr) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edwin Frank dated 4/21/2014. Regarding The Manhattan-based Anti-Discrimination Center's report. (gr) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Court having received a letter of April 17, 2014, from the Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc. (ADC), the relator for the United States of America in the above captioned action, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held on May 2, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. in the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 15B. ADCs counsel, counsel for the defendant, and counsel for the government must attend. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/24/2014) (gr) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Craig Gurian, Executive Director dated 4/17/2014.(gr) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. /Monitor's Report. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M-1, # 2 Exhibit M-2, # 3 Exhibit M-3)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 462 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated 10/28/2013 re: I write to inform the Court and the parties of the Monitor's intention to allocate a larger portion of the Monitor's current budget to the use of expert consultants.... ENDORSEMENT: Having considered the County's 11/4/13 response, this application is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/5/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 461 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Meehan dated November 4, 2013 re: Monitor's Intent to Pay Outside Consultants. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 460 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert A. Spolzino dated 10/29/2013 re: At this time, Kearney Realty withdraws the motion for leave to intervene and respectfully requests the Court disregard the partie's respective submissions related to the motion. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/30/2013) (djc) Modified on 11/4/2013 (djc). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 459 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated 10/28/2013 re: I write to inform the Court and the parties of the Monitor's intention to allocate a larger portion of the Monitor's current budget to the use of expert consultants, including to develop a toolkit for the design of affordable housing, as described in greater detail at pages 35 through 37 of the Monitor's Report filed on February 25, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Any objection to this proposal must be filed by 11/4/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 458 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Withdraw (435 in 1:06-cv-02860-DLC) MOTION to Intervene., (436 in 1:06-cv-02860-DLC) Declaration in Support of Motion,,, (437 in 1:06-cv-02860-DLC) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (438 in 1:06-cv-02860-DLC) Affidavit of Service Other. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-02860-DLC, 1:13-cv-02741-DLC(Flannery, John) Modified on 10/30/2013 (db). (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 457 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated 10-28-13 re: Monitor's Fees. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(Johnson, James) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert A. Spolzino dated 10/18/2013 re: We represent Kearney Realty and Development, Inc., intervenor-plaintiff in the above-referenced action. We write, with the consent of counsel for the proposed intervenor-defendant, the Town of North Salem, as well as counsel for the United States and the County of Westchester, to request that our motion be further adjourned, until November 15, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. There shall be no further extension. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/21/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Supplemental Exhibits to the Monitor's Final Report on Westchester County's Analysis of Municipal Zoning (Part 4 of 4). Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J to Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit K to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit L to Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit M to Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit N to Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit O to Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit P to Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit Q to Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit R to Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit S to Exhibit 1, # 11 Exhibit T to Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit U to Exhibit 1)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Supplemental Exhibits to the Monitor's Final Report on Westchester County's Analysis of Municipal Zoning (Part 3 of 4). Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit F (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit F (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit F (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit F (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit F (Part 6) to Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit F (Part 7) to Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit F (Part 8) to Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit F (Part 9) to Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit F (Part 10) to Exhibit 1, # 11 Exhibit F (Part 11) to Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit F (Part 12) to Exhibit 1, # 13 Exhibit F (Part 13) to Exhibit 1, # 14 Exhibit G (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 15 Exhibit G (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 16 Exhibit G (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 17 Exhibit G (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 18 Exhibit H (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 19 Exhibit H (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 20 Exhibit H (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 21 Exhibit H (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 22 Exhibit H (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, # 23 Exhibit I (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 24 Exhibit I (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 25 Exhibit I (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 26 Exhibit I (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 27 Exhibit I (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, # 28 Exhibit I (Part 6) to Exhibit 1, # 29 Exhibit I (Part 7) to Exhibit 1, # 30 Exhibit I (Part 8) to Exhibit 1, # 31 Exhibit I (Part 9) to Exhibit 1, # 32 Exhibit I (Part 10) to Exhibit 1, # 33 Exhibit I (Part 11) to Exhibit 1, # 34 Exhibit I (Part 12) to Exhibit 1, # 35 Exhibit I (Part 13) to Exhibit 1, # 36 Exhibit I (Part 14) to Exhibit 1, # 37 Exhibit I (Part 15) to Exhibit 1)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Supplemental Exhibits to the Monitor's Final Report on Westchester County's Analysis of Municipal Zoning (Part 2 of 4). Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit D (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit D (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit D (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit D (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit D (Part 6) to Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit D (Part 7) to Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit D (Part 8) to Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit D (Part 9) to Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit D (Part 10) to Exhibit 1, # 11 Exhibit D (Part 11) to Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit D (Part 12) to Exhibit 1, # 13 Exhibit D (Part 13) to Exhibit 1, # 14 Exhibit D (Part 14) to Exhibit 1, # 15 Exhibit D (Part 15) to Exhibit 1, # 16 Exhibit D (Part 16) to Exhibit 1, # 17 Exhibit D (Part 17) to Exhibit 1, # 18 Exhibit D (Part 18) to Exhibit 1, # 19 Exhibit D (Part 19) to Exhibit 1, # 20 Exhibit D (Part 20) to Exhibit 1, # 21 Exhibit D (Part 21) to Exhibit 1, # 22 Exhibit E (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 23 Exhibit E (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 24 Exhibit E (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 25 Exhibit E (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 26 Exhibit E (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, # 27 Exhibit E (Part 6) to Exhibit 1, # 28 Exhibit E (Part 7) to Exhibit 1, # 29 Exhibit E (Part 8) to Exhibit 1, # 30 Exhibit E (Part 9) to Exhibit 1)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Monitor's Final Report on Westchester County's Analysis of Municipal Zoning. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, # 20 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, # 21 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert A. Spolzino dated 8/28/2013 re: We write, with consent of counsel for the proposed intervenor-defendant, the Town of North Salem, as well as counsel for the United States and the County of Westchester, to request that our motion be further adjourned, until November 1, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/3/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Brian S. Sokoloff dated 8/8/2013 re: We write to request a three-week extension of time to respond to proposed intervenor-plaintiff Kearneyf Realty and Development, Inc....All parties consent to this request. This is the Town's second request for an adjournment. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/9/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Lara K. Eshkenazi dated 8/2/2013 re: We write on behalf of the United States in response to the motion to intervene in thea above-titled case filed by Kearney Realty and Development, Inc. Document filed by United States of America.(gr) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Francisco Cardoso on behalf of The Planning Board of the Town of North Salem, The Town Board of the Town of North Salem, The Town of North Salem. (Cardoso, Anthony) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 435 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Rodriguez, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Robert F. Meehan in Opposition re: 435 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rodriguez, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Robert A. Spolzino dated 8/1/2013 re: We represent Kearney Realty and Development, Inc. ("Kearney Realty"), intervenor plaintiff...In order to further pursue a resolution, we respectfully request that the Court extend North Salem's deadline to serve its opposition to August 9, 2013, and allow Kearney Realty two weeks to serve its reply, by August 23, 2013. All parties consent to this proposed schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/2/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Sokoloff on behalf of The Town of North Salem, The Town Board of the Town of North Salem, The Planning Board of the Town of North Salem. (Sokoloff, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: On July 17, 2013, the Court issued an Order advising the parties of the briefing schedule set by the Court's July 3 Order for a motion to intervene filed by Kearney Realty and Development, Inc. ("Kearney"). By letter dated July 17, counsel for proposed defendants Town of North Salem, the Town Board of the Town of North Salem, and the Planning Board of the Town of North Salem ("North Salem") requests an extension of the briefing schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the United States of America, defendant Westchester County, and the proposed North Salem defendants shall serve any opposition to Kearney's motion by August 2, 2013. Kearney's reply, if any, shall be served by August 16, 2013. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/2/2013, Replies due by 8/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel, Part I. for Denise Cote on 7/18/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rsh) Modified on 7/22/2013 (rsh). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: that, consistent with the July 3 Order, the United States of America, defendant Westchester County, and the proposed North Salem defendants shall serve any opposition to Kearney's motion by July 26, 2013. Kearney's reply, if any, shall be served by August 9, 2013. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party wishes to request an extension of the briefing schedule set by this Order, the request shall be made by letter to the Court and should state: (1) the original due date, (2) the number of previous requests for adjournment or extensions of time, (3) whether these previous requests were granted or denied, and (4) the position of the other parties regarding the requested extension. If any of the other parties do not consent to the extension, the letter shall state the reasons given by the non-consenting party for refusing consent. If the requested extension affects any other scheduled dates, a proposed Revised Scheduling Order must be attached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the proposed North Salem defendants shall promptly file a notice of appearance on the Electronic Case Filing system. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/26/2013, Replies due by 8/9/2013.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel, Part I for Denise Cote on 7/17/2013) (rsh) Modified on 7/22/2013 (rsh). (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THE MOTION BY KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPMENT, INC. TO INTERVENE, COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION served on Town of North Salem on July 3, 2013. Service was accepted by Veronica Howley. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THE MOTION BY KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPMENT, INC. TO INTERVENE, COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION, served on Westchester County Attorney's Office on July 3, 2013. Service was accepted by Receptionist. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. On 7/3/2013, Kearney Realty and Development, Inc. ("Kearney") filed a motion to intervene in the present action. It is hereby ORDERED that the United States of America and defendant Westchester County shall serve any opposition to Kearney's motion by 7/26/2013. Kearney's reply, if any, shall be served by 8/9/2013. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/3/2013) (gr) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION, NOTICE OF MOTION TO INTERVENE and MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THE MOTION BY KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPMENT, INC. TO INTERVENE served on USA ATTORNEY for the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK on July 3, 2013. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 435 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kenneth Kearney in Support re: 435 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ 1 of 3, # 37 Exhibit JJ 2 of 3, # 38 Exhibit JJ 3 of 3, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL, # 41 Exhibit MM, # 42 Exhibit NN, # 43 Exhibit COMPLAINT)(Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by KEARNEY REALTY AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.. Return Date set for 7/24/2013 at 09:30 AM.(Flannery, John) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Costs Taxed as to 433 USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 12-2047. in the amount of $456.00. Docketed as Judgment #13,1169 on 6/6/2013 in favor of Appellee United States of America against Appellant Westchester County, New York. (nd) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 403 Notice of Appeal, filed by Westchester County, New York USCA Case Number 12-2047. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 5/29/2013. (tp) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Mr. Meeham from James E. Johnson dated 5/14/2013 re: This serves to confirm our interview with County Executive Robert P. Astorino on Tuesday, May 21, 2013 from 10:30 a.m. to 12:30 pm at the Michaelian Office Building located at 148 Martine Avenue, White Plains, New York. "CC" to Honorable Denise Cote, U.S. District Judge; Honorable Gabriel W. Gorenstein, U.S. Magistrate Judge, David J. Kennedy, Assistant U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York; Benjamin H. Torrance, Assistant U.S. Attorney for the Souther District of New York; Lara K. Eshkenazi, Assistant U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York; Glenda I. Fussa, Deputy Regional Counsel, New York Office, HUD.(gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/26/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-02741-DLC, 1:06-cv-02860-DLC(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2013 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-02741-DLC, 1:06-cv-02860-DLC(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT. / Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the 2012 Calendar Year Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 9 Exhibit 2 - Part 4, # 10 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, # 11 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 12 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 13 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, # 14 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, # 15 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, # 16 Exhibit 3 - Part 6, # 17 Exhibit 3 - Part 7, # 18 Exhibit 3 - Part 8, # 19 Exhibit 3 - Part 9, # 20 Exhibit 3 - Part 10, # 21 Exhibit 3 - Part 11, # 22 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 23 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 24 Exhibit 4 - Part 3, # 25 Exhibit 4 - Part 4, # 26 Exhibit 4 - Part 5, # 27 Exhibit 4 - Part 6, # 28 Exhibit 4 - Part 7, # 29 Exhibit 5, # 30 Exhibit 6, # 31 Exhibit 7 - Part 1, # 32 Exhibit 7 - Part 2, # 33 Exhibit 7 - Part 3, # 34 Exhibit 7 - Part 4, # 35 Exhibit 7 - Part 5, # 36 Exhibit 7 - Part 6, # 37 Exhibit 7 - Part 7, # 38 Exhibit 7 - Part 8, # 39 Exhibit 7 - Part 9, # 40 Exhibit 7 - Part 10, # 41 Exhibit 7 - Part 11, # 42 Exhibit 8, # 43 Exhibit 9, # 44 Exhibit 10, # 45 Exhibit 11, # 46 Exhibit 12, # 47 Exhibit 13, # 48 Exhibit 14, # 49 Exhibit 15, # 50 Exhibit 16, # 51 Exhibit 17, # 52 Exhibit 18 - Part 1, # 53 Exhibit 18 - Part 2, # 54 Exhibit 18 - Part 3, # 55 Exhibit 18 - Part 4, # 56 Exhibit 18 - Part 5, # 57 Exhibit 18 - Part 6, # 58 Exhibit 18 - Part 7, # 59 Exhibit 18 - Part 8, # 60 Exhibit 18 - Part 9, # 61 Exhibit 18 - Part 10, # 62 Exhibit 18 - Part 11, # 63 Exhibit 18 - Part 12, # 64 Exhibit 18 - Part 13, # 65 Exhibit 19, # 66 Exhibit 20, # 67 Exhibit 21, # 68 Exhibit 22, # 69 Exhibit 23 - Part 1, # 70 Exhibit 23 - Part 2, # 71 Exhibit 23 - Part 3, # 72 Exhibit 23 - Part 4, # 73 Exhibit 23 - Part 5, # 74 Exhibit 23 - Part 6, # 75 Exhibit 23 - Part 7, # 76 Exhibit 23 - Part 8, # 77 Exhibit 23 - Part 9, # 78 Exhibit 24, # 79 Exhibit 25, # 80 Exhibit 26, # 81 Exhibit 27, # 82 Exhibit 28, # 83 Exhibit 29, # 84 Exhibit 30, # 85 Exhibit 31, # 86 Exhibit 32, # 87 Exhibit 33, # 88 Exhibit 34, # 89 Exhibit 35 - Part 1, # 90 Exhibit 35 - Part 2, # 91 Exhibit 36 - Part 1, # 92 Exhibit 36 - Part 2, # 93 Exhibit 36 - Part 3, # 94 Exhibit 36 - Part 4, # 95 Exhibit 37, # 96 Exhibit 38, # 97 Exhibit 39)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/6/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote, from David J. Kennedy, dated 9/5/2012, re: in anticipation of the conference scheduled for 10 a.m. on September 6, 2012, to provide the Court with a status update. Document filed by United States of America.(ja) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James Maisomo, Sheila Marcotte, et al. dated 8/27/2012 re: Counsel for Defendant writes that we apologize in advance for taking up the Court's valuable time on this issue, but the seven Republican Legislators of the Westchester County Board of Legislators believe that we were left with no choice but to inform the Court of a serious flaw in the letter that was faxed to Your Honor on August 21, 2012 by Legislator Ken Jenkins, the Chairman of our County Board, with respect to the referenced action. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (pl) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kenneth W. Jenkins dated 8/21/2012 re: Counsel writes in response to Deputy County Executive Plunkett's 8/17/2012 correspondence to James Johnson E. Johnson, Esq., and David J. Kennedy, Assistant U.S. Attorney, concerning the implementation of your May 3, 2012 Order. Counsel also writes concerning the County of Westchester's motion for a stay, which were denied, and the appeal of Your Honors 5/3/2012 Order.(jfe) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a confernce proceeding held on 8/10/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: confernce held on 8/10/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J. Kennedy dated 8/9/2012 re: This Office represents the United States in the above-referenced matter. At a conference on July 25, 2012, the Court heard from the parties regarding the United States' application to enforce the terms of the Settlement in this case with respect to the County's obligations to conduct an analysis of zoning ordinances. The Court's intervention substantially improved the communication process between the parties. While the Court scheduled a conference for August 10, 2012, at 3:30 p.m. in the event that additional discussion was necessary, we anticipate that the Monitor will advise the Court by letter that there is no need at present for an additional conference on the zoning issues. Document filed by United States of America.(lmb) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Meehan dated 8/10/2012 re: Please accept this letter in response to the Government's August 9, 2012 letter regarding a conference tentatively scheduled for this afternoon at 3:30 p.m. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(lmb) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David J. Kennedy dated 8/10/2012 re: This Office represents the United States in the above-referenced matter. We write in response to the County's letter of this morning. Document filed by United States of America.(lmb) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James E. Johnson dated 8/9/2012 re: I write to report on Westchester County's efforts to comply with the Court's Order of July 27, 2012, ECF No. 414, in the above captioned matter, and to inform the Court of a second request made concerning the Court's Opinion and Order of May 3, 2012, ECF No. 402. Document filed by James E. Johnson.(lmb) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Defendant Westchester County shall make a written presentation to the Monitor and The United States Government by 8/17/2012 regarding the Country's efforts to comply with the obligations set out in the Court's May 3 Opinion and Order. It is further ordered that, if there is any dispute that remains unresolved, a conference will be held September 6, 2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2012) (ago) Modified on 8/15/2012 (ago). (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 7/25/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 7/25/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 411 Motion to Compel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Monitor's powers pursuant to paragraph 13 of the Stipulation and Order include, among other things, the authority to inspect "all books, records, accounts, correspondence, files and other documents, and electronic records of the County and its officers, agents, and employees concerning the subject matter and implementation of the Stipulation and Order" with the exception of privileged materials. The County shall respond to the outstanding requests for information in the Monitor's May 14, 2012, letter as further set forth in this order. The following procedure shall apply to all future requests for information by the Monitor pursuant to his authority under the Stipulation and Order as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/26/2012) (lmb) Modified on 8/1/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of James E. Johnson in Support re: 411 MOTION to Compel Westchester County to to comply with Court-appointed Monitor's requests for information and procedures for future requests.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 411 MOTION to Compel Westchester County to to comply with Court-appointed Monitor's requests for information and procedures for future requests.. Document filed by United States of America. (Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Westchester County to to comply with Court-appointed Monitor's requests for information and procedures for future requests. Document filed by United States of America.(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 402 Memorandum & Opinion. (tro) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 405 Order to Show Cause - Unsigned,,. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Robert F. Meehan in Support re: 405 Order to Show Cause - Unsigned,,. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition Opposition of the United States to Applications by Westchester County for a Stay. Document filed by United States of America. (Kennedy, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (UNSIGNED). It is hereby ordered that the above-named Plaintiff show cause before this Court, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (1) staying the Opinion and Order of the Hon. Denise Cote dated 5/3/2012 (Docket No. 402); and (2) if Defendant's motion is denied, staying the Order pending Defendant's motion in the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit for a stay of the Order, and as further specified. ENDORSEMENT: Docket and File as unsigned. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein, Part I on 5/16/2012). (rjm) (laq). (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - OPPOSITION BRIEF Opposition of the United States to Applications by Westchester County for a Stay. Document filed by United States of America.(Kennedy, David) Modified on 5/17/2012 (ka). (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL from 402 Memorandum & Opinion, 401 Endorsed Letter. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 465407003321. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L Cote from David J Kennedy dated 4/16/2012 re: We respectfully request that this letter be accepted and docketed as a brief response to a jurisdictional argument raised by the County that the Government could not reasonably have anticipated, and that may affect the timing of this Court's disposition of the Objection. ENDORSEMENT: The jurisdictional argument is denied. This Court will consider the Objection on the merits. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/17/2012) (cd) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re: 398 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the County's response to the Government's March 30, objections, if any, shall be filed no later than April 13, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government shall submit two (2) courtesy copies of its objections and the County's response, if any, by mail or delivery to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, to be received no later than April 16, 2012 at 5 p.m., ( Responses due by 4/13/2012.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/2/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection re: 396 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, David) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Report and Recommendations Objection to Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, David) Modified on 4/2/2012 (db). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance in Opposition re: 386 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 2/3/2012 re: The United States (the government), plaintiff in the above-named action, respectfully submits this letter in response to the Courts order of January 26, 2012, posing three questions to the parties as set forth herein. Document filed by United States of America.(djc) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Robert F. Meehan dated 2/3/2012 re: Pursuant to your directive and on behalf of the County of Westchester, this letter addresses the issues raised in your Honor's Order dated January 26, 2012.(djc) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Court would like to hear the parties' views on the following topics set forth within. A telephone conference is scheduled for Friday, January 27, 2012, at 11:00 a.m. to discuss a schedule and the best method of presenting information, testimony, or briefing to the Court on these topics. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/26/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Monitor's First Biennial Assessment of Westchester County's Efforts and Progress Related to the Obligations Set Forth in the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C, # 4 Exhibit 1D, # 5 Exhibit 1E, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re: 388 Response,. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 389 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER re:#101220 348 MOTION to Intervene filed by Anti-Discrimination Center: ADC's May 31, 2011 motion to intervene is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2012) (ab) Modified on 1/5/2012 (jab). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re: 386 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to County's Objection to Monitor's Report and Recommendation. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, David) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Report and Recommendations Special Master Memorandum of Law in Opposition to County's Objection to Monitor's Report and Recommendation. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, David) Modified on 12/22/2011 (db). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection re: 384 Special Master's Report, County's Objections to the Monitor's Report and Recommendation. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F - AI Part 1, # 7 Exhibit F - AI Part 2, # 8 Exhibit F - AI Part 3, # 9 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 1, # 10 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 2, # 11 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 3, # 12 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 4, # 13 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 5, # 14 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 6, # 15 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 7, Part 1, # 16 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 7, Part 2, # 17 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 8, # 18 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 9, # 19 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 1, # 20 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 2, # 21 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 3, # 22 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 4, # 23 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 5, # 24 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 6, # 25 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 7, # 26 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 8, # 27 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 9, # 28 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 10, Part 10, # 29 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 1, # 30 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 2, # 31 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 3, # 32 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 4, # 33 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 5, # 34 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 6, # 35 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 7, # 36 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 8, # 37 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 9, # 38 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 10, # 39 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 11, Part 11, # 40 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 12, # 41 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 13, # 42 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 14, # 43 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 15, # 44 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 16, Part 1, # 45 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 16, Part 2, # 46 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 16, Part 3, # 47 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 17A, Part 1, # 48 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 17A, Part 2, # 49 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 17B, Part 1, # 50 Exhibit F - AI Appendix 17B, Part 2, # 51 Exhibit G, # 52 Exhibit H, # 53 Exhibit I)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Castro-Blanco dated 11/23/2011 re: Counsel for the defendant proposes the following schedule: The County's notice of motion, supporting affidavits, and memorandum of law shall be served on or before 12/7/2011; The Government's opposing affidavits and answering memorandum of law shall be served on or before 12/21/2011; and any reply affidavits and memorandum of law shall be served on or before 1/6/2012. Moreover, the County and the Government agree that compliance with this motion schedule is timely compliance with the provisions of paragraph 14(d) of the Stipulation. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The filing by the County should be denominated an "Objection" (not a "notice of motion") in accordance with paragraph l4(d) of the Stipulation, which incorporates the procedures contained in Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/28/2011) (ft) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. //Monitor's Report and Recommendation Regarding Dispute Resolution (Amended). Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. /MONITOR'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. /Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the period of April 25, 2011 through October 25, 2011 (refiled as instructed by the court) Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of April 25, 2011 Through October 25, 2011 Covering Activities for dates of April 25, 2011 Through October 25, 2011. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Johnson, James) Modified on 10/26/2011 (ka). (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Kevin D. Walsh in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Andrew A. Beveridge in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Declaration of V. Elaine Gross in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael L. Hanley in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jerrold M. Levy in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert H. Stroup dated 9/12/2011 re: request the Court's permission for ADC to sumbit a singe, 30 page consolidated brief to reply to the briefs in opposition to ADC's Motion to Intervene. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/13/2011) (jar) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Adam Rodriguez on behalf of Westchester County, New York. New Address: Office of the Westchester County Attorney, 148 Martine Avenue, Room #600, White Plains, New York, 10601, 9149954894. (Rodriguez, Adam) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John M. Nonna in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of James E. Johnson in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (letter Dec. 21, 2010), # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (letter Apr. 28, 2011), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (letter May 13, 2011), # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 (letter Jul. 13, 2011), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 (letter Jul. 20, 2011))(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Rodriguez on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Rodriguez, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kenneth W. Jenkins in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Robert F. Meehan in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/7/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/7/2011 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa-Jean Rotini on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Rotini, Melissa-Jean) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: 348 Motion to Intervene, filed by Anti-Discrimination Center and 343 Motion to Enforce Judgment - Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58, filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. Defendant Westchester County and the United States of America's opposition briefs to the ADC's motion to intervene shall be served by July 29, 2011. ADC's reply, if any, shall be served by September 16, 2011. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. ADC's May 31 motion to enforce the consent decree is denied without prejudice to ADC refiling the motion after the Court has decided the May 31 motion to intervene. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/7/2011) (ab) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/7/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/2/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Craig Gurian re: 351 Declaration in Support of Motion (Supplemental Declaration). Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Craig Gurian re: 351 Declaration in Support of Motion (Supplemental Declaration). Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5- 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Craig Gurian re: 351 Declaration in Support of Motion (Supplemental Declaration). Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, 18, # 2 Exhibit 19)(Stroup, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2011 (db). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14, 15, # 2 16)(Stroup, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2011 (db). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 5 - 12, 13)(Stroup, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2011 (db). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 4)(Stroup, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2011 (db). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Craig Gurian in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 348 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center.(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Andrew A. Beveridge in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 343 MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Gurian on behalf of Anti-Discrimination Center (Gurian, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Enforce Judgment -Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center.(Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion to Enforce Consent Decree Pursuant to Consent Decree 58. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert H. Stroup on behalf of Anti-Discrimination Center (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert H. Stroup on behalf of ABC. New Address: Craig Gurian, Anti-Discrimination Center, Inc., 54 West 21st Street, Suite 707, New York, New York, USA 10010, (212) 346-201. (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert H. Stroup on behalf of ABC (Stroup, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Francis Castro-Blanco on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Castro-Blanco, James) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Fumanti Arcuri on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Arcuri, Carol) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of October 25, 2010 Through April 25, 2011 Covering Activities for dates of October 25, 2010 Through April 25, 2011. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2))(Johnson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TERMINATING APPEARANCE OF EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN, P.C. AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT Epstein Becker & Green, P.C. ("RBG"), respectfully requests, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the appearances of Stuart M. Gerson, Matthew T. Miklave, Michael A. Kalish and Carrie B. Corcoran ("BBG attorneys") as counsel for Defendant Westchester County,New York (hereinafter "WCNY"), be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/12/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. re Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of July 7, 2010 through October 25, 2010 Covering Activities for dates of July 7, 2010 to October 25, 2010. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 2 - IP, # 4 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix A, # 5 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix B, # 6 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix C, # 7 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix D (part 1 of 2), # 8 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix D (part 2 of 2), # 9 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 1 of 7), # 10 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 2 of 7), # 11 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 3 of 7), # 12 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 4 of 7), # 13 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 5 of 7), # 14 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 6 of 7), # 15 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix E (part 7 of 7), # 16 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix F, # 17 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix G, # 18 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix H, # 19 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix I (part 1 of 3), # 20 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix I (part 2 of 3), # 21 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix I (part 3 of 3), # 22 Exhibit 2 - IP Appendix K, # 23 Exhibit 3 - BOL Comments on IP, # 24 Exhibit 4 - June 2010 Inquiries, # 25 Exhibit 5 - October 2010 Advisories, # 26 Exhibit 6- Combined Submission on Unit Issue, # 27 Exhibit 7 - 10/15/10 Letter from County to Monitor)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Sarles Brady on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Brady, Shannon) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Ann Alesio on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Alesio, Lori) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. Meehan on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Meehan, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / (Continued) MONITOR'S REPORT Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of February 11, 2010 Through July 6, 2010 - (Includes Exhibits - PART 2 of 2) Covering Activities for dates of February 11, 2010 through July 6, 2010. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8 (1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 8 (2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 9 (1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 9 (2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 329 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / MONITOR'S REPORT Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of February 11, 2010 Through July 6, 2010 - (Includes Exhibits - PART 1 of 2) Covering Activities for dates of February 11, 2010 through July 6, 2010. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 - IP (1 of 12), # 6 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix A (2 of 12), # 7 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix B (3 of 12), # 8 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix C (4 of 12), # 9 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix D (5 of 12), # 10 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix E (1of2) (6 of 12), # 11 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix E (2of2) (7 of 12), # 12 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix F (8 of 12), # 13 Exhibit IP Appendix G (9 of 12), # 14 Exhibit IP Appendix H (10 of 12), # 15 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix I (11 of 12), # 16 Exhibit 5 - IP Appendix I-Part 2 (12 of 12))(Johnson, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 409 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The County's May 15 motion for a stay of the Court's May 3 Opinion pending appeal is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/17/2012) (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 402 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER: The Governments objection to the Magistrate Judges March 16 Opinion is sustained. The Court adopts those sections of the Monitors Report dealing with the Countys obligation to promote source-of-income legislation. The remaining sections of the March 16 Opinion are adopted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/3/2012) (jfe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 396 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER: The Countys objections to the Monitors Report (Docket #386) are sustained in part and overruled in part. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/16/2012) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 389 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER re: 348 MOTION to Intervene filed by Anti-Discrimination Center: ADC's May 31, 2011 motion to intervene is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2012) (ab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 328 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. / Amended Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of August 10, 2009 Through February 10, 2010 Covering Activities for dates of August 10, 2009 Through February 10, 2010. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Implementation Plan, # 2 IP Appendix A, # 3 IP Appendix B, # 4 IP Appendix C, # 5 IP Appendix D, # 6 IP Appendix E, # 7 IP Appendix F, # 8 IP Appendix G (Part 1 of 2), # 9 IP Appendix G (Part 2 of 2), # 10 IP Appendix H (Part 1 of 2), # 11 IP Appendix H (Part 2 of 2), # 12 Exhibit 2 - Comments on IP)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT. Covering Activities for dates of / Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal for the Period of August 10, 2009 Through February 10, 2010. Document filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Implementation Plan, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Appendix C, # 5 Appendix D, # 6 Appendix E, # 7 Appendix F, # 8 Appendix G (Part 1 of 2), # 9 Appendix G (Part 2 of 2), # 10 Appendix H (Part 1 of 2), # 11 Appendix H (Part 2 of 2), # 12 Exhibit B - Comments on IP)(Johnson, James) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, that having been notified that the Westchester County Board of Legislators has approved the August 10, 2009 stipulation of settlement and has authorized a Bond Act conforming to the terms of paragraph 55 of the stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/24/09) (pl) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Stuart M. Gerson dated 9/23/09 re: Counsel is pleased to report that, the Board of Legislators of Westchester County enacted resolutions approving the settlement agreement in this matter as well as the bonding necessary to support the activities encompassed in the agreement. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(tro) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Westchester County, New York.Document filed by United States of America.(laq) (laq). (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a pre-trial conference in Courtroom 11B is set for October 16, 2009, at 2:30 p.m.; the trial shall begin on November 2, 2009. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT OF RELATOR'S SHARE AND RELEASE: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties hereto, in consideration of the mutual promises, covenants, and obligations hereinafter set forth, and for good and valuable consideration, receipt of which is hereby acknowledged, agree as follows: 1. In a separate Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal between the Government and the County (the "Settlement Stipulation and Order"), which is being submitted to the Court contemporaneously with this Stipulation and Order, the County has agreed to pay the United States, in full compromise and satisfaction of the False Claims Act allegations in this action, the sum of thirty million dollars ($30,000,000.00) (the "Settlement Proceeds"). The Relator agrees that this settlement is fair, adequate, and reasonable under all the circumstances under 31 U.S.C. 3730(c)(2)(B). 2. Contingent upon the United States receiving the Settlement Proceeds from the County and as soon as feasible after receipt, the United States agrees to pay the Relator, c/o its attorney Relman & Dane, PLLC, pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(d)(l), the sum of seven million, five hundred thousand dollars ($7,500,000.00) (the "Relator's Share"). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING MONITOR: The United States having selected James E. Johnson as the Monitor pursuant to paragraph 9 of the Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal (the "Stipulation") entered in the above-captioned case, and the Court having approved the Government's selection, it is hereby ORDERED that James E. Johnson is hereby appointed to the position of Monitor, as described in the Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 320 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, in consideration of the mutual promises, undertakings, obligations and commitments set forth below, the parties hereto covenant and agree as follows: 1. The parties hereto consent to this Court's exercise of subject matter jurisdiction over this action and personal jurisdiction over each of them. 2. The County shall pay twenty-one million, six hundred thousand ($21,600,000) into the County's account with HUD in accordance with HUD's administrative procedures. Such payment is for settlement of the claims brought pursuant to this action and not for the financing of a capital improvement. The County shall make such payment by electronic funds transfer pursuant to written instructions that the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York or HUD will provide to counsel for the County. HUD shall make those funds available to the County for the development of new affordable housing units that will AFFH in the County, provided that the County's use and expenditure of the funds, and any program income earned from the use of the funds, as defined by 24 C.F.R. 570.500(a), shall be subject to the requirements of the CDBG program and the terms and conditions set forth in paragraph 7. 3. The County shall pay to the United States the sum of thirty million dollars ($30,000,000) (the "Settlement Amount"), in full compromise and satisfaction of the False Claims Act allegations in this action. This Settlement Amount shall constitute a debt due and owing upon entry of this Stipulation and Order by the Court, and shall be discharged upon payment to the United States, no later than ninety (90) calendar days after the Court's entry of this Stipulation and Order. With respect to such payment, the County shall receive a credit of twenty-one million, six hundred thousand ($21,600,000) for the payment to HUD set forth in paragraph 2. The County shall pay the remaining eight million, four hundred thousand ($8,400,000) to the United States by electronic funds transfer pursuant to written instructions that the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York will provide to counsel for the County. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF UNITED STATES TO INTERVENE: The United States having notified the Court of its election to intervene and proceed with this action, and having filed its application with respect thereto; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 317 Notice (Other) in Support of United States' Application to Intervene. Document filed by United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Election to Intervene. Document filed by United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Joseph A. Stargiotti dated 6/9/2009 re: The City of Peekskill is in receipt of a letter dated May 12, 2009 from Jerry Mulligan, Westchester County's Commissioner of Planning advising that Westchester County will now be processing payment of vouchers under pre 2008 CDBG Grants. Based on that advice from the Commissioner of Planning the City of Peekskill's application for an Order to Show Cause is moot. The City of Peekskill hereby withdraws its application. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(mbe) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James Cott dated 6/26/09 re: Request for a 30 day extension of the 7/6 trial date. ENDORSEMENT: Trial is adjourned to 8/10/09. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/09) (cd) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 28, 2009 @ 10:00 a.m. before Judge Denise L. Cote. (jab) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 24, 2009 @ 10:45 a.m. before Judge Denise L. Cote. (jab) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The conference set for Wednesday, 5/13/09, at 10:30 A.M. is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/12/09) (tro) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that relator's counsel, defendant's counsel, counsel for the Government, and counsel for the City of Peekskill appear before this Court for a conference on Wednesday, May 13, 2009, at 10:30 A.M. at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 11B. SO ORDERED ( Status Conference set for 5/13/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/8/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the trial in this case is adjourned to July 6, 2009. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/5/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a conference with the parties held on April 28, 2009, it is hereby ORDERED that the April 10, 2009 motion [Docket No. 178] by the defendant for an Order to allow the introduction of certain evidence is denied with respect to the federal government's failure to intervene in this action and the federal government's reaction to this lawsuit, as explained more fully on the record. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/1/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a conference with the parties held on April 28, 2009, it is hereby ordered that the April 10, 2009 motion [docket no. 171] by the plaintiff for an order to exclude evidence on the subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's administration of CDBG funds is granted with respect to the issue of damages. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/1/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a conference with the parties held on April 28, 2009, it is hereby ordered that the April 10, 2009 motion [docket no. 146] by the plaintiff for an order excluding evidence or argument suggesting defendant's reliance on "Advice of Counsel" is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/1/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: granting 296 Motion for Brook Hopkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/27/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: 295 Motion for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/27/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents. Response to Defendant's Court-Ordered Supplemental Briefing. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER It is hereby ordered that the May 4, 2009 trial is adjourned to May 11, 2009. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/24/09) (mme) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION & ORDER #97444: For the reasons set forth in this order, Plaintiffs April 10, 2009 motion [Docket No. 184] excluding the issue of damages from decision by the jury is granted to the extent that the defendant will be precluded from arguing to the jury that its damages should be reduced by the benefit HUD received from the Countys administration of its housing and community development funds. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/24/09) (mme) Modified on 4/27/2009 (mro). (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents. -- Court Ordered Response to Relator's Reply. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Brook Hopkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.(dle) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.(dle) (dle). (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting, for the reasons that will be placed on the record at the final pretrial conference, 168 Motion in Limine To Exclude Defendant's Untimely disclosed Witnesses.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/23/09) (cd) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 162 Motion in Limine To Exclude Westchester County legislators form testifying, for the reasons that will be placed on the record at the Final Pretrial Conference. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/23/09) (cd) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/1/09 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (dle) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/30/09 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (dle) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 2, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Denise L. Cote. (js) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER #97436 granting 173 Motion in Limine. Plaintiff's April 10, 2009 motion [Docket No. 173] for a pretrial order that defendant's AFFH certifications during the false claims period were material as a matter of law is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/22/2009) (rw) Modified on 4/24/2009 (mro). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiff has moved to exclude defendant's documents produced in April 2009. Defendant responded, inter alia, that during discovery plaintiff "never sought the exhibits it seeks to exclude." It is hereby ORDERED that by April 24, 2009, defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's argument that these documents should have been produced in response to plaintiff's Request No. 65 of September 17, 2007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any response by plaintiff to the April 24 submission is due by April 27, 2009 at noon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel bring courtesy copies of all documents in dispute to the Final Pretrial Conference. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/22/2009) (rw) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION & ORDER #97437: The plaintiffs April 10, 2009 motions [Docket Nos. 177 and 140] to preclude the testimony of defendants experts Clark and Welch are granted. The defendants April 10, 2009 motion [Docket No. 198] to preclude the testimony of plaintiffs experts is granted in part; specifically, the motion as to Bradford is granted, and the motion as to Beveridge, Pratt, and Logan is granted in part. 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc. 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence filed by Westchester County, New York, 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/22/09) (db) Modified on 4/24/2009 (mro). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/2/2009 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (tve) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF (Reply in Further Support). Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 173 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 173 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 178 MOTION in Limine to Allow the Introduction of Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Support re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re: 139 Proposed Jury Instructions. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 143 MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 143 MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: that the parties shall draft a proposed instruction for the Court to give to the jury immediately prior to opening statements that will describe the statutory and regulatory framework for the claims in this case, the falsity of the certifications, and the issue of knowledge which the jury must resolve. The parties shall submit two courtesy copies of this proposed instruction (or separate instructions if the parties are unable to prepare a joint instruction) to the Court by noon on Monday, April 27, 2009. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/21/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 160 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Comment or Reference to the Court's Statutory Duties to Award Treble Damages and Attorneys' Fees and Assess Civil Penalties.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION in Limine for a Limited Instruction to the Jury and Prohibitions on Comment or Challenge by Counsel Regarding the "Falsity" of Westchester County's Certifications.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 175 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Commitment to Fair and Affordable Housing".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 171 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's Administration of CDBG Funds.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 171 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's Administration of CDBG Funds.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 149 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITNESS LIST. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection re: 139 Proposed Jury Instructions. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection re: 138 Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 175 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Commitment to Fair and Affordable Housing".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 175 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Commitment to Fair and Affordable Housing".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 173 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 173 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. gerson in Opposition re: 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes".. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 149 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Opposition re: 149 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 152 MOTION in Limine for a Limited Instruction to the Jury and Prohibitions on Comment or Challenge by Counsel Regarding the "Falsity" of Westchester County's Certifications.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 171 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's Administration of CDBG Funds.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 143 MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 160 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Comment or Reference to the Court's Statutory Duties to Award Treble Damages and Attorneys' Fees and Assess Civil Penalties.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re: 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 204 Trial Brief. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection re: 204 Trial Brief. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection re: 182 Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection re: 183 Proposed Jury Instructions, 185 Proposed Jury Instructions. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14A, # 15 Exhibit 14B, # 16 Exhibit 14C, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 178 MOTION in Limine to Allow the Introduction of Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 178 MOTION in Limine to Allow the Introduction of Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Banjamin H. Torrance dated 3/30/09 Document filed by United States of America.(djc) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7A, # 8 Exhibit 7B, # 9 Exhibit 7C, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF CORRECTED WITH SIGNATURE. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Support re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part A, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part B, # 6 Exhibit 4 Part A, # 7 Exhibit 4 Part B, # 8 Exhibit 4 Part C, # 9 Exhibit 4 Part D, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 201 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Relator From Offering Certain Evidence at Trial. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Support re: 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part A, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part B, # 5 Exhibit 2 Part C, # 6 Exhibit 3 Part A, # 7 Exhibit 3 Part B, # 8 Exhibit 4 Part A, # 9 Exhibit 4 Part B, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 198 MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine To Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (See document #200) - AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Support re: 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part A, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part B, # 5 Exhibit 2 Part C, # 6 Exhibit 3 Part A, # 7 Exhibit 3 Part B, # 8 Exhibit 4 Part A, # 9 Exhibit 4 Part B, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8)(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 4/13/2009 (jar). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (See document #199) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 4/13/2009 (jar). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (See document #198) - MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Trial Relator's Expert Evidence. Document filed by United States of America.(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 4/13/2009 (jar). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 192 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's April 2009 Production of Documents. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (See Document #205) - DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 189 MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False C. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7A, # 8 Exhibit 7B, # 9 Exhibit 7C, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Allen, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2009 (jar). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Requesting that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Federal Government Documents Conclusively Establishing the Number of Defendant's False AFFH Certifications and Claims Made and the Funds Secured by Defendant During the False Claims Period. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 184 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT # 204) - TRIAL BRIEF. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 4/15/2009 (gp). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order to Exclude the Issue of Damages From Decision by the Jury. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 178 MOTION in Limine to Allow the Introduction of Certain Evidence at Trial.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Allow the Introduction of Certain Evidence at Trial. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimoy of Defendant's Expert Witness William Clark. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 175 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Commitment to Fair and Affordable Housing".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Commitment to Fair and Affordable Housing". Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 173 MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine for a Pretrial Order that Defendant's AFFH Certifications During the False Claims Period Were Material as a Matter of Law, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude the Issue of Materiality from Decision by the Jury. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 171 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's Administration of CDBG Funds.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of the "Benefit HUD Received" from the County's Administration of CDBG Funds. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 168 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Witnesses. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 165 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Understanding of the Underlying Causes of Population Patterns within the County". Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 162 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Westchester County Legislators from Testifying at Trial. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 160 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Comment or Reference to the Court's Statutory Duties to Award Treble Damages and Attorneys' Fees and Assess Civil Penalties.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Comment or Reference to the Court's Statutory Duties to Award Treble Damages and Attorneys' Fees and Assess Civil Penalties. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence on the Subject of Westchester County's "Sensitivity to Issues Concerning African Americans and Members of Other Protected Classes". Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 155 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Plaintiff/Relator in General, its Motive in Filing Suit, or its Intentions Regarding the Use of Any Monetary Recovery. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION in Limine for a Limited Instruction to the Jury and Prohibitions on Comment or Challenge by Counsel Regarding the "Falsity" of Westchester County's Certifications.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 152 MOTION in Limine for a Limited Instruction to the Jury and Prohibitions on Comment or Challenge by Counsel Regarding the "Falsity" of Westchester County's Certifications.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine for a Limited Instruction to the Jury and Prohibitions on Comment or Challenge by Counsel Regarding the "Falsity" of Westchester County's Certifications. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 149 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 149 MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine for a Ruling Limiting the Questions and Subjects on Which Witnesses from the Federal Government May Testify. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 146 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Evidence or Argument Suggesting Defendant's Reliance on "Advice of Counsel".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 146 MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Evidence or Argument Suggesting Defendant's Reliance on "Advice of Counsel".. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine for an Order Excluding Evidence or Argument Suggesting Defendant's Reliance on "Advice of Counsel". Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 143 MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 143 MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Request for Judicial Notice of New York State Case Law and for an Order Excluding Evidence and Precluding Argument Inconsistent with Such State Law. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 140 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defedant's Expert Witness Finis Welch. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER #97402 re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal filed by Westchester County, New York. The defendant's March 10, 2009 motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/9/2009) (tve) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mro). (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/30/09 re: Counsel writes to address a number of misstatements and misapprehensions that appear in the March 27, 2009 letter. (mme) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER For the reasons stated on the record, it is hereby ordered that defendant's application to reopen discovery is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: any motion in limine shall be served by 4/10/09; opposition shall be served by 4/17/09; and the reply shall be served by 4/21/09. The final pretrial conference is scheduled for 4/28/09 at 10 am. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/2/09) (cd) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Gary Lacefield, # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Andrew Spano, # 3 Exhibit C - S. Gerson's March 20, 2009 letter)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's March 9, 2009 motion to reassign this case to the White Plains Courthouse is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/19/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 120 MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 120 MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Andrew Spano, # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Norma Drummond, # 3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Gerard Mulligan)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re: 120 MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 24, 2009 Opinion & Order)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Postpone Trial Pending Appeal Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: that plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due March 13, 2009; any reply is due March 17, 2009. At the time any reply is filed, defendant shall provide two courtesy copies of all motion papers to Chambers by delivering them to the Courthouse Mailroom, 8th Floor, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/10/2009) (tve) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 120 MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Stuart M. Gerson in Support re: 120 MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Reassign Case to White Plains Courthouse. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the parties contact Magistrate Judge Gorenstein immediately to arrange for settlement discussions under his supervision. The joint Pretrial Order must be filed by 4/10/09. The case is placed on the 5/4 trial ready calendar, on 24 hours notice. You may contact the Deputy Clerk, Gloria Rojas, to learn where your case stands on the calendar. ( Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2009. Ready for Trial by 5/4/2009.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/25/09) n.(cd) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER #97120: The ADC's September 30, 2008 partial motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to the following elements of FCA liability: that the defendant made a claim, to the United States government, that was false or fraudulent, seeking payment from the Federal treasury. The ADC's motion is denied as to the knowledge element of an FCA claim. The County's September 30, 2008 motion for summary judgment is denied in full. The ADC's November 19, 2008 motion to strike is denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/24/2009) (jfe) Modified on 2/25/2009 (mro). (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 1/16/2009 re: I write in response to Stuart Gerson's of January 16, 2009, and to object strenuously to his request that the Court suspend its consideration of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment, motions which have been fully briefed since November 14, 2008. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc..(jmi) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Stuart M. Gerson dated 1/16/2009 re: Counsel respectfully ask that the Court permit the County a reasonable time to pursue these efforts set forth within before issuing its decision on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: The U.S. declined to intervene in 2006. This action has been actively litigated in the interim without any apparent effort by the defendant to obtain a reconsideration of the Government's decision. The application for a stay is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/21/2009) (jfe) Modified on 1/23/2009 (ae). Modified on 2/2/2009 (jfe). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Opposition re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Errata D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Errata G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Opposition re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that defendant's opposition to the motion is due December 8, 2008; any reply is due December 15, 2008, as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/4/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 107 MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 .. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Document No. 102 . Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2008(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit R-2 to Beveridge Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Spano Deposition Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Mulligan Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Drummond Deposition Excerpts)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 64, # 2 Exhibit 65, # 3 Exhibit 66, # 4 Exhibit 67, # 5 Exhibit 68, # 6 Exhibit 69, # 7 Exhibit 70, # 8 Exhibit 71)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 91 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Michael Allen dated 11/7/08 re: Request for an adjournment of the scheduled 12/3/08 Settlement Conference until 1/12/09 at 10:00 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Letters due 1/9/09. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 1/12/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/7/08) (db) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTER STATEMENT TO 87 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Ann Seligsohn in Opposition re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Opposition re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (part 1), # 5 Exhibit D (part 2), # 6 Exhibit D (part 3), # 7 Exhibit D (part 4), # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Opposition re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit 3 (Part 3), # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), # 10 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), # 11 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), # 12 Exhibit 5 (Part 4), # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 9-10, # 17 Exhibit 11-12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14-15, # 20 Exhibit 16-18, # 21 Exhibit 19-21, # 22 Exhibit 23-29, # 23 Exhibit 30-32, # 24 Exhibit 33-34, # 25 Exhibit 35 (Part 1), # 26 Exhibit 35 (Part 2), # 27 Exhibit 36-38, # 28 Exhibit 39, # 29 Exhibit 40-41, # 30 Exhibit 42, # 31 Exhibit 43-45, # 32 Errata 46 (Part 1), # 33 Exhibit 46 (Part 2), # 34 Exhibit 47-49, # 35 Exhibit 50-52, # 36 Exhibit 22, # 37 Exhibit 53-54, # 38 Exhibit 55, # 39 Exhibit 56-62, # 40 Exhibit 63)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 91 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER: addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 10/17/08 re: Pursuant tot he instructions of your Clerk, I write to confirm our recent submission of a Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff/Relator's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. 90] and a corrected Rule 56.1 Statement [Doc. 91]. The corrected submissions are not substantively different from the original submissions. Rather the submissions correct citations to the record that were previously incorrect. We submit these corrected versions in order to assist the Court and all parties in referencing the appropriate exhibits. Counsel for Defendant Westchester County, New York consents to the submission of the corrected briefs. (js) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO AMEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION BRIEFING DEADLINES: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that the deadlines with respect to the further briefing of dispositive motions are extended as follows: All response in opposition to dispositive motions are now on Friday, October 31, 2008. All replies in support of dispositive motions are now due on Friday, November 14, 2008. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/20/2008) (jfe) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/10/2008) (tve) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit Exh. 2, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 3 (part 1), # 5 Exhibit 3 (part 2), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11 (part 1), # 14 Exhibit 11 (part 2), # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Exhibit 41, # 45 Exhibit 42, # 46 Exhibit 43, # 47 Exhibit 44, # 48 Exhibit 45, # 49 Exhibit 46, # 50 Exhibit 47, # 51 Exhibit 48, # 52 Exhibit 49, # 53 Exhibit 50, # 54 Exhibit 51, # 55 Exhibit 52, # 56 Exhibit 53, # 57 Exhibit 54, # 58 Exhibit 55, # 59 Exhibit 56, # 60 Exhibit 57, # 61 Exhibit 58, # 62 Exhibit 59, # 63 Errata 60, # 64 Exhibit 61, # 65 Exhibit 62, # 66 Exhibit 63, # 67 Exhibit 64, # 68 Exhibit 65, # 69 Exhibit 66, # 70 Exhibit 67, # 71 Exhibit 68 (part 1), # 72 Exhibit 68 (part 2), # 73 Exhibit 69, # 74 Exhibit 70, # 75 Exhibit 71, # 76 Exhibit 72, # 77 Exhibit 73, # 78 Exhibit 74, # 79 Exhibit 75, # 80 Exhibit 76)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rule 56.1 Statement). Document filed by Westchester County, New York. Responses due by 10/28/2008(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 10/1/2008 (jar). (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish (with Exhibits 45-76) in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45, # 2 Exhibit 46, # 3 Exhibit 49, # 4 Exhibit 50, # 5 Exhibit 51, # 6 Exhibit 52, # 7 Exhibit 53, # 8 Exhibit 54, # 9 Exhibit 55, # 10 Exhibit 56, # 11 Exhibit 57, # 12 Exhibit 58, # 13 Exhibit 59, # 14 Exhibit 60, # 15 Exhibit 62, # 16 Exhibit 63, # 17 Exhibit 64, # 18 Exhibit 65, # 19 Exhibit 66, # 20 Exhibit 67, # 21 Exhibit 68 (part 1 of 2), # 22 Errata 68 (part 2 of 2), # 23 Exhibit 69, # 24 Exhibit 70, # 25 Exhibit 72, # 26 Exhibit 73, # 27 Errata 74, # 28 Exhibit 75, # 29 Exhibit 76, # 30 Exhibit 47, # 31 Exhibit 48, # 32 Exhibit 61, # 33 Exhibit 71)(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 10/2/2008 (jar). (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (of 2), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 3 (part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Errata 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Errata 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Errata 33, # 36 Errata 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44)(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 10/2/2008 (jar). (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix I, Tab 1 - Defendant's Responses to First Requests for Admission, # 2 Appendix I, Tab 2 - Excerpts from the Fair Housing Planning Guide, # 3 Appendix I, Tab 3 - Defendant's Responses to Revised Second Requests for Admission, # 4 Appendix I, Tab 4 - J. D'Agosta 1996 letter to A. O'Rourke, # 5 Appendix I, Tab 5 - March 11, 2005 Application for Federal Assistance, # 6 Appendix I, Tab 6 - Funding Approval/Agreement Forms, # 7 Appendix I, Tab 7 - 1996 Analysis of Impediments, # 8 Appendix I, Tab 8 - 2000 Analysis of Impediments, # 9 Appendix I, Tab 9 - Annual Action Plans, # 10 Appendix I, Tab 9a - Annual Action Plans, # 11 Appendix I, Tab 10 - Guide to Affordable Housing Development (1997), # 12 Appendix I, Tab 11 - End of Decade Report (2000), # 13 Appendix I, Tab 12 - Affordable Housing Action Plan (2004), # 14 Appendix I, Tab 13 - Affordable Housing Allocation Plan (2005), # 15 Appendix I, Tab 14 - Do Real Estate Agents Treat Minorities Differently than Whites? (2005), # 16 Appendix I, Tab 15 - Westchester County's Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Prelminary Injunction (Westhab, Inc. v. The Village of Elmsford), # 17 Appendix I, Tab 16 - Instructions for Urban County Qualification for Participation in CDBG Program, # 18 Appendix I,Tab 17 - Excerpts from Patterns for Westchester, # 19 Appendix I, Tab 18a - Defendant's Response to First Request for Production, # 20 Appendix I, Tab 18b - Defendant's Responses to Revised Second Request for Production, # 21 Appendix I, Tab 19 - Defendant's Amended Response to Revised Contention Interrogatories, # 22 Appendix I, Tab 20 - Excerpts from Rockland County's Analysis of Impediments)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix II, Tab 21 - Beveridge Expert Report, # 2 Appendix II, Tab 21a - Beveridge Expert Report, # 3 Appendix II, Tab 21b - Beveridge Expert Report, # 4 Appendix II, Tab 21c - Beveridge Expert Report, # 5 Appendix II, Tab 22 - Beveridge Rebuttal Report, # 6 Appendix II, Tab 23 - Pratt Expert Report, # 7 Appendix II, Tab 24 - Pratt Rebuttal Report, # 8 Appendix II, Tab 25 - Logan Expert Report, # 9 Appendix II, Tab 26 - Logan Rebuttal Report, # 10 Appendix II, Tab 27 - Bradford Expert Report)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Allen in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix III, Tab 28 - Excerpts from Drummond Deposition, Vol. II, # 2 Appendix III, Tab 28a - Excerpts from Drummond Deposition, Vol. II, # 3 Appendix III, Tab 28b - Excerpts from Drummond Deposition, Vol II, # 4 Appendix III, Tab 29 - Excerpts from Spano Deposition, # 5 Appendix III, Tab 30 - Excerpts from Mulligan Deposition, # 6 Appendix III, Tab 31 - Excerpts from Drummond Deposition, Vol. I, # 7 Appendix III, Tab 32 - Excerpts from Brathwaite Deposition, # 8 Appendix III, Tab 33 - Excerpts from Lipkin Deposition, # 9 Appendix III, Tab 34 - Excerpts from Lacefield Deposition, # 10 Appendix III, Tab 35 - Excerpts from Welch Deposition, # 11 Appendix III, Tab 36 - Excerpts from Clark Deposition, # 12 Appendix III, Tab 37 - Excerpts from Levy Deposition, # 13 Appendix III, Tab 38 - Excerpts from Sanchez Deposition, # 14 Appendix III, Tab 39 - Excerpts from Massari Deposition, # 15 Appendix III, Tab 39a - Excerpts from Massari Deposition, # 16 Appendix III, Tab 39b - Excerpts from Massari Deposition, # 17 Appendix III, Tab 39c - Excerpts from Massari Deposition, # 18 Appendix III, Tab 40 - Excerpts from Gurian Deposition, # 19 Appendix III, Tab 41 - Excerpts from Bellman Deposition, # 20 Appendix III, Tab 42 - Excerpts from Raymond Deposition)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. Responses due by 10/28/2008(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Code of the Town of Lewisboro, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Code of the Village of Briarcliff Manor, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Code of the Town of North Salem, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Code of the Town of North Castle, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Code of the Village of Hastings-on-Hudson, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Code of the Town of Somers, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Municipal Code of Westchester County)(Allen, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2008 (db). Modified on 10/1/2008 (jar). (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2008(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 9/18/08 re: Counsel for Relator and Defendants write to express the parties' joint request to increase the length of briefs related to dispositive motions, the deadline for which is 9/30/08. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/19/08) (tro) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 8/28/08 re: Counsel for both parties jointly request extension of the current scheduled, as follows: Dispositive motions due 9/30/08; Oppositions due 10/28/08; and reply briefs due 11/11/08. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The case is removed from the trial ready calendar., (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/3/08) (tro) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the case is placed on the October 6, 2008 trial ready calendar. You must be ready to proceed on 24 hours notice. You may contact the Deputy Clerk Gloria Rojas, to learn where your case stands on the calendar. It is further ordered that the following procedures set forth in this order shall govern the conduct of the trial So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/08) (js) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/23/08 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ama) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 7/15/2008 re: Counsel writes to seek a pre-motion conference on discovery in advance of a motion to compel. ENDORSEMENT: No letter may be longer than 2 pages. This letter is rejected. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/16/2008) (tve) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRYJOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Expert Disclosure (STIPULATION). Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. Return Date set for 8/27/2008 at 12:00 AM.(Allen, Michael) Modified on 7/3/2008 (jar). (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Kalish dated 6/27/08 re: Counsel for Defendant Westchester County, New York write to request that the current deadline for defendant to identify experts and disclose expert testimony be extended by thirty days to 8/13/08. Defendant recognizes that such a 30-day extension would require that similar 30-day extensions would be required for relator's rebuttal expert testimony (to 8/27/08); the close of expert discovery (to 9/17/08); the time by which to make a summary judgment motion (to 10/19/08); the time by which to oppose a summary judgment motion (to 11/9/08); and the time by which to submit reply papers in connection with a summary judgment motion (to 11/23/08). ENDORSEMENT: The pretrial order or summary judgment motion remains due September 19. The parties may adjust the expert discovery schedule on consent. Without such consent, the March 19 Order remains in effect. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/30/08) (tro) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/13/2008 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ama) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/13/2008 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ama) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 3/18/08 re: Counsel requests an extension of certain deadlines set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order of 8/10/07 to as follows: Fact Discovery due by 6/27/08. Plaintiff's identification of experts and disclosures of expert testimony conforming to the requirements of Rule 26(a(2)(B) must occur by 6/16/08. Defendant's identification of experts and disclosure of expert testimony must occur by 7/14/08. Plaintiff's disclosure of rebuttal expert testimony must occur by 7/28/08. Expert Discovery due by 8/18/08. Any motion for summary judgment must be filed by 9/19/08; Opposition must be served by 10/10/08; reply must be served by 10/24/08. In the event no motion is filed, the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by 9/19/08. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/19/08) (tro) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/05/2008 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ama) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/24/2008 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ama) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/26/07) (cd) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER # 95092: The defendant's July 30 motion for certification of an immediate appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1992 (b) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/22/2007) (jmi) Modified on 8/24/2007 (rw). (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/3/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/15/07) (kco) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2007.,Joinder of Parties due by 9/28/2007.,Discovery due by 3/28/2008.,Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2008. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Carrie Corcoran dated August 6, 2007 re: Adjournment of the August 10, 2007 initial pretrial conference. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on August 8, 2007) (gr) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re: 51 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 51 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appeal and to Stay Discovery Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: the time for defendant Westchester County, New York to answer the complaint is extended to 8/13/07. Westchester County, New York answer due 8/13/2007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/27/07) (db) Modified on 8/9/2007 (db). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2007 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote, in courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/13/07) (jco) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER # 94905 re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. filed by Westchester County, New York. The defendant's April 17, 2007 motion to dismiss is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/13/07) (jco) Modified on 7/17/2007 (rw). (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Letter request to strike Relator's unauthorized 6/22/07 filing. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Corcoran, Carrie) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Letter request for permission to respond to Defendant's reply. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Brief and Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint served on Anti-Discrimination Law Center of Metro New York on June 15, 2007. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Allen dated 5/25/07 re: Application GRANTED. This letter is construed as a request to file an opposition to the defendants Motion to Dismiss that exceeds the page limit. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/25/07) (db) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F (pt. 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Kalish, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Michael Allen dated 5/4/07 re: plaintiff request an continuance of the initial conference currently scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, 5/11/07. So Ordered. The conference is adjourned to 6/15/07 @11:30 a.m.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/7/07) (pl) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH RESPECT TO BRIEFING OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND PROPOSED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER that defendant shall file ant reply brief on or before June 15, 2007. Replies due by 5/15/2007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/2/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Michael A. Kalish in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Westchester County, New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A (1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit Ex. A (pt. 2 of 2)# 3 Exhibit Ex. B# 4 Exhibit Ex. C# 5 Exhibit Ex. D (pt. 1 of 4)# 6 Exhibit Ex. D (pt. 2 of 4)# 7 Exhibit Ex. D (pt. 3 of 4)# 8 Exhibit Ex. D (pt. 4 of 4)# 9 Exhibit Ex. E# 10 Exhibit Ex. F (pt. 1 of 2)# 11 Exhibit Ex. F (pt. 2 of 2)# 12 Exhibit Ex. G# 13 Exhibit Ex. H# 14 Exhibit Ex. I# 15 Exhibit Ex. J# 16 Exhibit Ex. K# 17 Exhibit Ex. L# 18 Exhibit Ex. M# 19 Exhibit Ex. N# 20 Exhibit Ex. O# 21 Exhibit Ex. P)(Gerson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION). Document filed by Westchester County, New York.(Gerson, Stuart) Modified on 4/17/2007 (KA). (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carrie Corcoran on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Corcoran, Carrie) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thaddeus Miklave on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Miklave, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Kalish on behalf of Westchester County, New York (Kalish, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that dfts time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including 4/16/07. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/22/07) (pl) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Westchester County, New York served on 1/8/2007, answer due 3/31/2007. Service was accepted by Donna Dixon, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. (Allen, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/31/07) (db) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Hillary J. Raimondi dated 1/26/07 re: Counsel writes to request that this Court grant it an extension until 3/31/07 to enter an appearance and to answer the complaint. Granted. The parties shall appear for a conference May 11 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/30/07) (jco) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Craig Gurian on behalf of Anti-Discrimination Center of Metro New York, Inc.. New Address: Anti-Discrimination Center, 377 Broadway, Ninth Floor, New York, NY, US 10013, 212-655-5790. (Gurian, Craig) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 273 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?