Mass Engineered Design, Inc. v. Ergotron, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-00272
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 4:23 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jerry Moscovitch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by F. Elizabeth Burgin Waller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F. Elizabeth Burgin Waller

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Thompson Gorham +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 gorham@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Auchter +1 202 370 8303 +1 202 370 8344 rauchter@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen F Schlather

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen F Schlather

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Edmonds +1 713 364 5291 +1 832 415 2535 jedmonds@ip-lit.com
Space Shea Neal Palavan +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 spalavan@ip-lit.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin A. Nelson +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
Space Max Lalon Tribble, Jr. +1 713 653 7820 +1 713 654 6672 mtribble@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore Adam Breiner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Adam Breiner
No Logo Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aarika Katherine McCloskey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aarika Katherine McCloskey

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrew W. Spangler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew W. Spangler

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Conley, Rose & Tayon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Loren Maag +1 713 238 8040 +1 713 238 8008 gmaag@conleyrose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Thompson Gorham +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 gorham@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John J Edmonds

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Edmonds

Toggle Switch Represented by L. Charles Van Cleef

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Charles Van Cleef

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Auchter +1 202 370 8303 +1 202 370 8344 rauchter@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Michael Pierce +1 713 226 6694 +1 713 226 6294 jpierce@porterhedges.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea Neal Palavan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shea Neal Palavan

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen F Schlather

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen F Schlather

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin A. Nelson +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
Space Max Lalon Tribble, Jr. +1 713 653 7820 +1 713 654 6672 mtribble@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Bretford Manufacturing, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Barry Warren Sufrin +1 312 569 1489 +1 312 569 3489 Barry.sufrin@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP (Indianapolis)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Richard W. Young +1 312 715 5260 +1 312 632 1756 Richard.Young@Quarles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady, LLP - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 +1 312 715 5000 nicole.murray@quarles.com
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Richard W. Young +1 312 715 5260 +1 312 632 1756 Richard.Young@Quarles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Andrea Maria Augustine +1 312 499 6771 +1 312 499 6701 AMAugustine@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 David J. Moorhead +1 312 569 1483 +5693 569 569 3483 dmoorhead@gcd.com
TERMINATED: 06/26/2008 Barry Warren Sufrin +1 312 569 1489 +1 312 569 3489 Barry.sufrin@dbr.com
No Logo Cdw Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant D Fairbairn +1 612 492 7255 +1 612 492 7077 gfairbairn@fredlaw.com
Space Lora Mitchell Friedemann +1 612 492 7185 +1 612 492 7077 lfriedemann@fredlaw.com
Space MATTHEW GRAHAM
Space Kurt John Niederluecke +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 kniederluecke@fredlaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder lmyers@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Bridgett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell C. Petersen +1 415 995 5816 +1 415 995 3530 russ.petersen@hansonbridgett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Duston +1 312 474 6300 tduston@marshallip.com
Space Mark Harry Izraelewicz +1 312 474 6300 mizraelewicz@marshallip.com
Space Charles Juister +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 cjuister@marshallip.com
No Logo Csav, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Thuente Pedersen, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Chadwick +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 litigationECF@ptslaw.com
Space Aaron W. Davis +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 davis@ptslaw.com
Space Casey A Kniser +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 kniser@ptslaw.com
Space Chad Wickman +1 612 252 1543 +1 612 349 9266 wickman@ptslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Thuente, Skaar & Christensen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Chadwick +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 litigationECF@ptslaw.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Dell International L.l.c.
Dell Computer Corporation Officer/Director, Dell Computer Corporation
Officer/Director, Perot Systems Corp
Officer/Director, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Alden Dietzel +1 512 338 5423 +1 512 338 5499 bdietzel@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erskine & McMahon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blake C Erskine , +1 903 757 8435 +1 903 757 9429 blakee@erskine-mcmahon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt John Niederluecke +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 kniederluecke@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natalie J. Morgan +1 858 350 2303 +1 858 350 2399 nmorgan@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luiz Von Paumgartten +1 512 582 2850 +1 512 582 2851 lluiz@fogartyIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 542 8440 +1 512 236 3256 ctyler@velaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Taylor Morris +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 smorris@wsgr.com
Space Matthew Robert Reed +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mreed@wsgr.com
Space Jeffrey Michael Whiting +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 jwhiting@wsgr.com
No Logo Ergotron, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant D Fairbairn +1 612 492 7255 +1 612 492 7077 gfairbairn@fredlaw.com
Space Lora Mitchell Friedemann +1 612 492 7185 +1 612 492 7077 lfriedemann@fredlaw.com
Space MATTHEW GRAHAM
Space Kurt John Niederluecke +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 kniederluecke@fredlaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder lmyers@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant D Fairbairn +1 612 492 7255 +1 612 492 7077 gfairbairn@fredlaw.com
No Logo Tech Data Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant D Fairbairn +1 612 492 7255 +1 612 492 7077 gfairbairn@fredlaw.com
Space Lora Mitchell Friedemann +1 612 492 7185 +1 612 492 7077 lfriedemann@fredlaw.com
Space MATTHEW GRAHAM
Space Kurt John Niederluecke +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 kniederluecke@fredlaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder lmyers@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayrobinson Pa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Vaughn Stein +1 813 273 5078 +1 813 273 5145 stefan.stein@gray-robinson.com
No Logo A.B. Distributing, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane Russell Coleman & Logan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Reese Jones +1 214 777 4288 wjones@krcl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Touchstone Bernays Johnston Beall Smith & Stollenwerck - Dal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky Feemster +1 214 741 1166 +1 214 259 8720 rocky.feemster@tbjbs.com
Space Rocky Feemster +1 214 741 1166 +1 214 259 8720 rocky.feemster@tbjbs.com
No Logo D & H Distributing, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coghlan Crowson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 758 5543 +1 903 753 6989 rfaulkner@ccfww.com
No Logo Eizo Nanao Technologies Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008 Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008 Ryan S. Goldstein +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 ryangoldstein@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo International Audio Visual Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Mano Schoenbrun +1 903 534 0200 +1 903 534 0511 ron@sscfirm.com
No Logo Synnex Corporation, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY William Morrison Parrish +1 512 539 2628 +1 512 539 2627 bparrish@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2008 Samuel E. Stubbs +1 713 276 7645 +1 281 582 6473 sam.stubbs@pillsburylaw.com
Dell Marketing, LP Dell Marketing, LP, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erskine & McMahon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blake C Erskine , +1 903 757 8435 +1 903 757 9429 blakee@erskine-mcmahon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt John Niederluecke +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 kniederluecke@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natalie J. Morgan +1 858 350 2303 +1 858 350 2399 nmorgan@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luiz Von Paumgartten +1 512 582 2850 +1 512 582 2851 lluiz@fogartyIP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 542 8440 +1 512 236 3256 ctyler@velaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Robert Reed +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mreed@wsgr.com
Space Jeffrey Michael Whiting +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 jwhiting@wsgr.com
No Logo Doublesight Displays LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2008 Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2008 Andrea Maria Augustine +1 312 499 6771 +1 312 499 6701 AMAugustine@duanemorris.com
No Logo Global Marketing Partners, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Christensen & McLaughlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Becky Vanderhoof Christensen +1 818 488 8158 +1 818 332 4205 bchristensen@eclipsegrp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward F. O'Connor +1 949 851 5000 +1 949 851 5021 eoconnor@eclipsegrp.com
No Logo Peerless Industries, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Maria Augustine +1 312 499 6771 +1 312 499 6701 AMAugustine@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Maria Augustine +1 312 499 6771 +1 312 499 6701 AMAugustine@duanemorris.com
No Logo Sea Land, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008 Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coghlan Crowson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 758 5543 +1 903 753 6989 rfaulkner@ccfww.com
No Logo Gaynell C Methvin, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gaynell C Methvin +1 214 978 4999 +1 214 978 4044 gcmethvin@gmail.com
No Logo George Richard Grainger, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Richard Grainger +1 903 595 3514 graingerpc@aol.com
No Logo Richard Grainger, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Richard Grainger +1 903 595 3514 graingerpc@aol.com
No Logo Ingram Micro Inc., Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008 Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane Russell Coleman & Logan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008 Kenneth W Biermacher , +1 214 777 4250 +1 214 777 4299 kbiermacher@krcl.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (754) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 757 Motion to Withdraw 753 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt of Defendants Dell, Inc. and Dell Marketing LP. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/15/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION to Withdraw 753 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt of Defendants Dell, Inc. and Dell Marketing LP by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shea Neal Palavan on behalf of Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch (Palavan, Shea) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
            ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 758*** MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt of Defendants Dell, Inc. and Dell Marketing LP by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of J.E. Akin, # 2 Appendix to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - CV of J.E. Akin, # 4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 - '978 Claim Chart, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Steve F. Schlather, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Ergotron Permanent Injunction Order, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Ergotron Markman Orders, # 8 Exhibit 5 - Ergotron Trial Transcript Excerpt, # 9 Exhibit 6 - Ergotron Verdict Form, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Ergotron Royalty Order)(Schlather, Stephen) Modified on 5/15/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER that the royalty rate for pltfs' US Patent RE 36,978 to be set at 5.9% of deft's net sales. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 751 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 750 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Exhibit Order Exhibit A)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 750 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 749 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Sealed Document- CSAV's letter to Judge Davis. (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 748 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Against Dell Inc., In favor of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Against CDW Corporation, In favor of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Against Dell Marketing, L.P., In favor of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Against Tech Data Corporation, In favor of Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Against Ergotron, Inc. by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                        LREF
                        Blank 747 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 746 Motion to Vacate Final Judgment # 745 . The portion of the Courts May 7, 2009 Final Judgment [Dckt. No. 745] stating: Mass and Mr. Moscovitch are not liable for infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5.673,170 (the 170 Patent) on the bases that (i) Mass and Mr. Moscovitch are found to Case 2:06-cv-00272-LED Document 746-2 Filed 06/08/2009 have an implied license on the 170 Patent, and (ii) Dell and Dell Marketing are equitably estopped from asserting the 170 Patent against Mass and Mr. Moscovitch is hereby vacated. 2. The portion of the Courts April 17, 2009 Memorandum Opinion and Order [Dckt. No. 741] regarding equitable estoppel and implied license defenses to the 170 patent, appearing on pages 30-37, is hereby vacated. 3. All claims on the 170 patent, including cross-claims, counterclaims and defenses, between Dell Inc., Dell Marketing L.P., Mass Engineered Design, Inc., and Jerry Moscovitch, are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and expenses. 4. All other aspects of the Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order and Final judgment, including its rulings related to the 978 patent, remain binding and in force. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/10/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION to Vacate 741 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, 745 Judgment, a Portion of the Court's Order and Judgment and Dismiss Claims Regarding the '170 Patent by Dell Marketing, L.P., Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch, Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ***PORTION OF ORDER VACATED PER ORDER #747***FINAL JUDGMENT - Except for the Courts more detailed injunction terms as contained in a separate Order, all relief not specifically granted herein is DENIED. All pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/7/09. (ehs, ) Modified on 6/10/2009 (ehs, ). (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 744 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              PERMANENT INJUNCTION - On the basis of the full record at trial, and for the reasons and based on the evidence outlined in the Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order of April 17, 2009, the Court has determined that a permanent injunction is necessary and appropriate in this case. Dell, Inc., Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, and Tech Data Corporation are each hereby permanently enjoined, during the enforceable term of the 978Patent, from making, using, selling, or offering to sell in the United States, and also from importing into the United States, the products that were adjudicated and are listed below, and any variant of those products that are not more than colorably different. Product Name and Model referenced in said order. Each Defendant shall take immediate steps to comply with this Order and shall comply within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/7/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Permanent Injunction Order)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Submission of Defendants' Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction and Proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendants Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Final Judgment)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 741 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - denying motion for permanent injunction or reasonable royalty # 670 . Denying motion for judgment as a matter of law or new trial # 666 . Grants in part motion for post-trial relief # 682 and Denying motion for enhanced damages and attorneys' fees # 671 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/17/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 740 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                      FINAL EXHIBIT LIST (Mass, Moscovitch)of Plaintiff Mass and Jerry Moscovitch's Exhibits Admitted During Trial (11.10.08 -- 11.19.08).(rlf, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                        FINAL EXHIBIT LIST (Ergotron, CDW & Tech Data) of Defendant Ergotron, CDW & Tech Data's Exhibits Admitted During Trial (11.10.08 -- 11.19.08).(rlf, ) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                          FINAL EXHIBIT LIST (DELL) of Defendant Dell's Exhibits Admitted During Trial (11.10.08 -- 11.19.08)(rlf, ) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Stefan V Stein (Stein, Stefan) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 734 Motion to Dismiss all claims against Third Party Deft/Cross Deft Sealand Inc without prejudice, without attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/18/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Cancelling Deadline - hearing set for 2/26/09 has been cancelled. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/18/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE ITS THIRD-PARTY CLAIMS AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT SEALAND, INC. by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Christensen, Becky) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 732 Order,,, Set Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, NOTICE OF PARTIES MEET/CONFER AND STATEMENTS IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER (Neukom, John) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying # 670 request for a Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalties. parties to meet and confer regarding an appropriate per-unit royalty rate. If the parties are unable to agree on an appropriate rate, and a party opposes the $4 per-unit rate the Court ORDERS the objecting party to file its objections no later than February 13, 2009 or waive all objections to the $4 per-unit rate. Should the parties file objections, the Court ORDERS that the parties appear for a hearing concerning the appropriate rate on Thursday, February 26, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/4/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 728 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Replies to Post-Trial Briefs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/13/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER withdrawing 723 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 727 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/13/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 723 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 682 Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF -Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Neukom, John) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 725 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 722 Reply to Response to Motion, 721 Trial Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J Part 1, # 2 Exhibit J Part 2, # 3 Exhibit J Part 3, # 4 Exhibit K Part 1, # 5 Exhibit K Part 2, # 6 Exhibit K Part 3, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 724 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 722 Reply to Response to Motion, 721 Trial Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lora Friedemann, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 729 ***Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 1/13/2009 (ehs, ). (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 666 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Post-Bench Trial Reply Brief by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 720 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 671 SEALED MOTION and Brief in Support of an Order Finding Litigation Misconduct, Enhancing Damages, and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 719 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 670 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for a Permanent Injunction or, Alternatively, for Ongoing Royalties filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 717 Motion to Amend briefing scheduled for post trial reply Briefs. Reply briefs for all parties to be filed by 1/9/09, and that there is a 20 page per side page limit, the pages allocated among the issues as each side sees fit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/6/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule for Post-Trial Reply Briefs by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maag, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2009: # 2 REVISED proposed order) (sm, ). (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 716 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/08 Inequitable Conduct Hearing before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/08 Inequitable Conduct Hearing before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/08 Jury Notes and Verdict before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/08 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/08 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/14/08 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/14/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 707 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/08 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/12/08 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/12/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/10/08 afternoon session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/10/08 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2009. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 683 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch is allowed to file up to 45 pages combined in Opposition Briefs to Post Trial Motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/23/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 690 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Dfts are granted leave to file Oppositions to Post Trial Briefing up to 43 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/23/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 699 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 692 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ***REPLACES #691***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 670 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for a Permanent Injunction or, Alternatively, for Ongoing Royalties filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) Modified on 12/23/2008 (mpv, ). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 697 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 693 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 696 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 684 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 695 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 693 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 694 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 693 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 693 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 667 Post-Bench Trial Motion for Relief (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 692 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 671 SEALED MOTION and Brief in Support of an Order Finding Litigation Misconduct, Enhancing Damages, and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 670 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for a Permanent Injunction or, Alternatively, for Ongoing Royalties filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Maag, Gregory) Modified on 12/23/2008 (mpv, ). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Briefing by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 689 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 687 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T, # 4 Exhibit U, # 5 Exhibit V, # 6 Exhibit W, # 7 Exhibit X, # 8 Exhibit Y Part 1, # 9 Exhibit Y Part 2, # 10 Exhibit Y Part 3, # 11 Exhibit Z Part 1, # 12 Exhibit Z Part 2)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 688 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 687 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 687 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 682 Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF -Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF -, 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Fuchsberger, # 2 Affidavit of Myers, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D Part 1, # 7 Exhibit D Part 2, # 8 Exhibit D Part 3, # 9 Exhibit D Part 4, # 10 Exhibit D Part 5, # 11 Exhibit D Part 6)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 686 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 684 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 685 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 682 Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF -Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 pt 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 pt 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 pt 3, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4 pt 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5 pt 1, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 pt 2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 23 pt 1, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 23 pt 2, # 30 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 684 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 666 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Opposition Briefs to Post-Trial Motions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION POST-TRIAL RELIEF re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation re 668 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,, Certificate of Service (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 669 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Dft's are granted leave to file Opening Post-Trial Briefs up to 45 pages in lenght total. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 12/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 41-50 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 41, # 2 Exhibit EXH 42, # 3 Exhibit EXH 43, # 4 Exhibit EXH 44.1, # 5 Exhibit EXH 44.2, # 6 Exhibit EXH 45, # 7 Exhibit EXH 46, # 8 Exhibit EXH 47, # 9 Exhibit EXH 48, # 10 Exhibit EXH 49, # 11 Exhibit EXH 50)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 12/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 31-40 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 31, # 2 Exhibit EXH 32, # 3 Exhibit EXH 33, # 4 Exhibit EXH 34, # 5 Exhibit EXH 35, # 6 Exhibit EXH 36, # 7 Exhibit EXH 37, # 8 Exhibit EXH 38, # 9 Exhibit EXH 39, # 10 Exhibit EXH 40)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 12/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 21-30 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 21, # 2 Exhibit EXH 22, # 3 Exhibit EXH 23, # 4 Exhibit EXH 24, # 5 Exhibit EXH 25, # 6 Exhibit EXH 26, # 7 Exhibit EXH 27, # 8 Exhibit EXH 28, # 9 Exhibit EXH 29, # 10 Exhibit EXH 30)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 12/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 11-20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 11, # 2 Exhibit EXH 12, # 3 Exhibit EXH 13, # 4 Exhibit EXH 14, # 5 Exhibit EXH 15, # 6 Exhibit EXH 16, # 7 Exhibit EXH 17, # 8 Exhibit EXH 18, # 9 Exhibit EXH 19, # 10 Exhibit EXH 20)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 6-10 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 6, # 2 Exhibit EXH 7, # 3 Exhibit EXH 8, # 4 Exhibit EXH 9, # 5 Exhibit EXH 10)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 672 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment NOV MOTION MISC. MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - EXHIBITS 1-5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXH 1, # 2 Exhibit EXH 2, # 3 Exhibit EXH 3, # 4 Exhibit EXH 4, # 5 Exhibit EXH 5)(Neukom, John) Modified on 12/15/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Judgment NOV, MOTION MISC., MOTION for New Trial - MOTION FOR POST-TRIAL RELIEF - by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 671 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION and Brief in Support of an Order Finding Litigation Misconduct, Enhancing Damages, and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler ISO Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Continued, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 18 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 670 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for a Permanent Injunction or, Alternatively, for Ongoing Royalties by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgain In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Opening Post-Trial Briefs by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 666 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial and Docket No. 667 Post-Bench Trial Memorandum filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: 11-20-08 e-mail, # 2 Exhibit B: 11-12-08 trial transcript, # 3 Exhibit C: 11-12-08 trial transcript, # 4 Exhibit D: 11-13-08 trial transcript, # 5 Exhibit E: 11-13-08 trial transcript, # 6 Exhibit F: 11-14-08 trial transcript, # 7 Exhibit G: 11-14-08 trial transcript, # 8 Exhibit H: 11-17-08 trial transcript, # 9 Exhibit I: 11-17-08 trial transcript, # 10 Exhibit J: 11-18-08 trial transcript, # 11 Exhibit K: 11-18-08 trial transcript, # 12 Exhibit L: 11-19-08 trial transcript, # 13 Exhibit M: exhibits from Defendants Brief and Motion, # 14 Exhibit N, Part 1: exhibits from Defendants' Trial Brief and Motion, # 15 Exhibit N, Part 2: exhibits from Defendants' Trial Brief and Motion, # 16 Exhibit N, Part 3: exhibits from Defendants' Trial Brief and Motion, # 17 Exhibit N, Part 4: exhibits from Defendants' Trial Brief and Motion)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Post-Bench Trial Memorandum by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively for a New Trial by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) Modified on 12/16/2008 (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Third Party Ingram Mictro Inc's 640 Motion to Dismiss all claims against Global Marketing Partners Inc without prejudice, with attorneys' fees and costs being paid by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 663 Motion modify briefing schedule. Opening briefs on all post-trial issues due 12/12/08; Responsive briefs due 12/22/08; Reply briefs due 1/5/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/5/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Richard Grainger. Mediation result: impasse(Grainger, George) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 661 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY. (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 660 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      JURY VERDICT. (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 659 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Jury Notes. Jury Note #1 (Attachments: # 1 -- Response to Jury Note #1; # 2 -- Jury Note #2; # 3 -- Jury Note #3; # 4 -- Jury Note #4; # 5 -- Response to Jury Note #4; # 6 -- Jury Note #5; # 7 -- Response to Jury Note #5; # 8 -- Jury Note #6)(rlf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Instructions. (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 7 held and trial completed on 11/19/2008. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Directed Verdict Presented orally and provided copy to Court on Friday, Nov. 14, 2008 by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. Responses due by 11/14/2008 (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 6 held on 11/18/2008. Trial to resume at 8:30 am on 11/19/2008. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 5 held on 11/17/2008. Trial to resume on 11/18/2008 @ 8:30 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 4 held on 11/14/2008. Trial to resume at 8:30 a.m. on 11/17/2008) (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 648 Motion to Dismiss deft Cross-Claimant Global Marketing Partners Inc against Cross Deft DoubleSight Displays LLC without prejudice, with attorneys fees and costs being paid by the party incurring same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received disk containing defts final Trial Exhibit List of exhibits presented at trial on by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received disk containing deft's final exhibit list of exhibits admitted during trial by Dell Inc. Disk kept in Clerk's Office (ehs, ) (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - the Court ORDERS the parties to participate in a post-verdict mediation session with previously appointed mediator Richard Grainger no later than December 5, 2008.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Global Marketing Inc.'s Cross Claims of Indemnity against DoubleSight Displays LLC without Prejudice by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal of Global Marketing Inc.'s Cross Claims of Indemnity against DoubleSight Displays LLC without Prejudice)(Christensen, Becky) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2008: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Proceedings held on 11/4/08 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2009. 74 pages. See 623 (sms, ) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 646 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Transcript. In-chambers Conference before the Honorable Leonard Davis held on November 4, 2008. 6 pages. See 622 (sms, ) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 645 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 642 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Directed Verdict that They Have An Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5, 673,170 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Directed Verdict That Claims 16 and 17 of U.S. Patent No. RE 36,978 Are Not Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Sections 102, 103, and/or 112 by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. Responses due by 11/18/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 643 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION for Directed Verdict that No Bloomberg, L.P. Employee Was A Co-Inventor of United States Patent No. RE 36,978 by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 642 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION for Directed Verdict that They Have An Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5, 673,170 by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Third-Party Cross-Claim Against Third-Party Defendant Global Marketing Partners, Inc. by INGRAM MICRO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. JOINT PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Neukom, John) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that all parties in the above numbered cause meet and confer and file Joint Proposed Verdict Form containing all foreseeable requests and objections by 8:00 am Monday, November 17,2008. The Joint Proposed Verdict Form should include both sides' submissions in one document with the parties' disagreements indicated by italics and brackets or other means. Objections and their basis should be indicated by footnote. The Court strongly encourages the parties to agree on as many questions as they can. The Court further ORDERS the parties to file and submit an electronic copy of the Joint Proposed Verdict Form by e-mail to Andrea_Houston@txed.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect format before the start of trial on Monday November 17, 2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/08. (poa, ) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 3 held on 11/13/2008. Trial to resume on 11.14.08 at 8:30 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 11/12/2008. Trial to resume on 11.13.08 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (rlf, ). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 11/10/2008. Trial to resume on 11.12.2008 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) Modified on 11/14/2008 to correct minutes (rlf, ). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 632 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Supplementation filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Supplementation by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 9, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit A pt 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 626 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Third-Party Cross-Claim by Ingram Micro Inc against Third-Party deft Sea Land Inc. Attorneys' fees and costs being paid by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/10/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 624 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Third-Party Cross-Claim by Ingram Micro Inc against Third-Party Deft Peerless Industries Inc. Attorneys' fees and costs being paid by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/10/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura L Myers for Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation and Tech Data Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4223) (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Grant Fairbairn for Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation and Tech Data Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4223) (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Its Third-Party Cross-Claim Against Sea Land, Inc. by INGRAM MICRO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biermacher, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2008: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 625 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Supplemental Juror Questionnaires (30). (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice its Third-Party Cross-Claim Against Peerless Industries, Inc. by INGRAM MICRO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Against Third-Party Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc.)(Biermacher, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2008: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 11/4/2008. Trial to commence 11.10.2008 @ 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 622 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: SEALED In Camera Hearing held on 11/4/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - the court orders all parties to meet and confer and file Joint Proposed Jury Instructions containing all foreseeable requests and objections by 11/10/08. The court further orders the parties to file and submit an electronic copy of the Joint Proposed Jury Instructions to chambers in WordPerfect format before the start of Trial on Monday 11/10/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 618 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of CSAV, INC. (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 11/3/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of CSAV, INC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 620 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of CSAV, INC. (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 11/3/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER - for the aformentioned reasons the court GRANTS Mass's Motion to Compel and Ergotron is ordered to immediately product the attorney interview notes taken during the 4/15/08 meeting with Mirek Waraksa. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE from USCA Federal Circuit re 392 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE. Received ORDER granting appellant's unopposed motion to dismiss appeal - motion granted 10/27/08 (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - the court enters this order sua sponte. Due to the voluminous exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial of this case, the court ORDERS the following herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 614 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 613 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Having reviewed the parties time estimates, the Court ORDERS that each side shall have 45 minutes for voir dire, 60 minutes for opening statements, 15 hours for direct and cross examinations, and 60 minutes for closing arguments. This case will proceed to jury selection on November 4, 2008 and trial on November 10, 2008. As stated at the pretrial hearing, the Court ORDERS that the parties file their agreed jury questionnaire by October 30, 2008 and submit a version to the Court in WordPerfect format; The court is denying 389 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 400 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 402 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 403 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 404 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 405 Motion to Strike ; denying 406 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 408 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 410 Motion ; denying 411 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 413 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 415 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 416 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 418 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 422 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 423 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 425 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 445 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 447 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 521 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 572 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part 573 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 580 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 582 Motion in Limine, denies 484 and 575 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 605 Motion to Dismiss all Claims by Third-Party pltf CDW Corporation against Third-Party Deft Ingram Micro Inc, Global Marketing Partners Inc and Sealand Inc. Parties are dismissed without prejudice without attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/23/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Court's Order, Docket No. 585 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 610 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 582 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine REVISED PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TO REFLECT MEET/CONFER RESULTS) (Neukom, John) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Of Compliance with Court's Order Docket Number 585 (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 608 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 521 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Dartt In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Pltf's 584 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in sur-reply briefing to summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Status of the Parties' Motions in Limine (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice its Third-Party Claims Against Third-Party Defendants Ingram Micro, Inc., Global Marketing Partners, Inc., and Sealand, Inc. by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) OPPOSITION TO DELL'S MOTION TO STRIKE (DOCKET NO. 484) filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 603 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 402 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement filed by Dell Marketing, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luiz von Paumgartten In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 410 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. J. Edward Akin filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 601 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 422 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Plaintiffs' Notice of Jury Selection and Trial Time Requested (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., CSAV, INC., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Defendants' Notice of Jury Selection and Trial Time Requested (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 415 MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 597 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 596 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Edgar G. Sargent, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation filed by Ergotron, Inc.. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stoll filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 404 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 16 and 17 of U.S. Patent No. Re 36,978 Are Not Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 103 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 592 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 400 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That No Bloomberg, L.P. Employee Was a Co-Inventor of the United States Patent No. RE 36,978 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 591 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 411 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 590 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 423 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of J.E. Akin filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 406 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 588 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 416 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 587 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF BRETT L. REED filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 586 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that defts produce, for in camera inspection, all interview notes taken during conversation with Mirek Waraksa prior to his deposition by Wednesday, 10/22/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/21/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Sur-Reply Briefing to Summary Judgment Motions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extend Page Limits)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 425 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. for Lack of Standing filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 582 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Nelson, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 580 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 579 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Objections to Dell's Exhibit List (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Objections to Defendants Ergotron, Tech Data and CDW Exhibit List (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Objections to Third-Party Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Trial Exhibit List (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 576 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List (Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Motions in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Reference to its Expert Stephen Bristow's July 16, 2008 Expert Report by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 572 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Motion in Limine to Preclude any Arguments or Testimony that CSAV Copied Ergotron's Design by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 571 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 521 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 466 MOTION to Compel Interview Notes of Mirek Waraska filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Settlement of Global Marketing Partners Inc.'s Cross-Claims for Indemnity Against Cross Defendants Sea Land Inc. and DoubleSight Displays LLC by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER withdrawing 514 Motion to Strike ; granting 566 Motion to Withdraw 514 motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 559 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw 514 MOTION to Strike Defendants' New Bases for Inequitable Conduct Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) Joint Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Michael Pierce on behalf of all plaintiffs (Pierce, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint 397 , COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. by Tech Data Corporation.(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 10/17/2008 (rml, ). (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. by CDW Corporation.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. by Ergotron, Inc..(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Neukom on behalf of Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch (Neukom, John) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 560 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF BRETT L. REED filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants' Reply in Support of its Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 558 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic filed by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Dell Inc and Dell Marketing (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Morgan, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 10/17/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Mediation by George Richard Grainger. Mediation result: impasse(Grainger, George) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 545 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on reply in support of motion for summary judgment of invalidity and inequitable conduct. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 539 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in reply briefing to summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 532 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice of all claims by third-party pltf CDW Corp against third-party deft Doublesight Displays LLC without attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 549 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants are granted leave to file Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Datas Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement up to 10 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 423 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of J.E. Akin filed by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Niederluecke, # 2 Exhibit E)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 411 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978 filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 550 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 425 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. for Lack of Standing filed by CDW Corporation. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Objections to Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 547 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 406 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 415 MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 544 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct filed by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Myers, # 2 Exhibit JJ, # 3 Exhibit KK, # 4 Exhibit LL, # 5 Exhibit MM, # 6 Exhibit NN)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Plaintiffs' Objections to Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 410 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. J. Edward Akin re: the Dell '170 Patent filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 541 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 422 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 539 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Briefing to Summary Judgment Motions.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Briefing to Summary Judgment Motions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 404 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 16 and 17 of U.S. Patent No. Re 36,978 Are Not Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 103 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 400 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That No Bloomberg, L.P. Employee Was a Co-Inventor of the United States Patent No. RE 36,978 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 513 MOTION to Withdraw 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stoll Agreed Motion to Withdraw the Portion of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Docket No. 405) Discussing the Exclusion of D MOTION to Withdraw 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stoll Agreed Motion to Withdraw the Portion of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Docket No. 405) Discussing the Exclusion of D filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 535 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 416 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 402 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT Prejudice Third-Party Defendant DoubleSight Displays LLC by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Notice of Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Intent Not to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to CSAV's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '978 Patent and to Maintain CSAV's Motion for Summary Judgment as Set Forth in CSAV's Moving Brief (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Counter-Designations (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 366 Ergotron's motion to compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to respond to Dells Motion to Strike (Docket No 521) by Monday, October 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Pltf's 522 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page limitations on its response to deft's Daubert Motion to exclude opinions of damages expert Walter Bratic. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 513 Motion to Withdraw the portion of Pltf's 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stolls opinion in regard to the validity of the '978 patent is dismissed in accordance with the stipulation agreed by the parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 524 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Walter Bratic, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 523 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF BRETT L. REED filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Damages Expert Walter Bratic by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 521 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Dartt in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - the court orders dft to respond to Plaintiffs motion to strike 514 by Friday 10/17/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation of Compliance with 35 U.S.C. Sec. 282 (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 452 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 454 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 450 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 453 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Dell Marketing, L.P. by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 568 *** MOTION to Strike Defendants' New Bases for Inequitable Conduct Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stoll Agreed Motion to Withdraw the Portion of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Docket No. 405) Discussing the Exclusion of Defendant's Expert Stephen Bristow by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts of Trial Proceedings (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Defendant Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L..P.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations and Rebuttal Designations (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 510 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Plaintiffs' Objections to Designation of Deposition Testimony and Counter-Designations (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Objections to Designated Deposition Testimony (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 460 Notice (Other) Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 460 Notice (Other) Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Proceedings held on 9/23/08 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan,shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. 56 pages. See 456 (sms, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 470 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch be allowed to file more than 60 pages combined in response to DefendantsSummary Judgment and to file a brief of more than 30 pages in response to Ergotrons Invalidity/Inequitable Conduct motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 478 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Ergotrons Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on its Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation. Defendants are granted leave to file its Opposition to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation up to 19 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 468 Motion to Dismiss third party pltf CDW Corp against D&H Distributing Co with prejudice, without attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 482 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Their Responses to Plaintiffs Dispositive Motions. Defendants are granted leave to file responses to Plaintiffs dispositive motions up to 85 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 486 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Dell and Dell Marketings Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on its Opposition to Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Henry W. Stoll. Defendants are granted leave to file its Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Henry W. Stoll up to 20 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 476 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Pretrial Disclosures. Deadline is 10/13/08 to serve their respective pretrial disclosures. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 474 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 389 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 10/7/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 497 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) by Defendants. (Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 10/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order [Proposed] Joint Final Pretrial Order by Ergotron, Inc., Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch, CDW Corporation, CSAV, INC., Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc., Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, part 1, # 6 Exhibit E, part 2, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 495 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 425 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. for Lack of Standing filed by Mass Engineered Design and Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 494 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21 - part 1, # 23 Exhibit 21 - part 2, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 492 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) by Mass Engineered Design. (Maag, Gregory) Modified on 10/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 415 MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DELL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S NOVEMBER 30, 2007 ORDER DENYING DELL INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 35 USC SEC.112 (INDEFINITENESS) filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) Modified on 10/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 410 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. J. Edward Akin filed by Jerry Moscovitch and Mass Engineered Design Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 10/7/2008 (sm, ). Modified on 10/8/2008 (mpv, ). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 489 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 400 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That No Bloomberg, L.P. Employee Was a Co-Inventor of the United States Patent No. RE 36,978 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian A. Dietzel in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit II)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 423 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of J.E. Akin filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A - part 1, # 3 Exhibit A - part 2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 487 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 411 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 - part 1, # 9 Exhibit 7 - part 2, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16 - part 1, # 19 Exhibit 16 - part 2, # 20 Exhibit 16 - part 3, # 21 Exhibit 16 - part 4, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18 - part 1, # 24 Exhibit 18 part 2, # 25 Exhibit 19, # 26 Exhibit 20, # 27 Exhibit 21 - part 1, # 28 Exhibit 21 - part 2, # 29 Exhibit 22, # 30 Exhibit 23, # 31 Exhibit 24, # 32 Exhibit 25, # 33 Exhibit 26, # 34 Exhibit 27, # 35 Exhibit 28, # 36 Exhibit 29, # 37 Exhibit 30, # 38 Exhibit 31, # 39 Exhibit 32, # 40 Exhibit 33, # 41 Exhibit 34, # 42 Exhibit 35, # 43 Exhibit 36, # 44 Exhibit 37, # 45 Exhibit 38, # 46 Exhibit 39, # 47 Exhibit 40, # 48 Exhibit 41, # 49 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages of Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Henry Stoll by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 405 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Henry W. Stoll filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Fairbairn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Strike and Objections to Mass Engineered Design Inc.'s and Jerry Moscovitch's So-Called Facts and Evidence in Support of their Motions for Summary Judgment re 416 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170), 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Masocovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Dell Marketing L.P. Can Recover No Damages for Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 Occuring Prior to September 5, 2006) SEALED PATENT MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 483 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 422 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Responses to Plaintiffs' Dispositive Motions by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 481 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 404 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 16 and 17 of U.S. Patent No. Re 36,978 Are Not Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 103 filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Grant Fairbairn, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2008: # 10 Cert of authority) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 480 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Masocovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Dell Marketing L.P. Can Recover No Damages for Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 Occuring Prior to September 5, 2006) SEALED PATENT MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on its Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation filed by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Fuchsberger, # 2 Affidavit of Fischer, # 3 Affidavit of Mohwinkel, # 4 Affidavit of Niederluecke, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Pretrial Disclosures by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 406 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 498 ***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 389 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 10/7/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 473 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 416 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Errata Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 39 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 472 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 471 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 408 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '978 Patent filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Oppositions to Summary Judgment (UNOPPOSED) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 469 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to MOTION re 402 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement filed by Dell Marketing, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luiz von Paumgartten In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant D&H Distributing Company by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Interview Notes of Mirek Waraska by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9 Sealed, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2008: # 11 Certificate of Authorization to Seal) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Plaintiffs' Answer to CSAV, Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims) ANSWER to 437 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Defendants Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Designations of Deposition Testimony (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 389 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 461 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Designation of Deposition Testimony (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 398 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim by Dell Marketing, L.P..(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Defendant CSAV's Designations of Deposition Testimony (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2008 re 366 SEALED PATENT MOTION Ergotron's Second Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Ergotron, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 448 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Dfts Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs Damages Expert, Walter Bratic up to 20 pages in length. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/23/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by Dell Inc..(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by Dell Marketing, L.P..(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint (Third), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by CDW Corporation.(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint (Third) by Tech Data Corporation.(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ergotron, Inc.'s ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint (Third), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Ergotron, Inc..(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA for the Federal Circuit - appeal number 2008-1582 Mass Engineered Vergotron (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Their Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 447 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF BRETT L. REED by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 446 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11, # 4 Exhibit 12, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 445 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Walter Bratic by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Natalie J. Morgan, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 435 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Third-Party CDW Corporation against Eizo Nano Technologies, Inc., Synnex Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Peerless Industries, and Bretford Manufacturing, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, without attorneys fees and costs to any party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/19/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion on Adverse Instruction for Failure to Produce/Spoliation by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Justin A. Nelson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Justin A. Nelson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 9/19/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 441 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 389 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Walter Bratic, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24)(Nelson, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2008: # 26 Cert of Authority) (sm, ). (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 10/20/2008., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2008., Jury Selection set for 11/4/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 09:00 AM in (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/17/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 401 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, Unopposed Motion to Amended Docket Control Order by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rebuttal Trial Witness List Witness List by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s ANSWER to 397 Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Unenforceability against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by CSAV, INC..(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: Pursuant to the Court's Order #433 The Clerks office is in receipt of Exhibits D and E to the Affidavit of Steven Durkee in Support of CSAV Inc's motion for summary judgment # 408 Copy of exhibits sent to Judge Davis per counsel (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendants Eizo Nano Technologies, Inc., Synnex Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., and Bretford Manufacturing, Inc. by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 424 Motion to Enlarge the Page Limits for Motion for Summary Judgment. Ergotron is allowed to file the two Motions, Docket Nos. 406 and 418, totaling no more than 67 pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/12/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 409 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D and E to the Affidavit of Steven Durkee in Support of CSAV Inc's motion for summary judgment non-electronically due to their formatting. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/10/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 411 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978 Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 415 MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 425 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. for Lack of Standing Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 410 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. J. Edward Akin Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by CSAV, INC. re 406 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Notice of Intent to Join (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Notice of Service of Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Amended Identification of Trial Witnesses (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. for Lack of Standing by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Niederluecke, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Enlarge the Page Limits for Motions for Summary Judgment, Docket Nos. 406 and 418 by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 423 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of J.E. Akin by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Kurt J. Niederluecke, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D Part 1, # 7 Exhibit D Part 2, # 8 Exhibit D Part 3)(Findlay, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2008: # 9 Cert of Conference) (sm, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 422 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 by Dell Marketing, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian A. Dietzel In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC, # 4 Exhibit DD, # 5 Exhibit EE, # 6 Exhibit FF, # 7 Exhibit GG, # 8 Exhibit HH, # 9 Exhibit II)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U, # 6 Exhibit V, # 7 Exhibit W, # 8 Exhibit X, # 9 Exhibit Y, # 10 Exhibit Z)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 419 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 418 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M, # 8 Exhibit N, # 9 Exhibit O, # 10 Exhibit P)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Inequitable Conduct by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Myers, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E part 1, # 8 Exhibit E part 2, # 9 Exhibit E part 3, # 10 Exhibit E part 4, # 11 Exhibit F)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 416 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That They Have an Implied License Under U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 156 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey M. Whiting In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2008: # 5 Cert of Conference) (sm, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Summary Judgment that Equitable Estoppel Precludes Dell Marketing L.P.'s Claim of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 411 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Tech Data Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity of US Patent Re. 36,978 by Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Matthew J.S. Graham, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. J. Edward Akin by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael R. Huff In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2008: # 5 Cert of Conference) (sm, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File re Court Document No. 408 by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2008: # 2 Cert of Conference showing no opposition) (sm, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '978 Patent by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 CSAV, Inc.'s Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Motion, # 2 Affidavit Steven Durkee in Support of Summary Judgment Motion, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 406 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Ergotron, CDW, and Tech Data's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Kurt J. Niederluecke, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***PER ORDER # 525 portions of this motion related to Mr. Bristow's opinions in regard to the validity of the '978 patent is dismissed in accordance with the stipulation agreed to by the parties *** MOTION to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Stephen D. Bristow and Dr. Henry W. Stoll by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. Responses due by 10/3/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - PART 1 OF 4, # 4 Exhibit B - PART 2 OF 4, # 5 Exhibit B - PART 3 OF 4, # 6 Exhibit B - PART 4 OF 4, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Maag, Gregory) Modified on 10/14/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 16 and 17 of U.S. Patent No. Re 36,978 Are Not Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 103 by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. Responses due by 10/3/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Affidavit, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Maag, Gregory) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION (Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Masocovitch's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Dell Marketing L.P. Can Recover No Damages for Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,673,170 Occuring Prior to September 5, 2006) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Greg L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A-E, # 3 Exhibit F-G, # 4 Exhibit H-I, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement by Jerry Moscovitch. Responses due by 10/3/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER and REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2008. Exhibit List due by 11/10/2008. Expert Witness List due by 9/5/2008. Motions due by 10/20/2008. Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 11:00 AM in (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/9/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 400 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That No Bloomberg, L.P. Employee Was a Co-Inventor of the United States Patent No. RE 36,978 by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory L. Maag, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit C-3, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F-1, # 10 Exhibit F-2, # 11 Exhibit F-3, # 12 Exhibit G-1, # 13 Exhibit G-2, # 14 Exhibit G-3, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. Notice of Service of Dell Inc. and Dell Marketing L.P.'s Identification of Trial Witnesses (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 327 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Dell Marketing, L.P. by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD against Dell Marketing, L.P., CSAV, INC., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, filed by Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Notice of Service of Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Trial Witness List (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW Corporation, Ergotron, Inc., Tech Data Corporation NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WITNESS LIST (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Trial Witness List by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 373 Memorandum & Opinion by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05400000000001683436. (O'Connor, Edward) Modified on 9/8/2008 to show appeal was an Interlocutory Appeal(ehs, ). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trial Witness List by Tech Data Corporation. (Stein, Stefan) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control and Discovery Order by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Docket Control and Revised Discovery Order)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 389 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie J. Morgan in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 366 SEALED PATENT MOTION Ergotron's Second Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 29)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE in Support re 366 SEALED PATENT MOTION Ergotron's Second Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Ergotron, Inc.. (Niederluecke, Kurt) Modified on 8/25/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew R Reed for Dell Marketing, L.P. and Dell Inc APPROVED and FEE PAID Rec# 2-1-4027 (poa, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 383 Motion to Dismiss all claims by third-party pltf CDW Dorp against third-party deft CSAV Inc, A&B Distributing Inc and International Audio Visual Inc, parties dismissed with prejudice w/o attorney's fees or costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/21/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 382 Motion to Withdraw hearing and motion without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/21/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss CDW Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice its Third-Party Claims Against Defendants CSAV, Inc., International Audio Visual, Inc., and A&B Distributing, Inc. by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Withdraw 376 Order on Motion to Expedite, 374 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel, Or in the Alternative Instruction on Spoliation and Hearing Without Prejudice by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***STIPULATION re 374 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel, Or in the Alternative Instruction on Spoliation Plaintiffs' and Ergotron's Stipulation to Withdraw Motion and Hearing Date Without Prejudice by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch, Ergotron, Inc.. (Niederluecke, Kurt) Modified on 8/18/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch (NOTICE REGARDING IN CAMERA EXHIBITS) (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 379 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW 378 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 366 SEALED PATENT MOTION Ergotron's Second Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit List Description, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CSAV, INC. Notice of Service of Third Party Defendant CSAV, Inc.'s Amended Disclosures (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part 375 Motion to Expedite. Dfts response to the motion to compel 374 is due by noon on 8/18/08, Plaintiffs reply is due by noon on 8/20/08, and the motion to compel 374 is set for hearing on 8/21/08, @ 10:30 am. The court orders, by 8/19/08, each parties lead trial counsel and local counsel shall meet and confer in person or by telephone in effort to resolve the dispute.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/12/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite (Docket No. 374) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 374 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel, Or in the Alternative Instruction on Spoliation by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37)(Schlather, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER - for the aforementioned reasons herein, the court GRANTS CDW's motion 295 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 372 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - This opinion considers Defendant CSAV Inc.s (CSAV) Brief on Claim Construction # 345 . the Court amends the construction of support means and mounting means. Below is an amended version of Appendix B to Docket No. 344 reflecting such changes. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 369 Motion for Extension of Time to File expert designation and report. Deadline extended to 8/8/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/6/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 368 Motion for Leave to File amended infringement contentions against deft CSAV Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend an Expert Deadline by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its Infringement Contentions Against Defendant CSAV, Inc. (UNOPPOSED) by Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Marketing, L.P. of Amended Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 366 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION Ergotron's Second Motion to Compel Discovery by Ergotron, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Affidavit of Lora M. Friedemann, # 14 Exhibit 1, # 15 Exhibit 2, # 16 Exhibit 3, # 17 Exhibit 4, # 18 Exhibit 5, # 19 Exhibit 6, # 20 Exhibit 7, # 21 Exhibit 8, # 22 Exhibit 9, # 23 Exhibit 10, # 24 Exhibit 11, # 25 Exhibit 12, # 26 Exhibit 13, # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 15, # 29 Exhibit 16, # 30 Exhibit 17)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Charles Erskine on behalf of Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. (Erskine, Blake) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that parties pay technical consultant Gaynell Methvin invoices submitted to the court through 7/22/08 as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/23/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luiz Von Paumgartten on behalf of Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. (Von Paumgartten, Luiz) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 361 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Expert Deadlines by one week. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/17/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Certain Expert Deadlines by One Week by Plaintiffs and Defendant CSAV, Inc. by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 359 Motion to Amend/Correct. This motion shall not affect the deadlines set forth in the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/15/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Dell Marketing, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF filed Reply Brief on Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. RE 36,978 by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 356 Motion for Leave to File amended infringement contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/9/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Chad Wickman for CSAV, INC.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3923. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 353 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft Bretford are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms and conditions containe in the Term Sheet Agreement between these two parties. All costs incurred herein are ordered to be paid by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/26/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice All Claims Against Defendant Bretford Manufacturing, Inc. (UNOPPOSED) by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 345 Claim Construction Brief of CSAV by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 329 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim to Ergotron, Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 327 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Dell Marketing, L.P.'s Second Amended Counterclaims by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 328 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Dell Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 331 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CDW Corporation's Second Amended Counterclaims by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Answer to Bretford Manufacturing, Inc's Counterclaims ANSWER to 325 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Answer to CSAV, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to 326 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by CSAV, INC.. (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 344 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Pltf's motion for clarification. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/30/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Pltf's motion # 279 and # 281 as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/30/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - the court previously appointed Gaynell Methvin technical consultant. The court has received Mr. Methvin's invoice for services through 5/21/08 in the amount shown herein. The court orders payment to be promptly made as follows herein.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/28/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by CSAV, INC. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC. of Initial Disclosures (Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation of Service of Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6 (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ergotron, Inc. of Service of Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6 (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CDW Corporation of Service of Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6 (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard W Young for BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3801. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry W Sufrin for BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3800. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Moorhead for BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3799. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicole M Murray for BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3796. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc. of Service of Amended Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6 (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CDW Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) for Patent Infringement and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by CDW Corporation.(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tech Data Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) for Patent Infringement by Tech Data Corporation.(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ergotron, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) for Patent Infringement and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Ergotron, Inc..(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Dell Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by Dell Inc..(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Dell Marketing L.P.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by Dell Marketing, L.P..(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CSAV, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch by CSAV, INC..(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mass Engineered Design, Inc. by BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A1 of 5 to Bretford answer# 2 Exhibit Ex A2 of 5 to Bretfords answer# 3 Exhibit Ex A3 of 5 to Bretfords answer# 4 Exhibit Ex A4 of 5 to Bretfords answer# 5 Exhibit Ex A5 of 5 to Bretfords answer)(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET CONTROL AND REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER - Motions due by 10/20/2008., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2008.,Jury Selection set for 11/4/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 11:00 AM in (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/14/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Tech Data Corporation.(Stein, Stefan) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Becky V Christensen for GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3771 (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 40 Order, 298 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control and Discovery Order by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exh. A - Docket Control and Revised Discovery Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Plaintiff's Notice of PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Dell Marketing, L.P., BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC., Ergotron, Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation, filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 295 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Liability of Third-Party Defendant Global Marketing Partners, Inc. to Indemnify and Defend CDW Corporation filed by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 295 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Liability of Third-Party Defendant Global Marketing Partners, Inc. to Indemnify and Defend CDW Corporation filed by CDW Corporation. (Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - granting # 265 motion for leave to file and # 269 Mass's motion for leave to amend. Denies in part and Grants in part Tech Data's motion to dismiss # 200 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/30/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 282 MOTION to Amend/Correct : Motion to Clarify Claim Construction Opinion filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 281 MOTION for Leave to File Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Mosovitch's Motion for Leave to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 279 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Dell Marketing, L.P.'s Counterclaim filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 310 Unopposed Motion to be made a party to the Protective Order. Third-party Bretford Manufacturing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/23/08. (ch, ) Modified on 4/23/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Inclusion by BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document (APPENDIX): 308 Response in Opposition to Motion,,.. (O'Connor, Edward) Modified on 4/22/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 295 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Liability of Third-Party Defendant Global Marketing Partners, Inc. to Indemnify and Defend CDW Corporation filed by GLOBAL MARKETING PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Becky V. Christensen in Opposition to CDW's Motion for Summary Adjudication Re: Indemnity# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Paige LaBelle in Opposition to CDW's Motion for Summary Adjudication Re: Indemnity)(O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 MOTION to Amend/Correct : Motion to Clarify Claim Construction Opinion filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Ergotron, Inc., Dell Inc., CDW Corporation, Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 279 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Dell Marketing, L.P.'s Counterclaim filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott T. Morris# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 281 MOTION for Leave to File Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Mosovitch's Motion for Leave to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott T. Morris# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 269 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by CDW Corporation. (Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE ENTRY ***APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Natalie J Morgan for Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3688 (ehs, ) Modified on 4/11/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Natalie J Morgan for Dell Marketing, L.P. and Dell Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3688. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 291 Reply to Response to Motion Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction on Reply to Cross-Claim (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET CONTROL ORDER -Discovery due by 8/15/2008. Exhibit List due by 11/10/2008. Motions due by 10/20/2008. Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2008. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 11:00 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for Status Conference by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Liability of Third-Party Defendant Global Marketing Partners, Inc. to Indemnify and Defend CDW Corporation by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K)(Izraelewicz, Mark) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 293 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E# 2 Exhibit F-1# 3 Exhibit F-2# 4 Exhibit F-3# 5 Exhibit F-4# 6 Exhibit G-1# 7 Exhibit G-2# 8 Exhibit G-3# 9 Exhibit G-4# 10 Exhibit G-5# 11 Exhibit G-6)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 269 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1# 2 Exhibit A-2# 3 Exhibit A-3# 4 Exhibit A-4# 5 Exhibit B-1# 6 Exhibit B-2# 7 Exhibit B-3# 8 Exhibit C# 9 Exhibit D-1# 10 Exhibit D-2# 11 Exhibit D-3# 12 Exhibit D-4# 13 Exhibit D-5# 14 Exhibit D-6# 15 Exhibit D-7# 16 Exhibit D-8# 17 Exhibit D-9)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 289 Unopposed Motion to be made a party to the Protective Order. Third-party Dft CSAV.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 265 MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim for Patent Infringement filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 269 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Unopposed Motion by CSAV, Inc. to Join Protective Order by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - the following schedule of deadlines is in effect until further order of court.Motions due by 10/20/2008.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2008.,Jury Selection set for 11/4/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis.,Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis.,Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2008 11:00 AM in (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mass Engineered Design, Inc. re 284 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order : Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order : Revised Proposed Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 284 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order.. (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 4/1/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 283 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Mass Engineered Design and Jerry Moscovitch's motion for leave to amend Infringement Contentions Responses due by 4/2/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/1/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 269 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions CDW's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Moscovitch's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions [Dkt. No. 269] by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct : Motion to Clarify Claim Construction Opinion by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Clarify Claim Construction Opinion)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Jerry Mosovitch's Motion for Leave to Serve Invalidity Contentions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DENIED PER ORDER 343 *** First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Dell Marketing, L.P. by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch.(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 6/3/2008 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Dell Marketing, L.P.'s Counterclaim by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 269 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Pltfs' Preliminary Infringement Contentions for Def Tech Data# 2 Exhibit B: E-mail string between K. Niederluecke and J. Nelson)(Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 265 MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim for Patent Infringement filed by BRETFORD MANUFACTURING, INC.. (Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 265 MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim for Patent Infringement filed by CSAV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron W. Davis in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Assert Crossclaims Against CSAV# 2 Exhibit A - Letter to CSAV from Dell's counsel# 3 Exhibit B - Declaratory-Judgment Complaint# 4 Exhibit C - (Unpublished case) Ciena Corp. v. Nortel Networks, Inc.# 5 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Third Party Defendant CSAV)(Kniser, Casey) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Crossclaim of Global Marketing Partners, Inc. by DOUBLESIGHT DISPLAYS LLC.(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Crossclaim of Ingram Micro Inc. by PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC..(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint or in the alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement and Motion To Transfer or, in the alternative, Motion to Bifurcate filed by CDW Corporation. (Izraelewicz, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the Court issues thissupplemental opinion to further identify the exhibits that it ordered MASS to produce. Docket No. 234's Exhibits Non-ex parte Exhibits - Exhibit A - Exhibit 4 to Docket No. 162. Exhibit B -Exhibit 6 to Docket No. 162. Exhibit C - Exhibit 3 to Docket No. 239. Exhibit D - Exhibit 4 to Docket No. 239. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 262 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to the cross-claim of Ingram Micro Inc is granted. Deadline for Peerless extended to 3/24/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Motion # 162 Ergotron's motion to compel. MASS to produce documents for which privilege has been waived. Court further orders MASS produce the portions of Exhibits A and B identified as no longer privileged in Appendix A and Exhibit D without redaction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/19/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Infringement Contentions by Mass Engineered Design, Inc., Jerry Moscovitch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Doublesight extended to 3/24/08 to respond to cross-claim of Global. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/14/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint or in the alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement and Motion To Transfer or, in the alternative, Motion to Bifurcate filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Stein, Stefan) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth above, the Courts claim interpretations are set forth in Appendix B. The claims with the disputed terms in bold are set forth in Appendix A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/12/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim for Patent Infringement by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cross Claim for Patent Infringement# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Crossclaim Ingram Micro by SEA LAND, INC..(Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Crossclaim Global Marketing Partners, Inc. by SEA LAND, INC..(Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Cross-Claim of Ingram Micro Inc. by PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Cross-Complaint of Global Marketing Partners, Inc. by DOUBLESIGHT DISPLAYS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 259 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply brief to CDW's Brief in Opposition to Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss CDW's Third Party Complaint Replies due by 3/14/2008.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/29/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant, Counter-Claimant and Third Party Plaintiff, CDW Corporation's Opposition to Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss CDW's Third Party Complaint by Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stein, Stefan) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 252 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Guy N Harrison terminated as cnsl for Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Marvin Craig Tyler (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?