Marshall v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-02714
District Judge Jack B. Weinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 11:36 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joshua Marshall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Louis Norinsberg +1 212 791 5396 +1 212 406 6890 norinsberg@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Fitch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald M. Cohen +1 212 374 9115 +1 212 406 6890 gcohen@cohenfitch.com
Space Joshua Paul Fitch +1 212 374 9115 +1 212 406 6890 jfitch@cohenfitch.com
v.
No Logo P.O. Michael Burbridge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15488, Individually and in His Official Capacity Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
Shield No. 15488, Individually and in His Official Capacity Felicia Gross +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 9776 fgross@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve Stavridis +1 212 788 8698 +1 212 788 0367 stavridis.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15488, Individually and in His Official Capacity Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15488, Individually and in His Official Capacity Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15488, Individually and in His Official Capacity Vicki Becker Zgodny +1 212 788 8084 +1 212 788 0987 vzgodny@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Salim Randall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15331, Individually and in His Official Capacity Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
Shield No. 15331, Individually and in His Official Capacity Felicia Gross +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 9776 fgross@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve Stavridis +1 212 788 8698 +1 212 788 0367 stavridis.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15331, Individually and in His Official Capacity Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15331, Individually and in His Official Capacity Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 15331, Individually and in His Official Capacity Vicki Becker Zgodny +1 212 788 8084 +1 212 788 0987 vzgodny@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O.'s "John Doe" #1-10, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2012 Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
TERMINATED: 04/30/2012 Felicia Gross +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 9776 fgross@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve Stavridis +1 212 788 8698 +1 212 788 0367 stavridis.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2012 Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2012 Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
Letter Informing the Court of the Settlement of the Supplemental Application for Attorney's Fees by Joshua Marshall (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal filed by The City of New York It is Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 7/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki Becker Zgodny on behalf of Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall (aty to be noticed) (Zgodny, Vicki) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/29/2013, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM in Support re 106 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in connection with the appeal of this matter filed by Joshua Marshall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hours for Joshua P. Fitch, # 2 Exhibit Hours for Jon L. Norinsberg, # 3 Exhibit Hours for Gerald M. Cohen) (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
          Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in connection with the appeal of this matter by Joshua Marshall. (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Fee Application by Joshua Marshall. (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Judgment on Attorney Fees
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Report and Recommendations
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Motion Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Reply in Support
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Memorandum in Opposition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Clerks Judgment
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Reply in Opposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Motion to Stay
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Memorandum in Support
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 Telephone Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Status Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Interoffice Memorandum/Email
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Order Dismissing Parties
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Jury Trial Completed
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Jury Trial Held
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Jury Trial Begun
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Jury Selection
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Motion for Declaration of Mistrial
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: 3/26/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: 9/10/2011 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: 9/10/2011 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: 6/16/2011 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Produce by Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stavridis, Steve) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 12 Motion to Produce. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky, on 4/4/2011. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Produce by Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Produce Plaintiff to Sing Sing) (Stavridis, Steve) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Telephone Status Conference held on 2/10/2011. *A telephone conference will be held on May 5, 2011 at 2:00 p.m., to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. *See annexed conference minutes for further scheduling and rulings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall, The City of New York. (Stavridis, Steve) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Stavridis on behalf of Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Stavridis, Steve) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Marshall. Michael Burbridge served on 9/13/2010, answer due 10/4/2010. (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Initial Scheduling Hearing held on 10/26/2010. Scheduling order entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Michael Burbridge, Salim Randall, The City of New York. (Hudson, Maurice) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by The City of New York. (Hudson, Maurice) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Marshall. Salim Randall served on 8/3/2010, answer due 8/24/2010. (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or to Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, by The City of New York. (Hudson, Maurice) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Marshall. The City of New York served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Michael Burbridge, P.O.'s "John Doe" #1-10, Salim Randall, The City of New York Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joshua Marshall. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?