Walker Digital LLC v. Sony Computer Entertainment America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00368
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 12:45 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, F5 Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, East West Bancorp, Inc.
Officer/Director, Trex Co Inc
Officer/Director, Teledyne Technologies Inc.
Stamps.com, Inc. Officer/Director, Stamps.com, Inc.

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Microsoft Corp."
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Murphy Pringle +1 302 652 5070 pringle@fr.com
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo T-hq, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo 2k Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo 2ksports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com
Space Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com
No Logo Rockstar Games, Inc., Defendant
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Shaw Salceda +1 650 847 4150 +1 650 798 6701 psalceda@duanemorris.com

Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karineh Khachatourian +1 650 251 7700 +1 650 251 7739 kkhachatourian@mintz.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Square Enix, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Take-two Interactive Software, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walker Digital, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Bayard, PA

Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Helene Bromberg +1 212 957 7600 kbromberg@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damir Cefo dcefo@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra C. McCallion smccallion@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan M. Rosenbaum erosenbaum@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francisco A. Villegas +1 212 957 2018 +1 212 957 4514 fvillegas@cohengresser.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (205) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,224,486; 6,425,828. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 203 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Walker Digital LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/7/2015. (nms) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STATUS REPORT of Inter Partes and Ex Parte Re-Examination of Patent Nos. 6,425,828 and 6,224,486, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nms). (Entered: 02/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED Granting 200 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Walker Digital LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2014. (nms) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 12/18/2014 (nms). (Entered: 12/17/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 199 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
              Joint STATUS REPORT of Inter Partes and Ex Parte Re-examination of Patent Nos. 6,425,828 and 6,224,486, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 8/5/2014 (nms). (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Tara D. Elliott by Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corporation (Marsden, William) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT on Inter Partes and Ex Parte Reexaminations of the Patents-in-Suit by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael J. Flynn (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2013. (nms) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 08-05-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2014. (lad) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER Granting 192 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Capcom Entertainment Inc. (Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc., and Capcom Entertainment Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2013. (nms) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice, by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2013 (nms). (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Granting Motions to Stay (see 172 , 181 , and 187 ). The case is STAYED as to Sony and Microsoft only; and the parties to these motions are to submit a joint status report every six months. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2013. (nms) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's & Microsoft Corporation's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                  Supplemental DECLARATION of Karineh Khachatourian re 188 Reply Brief, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-14)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY BRIEF re 172 Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                      JOINDER by Microsoft Corp., joining in 181 Response to 172 Motion to Stay. (Elliott, Tara) Modified on 7/23/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Subpoena of Concert Technology Corporation by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Claim Construction Reply Brief and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/16/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Benjamin T. Wang re 183 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/12/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition 183 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Re-Examination of the Patents-in-Suit, filed by Walker Digital LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/12/2013 (nms). Modified on 7/16/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Argument on Pending Motions to Stay. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to 172 Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit, filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Marsden, William) Modified on 7/8/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST for Oral Argument by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 172 Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend briefing deadlines, by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/3/2013 (nms). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Subpoenas of Ocean Tomo, LLC and Scenera Research, LLC by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          SO ORDERED re 176 Stipulation and Order to Stay case for 30 days from the date of this Order, pending final dismissal of Plaintiff's claims, filed by Capcom USA Inc., Walker Digital LLC, Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Capcom Entertainment Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2013. (nms) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION and Order to Stay All Case Deadlines for 30 Days by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                              REQUEST for Oral Argument by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 172 Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Karineh Khachatourian re 173 Opening Brief in Support, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-10)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms). (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 172 Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit, filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/8/2013. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms). (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Renewed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms). (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Phillip D. Mancini of DUANE MORRIS LLP - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        SO ORDERED re 169 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding claim construction briefing to various deadlines (see stipulation for details), filed by Capcom USA Inc., Walker Digital LLC, Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Ubisoft Inc.. (Reset Deadline: Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 8/5/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2013. (nms) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for claim construction briefing to various deadlines (see stipulation for details) - filed by Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Ryan Hardee as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Duane Morris. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena of ThinkFire Services USA, Ltd. by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Claim Construction Opening Brief and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 5/21/2013 (nms). (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Lamberson - filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Jonathan Lamberson)(Marsden, William) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Objections and Responses to Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America, Llc's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4); and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 5/7/2013 (nms). (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Corrected Joint CLAIM Construction Chart by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 4/24/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 4/23/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Objections and Responses to Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America, Llc's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 3-77) and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 4/23/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (ksr, ) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE Of Service of 1) Plaintiff's Proposed Claim Constructions and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 4/16/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION and Order to Amend Answer, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-14); (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Objections and Responses to Capcom Entertainment, Inc.'S First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); (3) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Objections and Responses to Ubisoft, Inc.'S First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); (4) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llc's Objections and Responses to Sega of America, Inc.'S First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); and (5) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 4/2/2013 (nms). (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Objections and Responses to Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America, Llcs Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-2); and (2) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 3/27/2013 (nms). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Defendants Capcom U.S.A., Inc. and Capcom Entertainment, Inc.; (2) Capcom U.S.A., Inc. and Capcom Entertainment, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (3) Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Defendant Sega of America, Inc.; (4) Sega of America, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (5) Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.; and (6) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadline by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Capcom Entertainment, Inc. and Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets of Requests for the Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); (2) Defendants Capcom Entertainment, Inc. and Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10); (3) Sega of America, Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets of Requests for the Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); (4) Defendant Sega Of America, Inc.'s Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10); (5) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets of Requests for the Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); and (6) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10) by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos. 3-77) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to complete document production pursuant to Paragraph 3.c of the Court's Scheduling Order (D.I. 63) to April 26, 2013 - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Objections and Responses to Defendant Capcom U.s.a., Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-89); (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Objections and Responses to Defendant Sega of America, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-89); (3) Plaintiff Walker Digital, Llcs Objections and Responses to Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-89); and (4) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 3/7/2013 (nms). (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to substantially complete document production to May 3, 2013 - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Teleconferences: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. Status Teleconferences are set for 6/17/2013 before Judge Fallon. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/5/2013. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00311-RGA et al.(lih) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Capcom Entertainment, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC; (2) Defendant Sega of America's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC; (3) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC; and (4) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-14) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-2) by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryan Sinclair and the law firm of K&L Gates LLC as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer involved in litigation. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Baird and Ryan Hardee of DUANE MORRIS LLP - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 138 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Walker Digital LLC ( Square Enix Inc. and Square Enix of America Holdings Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2013. (nms) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 140 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Walker Digital LLC (Konami Digital Entertainment Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2013. (nms) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/7/2013 (nms). (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things; (2) Defendant Sega of America, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things; and (3) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendants Square Enix, Inc. and Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/5/2013 (nms). (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 135 Proposed Protective Order, filed by Walker Digital LLC, Sega of America Inc., Microsoft Corp., Ubisoft Inc., THQ Inc., Square Enix Inc., Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/22/2013. (nms) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Service of Walker Digital, Llc's Disclosures to Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom Usa Inc., Sega of America Inc. and Ubisoft Inc. Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/22/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED Protective Order, by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) this Notice of Service by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 362(a) by THQ Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 124 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/8/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 123 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/8/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 122 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/8/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 121 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/8/2013 (nms). (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Firm by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Paragraph 4(c) Disclosures to January 18, 2013 - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit, filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2012. (nms) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Service of (1) Walker Digital, LLCs Disclosures to Microsoft Corp. Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (2) Walker Digital, LLCs Disclosures to Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; and (3) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 12/20/2012 (nms). (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Walker Digital LLC, by Ubisoft Inc.. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Walker Digital LLC, by THQ Inc.. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Walker Digital LLC, by Sega of America Inc.. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIMS against Walker Digital LLC, by Capcom USA Inc. and Capcom Entertainment Inc.. (nms) Modified on 12/19/2012 (nms). (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 119 MOTION to Amend Answers. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2012. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Answers to Complaint (see D.I. 36 , 32 , 38 , 40 ) - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 12/19/2012 (nms). (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Capcom Co., Ltd.'s Objections And Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's Subpoena To Produce Documents, Information, Or Objects Or To Permit Inspection Of Premises In A Civil Action by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 4(c) and 4(d) Disclosures - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2012 (nms). (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Capcom Co., Ltd. by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Oral Argument by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esq. regarding Discovery Letter re: Protective Order - re 112 Letter. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Status Teleconferences: (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Status Teleconferences are set as follows: 2/19/2013 at 04:00 PM, 2/20/2013 at 01:30 PM, 2/20/2013 at 02:00 PM, 2/20/2013 at 02:30 PM, 2/20/2013 at 03:00 PM, 2/20/2013 at 03:30 PM and 2/20/2013 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff's shall initiate the calls to 302-573-4557. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/2/2012. (lih) (Main Document 113 replaced on 11/9/2012) (lih). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding two disputes regarding the prosecution bar in the proposed Protective Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental DECLARATION of Karineh Khachatourian re 110 Reply Brief, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 11/1/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc..(nms) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc..(nms) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint to Plead the Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Statute of Limitations, filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., Square Enix Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2012. (nms) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint to Plead the Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Statute of Limitations - filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 10/25/2012 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2012: # 5 Proposed Order) (nms). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/25/2012) (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/25/2012) (nms). (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick S. Salceda of K&L GATES - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., joining in 92 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 10/22/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jonathan Ellenthal re 101 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 10/19/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Benjamin T. Wang re 101 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 10/19/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Walker Digital LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Serve Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery to November 8, 2012 - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION extend deadline to produce core technical documents to October 18, 2012 by Microsoft Corp.. (Marsden, William) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Protective Order to October 11, 2012 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mari Tasaki from Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. re 95 Joinder to 92 Motion to Stay, by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 10/4/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Steve Ross from Square Enix, Inc. re 95 Joinder in 92 Motion to Stay, by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 10/4/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., joining in 92 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Karineh Khachatourian re 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit, by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-L)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2012 (nms). (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 92 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2012. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to October 4, 2012 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to September 26, 2012 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for submission of certain disclosures to dates as outlined in stipulation - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend discovery deadlines to as Set Forth in the Stipulation - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to produce core technical documents to 10/3 by Microsoft Corp.. (Marsden, William) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tamara Fraizer - filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Marsden, William) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to Submit Protective Order to September 19, 2012 - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 9/11/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Capcom U.S.A., Inc. and Capcom Entertainment, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (2) Initial Disclosures Of Defendants Capcom U.S.A., Inc. And Capcom Entertainment, Inc.; (3) THQ Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of The Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (4) Initial Disclosures Of Defendant THQ Inc.; (5) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of The Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; (6) Initial Disclosures of Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. (7) Initial Disclosures Of Defendant Sega of America, Inc.; (8) Sega of America, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of The Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Service of 1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Initial Disclosures; (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Disclosures to Defendants Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Sega of America, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Thq, Inc., and Ubisoft Inc. Pursuant to Sections 3 & 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and (3) this Notice of Service by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 9/5/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Square Enix, Inc. And Square Enix Of America Holdings, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Paragraph 3 Of The Court's Default Standard For Discovery, Including Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information; (2) Square Enix, Inc. And Square Enix Of America Holdings, Inc. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Paragraph 3 Of The Courts Default Standard For Discovery, Including Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information; (2) Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Court's Default Standard of Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (2) Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's Initial Disclosures by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Capcom Entertainment, Inc. And Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets Of Requests For The Production Of Documents And Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); (2) Defendants Capcom Entertainment, Inc. And Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s Answers To Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants (Nos. 1-10); (3) THQ Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets Of Requests For The Production Of Documents And Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); (4) Defendant THQ Inc.'s Answers To Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants (Nos. 1-10); (5) Ubisoft, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets Of Requests For The Production Of Documents And Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); (6) Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.'s Answers To Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants (Nos. 1-10); (7) Sega Of America, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Sets Of Requests For The Production Of Documents And Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); and (8) Defendant Sega Of America, Inc.'s Answers To Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLCs First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants (Nos. 1-10) by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLCs Initial Disclosures; (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLCs Disclosures to Defendant Microsoft Corp. Pursuant to Sections 3 & 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; and (3) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 8/21/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend Certain Case Deadlines to September 4, 2012; October 4, 2012; November 5, 2012; and December 5, 2012 - filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and Microsoft's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Court's Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Microsoft Corp..(Elliott, Tara) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for exchange of disclosures to dates as set forth in stipulation - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Service Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 and Paragraph 4 Disclosures to as set forth in the Stipulation - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend Time to Submit Protective Order to September 4, 2012 - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Status Teleconferences (Counsel for plaintiff's shall initiate the call ): Status Teleconferences are set in this matter as follows: Plaintiff and Defendant Microsoft Corporation only 10/10/2012 at 1:00 PM; Plaintiff and Defendants Capcom Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., and Ubisoft Inc. only at 3:00 PM; Plaintiff and Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc. and Square Enix of America Holdings Inc. only at 3:30 PM; Plaintiff and Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC only at 4:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/16/2012. (lih) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's Responses to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and 2) Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC's Responses to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Request for Production of Document and Things by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Walker Digital LLC and Electronic Arts Inc. (Electronic Arts Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2012. (nms) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Electronic Arts Inc, by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-18); (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-57); and (3) this Notice of Service, by Walker Digital LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 8/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.'s Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Common Interrogatories; and (2) Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc.'s Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Square Enix, Inc.'s Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Common Interrogatories; and (2) Square Enix, Inc.'s Responses To Walker Digital, LLC's First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference is set for 8/7/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/26/2012. (lih) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos. 1-47); and (2) Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1-10) by Microsoft Corp..(Marsden, William) (Main Document 64 replaced on 8/20/2012) (nms). (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/12/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2013. All Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/9/2014, at 8:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 7/22/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/21/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/1/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set to commence on 8/18/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00368-RGA, 1:11-cv-00649-RGA(nms) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order, by 2K Games Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Walker Digital LLC, Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/20/2012 (nms). (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Official Transcript of Rule 16 Conference held on 07-12-12 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2012. (lad) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Microsoft Corp.: Entry of appearance of attorney William J. Marsden, Jr. Attorney Lauren Murphy Pringle and John Thornburgh (no longer working on case) terminated. (Marsden, William) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Chan - filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Marsden, William) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected NOTICE OF SERVICE for Microsoft Corporation's first Set of Request for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos 1-57) and 1st set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-18) to Plaintiff Walker Digital LLC, by Microsoft Corp..(Marsden, William) Modified on 7/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Microsoft Corporation's First set of Request for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Nos 1-57) and 1st set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-18) to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC by Microsoft Corp..(Marsden, William) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order, by 2K Games Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Walker Digital LLC, Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/26/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things from Defendants; (2) Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories to the Defendants; and (3) this Notice of Service by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/15/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/20/2012, at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/18/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Benjamin T. Wang, and Adam S. Hoffman of Russ, August & Kabat - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Benjamin T. Wang, # 3 Certification of Adam S. Hoffman)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Walker Digital LLC (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/8/2012, at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2012. (nms) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Evan Rosenbaum and Jordan Adler of Cohen & Gresser LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with firm. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT -- RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED MATTER -- by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 40 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Answer to Ubisoft, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, / Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Answer to Capcom Entertainment, Inc. and Capcom U.S.A., Inc.'s Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Answer to THQ Inc.'s Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Answer to Electronic Arts Inc.'s Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Answer to Sega of America, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Walker Digital LLC's Answer to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims by Walker Digital LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Ubisoft Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND -- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF UBISOFT, INC. --, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by Ubisoft Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND -- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANTS CAPCOM ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND CAPCOM U.S.A., INC. --, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by Capcom USA Inc., Capcom Entertainment Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by THQ Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND -- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF THQ INC. --, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by THQ Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND -- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. --, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sega of America Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND -- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT SEGA AMERICA, INC. --, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by Sega of America Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach, Jason W. Wolff, John W. Thornburg, Tal Kedem and Robert C. Earle - filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with jury demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Walker Digital LLC by Microsoft Corp..(Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles S. Barquist, Benjamin J. Fox and Wendy J. Ray - filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wayne Barsky, Jason C. Lo, Timothy P. Best, Jennifer J. Rho and Neema Jalali - filed by Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., Ubisoft Inc.. (Troutner, Melissa) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc. and Square Enix, Inc. to Respond to Complaint until July 20, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Sega of America Inc., THQ Inc., and Ubisoft, Inc. to Respond to Complaint - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to July 11, 2011 - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 11, 2011 - filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karineh Khachatourian and Bryan Sinclair - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to / (Unopposed) for defendants Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., Square Enix Inc., and THQ Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint until June 20, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to (Unopposed) for Defendant Ubisoft, Inc.to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 20, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen H. Bromberg, Sandra C. McCallion, Damir Cefo, Francisco A. Villegas, Jordan S. Adler, and Evan M. Rosenbaum of Cohen & Gresser LLP - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Karen H. Bromberg, # 2 Certification of Sandra C. McCallion, # 3 Certification of Damir Cefo, # 4 Certification of Francisco A. Villegas, # 5 Certification of Jordan S. Adler, # 6 Certification of Evan M. Rosenbaum)(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Microsoft Corporation to Respond to the Complaint to June 20, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC served on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Walker Digital LLC as to 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc. and Rockstar Games, Inc. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. Microsoft Corp. served on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. Square Enix of America Holdings Inc. served on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. THQ Inc. served on 4/28/2011, answer due 5/19/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Sony to answer complaint to June 17, 2011 - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Walker Digital LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Walker Digital LLC as to Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,224,486; 6,425,828;. (els) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against 2K Games Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Capcom Entertainment Inc., Capcom USA Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Microsoft Corp., Rockstar Games Inc., Sega of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings Inc., THQ Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Ubisoft Inc. - ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-879968.) - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 274 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?