Perales v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00957-JFA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 12:20 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Azael Dythian Perales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azael Dythian Perales

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
et al Azael Dythian Perales
v.
No Logo 2004-2005 Hon John D Perdue, Defendant
No Logo 2005-2006 Hon Jody M Wagner, Defendant
No Logo 2005-2006 Hon Randall Edwards, Defendant
No Logo 2006-2007 Hon Tate Reeves, Defendant
No Logo 2007-2008 Hon Lynn Jenkins, Defendant
No Logo 2008-2009 Hon Jeb Spaulding, Defendant
No Logo 2010 Hon James B Lewis, Defendant
No Logo A Gragera, Defendant
No Logo Alberto R Gonzalez, Defendant
No Logo Alex Kozinski, Defendant
No Logo Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Alfred Amoroso, Defendant
No Logo Alice M Batchelder, Defendant
No Logo Alissandra Geliga, Defendant
No Logo Andre Birotte, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Andrew A Connell, Defendant
No Logo Annie Wing, Defendant
No Logo Anthony M Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Antonin Gregory Scalia, Defendant
No Logo Appeals Patty Murray, Defendant
No Logo Arlen Specter, Defendant
No Logo Arnold Schwarzenegger, Defendant
No Logo Art Brown, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Kern, Defendant
No Logo Audrey B Collins, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack H Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Barbara Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Pisaro, Defendant
No Logo Barney Frank, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S Bernanke"
No Logo Benjamin Todd Jealous, Defendant
No Logo Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bill Canepa, Defendant
No Logo Bob Sasser, Defendant
No Logo Brad Smith, Defendant
No Logo Bradley DeBerg, Defendant
No Logo Brian Beckwith, Defendant
No Logo Brian Cornell, Defendant
No Logo Cameron Moody, Defendant
No Logo Cascade Investment, L.l.c., Defendant
Officer/Director, TIERCO GROUP INC/DE/
Officer/Director, Seattle Genetics Inc /wa
Officer/Director, First Priority Group Inc
Officer/Director, Gates, William Henry
Officer/Director, Republic Services, Inc.
Officer/Director, AutoAmerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, DEERE & CO
No Logo Cathryn Lovely, Defendant
No Logo Charles B Rangel, Defendant
No Logo Charles E Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Charles H Noski, Defendant
No Logo Charlie Munger, Defendant
No Logo Chris Norby, Defendant
No Logo Christina Reiss, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Cox, Defendant
No Logo Christopher J Dodd, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Maddox, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Thomas, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Officer/Director, Kior, Inc.
Officer/Director, Evenflow, Inc.
Officer/Director, C3, Inc.
No Logo Curt Pringle, Defendant
No Logo Curtis L Collier, Defendant
No Logo Dale E Kildee, Defendant
No Logo Dale M Cundiff, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Inouye, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Daniel VanHorn, Defendant
No Logo David B Sentelle, Defendant
No Logo David Carey, Defendant
No Logo David Drier, Defendant
No Logo David F Marquardt, Defendant
No Logo David Kenny, Defendant
No Logo David M Walker, Defendant
No Logo David R Obey, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Bowen, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Dick Durban, Defendant
No Logo Dina Dublon, Defendant
No Logo Doc Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Don Bankhead, Defendant
No Logo Don Chang, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Shulman, Defendant
No Logo Dr Helmut Panke, Defendant
No Logo Dr William Frisk, Defendant
No Logo Duncan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Ed Royce, Defendant
No Logo Edmund G Brown, Defendant
No Logo Edolphus Towns, Defendant
No Logo Edward M Kennedy, Defendant
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elaine L Chao"
Officer/Director, Dole Food Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Officer/Director, News Corporation
Officer/Director, New Newscorp LLC
Officer/Director, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ingersoll-Rand plc
Officer/Director, Kroger Co
Officer/Director, Tortoise Acquisition Corp.
No Logo Elena Kagan, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth B Kautz, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Dole, Defendant
No Logo Elvi de Quiroz, Defendant
No Logo Emily C Hewitt, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H Holder"
No Logo Fernando M Olguin, Defendant
No Logo G De La Torre, Defendant
No Logo Gary Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Gayle King, Defendant
No Logo Gene Green, Defendant
No Logo Gene L Dodaro, Defendant
No Logo George Miller, Defendant
No Logo George V Voinovich, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W Bush"
No Logo Gerald E Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Greg L Prickett, Defendant
No Logo Greg M Conger, Defendant
No Logo Gregg W Steinhafel, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Hazel Cash, Defendant
No Logo Henry A Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Henry Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Hilda L Solis, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary R Clinton"
No Logo J Dennis Hastert, Defendant
No Logo J Douglas Steere, Defendant
No Logo Jack Markell, Defendant
No Logo James C Duff, Defendant
No Logo James E Clyburn, Defendant
No Logo James F Bellot, Defendant
No Logo James V Selna, Defendant
No Logo Jan Horbaly, Defendant
No Logo Jane Harman, Defendant
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jefferson B Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jerry Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Yang, Defendant
No Logo John A Perez, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant
No Logo John Boehner, Defendant
No Logo John Chiang, Defendant
No Logo John Conyers, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John D Rockefeller, IV, Defendant
No Logo John E Potter, Defendant
No Logo John Edwards, Defendant
No Logo John F Clark, Defendant
No Logo John G Roberts, Defendant
No Logo John M Spratt, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John O'Colvin, Defendant
No Logo John P Murtha, Defendant
No Logo Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "John Spratt"
No Logo John W Thompson, Defendant
No Logo John Warner, Defendant
No Logo Joseph I Lieberman, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph R Biden"
No Logo Karl Rove, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo Kizito Namulandan, Defendant
No Logo Kwesi Mfume, Defendant
No Logo Lamar Byron L Dorgan, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence R Johnston, Defendant
No Logo Leon Edward Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Green, Defendant
No Logo Linn Dyk, Defendant
No Logo Loretta Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Louise M Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo Lyle W Cayce, Defendant
No Logo Lynn C Woosley, Defendant
No Logo Maria M Klawe, Defendant
No Logo Marian B Horn, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn R Abbott, Defendant
No Logo Mark Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Marshal David M Singer, Defendant
No Logo Matthew S Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Maxine Waters, Defendant
No Logo Maynard Webb, Defendant
No Logo Melinda French Gates, Defendant
No Logo Michael A Nutter, Defendant
No Logo Michael B Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Michael Courlander, Defendant
No Logo Michael Larson, Defendant
No Logo Michael Sellers, Defendant
No Logo Michael Steele, Defendant
No Logo Micheal DeWine, Defendant
No Logo Micheal Seto, Defendant
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
No Logo Mike Duke, Defendant
No Logo Mimi Walters, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Nancy Mayer Whittington, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
No Logo National Association of State Treasures Presidents, Defendant
No Logo Norman Y Mineta, Defendant
No Logo Olympia J Snowe, Defendant
No Logo Oprah Winfrey, Defendant
No Logo Orrin Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leahy, Defendant
No Logo Patti Hart, Defendant
No Logo Paul Gardner Allen, Defendant
No Logo Paul H Dobson, Defendant
No Logo Paul Micheal, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Pete V Domenici, Defendant
No Logo Peter Hoekstra, Defendant
No Logo Peter Stark, Defendant
No Logo Phillip D Morse, Defendant
No Logo R N Armen, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Rahm Emanuel, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C Conte, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C Dawson, Defendant
No Logo Rand, Paul, Defendant
No Logo Randall Radar, Defendant
No Logo Raymond V Gilmartin, Defendant
Hastings, W. Reed Hastings, W. Reed, Defendant
Officially listed as "Reed Hastings"
Microsoft Corporation Officer/Director, Microsoft Corporation
Netflix, Inc. Officer/Director, Netflix, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B Cheney"
No Logo Robert Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert C Byrd, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gates, Defendant
No Logo Robert Louis Nardelli, Defendant
No Logo Robert R Di Trolio, Defendant
No Logo Robert S Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Ronald C Machen, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Meisburg, Defendant
No Logo Rose E Chavez, Defendant
No Logo Roy Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Roy Bostock, Defendant
No Logo Russ Hayden, Defendant
No Logo Russell G Weiner, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Jones, Defendant
No Logo Samuel A Alito, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Scott Burns, Defendant
No Logo Scott, Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Shelly E Saltzman, Defendant
No Logo Sonia M Sotomayer, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Bachus, Defendant
No Logo Steny Hoyner, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Bryer, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Eastman, Defendant
No Logo Steve Ballmer, Defendant
No Logo Steve Cooley, Defendant
No Logo Steve Paul Jobs, Defendant
No Logo Steve Scalise, Defendant
No Logo Steven J McAuliffee, Defendant
No Logo Sue James, Defendant
No Logo Susan K Lee, Defendant
No Logo Susan Stoker, Defendant
No Logo Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Davis, Defendant
No Logo Tim Kaine, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Geithner, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daly, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daschle, Defendant
No Logo Tom Monson, Defendant
No Logo Tom Tait, Defendant
No Logo Tony Rackauckas, Defendant
No Logo Trent Lott, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
United States Senate United States Senate, Defendant
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Department of Labor"
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
Officially listed as "US House of Representatives"
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Internal Revenue Service"
No Logo Vernon Ehlers, Defendant
No Logo Vulcan Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vyomesh Joshi, Defendant
No Logo Warren Buffett, Defendant
Gates, William Henry Gates, William Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "William Henry Gates, III"
Officer/Director, Republic Services, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cascade Investment, L.l.c.
Microsoft Corporation Officer/Director, Microsoft Corporation
Officer/Director, First Priority Group Inc
Officer/Director, Icos Corp / De
Officer/Director, Alpha G Inc
Officer/Director, Nbh Inc
Officer/Director, Ecolab Inc.
Officer/Director, DEERE & CO
Officer/Director, Planetout Inc.
Officer/Director, Kior, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gates Ventures, LLC
Officer/Director, Max-1 Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, D8 Holdings Corp.
No Logo William J Clinton, Defendant
Yahoo, Inc. Yahoo, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Net2phone, Inc.
Officer/Director, Launch Media, Inc.
Google, Inc. Officer/Director, Google, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hortonworks, Inc.
No Logo Yvonne T Dixon, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order adopting Report and Recommendations AND 14 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail to Azael Dythian Perales, PO Box 501, Fullerton, CA 92836-0501. (bshr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the action is dismissed with prejudice. (bshr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
      ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/21/2012. (ttil, ) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable/REFUSED. Addressee: Azael Dythian Perales. Document Returned: 8 Order, 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (abuc) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
          ***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Order and 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Azael Dythian Perales. (abuc) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, filed by Azael Dythian Perales. It is recommended that the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/30/2012. (abuc) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/30/2012. (abuc) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/21/2012. (ttil, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Azael Dythian Perales. Response to Motion due by 4/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Bank of America Account Balance)Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(jpet, ) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/30/2012. (abuc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Appeal, Writ of Habeas Corpus & Maladministration Proceeding, Power to Grant Writ, # 2 List of Related Cases, # 3 Certiorari Brief, # 4 Exhibit - Grand Jury Complaint, # 5 Exhibit - Grand Jury Correspondence, # 6 Exhibit - Medical Documents, # 7 Exhibit - Related Defendants, # 8 Envelope)(jpet, ) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 152 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?