Gross et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-06690
District Judge Eldon E. Fallon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 28, 2020 at 4:33 PM EDT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bedrock Building Materials, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Alan Harrell harrella@phelps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V. Loran, III +1 415 983 1865 +1 415 983 1200 thomas.loran@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Builders Gypsum Supply Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baldwin, Haspel, Burke & Mayer, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010 Beverly Klundt Baudouin +1 504 585 7896 +1 504 569 2099 baudouin@bhbmlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010 William Bryon Schwartz +1 504 569 2900 wschwartz@bhbmlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY William Daniel Wellons +1 504 569 2900 +1 504 569 2099 dwellons@bhbmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Collier Lambert +1 225 387 3221 amy.lambert@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Parker, Sr. +1 225 387 3221 +1 225 346 8049 mike.parker@taylorporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Joseph Philips, Jr. +1 225 387 3221 skip.philips@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Tooke +1 225 387 3221 margaret.tooke@taylorporter.com
No Logo Builders Gypsum Supply LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baldwin, Haspel, Burke & Mayer, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010 Beverly Klundt Baudouin +1 504 585 7896 +1 504 569 2099 baudouin@bhbmlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010 William Bryon Schwartz +1 504 569 2900 wschwartz@bhbmlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/04/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY William Daniel Wellons +1 504 569 2900 +1 504 569 2099 dwellons@bhbmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Collier Lambert +1 225 387 3221 amy.lambert@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Parker, Sr. +1 225 387 3221 +1 225 346 8049 mike.parker@taylorporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Joseph Philips, Jr. +1 225 387 3221 skip.philips@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Tooke +1 225 387 3221 margaret.tooke@taylorporter.com
No Logo CNBM USA Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne O'Quinn +1 504 310 2100 doquinn@irwinllc.com
TERMINATED: 06/21/2011 John W. Sinnott +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jsinnott@irwinllc.com
TERMINATED: 06/21/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr. +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 qurquhart@irwinllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tabet DiVito Rothstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2011 J. Jeffrey Patton +1 312 762 9450 +1 312 762 9451
TERMINATED: 06/21/2011 Daniel L. Stanner +1 312 762 9450 +1 312 762 9451 dstanner@tdrlawfirm.com
No Logo Davis Construction Supply, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Laborde & Neuner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Louis Mayeaux +1 337 237 7000 +1 337 233 9450 bmayeaux@neunerpate.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara B. Rodrigue +1 337 237 7000 srodrigue@ln-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Torian +1 337 237 7000 +1 337 233 9450 rtorian@neunerpate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley, Williams Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald Coleman Brown +1 337 433 6328 dcbrown@woodleywilliams.com
No Logo Devon International Trading, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Gibbons Rauh +1 504 561 0400 Drauh@glllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarah Johnson, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A. Braun +1 504 561 0400 abraun@glllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria E. Emmerling +1 504 561 0400 temmerling@glllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley, Williams Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Coleman Brown +1 337 433 6328 dcbrown@woodleywilliams.com
No Logo First Home Builders of Florida I, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Wachter +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 299 0134 charles.wachter@hklaw.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia-Pacific LLC"

Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

No Logo Great Western Building Materials, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Degan, Blanchard & Nash (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Marie Mayes +1 504 529 3333 +1 504 529 3337 lmayes@degan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Foster Parlange Nash, III +1 504 529 3333 fnash@degan.com
No Logo Independent Builders Supply Association, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulmer, LeRoy, Albee, Baumann & Glass, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Francis Baumann +1 954 707 4430 +1 954 707 4431 gbaumann@FulmerLeRoy.com
No Logo J.W. Allen & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susie Morgan +1 318 226 9100

Represented by Chaffe McCall, LLP

Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

No Logo Lee Roy Jenkins, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William H. Patrick, III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew R. Ballina +1 504 299 3399 dballina@hellerdraper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren Horn +1 504 299 3300 +1 504 299 3399 whorn@hellerdraper.com
No Logo Maurice Pincoffs Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick Miller LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pierre V. Miller, II +1 504 527 5400 +1 504 527 5456 pmiller@pmbblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Hannon Patrick +1 504 527 5400 ppatrick@patrickmillerlaw.com
No Logo Mazer Discount Home Centers, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Chaffe McCall, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickenson Peatman & Fogarty

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Walsh +1 707 524 7000 +1 707 546 6800 gwalsh@dpf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mary Blanche Hankey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2012 Mary Blanche Hankey +1 205 930 5369 +1 205 212 2877 mhankey@sirote.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirote & Permutt -B'ham AL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Bottcher +1 205 930 5100 +1 205 930 5335 cbottcher@sirote.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirote & Permutt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Lee Reeves +1 205 930 5100 +1 205 930 5335 lreeves@sirote.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Jackson +1 205 870 0555 +1 205 871 7534 mjackson@wallacejordan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Stephen Logsdon +1 205 870 0555 +1 205 871 7534 ll@wallacejordan.com
No Logo Qingdao Yilie International Trade Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Qingdao Yilie International Trade Co., Ltd.
No Logo Rightway Drywall, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Forman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Greg Burge +1 205 458 5101 +1 205 244 5612 gburge@burr.com
No Logo Rivercrest, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Smith +1 202 434 5000
No Logo Shandong Oriental International Trading Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shandong Oriental International Trading Co., Ltd.
No Logo Steeler, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Arata McCollam Duplantis & Eagan LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven W. Copley +1 504 582 1111 scopley@gordonarata.com
TERMINATED: 06/29/2011 Dana Erin Dupre +1 504 582 1111 ddupre@gordonarata.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Peragine et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman C. Hoffmann, Jr. +1 504 569 2030 +1 504 569 2999 hhoffmann@spsr-law.com
No Logo TMO Global Logistics, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley, Williams Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Coleman Brown +1 337 433 6328 dcbrown@woodleywilliams.com
No Logo Triorient Trading Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lennon, Murphy, Caulfield & Phillips, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J Lennon +1 203 256 8600 +1 203 256 8615 klennon@lmcplegal.com
No Logo Venture Supply Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Gooch, ALC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett M. Bollinger +1 504 836 5200 brettbollinger@allengooch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W. Verret +1 504 836 5270 markverret@allengooch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LOUISIANA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Valliere +1 504 836 5200 jeffrey.valliere@la.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sinnott Nuchols & Logan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth F. Hardt +1 804 378 2610 khardt@snllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Nanavati +1 804 378 7600 mnanavati@snllaw.com
No Logo Aamara Shazia, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Abraham Johnson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Acadia II Condo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adam Grover, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adam Hudson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adela Miranda, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adele Abbott, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adele Love, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adi Maya, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adolfo Barreto, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adolfo Cotilla, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adria Worthington, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Adrienne Luntz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Agnes Wheeler, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aimee Franklin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aisha Johnson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alain Yassa, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alan Lakind, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alan Miller, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Albert Dudreck, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alberto Sakalauskas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aldo Leon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aldo Matus, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alean Lampton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alex Andreae, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alex Schubert, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexander Becerra, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexander, Joseph, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexander Piatkowski, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexander Rekhels, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexandra Hernandez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alexandra Kazakov, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alfred Harkley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alfredo Maseda, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alfredo Pena, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alganan Brown, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ali McKinney, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alice Carter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alice Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allen Baron, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allen Fordham, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allen Hammer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allen Nunez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allie Jones, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allison Franklin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allison Grant, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allison Maguire, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allison Palombi, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Allison Toler, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alonza Wallace, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alton Pierce, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Alvaro Nunez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amada Vaca, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amanda Calloway, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amanda Galle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amanda Hughes, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amelia Ortiz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amir Stock, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amparo Acosta, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amparo Robles, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amy Bloom, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Amy Metcalfe, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ana Barrios, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anatoly Daniels, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andre Simmons, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andrea Carter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andrea Jensen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andrew Bennett, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andrew Penny, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andrew Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Andy Mertlitz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anese Racius, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anette Nilsson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angel Nowling, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angel Santiago, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angel Villalobos, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angela Crandle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angela Ludgood, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angela Oyer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angeles Blalock, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo ANGELO D'AMBROSIO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Angelo DePompa, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anh Van Lee, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anika Beasley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anika Coney, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anissa Fordham, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anita Daniels, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anita Kramer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ann Macrory, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ann Marie Barisich Sever, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ann Randle Poche, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anna Bertholette, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anna R. Pelligra, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anna Taylor, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anne Bailey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anne Marie DeMaio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anne Santelle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Annette Dempster, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Annice P. Gomez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Annie M. Wilkerson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthoney Gody, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony Boyd Lee, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony D'Aprile, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony Foreston, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony J. Patti, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony Mantrana, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Anthony Martin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Antione C Carter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Antoinise Eugene, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Antonio Aguilar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Antonio Johnson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo April Hurley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo April Thornton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aprile L. Douglas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Argerie Matute, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ariane Conrad, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ariel Cohen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arlen Marandona, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arlene Brennan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arnelle Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arnold Martinez, Sr., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arthur Balassone, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Arthur Kovens, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aryn Sherman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ashley Ball, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ashley J. Rogers, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ashley Westerfield, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ashok Malhoe, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Asmita Shirali, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Audrey B. Paul, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Augustus P. Gomez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Aurorina Commander, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Austin Sheppard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Avery Theard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Balraj Nijhawan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Ann Harmer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Balassone, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Evans, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Green, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Hankins, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Heller, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara R. Petty, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara W. Manuel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barbara Yasinski, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barosy St. Fort, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Borne, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Dempster, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Desmore, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Durrance, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Katz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Barry Labell, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bart Scocco, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beatrice Wood, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beatriz Galvis, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beatriz Grajales, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Becky Grissom, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bella Stock, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Benjamin Greenberg, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Benjamin Thompson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Berlyn Birkholz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bernice Butler, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bertha Roque, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bertoule Cheramie, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bertoule J. Cheramie, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beth Schubert, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beth Sorenson Tobin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beth Yoder, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Betty Branning, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Betty Gregory, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Betty Hicks, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Betty Martin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beunker Glasper, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Beverly Ann Risko, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Billy Biglane, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Billy C Gainey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Billy Graham, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Blue Water Condominium Association, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Blue Water of Cape Coral, Inc, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bobby Mays, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bobby McTigue, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bonnie Mitchell, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Boris Castillo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bove Dryman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brad Chaeffer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brandon Mize, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brandon Winn, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brenda Moses, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brenda Owens, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brenda Riggio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brenda Rogers, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brent Desselle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brenta Ortigoza, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bret Burrow, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brett McKee, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian Bishop, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian Cummings, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian Herbert, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian McLendon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian Rezny, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brian Warthen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bridget Leonard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bridgitte Adcock, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brigid Soldavini-Clapper, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brittany Sinclair, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brnady Harvey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brodrick J. Anderson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bruce Kelly, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Brust Pitcher, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bryant Moses, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bryson Royal, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Bui A. Tuyet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Burnistine Knotts, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo C. Andre Johnson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Caffie Soloman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Calman Pruscha, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Calvin Toler, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Candace Gody, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Candace Pequigney, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Candice Piatkowski, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Candida Benzo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Candy Brister, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carl Cricco, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carl D Abbott, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carla Pritchett, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Campos, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Garrido, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Jorda, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Navarro, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Ravelo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carlos Villavicencio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carly Garvey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmelle Martel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmen Amorin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmen Fuermayor, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmen LaSalle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmen Mercedes, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmen Santiago, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmine DiSapio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carmine Maurice, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carol Benoit, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carol Brumbaugh, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carol Johnson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carol Katarsky, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carol Shiyou, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carolyn Gainey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carolyn Melton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carrie Ayers, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carrie Reeves, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carroll Lamarque, Jr, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Carson Fluharty, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cart Waters, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Catherine Arnaud, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Catherine Avant, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Catherine Frank, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cathy Arnold, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cathy Headley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cathy Mai Thi Nguyen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cathy OBrien, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cecil Hatcher, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cecile Edwards, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Celeste E. White, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Celeste Thomas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Celia McTigue, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cesar Santiago, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chanty Smith, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charinee Bangthamai, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charleen Living Trust, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlene Cummins, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlene Fluharty, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlene Marrero, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Back, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Beale, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Bowden, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Coleman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Duchane, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles England, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Greenblott, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Hartley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Hummer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Robin, III, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charles Vessel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlotte D. Preyear, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlotte Kostelecky, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Charlotte Weekley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cheryl Caruso, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cheryl Gross, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chester Bilbo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chris Boyce, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chris Bradley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chris Davis, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chris Rutherford, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Chris Thrower, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christian Ferroni, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christie Lopez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina Bosse, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina Ewald, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina Kranz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina,Mc Kinnon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina Rizzo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christina Swan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christine Haynes, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christine Shedd, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christine Uttaro, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christine Von dem Bach, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Deharde, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Falgout, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Hotard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Kelly, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Kelso, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Moss, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Swartz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christopher Touriz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Christy Moritz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cindy Salter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Claire Tuepker, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clara Mazzarri, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clarence Anderson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clarence Busbee, Jr., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Claretha McMillan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clatues Brewer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Claudette Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cleon Long, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clifford Henry, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clifford Roy, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clifton Melerine, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clyde Buras, Sr., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Clyde Schafer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cody Sherman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Colin Berthaut, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Colleen Jablonski, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Connie Fineschi, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Connie Vanasdale, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Constance Anderson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cory Mayeus, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Courtney Callihan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cox Moss, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Craig De Mange, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Craig Domingue, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Craig Foxwell, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Craig Hasselschwert, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Crispina Henry, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cristinia Lozano, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Crystal Cox, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Crystal Farve, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Crystal Moss, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Crystal Mullet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cuc Dao, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Curtis Hubbard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Curtis Walley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cynthia Bart, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cynthia Cuff, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cynthia R. Tarver, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Cynthia White, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dailyn Martinez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daimarys Leon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dale Gainey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Damien Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dan Craven, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dan Friel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dana Huff, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dana LeBlanc, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dana Staub, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dane Robinson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Carter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Clough, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Kapalin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Kavanaugh, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Lund, III, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo DANIEL MOON, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Smith, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daniel Tibbetts, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danielle Kapalin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danielle Marie Lang, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danielle Murphy, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danielle Sloan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danielle Willey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danny Headley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Danny Wienstoer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Daphne Leslie, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darina Lumar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darius Allen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darlene Gesualdo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darlene Hall, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darlene Nuccio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darlene Wilson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darrell Wilson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darren Dowell, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Darryl Weiner, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dat Luong, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dave Neste, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David A. Walter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Alan Wiggins, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Bargky, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Blain, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Bosse, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Dorsey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Fores, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David, Frank, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Gross, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Hickman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Lopez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Martin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Meister, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Strasburger & Price LLP, Intervenor-Plaintiff
Officially listed as "David Moore"

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Nguyen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Parker, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David, Richard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Trueblood, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Varnado, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo David Veal, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Davon Jones, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dawn Danese, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dayne Gelpi, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dean B Latusek, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debbie Galle, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debbie Mershon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debbie Mullet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debbie Stafford, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debbie Tombrello, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah A. Hueston, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Braga, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Dambrosio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Dixon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah M. Williams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Moore, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Stewart, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Thompson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deborah Younes, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debra Bryant, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debra Greenwald, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debra Mantrana, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Debra Peoples, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deidre Singleton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Delores Aultman, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Deneen Samples, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Denise Durrance, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Denise Martin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Denise Touriz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Amtmann, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Helper, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Ho, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Martin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Pilet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dennis Vanasdale, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Derrick Peterson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diana Serrano, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Dunn, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Fletcher, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Meister, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Pitre, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Vessel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Diane Wilson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dianne Malone, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dolores Baltuskonis, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dolores Florio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Domenic Gesualdo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dominic Giannini, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dominick Lauria, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Don Boutte, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Don Noldge, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Don Wheeler, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donadio Gaetano, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Candiani, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald E. Tuecke, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Evans, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Fincher, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Gangl, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Lau, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald, Miller, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Presnall, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donald Robohm, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Chisholm, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Feltner, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo DONNA LEE, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Lengel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Leverette, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Malkki, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Polk, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Donna Teitelbaum, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dontroy Thorne, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Doris Tatum, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Doris Taylor, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dorothy Hunter, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dorothy Lee, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dorothy Mae Banks, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dorothy Raucci, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Doug Nuss, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Doug Seratt, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Douglas Black, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Douglas Gottung, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dread Mattox, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Dulce Casanas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Earl Sistrunk, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Earlene Moore, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Earline H. Barbarin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ed St. Fort, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eddie Adams, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eddie C. Cole, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eddie Licon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edgar Alford, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edgar Weisberg, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edith Price, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edith Thompson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edna Spencer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eduardo Amorin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eduardo Lavin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward DeMaio, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward Demirgian, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward Marks, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward Mayo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Herman et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Edward Cain +1 504 581 4892 jcain@hhkc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Scott Epstein +1 504 581 4892 jepstein@hhkc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward Overton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edward Rankins, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Edwin Mullet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eileen Crespo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elaine Birkholz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elaine McKenzie, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elaine Mundt, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elaine Petrella, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elaine Thomas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elia Ruiz, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Bertucci, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Black, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Eleuterius, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Felthus, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Hickey, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Lund, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elizabeth Vollmar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ella Ceasar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ella Engel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ellen DeCarlo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ellen Hirt, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ellen Robinson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elliott Crespo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Elliott Everard, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eloise Lewis, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Emile Gardette, Jr., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Emilia Owen, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Emily Harris, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Emma Hall, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Emmanie Maurice, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Enny Cannestro, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Enock Sanon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Enrique Guerra, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eric Galvan, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eric Grassel, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eric Romain, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eric Tobin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Erica Bowden, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Erika Maysonet, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ernest Coney, Jr., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ernesto Garcia, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Ervin Blaise, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Esperanza Lavin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Esteban Salas, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Estela Riley, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Esther Gonzalez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eugene Bart, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eugene W. Reaves, IV, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eugene Washington, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Eva Ann Montoya, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Evelyn B. Mowers, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Evelyn Dubocq de Vicente, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Evelyn Foster, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Evelyn Moore, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Evelyn Peyton, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Fabio Rainuzzo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Falana Bryant, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Faris Newell, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Faroh Edgar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Farrel Anderson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Fazeel Murdali, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Felician Saunders, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Felton Lewis, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Fifteen Bs, LC, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Flavor Loper, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Florence Iannazzi, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Florencia Eldurone, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Fran Fermoile, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Fran McNealy, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances Barisich, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances Brewer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances E. McRae, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances Nemes, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances O. Richardson, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frances Palmer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Francis Uttaro, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Batiste, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Cardiello, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Elkins, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Gitto, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Harmer, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Maniscalco, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Molden, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Montoya, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Rizzo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frank Vollmar, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hermanmathis.com
No Logo Frankie Jones, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Mathis Casey Kitchens & Gerel, LLP

Name Ph