Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-03351-SBA
District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 1:52 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2010 Nathan Daniel Cardozo +1 415 591 7529 +1 415 591 7510 nathan.cardozo@dbr.com

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by U.C. Berkeley School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Ann Lynch +1 510 642 7515 +1 415 393 2286 jlynch@law.berkeley.edu
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Energy United States Department of Energy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Energy"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/13/2011 Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Office Oakland
Filed 7/22/2009
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County San Francisco
Terminated 7/10/2014
Origin 1
Reopened 3/29/2011
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,E-Filing
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [97] Stipulation of Dismissal in its entirety. Parties to bear fees and costs. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 09/11/14. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014, Terminated: 9/11/2014 Stipulation and Proposed Order
    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Bennett, Michelle) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 95 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Court Filing
        ORDER ([94] STIPULATION Staying Proceedings terminated). ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014, Terminated: 7/10/2014
          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 93 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [92] Stipulation for Enlargement of Time re [90] Order on Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Enlargement of Time re [90] Order on Stipulation, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle R. Bennett)(Bennett, Michelle) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014
                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel: That Michelle Renee Bennett will take the place of Kathryn C. Davis, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of Naitional Intelligence (Bennett, Michelle) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 90 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [89] Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Order on Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014, Terminated: 5/6/2014
                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Order on Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer Lynch)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Court Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [87] Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 87 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014, Terminated: 3/21/2014
                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Production of Records or Supplemental Materials filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Kathryn C. Davis)(Davis, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/20/2014) Modified on 3/21/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [85] Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 85 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014, Terminated: 2/19/2014
                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Production of Records or Supplemental Materials, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Kathryn C. Davis)(Davis, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/14/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                              LREF
                              Blank 84 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Court Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [83] Stipulation re Production of Records or Supplemental Materials (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013
                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Production of Records or Supplemental Materials, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Kathryn C. Davis)(Davis, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013
                                  NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel as to Kathryn Celia Davis, in place of Joel McElvain, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Davis, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 81 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (granting in part and denying in part [63] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [76] Motion for Summary Judgment). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013
                                      NOTICE re [76] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Submitted in Response to Court Order (Dkt. No. 75). Notice of Submitted Matter per LR 7-13 by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: 4/6/2013
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/6/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012
                                          NOTICE re Submitted Matters Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-13 re [76] Cross Motions for Summary Judgment, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012
                                            Reply Memorandum re [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, [76] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 4/20/2012) Modified on 4/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 76 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012, Terminated: 9/30/2013
                                              Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition to [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 4/27/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer Lynch, # (2) Exhibit 1-3, # (3) Exhibit 4-13, # (4) Exhibit 14-18, # (5) Exhibit 19-24, # (6) Proposed Order)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 75 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING [64] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; STRIKING [66] Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, [67] Reply Memorandum, [68] Reply Memorandum. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 04/13/12; Defendants Reply due by 04/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 
                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to [75] Cross Motions due by 4/13/2012. Responses due by 4/13/2012. Replies due by 4/27/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012
                                                    Declaration of Mark Rumold in Support of [73] Reply Memorandum filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2 Part 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 Part 2, # (4) Exhibit 2 Part 3)(Related document(s)[73]) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 2/7/2012) Modified on 2/8/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012
                                                      Reply Memorandum re [66] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/7/2012) Modified on 2/8/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel (removing Marcia Hofmann), filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Entry Appearance of Mark Thomas Rumold, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Date for Filing Reply and Hearing Date as to [64] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants combined Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion, [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, [66] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition. Replies due by 2/7/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/23/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [63] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [66] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012, Terminated: 1/23/2012 Stipulation
                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Date for Filing Reply and Hearing Date re [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, [66] Cross MotionN for Summary Judgment, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer Lynch)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                  ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [75]*** Reply Memorandum re [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, and Memorandum in Opposition to [66] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 1/10/2012) Modified on 1/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                    ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [75]*** Reply Memorandum re [63] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 1/10/2012) Modified on 1/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011, Terminated: 4/3/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                      ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [75]*** Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT NO. [65]], filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer Lynch, # (2) Exhibit 1-3, # (3) Exhibit 4-13, # (4) Exhibit 14-18, # (5) Exhibit 19-24, # (6) Proposed Order)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011, Terminated: 12/20/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT [66]*** MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/3/2012. Replies due by 1/10/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer Lynch, # (2) Exhibit 1-3, # (3) Exhibit 4-13, # (4) Exhibit 14-18, # (5) Exhibit 19-24, # (6) Proposed Order)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011, Terminated: 4/3/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants combined Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 11/21/2011, Terminated: 9/30/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 12/20/2011. Replies due by 1/10/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Margaret Baines, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Margaret Baines - Exhibit A, # (3) Declaration Declaration of Andrew Fausett, # (4) Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Fausett - Exhibit A, # (5) Declaration Declaration of John Hackett (part 1 of 2), # (6) Declaration Declaration of John Hackett (part 2 of 2), # (7) Exhibit Declaratin of John Hackett - Exhibit A, # (8) Exhibit Declaration of John Hackett - Exhibit B, # (9) Exhibit Declaration of John Hackett - Exhibit C (part 1 of 2), # (10) Exhibit Declaration of John Hackett - Exhibit C (part 2 of 2), # (11) Exhibit Declaration of John Hackett - Exhibitss D-I, # (12) Exhibit Declaratin of John Hackett - Exhibit J, # (13) Declaration Declaration of David Hardy, # (14) Exhibit Declaration of David Hardy - Exhibits, # (15) Declaration Declaration of Caryn Hargrave, # (16) Exhibit Declaration of Caryn Hargrave - Exhibit A, # (17) Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Stipulation
                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 11/18/2011) Modified on 11/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 11/4/2011) Modified on 11/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/20/2011) Modified on 10/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order, filed by Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 10/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal with Respect to Defendant CIA and Proposed Order, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Sercurity Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice as to Defendants Department of Energy, Department of State and Office of the Attorney General, with each party bearing its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal with Proposed Order, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/18/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Department of Justice. (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer Ann Lynch as Counsel, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Department of Justice. (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order re processing of records by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle R. Freeny)(Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 8/9/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Proposed Order re processing of records by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle R. Freeny)(Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 6/15/2010) Modified on 6/16/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Nathan D. Cardoza as Counsel, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Corrected Status Report re [43] Status Report, filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Second Declaration of Dennis J. Argall)(Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                  SECOND STATUS REPORT by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Dennis J. Argall)(Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 4/20/2010) Modified on 4/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Freeny, Kyle) (Filed on 4/20/2010) Modified on 4/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, filed (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/18/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order re production of all records determined to be responsive and not exempt from disclosure, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Eletronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Joel McElvain)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION as to Schedule for Processing by DOD and DIA, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Joel McElvain)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/1/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 
                                                                                                                              ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART [13] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, GRANTING [26] Motion to Stay. Defendants shall file status reports every 120 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order re [36] Motion, [13] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [26] Motion to Stay filed, by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Modified on 12/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2009 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 12/15/2009). (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing to 1/12/2010 at 01:00 PM and Case Management Conference to 1/12/2010 at 01:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Case Management Conference to 12/15/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland and Motion Hearing to 12/15/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference to 12/8/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009) Modified on 11/25/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum re [26] MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Respect to FBI filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified on 11/18/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 11/13/2009) Modified on 11/16/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re [26] Motion for Stay of Proceedings with Respect to FBI filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit 5-6)(Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re [13] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 11/4/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Briefing Schedule, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [13] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Ann Pustay, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of William T. Kammer, # (3) Affidavit Declaration of Alesia Y. Williams, # (4) Affidavit Declaration of Martha M. Lutz, # (5) Affidavit Declaration of Diane M. Janosek, # (6) Affidavit Declaration of John F. Hackett, # (7) Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009, Terminated: 12/21/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Respect to FBI, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of David M. Hardy, # (2) Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 
                                                                                                                                                          ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 10/27/09. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re [24] Clerks Notice (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE: The Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT [24]*** CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: re [24] Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/27/09 at 10:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment :, Motions terminated: [11] MOTION to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/14/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation *CORRECTED VERSION (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                              ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT [20]*** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Amendment of [12] Declaration of Nathan Cardoza in Support of Motion to Shorten Time (Attachments: # (1) Amended Declaration in Support of Motion to Shorten Time) by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re [11] Motion to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 10/1/2009) Modified on 10/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nathan Cardozo in Support of [13] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit 5-8, # (3) Exhibit 9-12, # (4) Exhibit 13-16, # (5) Exhibit 17-19, # (6) Exhibit 20-22, # (7) Exhibit 23-26)(Related document(s)[13]) (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 12/21/2009 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2009 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Nathan Cardozo in Support of [11] Motion to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[11]) (Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009, Terminated: 10/15/2009 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cardozo, Nathan) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Proposed Order re FOIA Agreement, by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 9/28/2009) Modified on 9/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation of Summons and Complaint (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint byCentral Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2009 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING [5] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David L. Sobel (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009, Terminated: 8/3/2009 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David L. Sobel ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003923.) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2009. Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2009 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order - SBA)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611034587.). Filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009) Modified on 7/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?