Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority v. Orrstown Financial Services, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00993
District Judge Sylvia H. Rambo, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Sylvia H. Rambo
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 4:17 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Plaintiff

Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Represented by Law Offices of Kimberly Donaldson Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Donaldson Smith +1 610 642 8500
v.
No Logo Andrea Pugh, Defendant
No Logo Anthony F. Ceddia, Defendant
No Logo Bradley S. Everly, Defendant

Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID E. EDWARDS +1 215 864 7166 edwardsd@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Glenn W. Snoke, Defendant
No Logo Gregory A. Rosenberry, Defendant
No Logo Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Defendant

Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Monhait +1 215 665 2084 jmonhait@cozen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Weil +1 215 665 2000 +1 215 665 2013 jweil@cozen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. WILKINSON +1 215 665 3737 twilkinson@cozen.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam D. Gold +1 212 403 1046 adgold@wlrk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com

Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Jeffrey W. Coy, Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Defendant

Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Joel R. Zullinger, Defendant
No Logo John S. Ward, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Defendant
No Logo Mark K. Keller, Defendant
No Logo Orrstown Bank, Defendant
No Logo Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sandler O'neill & Partners, L.p., Defendant

Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Monhait +1 215 665 2084 jmonhait@cozen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Weil +1 215 665 2000 +1 215 665 2013 jweil@cozen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. WILKINSON +1 215 665 3737 twilkinson@cozen.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam D. Gold +1 212 403 1046 adgold@wlrk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com

Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SETH L. LAVER +1 267 519 6800 slaver@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN S. ZISS +1 267 519 6800 +1 267 519 6801 jziss@goldbergsegalla.com

Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Thomas R. Quinn, Jr., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kimberly M. Donaldson, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/17/17. (rw) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Timothy N. Mathews, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/17/17. (rw) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kimberly M. Donaldson Smith on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Attorney Kimberly Donaldson Smith is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4253732., filed by on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Timothy N Mathews on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Attorney Timothy Mathews is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4252906., filed by on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(Mathews, Timothy) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management deadlines applicable to this case are revised as follows: Discovery due by 3/1/2018. Class Certification, Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 12/15/2017. Defendant Expert Report is due by 1/15/2018. Other deadlines: Plaintiff Expert Report is due by: 3/16/2018. Defendant Expert Report is due by 4/16/17. Pretrial Memos due by 12/4/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Yvette Kane. Trial set for 1/7/2019 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 4 before Honorable Yvette Kane. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/15/17. (rw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER - upon consideration of the parties Joint Request 135 for a Telephonic Status Conference to Establish an Amended Discovery and PretrialSchedule, IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties request is GRANTED, and atelephone status conference shall be held on August 15, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/11/17. (rw) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for -- Joint Request for Telephonic Status Conference to Establish an Amended Discovery and Pretrial Schedule by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Saler, Christina) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROTECTIVE ORDER governing the production and exchange of confidential information. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/6/17. (sc) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER - CASE PLACED ON COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - IT IS ORDERED that the following dates apply in this case: Discovery due by 11/3/2017. Jury Selection & Trial set for 10/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 4 before Honorable Yvette Kane. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in Harrisburg - Chambers 4 before Honorable Yvette Kane.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/30/17. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES. (sc) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Revised) on behalf of SEPTA and All Defendants by JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Thomas R. Quinn, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Stipulated Protective Order)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Tiffany J Cramer on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Attorney Tiffany J Cramer is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3990205., filed by on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(Cramer, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JOINT) ON BEHALF OF SEPTA AND ALL DEFENDANTS by JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Thomas R. Quinn, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Stipulated Protective Order)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 101 Amended Complaint, by JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Thomas R. Quinn, Jr.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Orrstown Defendants and IndividualDefendants Ceddia, Coy, Embly, Every, Keller, Pugh, Quinn, Rosenberry,Shoemaker, Snoke, Ward, and Zullinger, (Doc. No. 107), is GRANTED INPART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant SEK (Doc. No. 105), seeking dismissal of Counts 2 and 6, is GRANTED in its entirety. The Motion to Dismiss filed by the Underwriter Defendants (Doc. No. 109),seeking dismissal of Counts 2 and 3, is GRANTED in its entirety. Defendants Motion to Strike (Doc. No. 114), is DENIED. 114 109 107 105 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT a joint case management telephone conference will beheld on January 27, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. The telephonenumber of the Court is 717-221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/7/16. (sc) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/7/16. (sc) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC re 122 Notice, of SEK's Response to Notice of Subsequent Event (Laver, Seth) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. re 122 Notice, of filing Underwriter Defendants' Response to Notice of Subsequent Event (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 122 Notice, Plaintiff's Response to the Orrstown Defendants' Notice of Subsequent Event that was Filed in Further Support of the Orrstown Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Subsequent Event in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint, filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 7.36, filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 114 Joint MOTION to Strike 112 Declaration,, Submitted on Behalf of All Defendants filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB A, # 2 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB B, # 3 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB C, # 4 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB D, # 5 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB E, # 6 Unpublished Opinion(s) TAB F)(Edwards, David) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 114 Joint MOTION to Strike 112 Declaration,, Submitted on Behalf of All Defendants filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Unpublished Opinion(s) Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 114 Joint MOTION to Strike 112 Declaration,, Submitted on Behalf of All Defendants filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC.(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF re 107 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Strike 112 Declaration,, Submitted on Behalf of All Defendants by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC.(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 112 Declaration,, (Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 111 Brief in Opposition, -- Declaration of Kimberly Donaldson Smith in Support of Plaintiff SEPTA's Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K - PART 1, # 12 Exhibit(s) K - PART 2, # 13 Exhibit(s) K - PART 3, # 14 Exhibit(s) K - PART 4, # 15 Exhibit(s) K - PART 5, # 16 Exhibit(s) K - PART 6, # 17 Exhibit(s) L, # 18 Exhibit(s) M)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 107 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM -- Plaintiff SEPTA's Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s), # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Appendix Ex. A, # 4 Appendix Ex. B, # 5 Appendix Ex. C, # 6 Appendix Ex. D, # 7 Appendix Ex. E)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 107 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Creagan, David) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC.(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s))(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the (1) The Orrstown Defendants, the Underwriter Defendants, and the Auditor Defendant shall file any motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and supporting briefs by 3/18/16. (2) Plaintiff shall file an omnibus opposition to the Defendants motions to dismiss by 4/8/16. (5) The telephonic conference scheduled for March 2, 2016, is cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, based on the Courts above briefing schedule,Defendants Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 102) is HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT. 102 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/25/16 (sc) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(sc) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Amend the complaint is GRANTED. Status Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2016 at 11:30 AM. Pltf's cnsl shall initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/8/16. (sc) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/8/16. (sc) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 98 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff SEPTA's Motion for leave to Amend in Accordance with Local Rule 15.1 filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff SEPTA's Motion for leave to Amend in Accordance with Local Rule 15.1 filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff SEPTA's Motion for Leave to Amend in Accordance with L.R. 15.1 re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff SEPTA's Motion for leave to Amend in Accordance with Local Rule 15.1 filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Summary of Actions Required by Written Agreement, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - Additional Actions Required by Pennsylvania Department of Banking)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff SEPTA's Motion for leave to Amend in Accordance with Local Rule 15.1 by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - Redline of Amended Class Action Complaint to SAC, # 3 Proposed Order)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas G. Wilkinson (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint, accompanied by the proposed amendment in the form dictated by Local Rule 15.1, or a Notice of Intention to Stand on the Amended Complaint. 58 56 53 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/22/15. (sc) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/22/15. (sc) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 66 Brief in Opposition,, Supplemental Filing in Further Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Omnicare Opinion)(Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger re 87 Order, (Defendants' Joint Memorandum Addressing the Supreme Court's Omnicare Decision, Submitted in Further Support of Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint). (Creagan, David) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE TO UNREGISTERED ECF ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTIES regarding the filing of 88 Transcript. A copy of transcript was sent to Adam Gold, Bradley Wilson on 3/31/15. (lh) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Proceedings held on 4/29/14 before Judge Kane. Court Reporter L. Shuey, Telephone Number 717-215-1270. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (ctrep1, ) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than 4/10/2015, the parties shall each file a memorandum, not to exceed 10 pages, to address the U.S. Supreme Court's decision in Case Number 13-435 issued 3/24/2015. 86 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/25/15. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (sc) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority -- Plaintiff SEPTA's Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.36 (Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
COURT REPORTER STENOGRAPHIC NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by L. Shuey of oral argument before Judge Kane on 4/29/14. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Kane on 4/29/14. By s/ L. Shuey. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (ctrep1, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC re 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service Notice of Supplemental Authority (Laver, Seth) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 66 Brief in Opposition,, -- Plaintiff SEPTA's Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.36 (Donaldson Smith, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT oral argument on the Orrstown Defendants motion to dismiss is RESCHEDULED to April 29, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom No. 4, Eighth Floor, Federal Building, Third and Walnut Streets, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania. 53 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/28/2014. (sc) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
ORDER granting 79 Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Oral argument on the defendants respective Motions to Dismiss, previously scheduled for February 7, 2014, is rescheduled to March 27, 2014 at a hearing commencing at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom No. 4. (eo) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue February 7, 2014 Hearing by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC.(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Oral Argument is GRANTED. Argument shall be presented on 2/7/14 at a hearing commencing at 10:00am in Courtroom #4. 58 56 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/23/13. (sc) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 76 MOTION Opportunity to Present Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Compendium in support of Motion for Oral Argument, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION Opportunity to Present Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
Letter from Cozen O'Connor . (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth L. Laver on behalf of SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Laver, Seth) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT oral argument on the Orrstown Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 55) 55 is set for 2/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 4 before Honorable Yvette Kane.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/5/13. (sc) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit(s) Ex.1 to Appendix, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 to Appendix, # 4 Exhibit(s) Ex. 3 to Appendix, # 5 Exhibit(s) Ex. 4 to Appendix, # 6 Exhibit(s) Ex. 5 to Appendix, # 7 Exhibit(s) Ex. 6 to Appendix, # 8 Exhibit(s) Ex. 7 to Appendix, # 9 Exhibit(s) Ex. 8 to Appendix, # 10 Exhibit(s) Ex. 9 to Appendix, # 11 Exhibit(s) Ex. 10 to Appendix, # 12 Exhibit(s) Ex. 11 to Appendix, # 13 Exhibit(s) Ex. 12 to Appendix, # 14 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Ziss, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
Supplement by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. to 68 Reply Brief, . (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Compendium of Unpublished Decisions)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
APPENDIX by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. to 68 Reply Brief, . (Creagan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 53 MOTION to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 66 Brief in Opposition,, Declaration of Kimberly Donaldson Smith in Support of Plaintiff SEPTA's Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D-1, # 5 Exhibit(s) D-2, # 6 Exhibit(s) D-3, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 53 MOTION to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint, 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 54 MOTION for Order to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint, 55 MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint, 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeffrey M. Monhait, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 12, 2013. (sc) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Adam Gold, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 12, 2013. (sc) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeffrey G. Weil, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 12, 2013. (sc) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Bradley R. Wilson, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 12, 2013. (sc) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger re 53 MOTION to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint . (Creagan, David) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 53 MOTION to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint filed by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s), # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix, # 8 Appendix, # 9 Appendix, # 10 Appendix, # 11 Appendix, # 12 Appendix, # 13 Appendix, # 14 Appendix, # 15 Appendix, # 16 Appendix, # 17 Appendix, # 18 Appendix, # 19 Appendix, # 20 Appendix, # 21 Appendix, # 22 Appendix, # 23 Appendix, # 24 Appendix)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Unreported Decisions)(Ziss, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service by SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC.(Ziss, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s), # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix, # 8 Appendix, # 9 Appendix, # 10 Appendix, # 11 Appendix, # 12 Appendix, # 13 Appendix, # 14 Appendix, # 15 Appendix, # 16 Appendix, # 17 Appendix, # 18 Appendix, # 19 Appendix, # 20 Appendix, # 21 Appendix, # 22 Appendix, # 23 Appendix, # 24 Appendix, # 25 Appendix)(Creagan, David) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Order to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger.(Creagan, David) Modified on 5/29/2013 (jc). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss SEPTA's Amended Complaint by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger.(Creagan, David) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas G. Wilkinson on behalf of JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. Attorney Jeffrey M. Monhait is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2790347.. (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas G. Wilkinson on behalf of JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. Attorney Adam D. Gold is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2790343.. (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas G. Wilkinson on behalf of JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. Attorney Bradley R. Wilson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2790339.. (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas G. Wilkinson on behalf of JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. Attorney Jeffrey G. Weil is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2790326.. (Wilkinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1)The Orrstown Defts shall collectively move to dismiss the amdcmp shall file their brsup by 5/28/13 and such brief shall not exceed 75 pages. 2)Auditor Deft shall move to dismiss the amdcmp and shall file a brief in support by 5/28/13 and such brief shall not exceed 75 pages. 3)Underwrite Defts shall move to dismiss the amdcmp and shall file a brief in support by 5/28/13 and such brief shall not exceed 75 pages. 4)Pltf shall file its opp to each of those mtns by 7/22/13 and each opp brief shall not exceed 75 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on March 27, 2013. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS. (sc) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 44 Status Report Order, by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC waiver sent on 3/4/2013, answer due 5/3/2013. (Saler, Christina) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P. waiver sent on 3/4/2013, answer due 5/3/2013. (Saler, Christina) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before March 18, 2013, informing the Court whether a telephonic conference is necessary at this time and, if the parties agree that a conference is not necessary, providing the Court with proposed deadlines for the briefing of a motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 3/8/13. (pw) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. JEFFREY W. EMBLY waiver sent on 3/4/2013, answer due 5/6/2013. (Saler, Christina) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEFFREY W. EMBLY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (jc) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF SECTIONS 11, 12(a) AND 15 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933 AND SECTIONS 10(b) AND 20(a) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 against Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger, JEFFREY W. EMBLY, SMITH ELLIOTT KEARNS & COMPANY, LLC, SANDLER O'NEILL & PARTNERS L.P., JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC, filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 38 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. The amended complaint is due by 3/22/13. SEE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 1/11/13. (sc) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 36 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Movant is to file its amended complt by 1/16/13 or otherwise advise the Court prior to that time of circumstances that require the parties to request a further enlargement of time. Upon filing of Movant's amdcmp, the Court will issue an order for a telephonic scheduling conference. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Oct. 26, 2012. (sc) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - The telephonic scheduling conference set to be held on September 27, 2012, at 11:00 a.m., is CANCELED. See order for further deatails. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 9/27/12. (pw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed First Scheduling Order)(Saler, Christina) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SEPTA's Mtn for Appt as Lead Plaintiff and for approval of Selection of Lead Counsel is GRANTED. Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority is APPOINTED AS LEAD PLAINTIFF and the selecti on of Chimicles and Tikellis LLP is APPROVED. A Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/27/2012 at 11:00 AM to address the matters identified in the Court's June 28, 2012 order. Counsel for pltf shall initiate the call. 32 28 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on August 20, 2012. SEE MEMORANDUM.(sc)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SEPTA's Mtn for Appt as Lead Plaintiff and for approval of Selection of Lead Counsel is GRANTED. Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority is APPOINTED AS LEAD PLAINTIFF and the selection of Chimicles and Tikellis LLP is APPROVED. A Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/27/2012 at 11:00 AM to address the matters identified in the Court's June 28, 2012 order. Counsel for pltf shall initiate the call. 32 28 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on August 20, 2012. SEE MEMORANDUM.(sc) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority re 28 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Its Selection of Lead Counsel , 29 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Notice of Supplemental Filing In Further Support Of SEPTA's Motion To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff And For Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel (Saler, Christina) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christina Donato Saler, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on July 31, 2012. (sc) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nicholas E. Chimicles, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on July 31, 2012. (sc) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Pltf's 28 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Brief was Originally filed as part of 28 Motion)(rm, ) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION Plaintiff's Motion To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Its Selection of Lead Counsel , filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Septa's Memorandum in Support of LP Motion, # 3 Saler Declaration in Support of Septa's LP Motion)(Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Creagan on behalf of All Defendants (Creagan, David) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER - Dfts shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint at this time. Pltf shall not be required to file a motion for class certification on 8/23/12 which is 90 days from the filing of its complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 28, 2012. SEE ORDER. (sc) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 25, 2012. (sc) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED ORDER] by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Orrstown Bank identifying Corporate Parent Orrstown Financial Services, Inc. for Orrstown Bank. (Edwards, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Anthony F. Ceddia, Jeffrey W. Coy, Bradley S. Everly, Mark K. Keller, Orrstown Bank, Orrstown Financial Services, Inc., Andrea Pugh, Thomas R. Quinn, Jr, Gregory A. Rosenberry, Kenneth R. Shoemaker, Glenn W. Snoke, John S. Ward, Joel R. Zullinger. (Edwards, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Edwards on behalf of All Defendants (Edwards, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 06/01/12. (ma, ) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Benjamin F. Johns on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Attorney Christina Saler is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2493189.. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Benjamin F. Johns on behalf of Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Attorney Nicholas Chimicles is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2493178.. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Joel R. Zullinger served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. John S. Ward served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Glenn W. Snoke served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Kenneth R. Shoemaker served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Gregory A. Rosenberry served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Thomas R. Quinn, Jr served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Andrea Pugh served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Orrstown Financial Services, Inc. served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Orrstown Bank served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Mark K. Keller served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Bradley S. Everly served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Jeffrey W. Coy served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Anthony F. Ceddia served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Johns, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT - n/c to counsel, jury trial demanded ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 0314-2488732) filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certification)(pjr) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 332 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?