MOBLEY et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02073

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 9:28 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NZINGA ISLAM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Security Counselors

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Brian McClanahan +1 301 728 5908 +1 240 681 2189 kel@nationalsecuritylaw.org
No Logo SHARIF MOBLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Security Counselors

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Brian McClanahan +1 301 728 5908 +1 240 681 2189 kel@nationalsecuritylaw.org
v.
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-2072 and 11-2073 by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of 11-2072 by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/16/2013, Entered: None
      Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/16/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 60 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 42 Defendant Department of Defense's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 7, 2013. (lcbah1)
          LREF
          Blank 60 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 42 Defendant Department of Defense's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 7, 2013. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 42 Defendant Department of Defense's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 7, 2013. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
              Memorandum in opposition to re 57 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H - McClanahan PA request, # 2 Exhibit I - McClanahan PA response, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/10/2012, Entered: None
                  ERRATA by SHARIF MOBLEY 55 Surreply, filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/10/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                    SURREPLY to re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - Larson opp'n, # 2 Exhibit G - Notes)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sur-Reply) by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                          SEALED Exhibit C to Second Argall Declaration filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. re 51 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Exhibit by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 50 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit 1 - Second Williams Declaration, # 2 Declaration Exhibit 2 - Second Argall Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Second Argall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Second Argall Declaration)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                  SEALED Exhibit E filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(rdj) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sealed Exhibit by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wikileaks email, # 2 Exhibit B - State-FBI email 1, # 3 Exhibit C - State-FBI email 2, # 4 Exhibit D - State visit email, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                              Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex 1 - CIA Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to CIA Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to CIA Declaration, # 4 Vaughn Index, # 5 Declaration Ex 2 - OPMG Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1 to OPMG Declaration, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 39 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and denying as moot 37 Defendants' Motion to Strike the First Amended Complaint. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 15, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 39 Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Littleton, Judson) Modified on 8/13/2012 to edit event (dr). (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION to Strike 36 Amended Complaint filed by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Littleton-McClanahan email, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Strike 36 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by SHARIF MOBLEY.(znmw, ) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER denying Plaintiffs' request to reference classified information in their opposition to 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order for further discussion. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 18, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE re 32 Response to Order of the Court filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY re 29 MOTION to Clarify 3 July 2012 Order (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 28 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE re 29 MOTION to Clarify 3 July 2012 Order filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Stay re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Clarify 3 July 2012 Order by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 19 plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference Regarding Use of Potentially Classified Information. The plaintiffs shall, by July 6, 2012, advise the Court of the specific legal issues for which resolution, in the plaintiffs' view, requires the Court to assess facts that implicate classified information. The government shall file a response to the plaintiffs' brief, if any, by July 9, 2012. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Seal Document re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of In Camera Filing by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Summary Judgment - Declaration of Dennis J. Argall, # 2 Exhibit A to Argall Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Argall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Argall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Argall Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Argall Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Argall Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Argall Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Argall Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Argall Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Argall Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Argall Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Argall Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Argall Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Argall Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to Argall Declaration, # 17 Exhibit P to Argall Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Q to Argall Declaration, # 19 Exhibit R to Argall Declaration, # 20 Exhibit S to Argall Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 2 to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Status Conference Regarding Use of Potentially Classified Information filed by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - McClanahan declaration)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE re 19 MOTION for Status Conference Regarding Use of Potentially Classified Information filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Additional Information by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY re 19 MOTION for Status Conference Regarding Use of Potentially Classified Information (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Mark A. Clark, U.S. Special Operations Command by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Clark Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Clark Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Clark Declaration)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Alesia Y. Williams, Defense Intelligence Agency by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Williams Declaration)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Status Conference Regarding Use of Potentially Classified Information by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY re 17 Response to motion filed by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE re 16 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Crider Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Littleton-McClanahan email)(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified on 10/19/2012 (jeb, ). (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ANSWER to 3 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 22, 2011. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/8/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/6/2012. (rdj) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rdj) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/6/2011 (rdj) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 12/8/2011 (rdj) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of All Defendants (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY. Case related to Case No. 11-1437. (rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by SHARIF MOBLEY, NZINGA ISLAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCVR 5.1(e). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 11/8/2011. (rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCVR 5.1(e) by NZINGA ISLAM, SHARIF MOBLEY (rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?