Cybernet Entertainment LLC v. IG Media Incorporated et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-01101
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 6:27 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Cybernet Entertainment LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Freeman Law Firm, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer D. Freeman +1 253 383 4500 +1 253 383 4501 sfreeman@freemanlawfirm.org

Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad Lorin Belville +1 480 203 5861 +1 602 297 6953 cbelville@azbar.org
v.
No Logo IG Media Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Dioguardi Flynn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Patrick Flynn +1 480 951 8808 +1 480 951 8824 jflynn@dioguardiflynn.com
Space Peter Jon Moolenaar +1 480 951 8806 +1 480 951 8824 pmoolenaar@dioguardiflynn.com

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Marc Fray-Witzer +1 617 426 0000 +5078 507 507 8043 evan@cfwlegal.com
No Logo Igor Gens, Defendant
No Logo International Media Limited, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com
Space Matthew Shayefar +1 617 928 1806 +1 617 928 1802 matt@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Marc Fray-Witzer +1 617 426 0000 +5078 507 507 8043 evan@cfwlegal.com
No Logo Unknown Parties, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo JASON TUCKER, Movant

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Libby Hougland Banks +1 602 375 6752 +1 602 795 0072 Libbybanks@yahoo.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (152) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Order Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 147 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Notice of Settlement
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Report - Status
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 141 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Report - Status
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Lodged Proposed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Notice of Errata
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 113 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Notice of Reassignment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Notice of Service of Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
ORDER denying 105 non-party Jason Tucker's Notice of Compliance and Request for Award of Fees [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/23/14.(MAW) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
*REPLY to Response to Motion re: 105 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jason Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Libby Banks in Support of Attorney's Fees, # 2 Invoice of Jason Tucker, # 3 Email dated October 30, 2013 from John Flynn)(Banks, Libby) *Modified to correct filer on 4/23/2014* (REW). (Entered: 04/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Notice of Service of Discovery
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Igor Gens. (Flynn, John) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Notice of Service of Discovery
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by IG Media Incorporated, International Media Limited. (Flynn, John) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re: 105 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jason Tucker filed by Igor Gens, IG Media Incorporated, International Media Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Flynn, John) Modified on 4/15/2014 (REW). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Motion for Attorney Fees
*Second MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jason Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding fees)(Banks, Libby) *Modified to correct filer on 4/23/2014* (REW). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/20/14.(MAW) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
ORDER denying 102 Defendants' Request for Hearing on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14.(MAW) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion for Hearing
*MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Compel by Defendants Igor Gens, IG Media Incorporated, International Media Limited.. (Flynn, John) *Modified from Request on 2/10/2014* (REW). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 98 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Unknown Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Email, # 2 Exhibit B, Declaration, # 3 C, Invoice)(Banks, Libby) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. IT IS ORDERED that Jason Tucker shall have until January 22, 2014, to file his Response to the Motion to Compel Production 98 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/13/14.(MAW) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Compel Production by Unknown Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banks, Libby) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Production by Igor Gens, IG Media Incorporated, International Media Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Flynn, John) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Service Executed
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Order on Motion for TRO
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Motion for TRO
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Scheduling Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Set/Reset Hearings
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Notice of Errata
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013 Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: 12/27/2012 Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Lodged Proposed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Motion to Dismiss Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: 10/16/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 New Case Opened
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 Summons Submitted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 Complaint
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 410 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?