Koninklijke Philips Electronics N v. v. Seoul Semiconductor Company Ltd
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:11-cv-00356

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 11:17 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward David Johnson +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2064 wjohnson@mayerbrown.com
Space Cliff Maier cmaier@mayerbrown.com
Space Michael A. Molano +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 mmolano@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
Space Luke B Weiger +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 lukeweiger@quinnemanuel.com
Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC, Plaintiff
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, Counter-Claimant
Philips Electronics North America Corporation Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor Inc, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aslan Baghdadi +1 202 637 2216 +1 202 637 2201 aslan.baghdadi@lw.com
Space Lawrence J. Gotts +1 202 637 2384 +1 202 637 2201 lawrence.gotts@lw.com
Space Franklin Devin Kang +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 franklin.kang@lw.com
Space Michael A. Ladra +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 mike.ladra@lw.com
Space Ryan R Owens +1 714 540 1235 +1 714 755 8290 ryan.owens@lw.com
Space Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukens Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lee Jonak +1 415 433 3000 +1 415 781 1034 jenny@jonak.com
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor Inc, Defendant
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, Counter-Defendant
Philips Electronics North America Corporation Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Seoul Semiconductor, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit Patent
  Entries (150) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 (TERMED) Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Stipulation to Dismiss Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 (TERMED) Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Transcript (CV)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Amended Minutes
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Order on Application to Seal Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Application to Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Stipulation to Stay Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Response in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/28/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 (TERMED) Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Transcript (CV)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Reply (Motion related)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Exhibit
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: The parties stipulate to and petition the court to enter the following Stipulated Protective Order. The parties acknowledge that this Order does not confer blanket protections on all di sclosures or responses to discovery and that the protection it affords from public disclosure and use extends only to the limited information or items that are entitled to confidential treatment under the applicable legal principles. The parties furt her acknowledge, as set forth in Section 13.3, below, that this Protective Order does not entitle them to file confidential information under seal; Civil Local Rule 79-5 sets forth the procedures that must be followed and the standards that will be applied when a party seeks permission from the court to file material under seal. (See document for further details.) (rla)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Order on Application to Seal Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Application to Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Statement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Order on Application to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Application to Seal
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Ex Parte Applicaton for Leave
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Application to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Order on Motion to Stay Order (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 (TERMED) Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: 10/5/2011 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 (TERMED) Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Motion to Stay Order (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/30/2011 Amended Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 (TERMED) Order on Notice/Request of Settlement Procedure 3 - (ADR-1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Notice of Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Order on Application for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Ex Parte Application for Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?