Timothy Lewis Whiting v. Stan Henry et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-00552

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 3:04 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Timothy Lewis Whiting, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Lewis Whiting TW92240@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo A Lemus, Defendant
No Logo Adams, Defendant
No Logo Agua Caliente Band Of Cahuilla Indians, Defendant
No Logo Agua Caliente Casino Resort Spa, Defendant
No Logo Agua Caliente Tribal Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Anita Singleterry, Defendant
No Logo Bill Buckley, Defendant
No Logo Bob Buster, Defendant
No Logo Bower Events, Defendant
No Logo Brad Ramos, Defendant
No Logo Bud England, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn McMillin, Defendant
No Logo Chaney, Defendant
No Logo Chris May, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Gelinas, Defendant
No Logo Christopher N Mandarano, Defendant
No Logo City of Cathedral City, California, Defendant
No Logo City of Indio, California, Defendant
No Logo City of Palm Springs, California, Defendant
No Logo Cleary, Defendant
No Logo Corwin Deveas, Defendant
No Logo County of Riverside, Defendant
No Logo County of Riverside Board of Supervisors, Defendant
No Logo Covington, Defendant
No Logo Craig T., Defendant
No Logo Daliah H., Defendant
No Logo Dan Wilham, Defendant
No Logo David G Dominguez, Defendant
No Logo David Justice Lynch Associates, Defendant
No Logo David Justin Lynch, Defendant
No Logo David Rabern, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Inocencio, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Blair, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Donald Crager, Defendant
No Logo Elders, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo Eric Ken Shinseki, Defendant
No Logo Eureka Aerospace, Defendant
No Logo Gary Gemberling, Defendant
No Logo Horkel, Defendant
No Logo Infragard Los Angeles Members Alliance, Defendant
No Logo International Counterintelligence Services Inc, Defendant
No Logo James R Clapper, Defendant
No Logo James Tatoian, Defendant
No Logo Jan Jones, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Janet Ann Napolitano, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Stone, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Bird, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Carbajal, Defendant
No Logo Joe McMillin, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 41, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 44, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo John Does 42-43, Defendant
No Logo John F Tavaglione, Defendant
No Logo John J Benoit, Defendant
No Logo Jose Nunez, Defendant
Harris, Kamala Devi Harris, Kamala Devi, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kamala Harris "
No Logo Kathleen Sebelius, Defendant
No Logo Keith B Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Connor, Defendant
No Logo Larry Gaines, Defendant
No Logo Laura Hanlon, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence P Best, Defendant
No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Marion Ashley, Defendant
No Logo Michael Rabern, Defendant
No Logo Michael Studer, Defendant
No Logo Mikel Oglesby, Defendant
No Logo Mullen, Defendant
No Logo Paragon Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ponce, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Gregory, Defendant
No Logo Regina Canale-Miles, Defendant
No Logo Richard Pickowitz, Defendant
No Logo Riverside County District Attorney's Office, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Robert Pickowitz, Defendant
No Logo Robertson, Defendant
No Logo Ron Ayala, Defendant
No Logo Ronald B Himelman, Defendant
No Logo Salvador Sandoval, Defendant
No Logo Shaun L Donovan, Defendant
No Logo Stan Henry, Defendant
No Logo Stanley Sniff, Defendant
No Logo Steven M Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Sunline Transit Agency, Defendant
No Logo T Brothers, Defendant
No Logo Tenet Healthsystem Desert Inc, Defendant
No Logo Timothy J Healy, Defendant
No Logo Tom Neilson, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Defendants, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Informant Does 101-1000, Defendant
No Logo Vegas, Defendant
No Logo Warren Norried, Defendant
No Logo William Bower Associates Inc, Defendant
No Logo William, Michael, Defendant
No Logo William Richard Bower , Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Order on Request for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV 60)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Request and Declaration to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV 60)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?