Kickapoo Run LLC v. McKesson Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-09929
District Judge S. James Otero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 6:15 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by White Field Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@whitefieldinc.com
v.
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawrence, George B.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karineh Khachatourian +1 650 847 4150
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 dismissal) (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Kickapoo Run LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, DENYING Stipulation to Extend Time to respond to complaint to 3/16/12 10 (lc) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 10 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kerrane, Sara) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 10 . The following error(s) was found: Missing Proposed order which was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 03/16/2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karineh Khachatourian in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Kerrane, Sara) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sara N Kerrane on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Kerrane, Sara) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to McKesson Corporation answer now due 3/2/2012, filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation.(Khachatourian, Karineh) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karineh Khachatourian on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE S. JAMES OTERO by Judge S. James Otero, (lc) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 08-05 (CV-52)Court Filing
                          ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 11-09929 SJO(PJWx). (rn) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                            REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (et) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                              CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Plaintiff Kickapoo Run LLC. (et) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Complaint - (Discovery)Court Filing
                                COMPLAINT against Defendant McKesson Corporation. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kickapoo Run LLC. (et) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?