One-E-Way Inc v. Imation Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00608
District Judge Margaret M. Morrow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 1:18 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo One-e-way, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fernald Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C Fernald +1 323 410 0320 +1 323 410 0330 brandon@fernaldlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D Stanger +1 323 410 0300 +1 323 310 0330 rachel.stanger@fernaldlawgroup.com

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 notice of dismissal) (bp) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE Of Dismissal Of Action With Prejudice As To Defendant Imation Corporation filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by One-E-Way Inc. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Copyright, Patent, and Trademark ReportingRequirements by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/15/2012. (rrey) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 11-06673 PA(FMOx) (rn) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
            PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 1/27/12: Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. (mg) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
              PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 1/27/12: Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. (mg) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Copyright, Patent, and Trademark ReportingRequirements by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/15/2012. (rrey)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 1/26/12 addressed to brandon.fernald@fernaldlawgroup.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (mg) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Edward E Casto, Jr. for Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120) (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc, identifying Other Affiliate C Earl Woolfork, Other Affiliate Cedric Woolfork, Other Affiliate Tina Woolfork for One-E-Way Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            COMPLAINT against Defendant Imation Corporation. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff One-E-Way Inc.(ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 165 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?