Teresa Stephens v. United States et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-mc-00254

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 12:15 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Teresa L Stephens, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Edgar F Heiskell Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Teresa L Stephens +1 817 788 0766 pocketofsun@rocketmail.com
v.
No Logo A.h. Belo Corporation, Respondent
No Logo ABC News, Respondent
No Logo ABC News Digital Media Group, Respondent
No Logo ABC News Internet Ventures, Respondent
No Logo ABC News NOW, Respondent
No Logo ABC News Productions, Inc., Respondent
No Logo ABC Television Network, Respondent
No Logo ABC, Inc., Respondent
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, ABC Holding CO Inc.
No Logo Access Hollywood, Respondent
No Logo Admiral Dennis C. Blair, Respondent
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Respondent
No Logo All members of 110th Congress, Respondent
No Logo All members of 111th Congress, Respondent
No Logo All members of 112th Congress, Respondent
No Logo American Broadcasting Co, Respondent
Officially listed as "American Broadcasting Company"
No Logo American Broadcasting Company National Amusements Inc., Respondent
No Logo Anthony M. Kennedy, Respondent
No Logo Antonin Scalia, Respondent
No Logo Arne Duncan, Respondent
No Logo Arthur O. Sulzberger, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Ashton B. Carter, Respondent
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "AT and T"
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.
No Logo Belo Corporation, Respondent
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Respondent
Officially listed as "Ben Bernanke"
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Respondent
Officially listed as "Board of Governors-Federal Reserve System"
No Logo Broadcasting Board Of Governors, Respondent
No Logo Bruce C Taub, Respondent
No Logo Cable News Network, Respondent
No Logo Cable News Network Interactive, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Carolyn O'Dell, Respondent
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Respondent
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Respondent
CBS Interactive Media Inc. CBS Interactive Media Inc., Respondent
No Logo CBS Television Network, Respondent
No Logo CBS Television Service, Inc., Respondent
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Cindy Adams, Respondent
No Logo Clarence Thomas, Respondent
No Logo Cnbc, Respondent
No Logo Col Allan, Respondent
No Logo Congress, Respondent
No Logo Dana Perino, Respondent
No Logo Daniel K. Tarullo, Respondent
No Logo David H. Petraeus, Respondent
No Logo Department of Agricultural, Respondent
No Logo Department Of Commerce, Respondent
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"
No Logo Department of Education Department of Energy, Respondent
United States Department of Energy United States Department of Energy, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Energy"
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Health and Human Services"
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"
No Logo Department Of Housing And Urban Development, Respondent
No Logo Department of Interior, Respondent
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Labor"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of State"
No Logo California Department of Transportation, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Transportation"
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Treasury"
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Veteran Affairs"
No Logo Dianne Brandi, Respondent
No Logo Dick Parson, Respondent
No Logo Director of the Office of Management and Budget, Respondent
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "Disney Enterprises"
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, Infoseek Corp /de/
Unknown Role, Active Network, Inc.,
Unknown Role, ABC, Inc.
Unknown Role, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Unknown Role, Espn, Inc.
No Logo Disney Media Distribution, Respondent
No Logo Don Clark, Respondent
No Logo Don Logan, Respondent
No Logo Douglas B. Wilson, Respondent
No Logo Dr. Steven Chu, Respondent
No Logo Dunia A. Shive, Respondent
No Logo E! Entertainment Television, LLC, Respondent
No Logo E! Entertainment Television International Holdings, Inc., Respondent
No Logo E-Online, Respondent
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Respondent
Officially listed as "Elaine L. Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc
No Logo Elena Kagan, Respondent
No Logo Elizabeth A. Duke, Respondent
No Logo Emily Smith, Respondent
No Logo Entertainment Tonight, Respondent
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Respondent
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr."
No Logo Eric K. Shinseki, Respondent
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Respondent
Officially listed as "Federal Bureau of Investigations"
Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Respondent
No Logo Fox Broadcasting Company, Respondent
Fox News Network LLC Fox News Network LLC, Respondent
Officially listed as "Fox News Channel"
No Logo Fox News Production, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Fox News Service, Inc., Respondent
Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Frank A. Bennack, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Gabriel Snyder, Respondent
No Logo Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Respondent
No Logo Gawker Media, Llc, Respondent
No Logo General Martin E. Dempsey, Respondent
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Respondent
Officially listed as "General Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo General Michael Moseley, Respondent
No Logo Geoff Morrell, Respondent
No Logo George Little, Respondent
No Logo George R. Hearst, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Glenn Britt, Respondent
No Logo Government Accountability Office, Respondent
No Logo Hamilton Nolan, Respondent
No Logo Harvey Levin, Respondent
No Logo Harvey Levin Productions, Respondent
No Logo Henry Paulson, Respondent
No Logo Hilda L. Solis, Respondent
No Logo Howell Raines, Respondent
No Logo Information Security Oversight Office, Respondent
No Logo Jacob J Lew, Respondent
Officially listed as "Jacob Lew"
No Logo James Jim Walton, Respondent
No Logo James M. Moroney, III, Respondent
No Logo Janet L. Robinson, Respondent
Yellen, Janet Yellen, Janet, Respondent
Officially listed as "Janet L. Yellen"
No Logo Janet Napolitan, Respondent
No Logo Jann Wenner, Respondent
No Logo Jay Carney, Respondent
No Logo Jeffrey L. Bewkes, Respondent
No Logo Jill Abramson, Respondent
No Logo John and Jane Doe Defendants, Respondent
No Logo John Brennan, Respondent
No Logo John Bryson, Respondent
No Logo John Chris Inglis, Respondent
No Logo John Fitzgerald, Respondent
No Logo John G. Roberts, Jr., Respondent
No Logo John M. O'Quinn Foundation, Respondent
No Logo John Stack, Respondent
No Logo Joshua Brewster Bolten, Respondent
No Logo Judge Terry Means, Respondent
No Logo Kathleen Sebelius, Respondent
No Logo KCBS, Respondent
No Logo KDFW, Respondent
No Logo Keith B. Alexander, Respondent
No Logo Ken Salazar, Respondent
No Logo KTVT, Respondent
No Logo KXAS, Respondent
No Logo Leon E. Panetta, Respondent
No Logo Leslie Moonves, Respondent
No Logo Linda Bell Blue, Respondent
No Logo Liz Smith, Respondent
No Logo Lt. General James R. Clapper, Respondent
No Logo Maj. Gen. Noel T. Tom Jones, Respondent
No Logo Mario Lavandeira, Respondent
No Logo Mark Anthony Steines, Respondent
No Logo Mark E. Aldam, Respondent
No Logo Mary Peters, Respondent
No Logo Melissa Hathaway, Respondent
No Logo Michael Clemente, Respondent
No Logo Michael Morell, Respondent
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Respondent
No Logo Mr. Louis E. Caldera, Respondent
No Logo MSNBC, Respondent
No Logo MSNBC.com, Respondent
No Logo National Geospatial-intelligence Agency, Respondent
No Logo National Public Radio, Respondent
No Logo National Security Agency NSA and Central Security Services CSS, Respondent
No Logo National Security Council, Respondent
No Logo Nbc, Respondent
No Logo NBC News, Respondent
No Logo NBC News Bureau, LLC, Respondent
No Logo NBC News Bureaus, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Nbc Universal Television Distribution, Respondent
No Logo NBC5, Respondent
No Logo Neil McCabe, Respondent
No Logo New York Times, Respondent
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Respondent
Officially listed as "New York Times Company"
News Corporation News Corporation, Respondent
No Logo NewsOne, Respondent
No Logo Nick Denton, Respondent
No Logo NY York Post, Respondent
No Logo Office of Director of DNI, Respondent
Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget, Respondent
Officially listed as "Office of Management and Budget"
No Logo Perez Hilton, Respondent
No Logo Perez Hilton Entertainment LP, Respondent
No Logo Perez Hilton Management, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Peter Keisler, Respondent
No Logo Peter L. Diaz, Respondent
No Logo Peter Mikami Pete Rouse, Respondent
No Logo Philip I. Kent, Respondent
No Logo President Barack Obama, Respondent
No Logo R.E. Ted Turner, Respondent
No Logo Rahm Emanuel, Respondent
No Logo Ray LaHood, Respondent
No Logo Richard Johnson, Respondent
No Logo Robert E. Casey, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Robert Gibbs, Respondent
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013
No Logo Robert W. Decherd, Respondent
Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert, Respondent
Officially listed as "Rupert Murdoch"
No Logo Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Respondent
No Logo Samuel Anthony Alito, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Sarah Bloom Raskin, Respondent
No Logo Scott Heekin-Canedy, Respondent
No Logo Scott Teissler, Respondent
No Logo Secretary of State Hillary Clinton, Respondent
No Logo Shari Berg, Respondent
No Logo Shaun Donovan, Respondent
No Logo Sonia Sotomayor, Respondent
No Logo Splash News - N.Y., LLC, Respondent
No Logo Splash News & Picture Agency, LLC, Respondent
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Station Venture Operations, Respondent
No Logo Stephen G. Breyer, Respondent
No Logo Steve Preston, Respondent
No Logo Sumner Redstone, Respondent
No Logo Supreme Court of the United States, Respondent
No Logo Suzanne Scott, Respondent
No Logo T. Gerald Treece, Respondent
No Logo The National Reconnaissance Office, Respondent
No Logo The O'Quinn Law Firm, Respondent
The Walt Disney Company, Inc. The Walt Disney Company, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "The Walt Disney Company"
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, TWDC Holdco 613 Corp.
Unknown Role, TFCF America, Inc
Unknown Role, TFCF Corp
No Logo Tim Geithner, Respondent
No Logo Time Inc., Respondent
No Logo Time Warner Cable Inc., Respondent
Unknown Role, Clearwire Corp
Unknown Role, Time Warner Cable LLC
Unknown Role, New Clearwire CORP
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Respondent
No Logo TMZ Productions, Inc., Respondent
No Logo Tom Ehlmann, Respondent
No Logo Tom Vilsack, Respondent
No Logo Turner Broadcasting, Inc., Respondent
No Logo U.S. Federal Civil Court - North Texas, Respondent
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Respondent
No Logo Universal, Respondent
No Logo Universal Media Studios, Respondent
No Logo Us Magazine LLC, Respondent
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Respondent
Officially listed as "Vice Presidentr Joe Biden"
No Logo Wall Street Journal, Respondent
No Logo Walt Disney-ABC Television, Respondent
No Logo Warner Brotheers Entertainment Inc., Respondent
No Logo The Washington Post Company, Respondent
Officially listed as "Washington Post"
Unknown Role, Cable One, Inc.
Unknown Role, Smartpros Ltd
No Logo Wenner Media LLC, Respondent
No Logo Wenner Productions, LLC, Respondent
No Logo WFAA, Respondent
No Logo William B. Black, Respondent
No Logo William C. Dudley, Respondent
No Logo William Daley, Respondent
No Logo Wilma Vicedomine, Respondent
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 2 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Denying 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the request of plaintiff/petitioner to file the action prepayment of the filing be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged Emergency Veriefied Returned, # 2 Part 1 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition to Perpetuate Returned, # 3 Part 2 to Lodged to Emergency Verified Petition Returned, # 4 Part 3 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 5 Part 4 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 6 Part 5 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 7 Part 6 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 8 Part 7 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 9 Part 8 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 10 Part 9 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 11 Part 10 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 12 Part 11 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 13 Part 12 to Emergency to Verified Petition Return, # 14 Part 13 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 14 Part 15 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 16 Part 15 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 17 Part 16 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 18 Part 17 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 19 Part 18 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 20 Part 19 to Lodged Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 21 Part 20 to Emergency Verified Petition Return, # 22 Part 21 to Emergency Verified Petition Return) (et) (Attachment 15 replaced on 4/24/2013) (mda). (Attachment 15 replaced on 4/25/2013) (et). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/26/2012 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 203 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?